Zavala, et al v Cooper Tire and Rubber Co.
Plaintiff: Ilda Castruita Zavala, Lorenzo Castruita Zavala, Pedro Rayas and Velia Roman Vega
Defendant: Cooper Tire & Rubber Company
Case Number: 4:2022cv00498
Filed: June 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Amos L Mazzant
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Cooper's Withdrawal of FNC Motion)(Jenks, Thad)
August 10, 2022 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION TO WITHDRAW submitted DOCUMENT #16 - NO CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE AND NO PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
August 9, 2022 Filing 16 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - DEFICIENT DOCUMENT*** MOTION to Withdraw #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens without prejudice by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. (Jenks, Thad) Modified on 8/10/2022 (baf, ).
August 9, 2022 Filing 15 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens filed by J.C., Pedro Rayas, Velia Roman Vega, Ilda Castruita Zavala, Lorenzo Castruita Zavala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit 2 to Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit 3 to Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit 4 to Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit 5 to Exhibit A, #7 Exhibit 6 to Exhibit A, #8 Exhibit 7 to Exhibit A, #9 Exhibit 8 to Exhibit A)(Ammons, Robert)
August 9, 2022 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the SURREPLY submitted DOCUMENT #14 - THE EXHIBITS ARE NOT ATTACHED IN COMPLIANCE WITH OUR LOCAL RULES. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
August 8, 2022 Filing 14 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD***SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens filed by J.C., Pedro Rayas, Velia Roman Vega, Ilda Castruita Zavala, Lorenzo Castruita Zavala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A w-Exhibits 1-8)(Ammons, Robert) Modified on 8/9/2022 (baf, ).
August 5, 2022 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens filed by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - Med Recs)(Jenks, Thad)
August 4, 2022 Counsel are advised that the Court has not opted out of this court's Local Rules concerning courtesy copies; therefore, Counsel are asked to comply with Local Rule CV-5(a)(9) and Local Rule CV-10(b) with respect to sending courtesy copies to Judge Mazzant. Please send copies of filings that exceed 20 pages to Judge Mazzant's chambers. Please use tabs and dividers for exhibits, and please place very voluminous filings in three-ring binder(s). Staples are fine; no binder clips, please. (tls)
August 3, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE by J.C., Pedro Rayas, Velia Roman Vega, Ilda Castruita Zavala, Lorenzo Castruita Zavala Plaintiffs' Certificate of Interested Persons (Ammons, Robert)
August 3, 2022 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens filed by J.C., Pedro Rayas, Velia Roman Vega, Ilda Castruita Zavala, Lorenzo Castruita Zavala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A w-Exhibits 1-3, #2 Text of Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens)(Ammons, Robert)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/31/2022. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 9/20/2022 at 02:00 PM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/27/2022. (rpc, )
July 21, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Richard Tippetts on behalf of Cooper Tire & Rubber Company (Tippetts, David)
July 20, 2022 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company identifying Corporate Parent The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company for Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. (Tippetts, David)
July 20, 2022 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. (Tippetts, David)
July 20, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company.(Tippetts, David)
July 20, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Forum Non Conveniens by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. (Tippetts, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/21/2022: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ).
July 20, 2022 Filing 4 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cooper Tire & Rubber Company.(Tippetts, David) Modified on 7/20/2022 (baf, ).
July 20, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
July 20, 2022 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the ANSWER submitted DOCUMENT #4 - DOCUMENT IS A TWO PART DOCUMENT/MOTION - ANSWER AND MOTION TO DISMISS FILED IN THE SAME DOCUMENT. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, )
June 23, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Cooper Tire & Rubber Company. (baf, )
June 21, 2022 ***FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY - SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED SHOULD NOT BE FILED ON THE DOCKET. Document # 2, NOTICE. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (baf, )
June 17, 2022 Filing 2 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY***NOTICE by Ilda Castruita Zavala Request for Issuance Summons Cooper (Ammons, Robert) Modified on 6/21/2022 (baf, ).
June 14, 2022 Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, )
June 14, 2022 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, )
June 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cooper Tire & Rubber Company, filed by Ilda Castruita Zavala. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Ammons, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zavala, et al v Cooper Tire and Rubber Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ilda Castruita Zavala
Represented By: Robert Earl Ammons
Represented By: Zachary Joseph Wyatte
Represented By: Robert Ammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Castruita Zavala
Represented By: Zachary Joseph Wyatte
Represented By: Robert Ammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Rayas
Represented By: Zachary Joseph Wyatte
Represented By: Robert Ammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Velia Roman Vega
Represented By: Zachary Joseph Wyatte
Represented By: Robert Ammons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: David Richard Tippetts
Represented By: Thad Kingston Jenks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?