ESN LLC v. Cisco Systems, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff ESN, LLC alleged that Defendants Cisco Systems, Inc. and Cisco-Linksys, LLC infringed on U.S. Patent No. 7,283,519 entitled \"Distributed Edge Switching System for Voice-Over-Packet Multiservice Network.\"

Plaintiff: ESN LLC
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc. and Cisco-Linksys LLC
Case Number: 5:2008cv00020
Filed: January 31, 2008
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: David Folsom
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2010 192 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC Change of Firm Name (Maroulis, Victoria)
February 19, 2010 Notice of docketing from US Court of Appeals for Federal Circuit (#2010-1185) on 2/5/2010 (sm, )
February 17, 2010 191 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC Joint Notice of Agreement Regarding Costs (Cannon, Matthew)
February 16, 2010 190 Featured Case ORDER granting 189 Motion for Extension of the Local Rule CV-54(a) Deadline for Filing Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 2/16/10. (mrm, )
February 12, 2010 189 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Matthew)
January 29, 2010 Sent certified NOA, docket sheet, dismissal order to Federal Circuit. (sm, )
January 28, 2010 188 NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to 185 Order Dismissing Case, 184 Order on Sealed Motion,,,,, by ESN LLC. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 05400000000002333360. (Albritton, Eric)
January 19, 2010 187 Featured Case ORDER granting 186 Motion for Extension of Time to File bill of costs to February 12, 2010. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 1/19/2010. (sm, )
January 13, 2010 186 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
December 30, 2009 185 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by Judge David Folsom on December 30, 2009. (rml, )
December 30, 2009 184 Featured Case ORDER granting 71 Sealed Motion to dismiss ; granting in part and denying in part 73 Sealed Motion to disqualify counsel & impose sanctions; dfts ordered to reimburse pltf for all expenses associated with dft's failure to timely product emp agreement. If the parties are unable to agree on the amount of such expenses, any such dispute should be submitted to the Court by appropriate motion within 30 days of this Order. Dfts to pay fine of $100,000.00 to Rest Acct of the court within 30 days. Signed by Judge David Folsom on December 30, 2009. (rml, ) Modified on 12/30/2009 (rml, ).
December 29, 2009 183 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL REDACTED TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 20, 2009, Motion Hearing, 66 pages before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. Redaction Request due 1/22/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/1/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/1/2010. (aec, )
December 17, 2009 182 Featured Case ORDER granting 181 Motion to Redact re 179 Transcript,,,,. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/17/09. (mrm, )
December 16, 2009 181 Unopposed MOTION to Redact 179 Transcript,,,, by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cannon, Matthew)
December 16, 2009 180 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Matthew D Cannon re 179 Transcript,,,,. (Cannon, Matthew)
December 7, 2009 179 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 20, 2009, Motion Hearing, 66 pages, before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be purchased from the Court Reporter or PACER.. Redaction Request due 12/31/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2010. (aec, )
December 1, 2009 178 NOTICE of Change of Address by Victoria Fishman Maroulis (Maroulis, Victoria)
November 20, 2009 177 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2009 re 123 Second MOTION to Compel Response to Cisco's Seventh Interrogatory filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC, 73 SEALED MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and Impose Sanctions on Defendants and Their Counsel for Improperly Offering Financial Incentives in Exchange for Testimony filed by ESN LLC, 124 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC, 71 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
November 19, 2009 176 Featured Case ORDER STAYING CASE, granting 169 Agreed MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's and Defendants' Stipulation and Agreed Motion for a Temporary Stay Pending the Outcome of the Motions Currently Before the Court filed by ESN LLC. Thecase shall be stayed upon conclusion of the November 20, 2009 motion hearing until sixty days after the Court rules on the motions.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/19/09. (mrm, )
November 17, 2009 175 Featured Case ORDER granting 174 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/17/09. (mrm, )
November 16, 2009 174 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
November 16, 2009 173 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 146 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff ESN, LLC's Motion to Impose Sanctions on Cisco for Discovery Misconduct filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Supplemental Takenouchi Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 36, # 3 Exhibit 37, # 4 Exhibit 38, # 5 Exhibit 39, # 6 Exhibit 40, # 7 Exhibit 41)(Smith, Kevin)
November 16, 2009 172 Featured Case ORDER denying 170 Sealed Motion to consolidate the hearings on pending motions. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/16/2009. (sm, )
November 15, 2009 171 RESPONSE to Motion re 170 SEALED MOTION to Consolidate the Hearings on the Pending Motions Currently Before the Court filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Smith, Kevin)
