PRSM II/BJ Martino Investments, LLC v. Certain Underwriters at Llloyd's of London et al
Plaintiff: PRSM II/BJ Martino Investments, LLC
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Llloyd's of London and Charles Robertson
Case Number: 4:2022cv00152
Filed: March 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2022 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 Opposed MOTION to Remand filed by Certain Underwriters at Llloyd's of London. (Steppick, Daniel)
April 12, 2022 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Opposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss, or Alternatively Stay, Proceedings filed by Certain Underwriters at Llloyd's of London. (Steppick, Daniel)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #7 Opposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Reply due by 4/13/2022. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 4/7/2022. (rpc, )
April 6, 2022 Filing 16 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Certain Underwriters at Llloyd's of London. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Steppick, Daniel)
April 5, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Calvin Steppick on behalf of Certain Underwriters at Llloyd's of London (Steppick, Daniel)
March 30, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 Opposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss, or Alternatively Stay, Proceedings filed by PRSM II/BJ Martino Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Loree, Robert)
March 30, 2022 Filing 13 Opposed MOTION to Remand by PRSM II/BJ Martino Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Loree, Robert)
March 30, 2022 Filing 12 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION to Remand by PRSM II/BJ Martino Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Loree, Robert) Modified on 3/30/2022 (rpc, ).
March 30, 2022 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #12 MOTION to Remand submitted by PRSM II/BJ Martino Investments, LLC. The Motion is missing a Certificate of Conference. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #7 Opposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Response due by 3/30/2022. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 3/24/2022. (rpc, )
March 23, 2022 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by PRSM II/BJ Martino Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loree, Robert)
March 21, 2022 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Certain Underwriters at Llloyd's of London, Charles Robertson identifying Corporate Parent Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. B1230AP03924B17, Corporate Parent Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Subscribing to Policy No. B1230AP03924A17, Other Affiliate Charles Robertson for Certain Underwriters at Llloyd's of London, Charles Robertson. (Jones, Paige)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 3/3/2022. (rpc, )
March 3, 2022 Filing 7 Opposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss, or Alternatively Stay, Proceedings by Certain Underwriters at Llloyd's of London, Charles Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Statutory Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit Defendants' Arbitration Demand Letter, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Paige)
March 3, 2022 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the #6 Opposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss, or Alternatively Stay, Proceedings submitted by Certain Underwriters at Llloyd's of London, Charles Robertson. The exhibits were not filed as separate attachments, Local Rule CV-5. Correction should be made by one business day. (rpc, )
March 2, 2022 Filing 6 ***DEFICIENT. TO BE REFILED. PLEASE DISREGARD*** Opposed MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss, or Alternatively Stay, Proceedings by Certain Underwriters at Llloyd's of London, Charles Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Paige) Modified on 3/3/2022 (rpc, ).
March 1, 2022 Filing 5 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by PRSM II/BJ Martino Investments, LLC.(rpc, )
March 1, 2022 Filing 4 Charles Robertson's ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Charles Robertson.(Jones, Paige) Modified on 3/1/2022 (rpc, ).
March 1, 2022 Filing 3 Underwriters' ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Certain Underwriters at Llloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B1230AP03924A17 and B1230AP03924B17.(Jones, Paige) Modified on 3/1/2022 (rpc, ).
March 1, 2022 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Certain Underwriters at Llloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B1230AP03924A17 and B1230AP03924B17, Charles Robertson (Jones, Paige)
March 1, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Certain Underwriters at Llloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B1230AP03924A17 and B1230AP03924B17, Charles Robertson from 431st District Court, Denton County, Texas, case number 22-0633-431. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8809257), filed by Certain Underwriters at Llloyd's, London Subscribing to Policy No. B1230AP03924A17 and B1230AP03924B17, Charles Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Jury Request, #3 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #5 Exhibit Certified Copy of Case Summary, #6 Exhibit List of Counsel of Record, #7 Exhibit Index of State Court Filings, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Jones, Paige)
March 1, 2022 Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (rpc, )
March 1, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRSM II/BJ Martino Investments, LLC v. Certain Underwriters at Llloyd's of London et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRSM II/BJ Martino Investments, LLC
Represented By: Robert W. Loree
Represented By: Robert W Loree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Llloyd's of London
Represented By: Paige Craig Jones
Represented By: Daniel Calvin Steppick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Robertson
Represented By: Paige Craig Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?