Whitlock v. Merchant et al
Plaintiff: Tarrance Daron Whitlock
Defendant: Dawn Merchant, Tori Scott, Reginaldo Stanley, Cathy McPeak and B Howard
Case Number: 5:2014cv00119
Filed: September 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Bowie
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Schneider
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER ADOPTING 64 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ORDERING that 59 motion for summary judgment is Granted and claims against Scott are Dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/25/2016. (sm, )
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 40 Report and Recommendations, GRANTING 19 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P 12(b)(6) and 12(b)(1) filed by B Howard, Dawn Merchant., B Howard (ARD) and Dawn Merchant now DISMISSED without prejudice.. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/24/2015. (sm, )
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 47 Report and Recommendations,, GRANTING 16 MOTION to Dismiss Claims against Defendants Stanley and McPeak's Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Cathy McPeak, Reginaldo Stanley., Cathy McPeak (Telford Medical Dept.) and Reginaldo Stanley (Head Practioner of Telford) now terminated.. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/21/2015. (sm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitlock v. Merchant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarrance Daron Whitlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Merchant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tori Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reginaldo Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy McPeak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?