DENTON v. FEDEX CORPORATION et al

Plaintiff: CURT ALAN DENTON
Defendant: FEDEX CORPORATION and JOSEPH VA NORMAN
Case Number: 5:2018cv00146
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
0 Judge: Caroline Craven
1 Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 2/28/2019 10:00 AM VIA TELEPHONE before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 01/10/19. (lfs, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by CURT ALAN DENTON (Wyly, James)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by FEDEX CORPORATION, JOSEPH VA NORMAN.(Bassett, Mike)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Plaintiff is to file a notice that the case is ready for a scheduling conference when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 12/04/18. (lfs, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to JOSEPH VA NORMAN. (lfs, )
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to FEDEX CORPORATION. (lfs, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/3/2018) (lfs, ).
November 29, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (lfs, )
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/29/18. (lfs, )
November 29, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (lfs, )
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7043000.), filed by CURT ALAN DENTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wyly, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DENTON v. FEDEX CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDEX CORPORATION
Represented By: Mike H Bassett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH VA NORMAN
Represented By: Mike H Bassett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURT ALAN DENTON
Represented By: James Clark Wyly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?