November 13, 2009 170 SEALED MOTION to Consolidate the Hearings on the Pending Motions Currently Before the Court by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Willis, Gerald)
November 13, 2009 169 Agreed MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's and Defendants' Stipulation and Agreed Motion for a Temporary Stay Pending the Outcome of the Motions Currently Before the Court by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Willis, Gerald)
November 12, 2009 168 Featured Case ORDER granting 145 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/12/09. (mrm, )
November 10, 2009 167 SEALED SUR REPLY in Opposition to Cisco's re 151 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit U, # 2 Exhibit V, # 3 Exhibit W, # 4 Exhibit X, # 5 Exhibit Y)(Willis, Gerald)
November 5, 2009 166 Featured Case ORDER granting 163 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/5/2009. (sm, )
November 4, 2009 165 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Declaration of Gerald Willis in Response to Declaration of Jason Takenovchi filed in support of Cisco's opposition - is contained in main document): 164 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion, Declaration of Gerald C. Willis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Willis, Gerald) Modified on 11/5/2009 (sm, ). Modified on 11/5/2009 (sm, ).
November 4, 2009 164 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 146 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff ESN, LLC's Motion to Impose Sanctions on Cisco for Discovery Misconduct filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DD, # 2 Exhibit EE, # 3 Exhibit FF, # 4 Exhibit GG, # 5 Exhibit HH, # 6 Exhibit II, # 7 Exhibit JJ, # 8 Exhibit KK, # 9 Exhibit LL, # 10 Exhibit MM)(Willis, Gerald)
November 4, 2009 163 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Willis, Gerald)
November 2, 2009 162 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 151 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Smith, Kevin)
October 28, 2009 161 Featured Case ORDER granting 160 Motion for Leave to File Brief in Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/28/09. (mrm, )
October 27, 2009 160 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
October 27, 2009 159 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 157 Sealed Response to Motion, Jason Takenouchi Declaration - included in main document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Errata 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35)(Smith, Kevin) Modified on 10/28/2009 (sm, ).
October 27, 2009 158 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 157 Sealed Response to Motion, Declaration of William Hamilton - included in Main Document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Kevin) Modified on 10/28/2009 (sm, ).
October 27, 2009 157 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 146 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff ESN, LLC's Motion to Impose Sanctions on Cisco for Discovery Misconduct filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Froehbrodt Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Culliper Declaration)(Smith, Kevin)
October 23, 2009 156 Featured Case ORDER granting 154 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 146 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff ESN, LLC's Motion to Impose Sanctions on Cisco for Discovery Misconduct Responses due by 10/27/2009. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/23/09. (mrm, )
October 22, 2009 155 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 151 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T)(Willis, Gerald)
October 22, 2009 154 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 146 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff ESN, LLC's Motion to Impose Sanctions on Cisco for Discovery Misconduct by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
October 14, 2009 153 NOTICE by ESN LLC re 146 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff ESN, LLC's Motion to Impose Sanctions on Cisco for Discovery Misconduct Notice of Correction to ESN's Motion for Sanctions (Ward, Thomas)
October 9, 2009 152 Featured Case ORDER Re-setting Hearing on Motion 124 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions, 123 Second MOTION to Compel Response to Cisco's Seventh Interrogatory; The Court ordered that each side would have 15 minutes for argument as to each motion(for a total of 30 minutes per side as to both motions dkt # 123 and 124). ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 71 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction; 73 SEALED MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and Impose Sanctions on Defendants and Their Counsel for Improperly Offering Financial Incentives in Exchange for Testimony, ( Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2009 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.) Defendants will have a total of 30 minutes to present their Motion to Dismiss and respond to Plaintiffs Motion to Disqualify. Likewise, Plaintiff will have a total of 30 minutes to present its Motion to Disqualify and respond to Defendants Motion to Dismiss.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/9/09. (mrm, )
October 7, 2009 151 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Sharper Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria)
October 7, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, ATTY WILL REFILE MOTION, THIS MOTION IS NOW TERMINATED. Documents #149 and #150, SEALED CORRECTED MOTION AND ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
October 7, 2009 150 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Additional Attachments to Main Document: 149 Amended SEALED PATENT MOTION CORRECTED BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER.. (Smith, Kevin) Modified on 10/7/2009 (sm, ).
