Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 97.99.244.198
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 97.99.244.198
Case Number: 4:2022cv00162
Filed: March 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER and PROTECTIVE ORDER. The Court GRANTS each of Strike 3's motions for leave to serve third-party subpoenas. (No. 4:22-CV-155, Dkt. #4); (No. 4:22-CV-156, Dkt. #4); (No. 4:22-CV-157, Dkt. #4); (No. 4:22-CV-158, Dkt. #4); (No. 4:22-CV-159, Dkt. #4); (No. 4:22-CV-162, Dkt. #5); (No. 4:22-CV-163, Dkt. #5); (No. 4:22-CV-164, Dkt. #5); (No. 4:22-CV-165, Dkt. #5); (No. 4:22-CV-166, Dkt. #4); (No. 4:22-CV-167, Dkt. #4). The Court also enters a Protective Order sua sponte to protect the respective interests of the parties and non-parties and to facilitate the progress of disclosure and discovery in this case. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 3/18/2022. (rpc, )
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 4:22-CV-155. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the lead case. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations and trial. The Court will enter one docket control order, one protective order, and one discovery order that will govern the entire consolidated case. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 3/17/2022. (mem)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order This civil action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 4:22-cv-155 designated as the Lead Case. All future pleadings are to be filed in the Lead Case (except relating to venue). (mem)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Beik, Paul)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Sean D. Jordan, effective immediately. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 3/3/2022. (rpc, )
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Beik, Paul)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Beik, Paul)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8813148.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beik, Paul)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, )
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 97.99.244.198
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Paul Stephen Beik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, subscriber assigned IP address 97.99.244.198
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?