Kapadia v. Texas Instruments, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Viral Kapadia
Defendant: Texas Instruments, Inc., Fidelity Investments, Inc., The Vanguard Group, Inc., Unknown Defendants, Texas Instruments, Incorporated, Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC doing business as Fidelity Investments, The Vanguard Group, Incorporated doing business as Vanguard Flagship Services, Unknown Defendant(s), Swami Nileshwaranand Saraswati and Swami Chandramauleshwaranand Saraswati
Case Number: 4:2022cv00443
Filed: May 24, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2022 Filing 7 Defendant Fidelity Workplace Services LLC's ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC.(Bowen, James)
July 14, 2022 Filing 6 Defendant Texas Instruments Incorporated's ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Texas Instruments, Incorporated.(Bowen, James)
June 24, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants, filed by Viral Kapadia.(Mead, David)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TRANSFER ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that this civil action is transferred to the Honorable Jeremy D. Kernodle, effective immediately. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 6/16/2022. (mcg)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER AND ADVISORY. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 5/26/2022. (mcg)
May 24, 2022 Filing 2 ***ORIGINALLY FILED IN STATE COURT*** PETITION against All Defendants, filed by Viral Kapadia.(mcg)
May 24, 2022 Case Assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (mcg)
May 24, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mcg)
May 24, 2022 Notified Attorney, David M. Mead, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. ***ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN OUR COURT - ATTORNEY ADMISSION LETTER SENT VIA EMAIL*** (mcg)
May 24, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fidelity Investments, Inc., Texas Instruments, Inc. from Probate Court of Collin County, Texas, case number PB1-0690-2022. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-8942714), filed by Fidelity Investments, Inc., Texas Instruments, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Bowen, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kapadia v. Texas Instruments, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viral Kapadia
Represented By: David Mead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Instruments, Inc.
Represented By: James W Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Investments, Inc.
Represented By: James W Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vanguard Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Instruments, Incorporated
Represented By: Charles Robinson Truslow
Represented By: James W Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity Workplace Services, LLC doing business as Fidelity Investments
Represented By: Charles Robinson Truslow
Represented By: James W Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Vanguard Group, Incorporated doing business as Vanguard Flagship Services
Represented By: Virginia Bell Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendant(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swami Nileshwaranand Saraswati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swami Chandramauleshwaranand Saraswati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?