Hinsley v. Day & Zimmermann, Lone Star LLC

Plaintiff: Tonia Leiann Hinsley
Defendant: Day & Zimmermann, Lone Star LLC
Case Number: 5:2018cv00097
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Texarkana Office
County: Red River
0 Judge: Caroline Craven
1 Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2018 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 6-43004. (mjc, )
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 ORDER. (Plaintiff to file a notice that the case is ready for a scheduling conference when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 8/1/2018. (slo, )
July 31, 2018 Pro Se Guidelines were given to Plaintiff, per Magistrate Judge Craven, which includes information on reporting change of address to the Court. Plaintiff also provided Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate and copy of Docket Sheet. (slo, )
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order STANDING ORDER REFERRING PROSE CASES to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/31/2018. (slo, )
July 31, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )
July 31, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Day & Zimmermann, Lone Star LLC filed by Tonia Leiann Hinsley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Medical Records, #2 Exhibit EEOC Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(slo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinsley v. Day & Zimmermann, Lone Star LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Day & Zimmermann, Lone Star LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonia Leiann Hinsley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?