Lynch v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Ritchie Lynch
Defendant: United States of America, Michael Pppas and Christus St. Michael Health System
Case Number: 5:2009cv00029
Filed: March 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Bowie
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Presiding Judge: David Folsom
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:1346 Tort Claim

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 48 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 11/12/09. (mrm, )
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER re 42 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Ritchie Lynch ;ORDERED that the deadline for the Defendants to file a response to the motion to dismiss isOctober 19,2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on October 5, 2009. (rml, )
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting 34 Motion for clarification of scheduling order re disclosure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on September 8, 2009. (rml, )
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL; adopting 29 Report and Recommendations; ORDERED that the Plaintiffs breach of duty and breach of contract claims against Defendant Christus Health Ark-La-Tex d/b/a Christus St. Michael Health System contained in paragraphs 52 and 53 of the original complaint are DISMISSED without prejudice.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 8/12/09. (mrm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lynch v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ritchie Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pppas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christus St. Michael Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?