October 7, 2009 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #148 Sealed Motion for protective order submitted by Cisco Systems, Inc.. No cert of authority to seal. (Atty has already refiled - see #149) (sm, )
October 6, 2009 149 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Amended SEALED PATENT MOTION CORRECTED BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria) Modified on 10/7/2009 (sm, ).
October 6, 2009 148 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED PATENT MOTION For a Protective Order by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Sharper Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) Modified on 10/7/2009 (sm, ).
October 6, 2009 147 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 145 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages.. (Attachments: # 1 certificate of conference)(Ward, Thomas)
October 5, 2009 146 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff ESN, LLC's Motion to Impose Sanctions on Cisco for Discovery Misconduct by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y, # 27 Exhibit Z, # 28 Exhibit AA, # 29 Exhibit BB, # 30 Exhibit CC)(Bjella, Heather)
October 5, 2009 145 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bjella, Heather)
October 2, 2009 144 Featured Case ORDER terminating as moot 119 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/2/09. (mrm, )
October 1, 2009 143 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER re: motion practice. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/1/09. (mrm, )
September 30, 2009 142 NOTICE by ESN LLC, Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC Joint Notice That Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify and Impose Sanctions Are Ripe for the Court's Consideration (Smith, Kevin)
September 30, 2009 141 Featured Case AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER:( Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2010 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom., Jury instructions due by 4/22/2010, Jury Selection set for 5/2010 in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/22/2010.), granting 140 Agreed MOTION Modify Docket Control Order re 25 Scheduling Order, filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/30/09. (mrm, )
September 29, 2009 140 Agreed MOTION Modify Docket Control Order re 25 Scheduling Order, by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
September 28, 2009 139 SEALED SUR-REPLY IN OPPOSITION to Motion re 71 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11)(McAndrews, Peter)
September 21, 2009 138 Featured Case ORDER granting 135 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/21/09. (mrm, )
September 18, 2009 137 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 71 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Smith Reply Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 25, # 3 Exhibit 26, # 4 Exhibit 27, # 5 Exhibit 28, # 6 Exhibit 29, # 7 Exhibit 30, # 8 Exhibit 31, # 9 Exhibit 32, # 10 Exhibit 33, # 11 Exhibit 34, # 12 Exhibit 35, # 13 Exhibit 36, # 14 Exhibit 37, # 15 Exhibit 38, # 16 Exhibit 39, # 17 Exhibit 40, # 18 Exhibit 41)(Smith, Kevin)
September 18, 2009 136 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 73 SEALED MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and Impose Sanctions on Defendants and Their Counsel for Improperly Offering Financial Incentives in Exchange for Testimony filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit O, # 2 Exhibit P, # 3 Exhibit Q, # 4 Exhibit R, # 5 Exhibit S, # 6 Exhibit T, # 7 Exhibit U, # 8 Exhibit V, # 9 Exhibit W)(Smith, Kevin)
September 18, 2009 135 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
September 15, 2009 134 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 124 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Willis, Gerald)
September 15, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT. Document # 132, Sealed Document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
September 14, 2009 133 NOTICE of Disclosure by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC Final Unenforceability Contentions (Smith, Kevin)
September 14, 2009 132 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***Sealed Document. Plaintiff's Sur-reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Leave to Serve a Second Supplement to Their Invalidity Contentions (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Willis, Gerald) Modified on 9/15/2009 (sm, ).
September 14, 2009 131 REPLY to Response to Motion re 123 Second MOTION to Compel Response to Cisco's Seventh Interrogatory filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Smith, Kevin)
September 14, 2009 130 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 124 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S)(Bjella, Heather)
September 14, 2009 129 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 123 Second MOTION to Compel Response to Cisco's Seventh Interrogatory filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Bjella, Heather)
September 14, 2009 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #125 and #127 submitted by ESN LLC. Not in pdf searchable format. Correction should be made by 1 business day and both refiled. (sm, )
September 14, 2009 128 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 124 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit I)(Smith, Kevin)
September 14, 2009 127 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 124 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S)(Bjella, Heather) Modified on 9/14/2009 (sm, ).
