ESN LLC v. Cisco Systems Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff ESN, LLC alleged that Defendants Cisco Systems, Inc. and Cisco-Linksys, LLC infringed on U.S. Patent No. 7,283,519 entitled "Distributed Edge Switching System for Voice-Over-Packet Multiservice Network."

Plaintiff: ESN LLC
Defendant: Cisco Systems Inc and Cisco-Linksys LLC
Case Number: 5:2007cv00156
Filed: October 15, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Presiding Judge: David Folsom
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/19/07. (mrm, )
November 2, 2007 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by ESN LLC, Cisco Systems Inc, Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
October 29, 2007 Filing 11 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul McAndrews for ESN LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3165 (ch, )
October 29, 2007 Filing 10 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gerald C Willis, Jr for ESN LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3165 (ch, )
October 29, 2007 Filing 9 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Peter J McAndrews for ESN LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3165 (ch, )
October 29, 2007 Filing 8 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney George P McAndrews for ESN LLC. (APPROVED)(FEE PAID) 2-1-3165(ch, )
October 29, 2007 Filing 7 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Thomas J Wimbiscus for ESN LLC. (PAID - RECEIPT #2-1-3165) (sm, )
October 18, 2007 Filing 6 MOTION to Enjoin Defendants Cisco and Linksys From Prosecuting Later-Filed Parallel Litigation in Connecticut by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G)(Albritton, Eric)
October 17, 2007 Filing 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Cisco Systems Inc, Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 summons CiscoLinksys)(rml, )
October 17, 2007 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Albritton, Eric)
October 17, 2007 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cisco Systems Inc, Cisco-Linksys LLC, filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1# 2 Exhibit A - Part 2# 3 Exhibit B - Part 1# 4 Exhibit B - Part 2# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D)(Albritton, Eric)
October 16, 2007 Opinion or Order STANDING ORDER REFERRING 40% of CASES to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for pretrial. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/16/2007. (sm, )
October 16, 2007 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of ESN LLC (Ward, Thomas)
October 16, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cisco Systems Inc, Cisco-Linksys LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1298562.), filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1# 2 Exhibit A - Part 2# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Albritton, Eric) Modified on 10/17/2007 (fnt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESN LLC v. Cisco Systems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESN LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Wimbiscus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco-Linksys LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?