Dutto v. Marten Transport Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Tara Dutto
Defendant: Marten Transport Logistics LLC, Marten Transport Ltd and Marten Transport Services Ltd
Case Number: 5:2018cv00154
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Rodney Gilstrap
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order 13 JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/24/2019. (slo, )
January 21, 2019 12 Additional Attachments to Main Document: Exhibits to #11 Proposed Discovery Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Rhine, Eric)
January 18, 2019 11 Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by Tara Dutto . (Rhine, Eric)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Rule 12(b)(2) Motions to Dismiss. The Court ORDERS that the Parties, within five (5) days of the date of this Order, meet and confer and jointly submit a proposed jurisdictional discovery order that addresses the metes and bounds of such discovery. Any areas of disagreement shall be clearly noted. The Court further ORDERS that the deadlines for Plaintiff's Responses to the Motions to Dismiss are EXTENDED up to and including March 11, 2019. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/14/19. (lfs, )
January 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING: The Scheduling Conference previously set on January 14, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. is CANCELLED. (jml)
January 8, 2019 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Tara Dutto. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rhine, Eric)
January 4, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference RESET for 1/14/2019 02:00 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (klc, )
January 4, 2019 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Marten Transport Logistics LLC, Marten Transport Ltd, Marten Transport Services Ltd. (Wright, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/4/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (slo, ).
December 28, 2018 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Tara Dutto. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rhine, Eric)
December 14, 2018 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Marten Transport Services Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of James Hinnendael)(Wright, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2018: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (slo, ).
December 14, 2018 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Marten Transport Logistics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of James Hinnendael)(Wright, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2018: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (slo, ).
December 14, 2018 4 Marten Transport, Ltd's Original ANSWER to #2 Complaint Plaintiff's Original Petition by Marten Transport Ltd.(Wright, Michael)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, PROPOSED DEADLINES FOR DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND DISCOVERY ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 1/22/2019 02:00 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/13/2018. (slo, )
December 7, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (lfs, )
December 7, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (lfs, )
December 7, 2018 2 PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION FILED IN STATE COURT, JURY DEMAND AND REQUEST FOR DISCLOSURE against All Defendants, filed by Tara Dutto.(lfs, )
December 7, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Marten Transport Services Ltd, Marten Transport Logistics LLC, Marten Transport Ltd from Titus County District Court, case number 40586. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7053578), filed by Marten Transport Services Ltd, Marten Transport Logistics LLC, Marten Transport Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - List of Parties, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - List of Counsel, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Certified Copy of Docket Sheet, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Process on all Defendants, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Plaintiff's Original Petition)(Wright, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dutto v. Marten Transport Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marten Transport Logistics LLC
Represented By: Michael Calvin Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marten Transport Ltd
Represented By: Michael Calvin Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marten Transport Services Ltd
Represented By: Michael Calvin Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Dutto
Represented By: Marcus Raymond Spagnoletti
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Rhine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?