September 14, 2009 126 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 124 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions, 123 Second MOTION to Compel Response to Cisco's Seventh Interrogatory :( Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2009 11:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.) Each side will have 15 minutes for argument as to each motion (for a total of 30 minutes per side as to both motions). The Court hereby CANCELS the hearing previously set for September 15, 2009 at 10:00 A.M. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/14/09. (mrm, )
September 14, 2009 125 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE.***SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 123 Second MOTION to Compel Response to Cisco's Seventh Interrogatory filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Bjella, Heather) Modified on 9/14/2009 (sm, ).
September 11, 2009 124 Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Affidavit Sharper Declaration, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
September 11, 2009 123 Second MOTION to Compel Response to Cisco's Seventh Interrogatory by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Errata G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
September 11, 2009 122 Featured Case ORDER granting 120 Motion to Withdraw; withdrawing 54 Motion to Compel; withdrawing 55 Motion to Amend/Correct;. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/11/09. (mrm, )
September 10, 2009 121 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply and Surreply by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 10, 2009 120 Agreed MOTION to Withdraw 54 MOTION to Compel Response to Cisco's Seventh Interrogatory, 55 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
September 3, 2009 119 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Continuance of Hearing Date by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
September 3, 2009 118 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC of Compliance With Disclosures Pursuant to the Court's Scheduling Order (Sharper, Sayuri)
August 25, 2009 117 NOTICE of Disclosure by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC Service of Preliminary Unenforceability Contentions (Smith, Kevin)
August 12, 2009 116 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 55 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions, 54 MOTION to Compel Response to Cisco's Seventh Interrogatory : Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2009 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. Each side will have 15 minutes for argument as to each motion (for a total of 30 minutes per side as to both motions).. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/12/09. (mrm, )
August 10, 2009 115 Featured Case ORDER granting 113 Motion for Entry of Stipulation regarding Discovery. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/10/09. (mrm, )
August 10, 2009 114 Featured Case ORDER granting 112 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 73 SEALED MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and Impose Sanctions on Defendants and Their Counsel for Improperly Offering Financial Incentives in Exchange for Testimony, 71 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Sur-Reply and Reply due by 9/15/2009.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/10/09. (mrm, )
August 7, 2009 113 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulation Regarding Discovery by ESN LLC, Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) Modified on 8/11/2009 (sm, ).
August 6, 2009 112 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 108 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion,, 106 Sealed Response to Motion, by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
August 3, 2009 111 Featured Case ORDER granting 110 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/3/09. (mrm, )
July 31, 2009 110 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages of ESN's Sealed Reply Brief (document entry 108) by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order proposed order)(Ward, Thomas)
July 31, 2009 109 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Declaration of Connaughton is contained in main document): 106 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Connaughton Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B (1 of 3) to Connaughton Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B (part 2 of 3) to Connaughton Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B (part 3 of 3) to Connaughton Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C to Connaughton Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D to Connaughton Declaration)(McAndrews, Peter) Modified on 8/3/2009 (sm, ).
July 31, 2009 108 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 73 SEALED MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and Impose Sanctions on Defendants and Their Counsel for Improperly Offering Financial Incentives in Exchange for Testimony filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N, # 2 Exhibit O, # 3 Exhibit P, # 4 Exhibit Q, # 5 Exhibit R, # 6 Exhibit S - Part 1, # 7 Exhibit S - Part 2, # 8 Exhibit T, # 9 Exhibit U, # 10 Exhibit V, # 11 Exhibit W, # 12 Exhibit X, # 13 Exhibit Y, # 14 Exhibit Z, # 15 Exhibit AA, # 16 Exhibit BB, # 17 Exhibit CC)(Ward, Thomas)
July 31, 2009 107 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (Declaration of Girard is main document): 106 Sealed Response to Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (1 of 3) of Girard Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A (2 of 3) of Girard Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A (3 of 3) of Girard Declaration, # 4 Exhibit B of Girard Declaration, # 5 Exhibit C of Girard Declaration, # 6 Exhibit D of Girard Declaration, # 7 Exhibit E of Girard Declaration, # 8 Exhibit F of Girard Declaration, # 9 Exhibit G of Girard Declaration)(McAndrews, Peter) Modified on 8/3/2009 (sm, ).
