Robertson v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Lisa F. Robertson
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2018cv00147
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
0 Judge: Caroline Craven
1 Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 NOTICE: Per General Order 19-01, all civil actions pending in the Eastern District of Texas wherein the United States or an agency, corporation, officer or employee of the United States is a party are STAYED. All such cases shall remain stayed until such time as an appropriations bill or a continuing resolution is enacted restoring funding to the Department of Justice or a subsequent Order lifting this stay (in whole or in part) is entered. (slo, )
December 31, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa F. Robertson. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 12/6/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. (Giles, Gregory)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons-Atty General, #2 Summons-US Atty)(slo, )
November 30, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order STANDING ORDER REFERRING SOCIAL SECURITY CASES to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/30/2018. (slo, )
November 30, 2018 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7044721.), filed by Lisa F. Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giles, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa F. Robertson
Represented By: Gregory Ross Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?