Benham v. Five Point Dental Specialists, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Adam Benham, Benham Orthodontics, PA, Five Point Dental Specialists, Inc. and FPDS Benham Sub, LLC
Defendant: FPDS Benham Holdco, LLC, Benham Property Owners Association, LLC and Benham Orthodontics & Associates, PA
Case Number: 4:2024cv00484
Filed: May 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Sherman Office
Presiding Judge: Sean D Jordan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 EMERGENCY MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Adam Benham, Benham Orthodontics & Associates, PA, Benham Property Owners Association, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email re Dismissal of TM Claims, #2 Exhibit FP Petition, #3 Exhibit Consolidation Order, #4 Exhibit FP Amended Petition, #5 Exhibit Email re TRO Hearing, #6 Proposed Order)(Nash, Connor)
May 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. Before the Court is Defendants' Emergency Motion for Remand. (Dkt. #9 ). Plaintiff Adam Benham and Third-Party Defendants Benham Property Association, LLC and Benham Orthodontics & Associates, PA are ORDERED to respond to the motion by 5:00 p.m. on May 31, 2024. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 5/30/2024. (jmb)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (jmb)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Case assigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (jmb)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER transferring this case to the Sherman Division of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas. Signed by District Judge Marcia A. Crone on 5/29/24. (kcv)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CORRECTED MOTION to Change Venue by Adam Benham, Benham Orthodontics & Associates, PA, Benham Property Owners Association, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nash, Connor)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Change Venue by Adam Benham, Benham Orthodontics & Associates, PA, Benham Property Owners Association, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nash, Connor)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EMERGENCY MOTION to Remand to State Court by Benham Orthodontics, PA, FPDS Benham Holdco, LLC, FPDS Benham Sub, LLC, Five Point Dental Specialists, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Avant, Camille)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Clerk's LR CV-10(d) Notice of Deficiency as to #10 Motion to Change Venue filed by Adam Benham, Benham Orthodontics & Associates, PA. - LR CV-7(i) or LR CR-47(a)(3) requires this document to include a certificate of conference that complies with the rule. Recommended cure: Within one day, Filer must refile with the word Corrected in the title of the document. The filer should use the same ECF event and when offered the docket text enhancement dropdown, select CORRECTED so it will also appear in the docket text. (kcv)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORIGINAL ANSWER to #3 Original Petition, #4 First Supplemental Petition, filed in State Court and included in the Supplemental Notice of Removal, by FPDS Benham Holdco, LLC, FPDS Benham Sub, LLC, Five Point Dental Specialists, Inc.(kcv)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE of Removal by Adam Benham, Benham Orthodontics & Associates, PA, Benham Property Owners Association, LLC re #2 Amended Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Nash, Connor)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (kcv)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Adam Benham, Benham Orthodontics & Associates, PA, Benham Property Owners Association, LLC from 471st Judicial District Court, case number 471-02575-2024., filed by Adam Benham, Benham Orthodontics & Associates, PA, Benham Property Owners Association, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Nash, Connor) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2024: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (kcv).
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED PETITION against Adam Benham, Benham Orthodontics & Associates, PA, Benham Property Owners Association, LLC, filed by Benham Orthodontics, PA, FPDS Benham Sub, LLC, Five Point Dental Specialists, Inc.(kcv)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORIGINAL PETITION filed in State Court in cause no 471-02582-2024 and consolidated with cause no. 471-02575-2024 against Adam Benham, Benham Property Owners Association, LLC, filed by Benham Orthodontics, PA, FPDS Benham Sub, LLC, Five Point Dental Specialists, Inc.(kcv)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION filed in State Court and included in the Amended Notice of Removal against Five Point Dental Specialists, Inc., FPDS Benham Holdco, LLC, FPDS Benham Sub, LLC, filed by Adam Benham.(kcv)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORIGINAL PETITION filed in State Court and included in the Amended Notice of Removal against Five Point Dental Specialists, Inc., FPDS Benham Holdco, LLC, FPDS Benham Sub, LLC, filed by Adam Benham.(kcv)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to District Judge Marcia A. Crone. (kcv)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff. (kcv)
May 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Adam Benham, Benham Orthodontics & Associates, PA, Benham Property Owners Association, LLC from 471st Judicial District Court, case number 471-02575-2024. ( Filing fee $ 405), filed by Adam Benham, Benham Orthodontics & Associates, PA, Benham Property Owners Association, LLC.(Nash, Connor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benham v. Five Point Dental Specialists, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Benham
Represented By: Connor Allan Nash
Represented By: James Samuel Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benham Orthodontics, PA
Represented By: John Clayton Sokatch
Represented By: Camille Antoinette Avant
Represented By: Dallas Zachary Flick
Represented By: Israel Ramon Silvas
Represented By: Matthew Steven Muckleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Five Point Dental Specialists, Inc.
Represented By: John Clayton Sokatch
Represented By: Camille Antoinette Avant
Represented By: Dallas Zachary Flick
Represented By: Israel Ramon Silvas
Represented By: Matthew Steven Muckleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FPDS Benham Sub, LLC
Represented By: John Clayton Sokatch
Represented By: Camille Antoinette Avant
Represented By: Dallas Zachary Flick
Represented By: Israel Ramon Silvas
Represented By: Matthew Steven Muckleroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FPDS Benham Holdco, LLC
Represented By: Israel Ramon Silvas
Represented By: Matthew Steven Muckleroy
Represented By: John Clayton Sokatch
Represented By: Camille Antoinette Avant
Represented By: Dallas Zachary Flick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benham Property Owners Association, LLC
Represented By: James Samuel Bell
Represented By: Connor Allan Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benham Orthodontics & Associates, PA
Represented By: James Samuel Bell
Represented By: Connor Allan Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?