July 31, 2009 106 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 71 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(McAndrews, Peter)
July 16, 2009 105 Sealed Transcript. SEALED PROCEEDINGS, Page 91, line 19 through Page 92, line 13, from Claim Construction Hearing held June 11, 2009. (aec, )
July 16, 2009 104 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL REDACTED TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 11, 2009, Claim Construction Hearing, before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 or lcrawford@cableone.net. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be purchased from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/6/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/14/2009. (aec, )
July 14, 2009 103 Featured Case ORDER granting 101 Motion to Redact re 95 Transcript ORDERING that the transcript of the June 11, 2009 hearing is sealed from page 91, line 19 through page 92, line 13, inclusive and court reporter is directed to redact that passage from all publicly available versions of transcript.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/13/2009. (sm, )
July 14, 2009 102 Featured Case CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/13/2009. (sm, )
July 9, 2009 101 Unopposed MOTION to Redact 95 Transcript,,,, by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Additional Redaction)(Cannon, Matthew)
July 6, 2009 100 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Matthew D Cannon re 95 Transcript,,,,. (Cannon, Matthew)
July 6, 2009 99 Featured Case ORDER granting 98 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 73 SEALED MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and Impose Sanctions on Defendants and Their Counsel for Improperly Offering Financial Incentives in Exchange for Testimony Replies due by 7/31/2009.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/6/09. (mrm, )
July 2, 2009 98 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 73 SEALED MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and Impose Sanctions on Defendants and Their Counsel for Improperly Offering Financial Incentives in Exchange for Testimony by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
July 2, 2009 97 Featured Case ORDER granting 96 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 71 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Responses due by 7/31/2009. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/2/09. (mrm, )
July 1, 2009 96 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 71 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
June 25, 2009 95 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 11, 2009, Claim Construction Hearing, 93 pages before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be purchased from the Court Reporter or PACER.. Redaction Request due 7/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2009. (aec, )
June 25, 2009 94 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 10, 2009, Tutorial, 48 pages, before The Honorable Chief Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter: Libby Crawford, CSR, Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext 237 or lcrawford@cableone.net. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be purchased from the Court Reporter or PACER. Redaction Request due 7/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/23/2009. (aec, )
June 11, 2009 93 Claim Construction Hearing Exhibit List. (Exhibits placed in Texarkana vault)(mrm, )
June 11, 2009 92 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Markman Hearing held on 6/11/2009. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
June 10, 2009 91 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Tutorial held on 6/10/2009. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
May 29, 2009 90 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by ESN LLC, Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Ward, Thomas)
May 27, 2009 89 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC Joint Notice Regarding Claim Construction Scheduling (Smith, Kevin)
May 12, 2009 88 Featured Case ORDER; ORDERED to notify the Court by letter when the Motion to Dismiss is ripe for the Courts consideration. At that time, the Court will determine how to proceed. ORDERED to discuss these dates and notify the Court if the claim-construction schedule is no longer feasible. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/12/09. (mrm, )
May 11, 2009 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Telephone Conference held on 5/11/2009. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
May 11, 2009 86 Featured Case ORDER granting 82 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Reply Brief on Claim Construction. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/11/09. (mrm, )
May 11, 2009 85 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 73 SEALED MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and Impose Sanctions filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Smith, Kevin)
May 8, 2009 84 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 75 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Stay the Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(McAndrews, George)
May 8, 2009 83 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SUR-REPLY BRIEF filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit R, # 2 Exhibit S, # 3 Exhibit T, # 4 Exhibit U)(Smith, Kevin)
May 8, 2009 82 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File to File Sur-Reply on Claim Construction by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
May 7, 2009 81 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 75 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Stay the Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Smith, Kevin)
May 6, 2009 80 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC of Status of Reexamination (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A1, # 2 Exhibit A2, # 3 Exhibit A3, # 4 Exhibit A4)(Maroulis, Victoria)
May 4, 2009 79 Featured Case ORDER granting 77 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/4/09. (mrm, )
May 1, 2009 78 Plaintiff ESN, LLC's Reply Brief on Claim Construction filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit J, # 6 Exhibit K, # 7 Exhibit L, # 8 Exhibit M, # 9 Exhibit N, # 10 Exhibit O)(McAndrews, Peter)
May 1, 2009 77 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Willis, Gerald)
May 1, 2009 76 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 75 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Stay the Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing : Phone Conference set for 5/11/2009 02:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. ORDERS Cisco to file a response by 5PM on Thursday, May 7, 2009. ESN may, if necessary, file a reply by 5PM on Friday, May 8, 2009. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/1/09. (mrm, )
April 30, 2009 75 SEALED MOTION Plaintiff's Motion to Stay the Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(McAndrews, George)
April 24, 2009 74 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 71 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Kevin)
April 24, 2009 73 SEALED MOTION to Disqualify Counsel and Impose Sanctions on Defendants and Their Counsel for Improperly Offering Financial Incentives in Exchange for Testimony by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M)(McAndrews, George) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2009: # 15 REVISED Proposed Order) (mpv, ).
April 24, 2009 72 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 71 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Kevin)
April 24, 2009 71 SEALED MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
April 22, 2009 70 Sealed Defendants' Opposition Brief on Claim Construction (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Burger Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q)(Smith, Kevin)
April 22, 2009 69 NOTICE by ESN LLC, Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC Joint Notice Regarding Mediation (Willis, Gerald)
April 1, 2009 68 Plaintiff ESN, LLC's Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(McAndrews, Peter)
March 23, 2009 67 Featured Case ORDER granting 63 Motion to Withdraw McKool Smith as Attorney of record. Attorney Garret Wesley Chambers terminated; granting 63 Motion to Substitute Michael Jones as Attorney. Attorney Garret Wesley Chambers terminated - Sam Baxter not an atty of record.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/23/2009. (sm, )
March 23, 2009 66 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Edwin Jones on behalf of Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC (Jones, Michael)
March 20, 2009 65 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Motion re 55 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Willis, Gerald)
March 20, 2009 64 SEALED RESPONSE by ESN LLC to 61 Sealed Document filed by ESN LLC. ESN's Reply to Defendants Cisco Systems, Inc. and Cisco-Linksys, LLC's Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims(Ward, Thomas)
March 17, 2009 63 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chambers, Garret)
March 16, 2009 62 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 55 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit I)(Smith, Kevin)
March 10, 2009 61 Sealed Document. CISCO-SYSTEMS, INC. AND CISCO-LINKSYS, LLC'S AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO ESN, LLC'S COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT(Maroulis, Victoria)
March 9, 2009 60 REPLY to Response to Motion re 54 MOTION to Compel Response to Cisco's Seventh Interrogatory filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Smith, Kevin)
March 5, 2009 59 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 55 MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S)(Ward, Thomas)
March 3, 2009 58 Featured Case ORDER, granting 57 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC., Attorney Katherine H Bennett terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/3/09. (mrm, )
February 27, 2009 57 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
February 25, 2009 56 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 54 MOTION to Compel Response to Cisco's Seventh Interrogatory filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Ward, Thomas)
February 18, 2009 55 *WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 122 * MOTION to Amend/Correct Invalidity Contentions by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Affidavit Sharper Declaration, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin) Modified on 9/11/2009 (mrm, ).
February 10, 2009 54 *WITHDRAWN PER ORDER # 122 * MOTION to Compel Response to Cisco's Seventh Interrogatory by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin) Modified on 9/11/2009 (mrm, ).
February 10, 2009 53 NOTICE by ESN LLC, Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC of Filing PR 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Ward, Thomas)
December 15, 2008 52 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew D Cannon for Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC, Cisco Systems, Inc. and Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 RECEIPT 5-1-1559)(rml, )
December 11, 2008 51 Featured Case ORDER granting 50 Motion for Leave to Supplement Plaintiffs P.R. 3-1 Contentions and Defendants P.R. 3-3 Contentions. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/11/08. (mrm, )
December 10, 2008 50 Joint MOTION for Leave to File /Supplement Plaintiff's P.R. 3-1 Contentions and Defendants' P.R. 3-3 Contentions by ESN LLC, Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
November 24, 2008 49 NOTICE by ESN LLC of Limiting the Number of Asserted Claims Pursuant to the Court's Docket Control Order Entered May 22, 2008 (Ward, Thomas)
November 24, 2008 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 48, NOTICE by ESN LLC NOTICE OF LIMITING THE NUMBER OF ASSERTED CLAIMS PURSUANT TO THE COURTS DOCKET CONTORL ORDER ENTERED MAY 22, 2008. PLEASE IGNORE. Per Attorney, document contains clerical errors; attorney will correct and refile.*** (mpv, )
November 21, 2008 48 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by ESN LLC NOTICE OF LIMITING THE NUMBER OF ASSERTED CLAIMS PURSUANT TO THE COURTS DOCKET CONTORL ORDER ENTERED MAY 22, 2008 (Ward, Thomas) Modified on 11/21/2008 (mpv, ). Modified on 11/24/2008 (mpv, ). Modified on 11/24/2008 (mpv, ).
November 20, 2008 47 Featured Case ORDER denying 35 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/20/08. (mrm, )
November 19, 2008 46 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Heather Bjella for ESN LLC.RECEIPT 5-1-1534 (rml, )
October 17, 2008 45 Featured Case ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time for early mediation which is set to April 22, 2009 from October 22, 2008.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 10/17/2008. (sm, )
October 16, 2008 44 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Extend Early Mediation Deadline by ESN LLC, Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
September 9, 2008 43 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 8-25-08, Motion Hearing, 33 pages before Judge David Folsom. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Libby Crawford, CSR,Telephone number: 903.794.4067 Ext. 237. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 9/30/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/10/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/8/2008. (aec, )
August 26, 2008 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom: Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2008 re 35 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
August 4, 2008 41 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 35 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by ESN LLC. (McAndrews, Peter)
July 25, 2008 40 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document (SEALED EXHIBIT): 39 Reply to Response to Motion. (Smith, Kevin) Modified on 7/29/2008 (sm, ).
July 25, 2008 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re 35 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Smith, Kevin)
July 21, 2008 38 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 35 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination : Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2008 11:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. Each side shall have 15 minutes to present their arguments. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 7/21/08. (mpv, )
July 15, 2008 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re 35 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T)(McAndrews, Peter)
June 30, 2008 36 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 35 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin A. Smith in Support of Defendants' Motion to Stay, # 2 Exhibit 1(a) to Smith Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1(b) to Smith Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 1(c) to the Smith Declaration, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Maroulis, Victoria) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2008: # 6 REVISED ORDER) (sm, ).
June 30, 2008 35 MOTION to Stay Pending Reexamination by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Maroulis, Victoria)
June 5, 2008 34 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/5/08. (mpv, )
June 4, 2008 33 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
June 4, 2008 32 Featured Case ORDER re 28 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by ESN LLC, Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. Currently before the Court are competing provisions of paragraph 14(d)(i) as submitted inthe Joint Motion for Protective Order (Dkt. No. 28). The Court hereby provides a modified versionof paragraph 14(d)(i) with its additions in bold:A laser printer with an adequate paper supply shall be attached to the StandaloneComputers and the receiving party shall make no more than 1,500 total pages of hardcopies of HIGHLY RESTRICTED CONFIDENTIAL material that they in good faithconsider to be necessary to proving the elements of their case. In the event thereceiving party feels that this disclosure is inadequate, it may petition the Courtfor additional pages after reasonable time for review by the receiving partysexpert.The parties are to submit a new joint protective order consistent herewith. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/4/08. (mpv, )
June 3, 2008 31 Featured Case ORDER re 29 Protective Order. The parties field a Joint Motion for Protective Order (Dkt. No. 28) and attached a ProposedProtective Order (Dkt. No. 28, Exh. 1). Due to an oversight, the Court filed that proposed protectiveorder that included the parties competing provisions for paragraph 14(d)(I).The Court hereby VACATES Protective Order (Dkt. No. 29). Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/3/08. (mpv, )
June 2, 2008 30 NOTICE by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC Notice of Compliance with Disclosures Pursuant to Patent Local Rules 3-3 and 3-4 (Smith, Kevin)
June 2, 2008 29 Featured Case ***VACATED PER ORDER #31***PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 6/2/08. (mrm, ) Modified on 6/3/2008 (mpv, ).
May 28, 2008 28 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by ESN LLC, Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Protective Order)(Albritton, Eric)
May 23, 2008 27 Featured Case ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Motion for a Protective Order; ddl for filing 5/28/08. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/23/08. (mrm, )
May 22, 2008 26 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for a Protective Order by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin)
May 22, 2008 25 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/5/2010 in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. Jury Selection set for 4/6/2010 in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom. Amended Pleadings without leave 30 days before dispositive motions are due; Prehearing conference and technical tutorial if necessary is set for June 10, 2009 at 2;00 pm; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/21/2010.. Signed by Judge Judge David Folsom on 5/22/2008. (sm, )
May 21, 2008 24 MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order by ESN LLC, Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Docket Control Order)(Albritton, Eric)
April 22, 2008 23 Featured Case ORDER that due to large number of patent cases pending on courts docket resulting in volminous motion practice, the Court finds it necessary to implement procedures applying to future motions being submitted in recently filed cases. This procedure is necessary to allow court to manage its docket in a timely fashion.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/22/2008. (sm, )
April 22, 2008 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David Folsom : Scheduling Conference held on 4/22/2008. (Court Reporter Libby Crawford.) (mrm, )
April 17, 2008 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order)(Albritton, Eric)
March 31, 2008 20 ANSWER to Counterclaim by ESN LLC.(Albritton, Eric)
March 25, 2008 19 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney George P McAndrews for ESN LLC, Matthew N Allison for ESN LLC, Thomas J Wimbiscus for ESN LLC, Peter J McAndrews for ESN LLC, Paul McAndrews for ESN LLC, Gerald C Willis, Jr for ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 PHV Application for Matthew Allison# 2 PHV Application for Thomas Wimbiscus# 3 PHV Application for Peter McAndrews# 4 PHV Application for Paul McAndrews# 5 PHV Application for Gerald Willis)(sm, ) (PAID BY RECEIPT #5-1-001289) Modified on 3/25/2008 (sm, ).
March 24, 2008 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Victoria Fishman Maroulis on behalf of all defendants (Maroulis, Victoria)
March 20, 2008 17 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Katherine H Bennett for Cisco Systems, Inc. and Cisco-Linksys LLC. APPROVED; receipt #5-1-1275 (mpv, )
March 20, 2008 16 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sayuri K Sharper for Cisco Systems, Inc. and Cisco-Linksys LLC. APPROVED; Receipt #5-1-1277 (mpv, )
March 20, 2008 15 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Charles K Verhoeven for Cisco Systems, Inc. and Cisco-Linksys LLC. APPROVED; Receipt # 5-1-1276 (mpv, )
March 20, 2008 14 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kevin A Smith for Cisco Systems, Inc. and Cisco-Linksys LLC. APPROVED; Receipt #5-1-1274 (mpv, )
March 19, 2008 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (no Parent Corp) filed by ESN LLC (Albritton, Eric) Modified on 3/19/2008 (sm, ).
March 12, 2008 12 Featured Case NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER, AND DISCOVERY ORDER; Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2008 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before Judge David Folsom.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 3/12/08. (mrm, )
March 6, 2008 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cisco-Linksys LLC identifying Cisco Systems, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Chambers, Garret)
March 6, 2008 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cisco Systems, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Chambers, Garret)
March 6, 2008 9 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against ESN LLC by Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC.(Chambers, Garret)
March 6, 2008 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of ESN LLC (Ward, Thomas)
March 4, 2008 7 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by ESN LLC. Cisco Systems, Inc. served on 2/19/2008, answer due 3/10/2008. (sm, )
March 4, 2008 6 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by ESN LLC. Cisco-Linksys LLC served on 2/19/2008, answer due 3/10/2008. (sm, )
January 31, 2008 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding A Patent or Trademark. (Copy will be forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office by atty). (sm, )
January 31, 2008 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Albritton, Eric)
January 31, 2008 3 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Cisco-Linksys LLC. (sm, )
January 31, 2008 2 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Cisco Systems, Inc.. (sm, )
January 31, 2008 Case Assigned to Judge David Folsom. (sm, )
January 31, 2008 1 COMPLAINT against Cisco Systems, Inc., Cisco-Linksys LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1415101.), filed by ESN LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1# 2 Exhibit A - Part 2# 3 Exhibit B - Part 1# 4 Exhibit B - Part 2# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Errata D# 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Albritton, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESN LLC v. Cisco Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESN LLC
Represented By: Eric M. Albritton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco-Linksys LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?