Hunsicker et al v. EDW Trucking, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Theresa Hunsicker and William N Hunsicker
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Adrian I Perez, EDW Trucking, Inc. and Pan American Express, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00005
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EDW Trucking, Inc., Pan American Express, Inc. (Kaufmann, Lisa)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by EDW Trucking, Inc., Pan American Express, Inc..(Kaufmann, Lisa)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William N Hunsicker, Theresa Hunsicker. Pan American Express, Inc. served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (slo, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William N Hunsicker, Theresa Hunsicker. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 1/22/2019, answer due 2/12/2019. (slo, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William N Hunsicker, Theresa Hunsicker. EDW Trucking, Inc. served on 1/25/2019, answer due 2/15/2019. (slo, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Parker, Weldon)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to EDW Trucking, Inc., Pan American Express, Inc., Adrian I Perez, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Pan American, #2 Summons-Perez, #3 Summons-State Farm)(slo, )
January 11, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )
January 11, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7093719.), filed by William N Hunsicker, Theresa Hunsicker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Jackson, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunsicker et al v. EDW Trucking, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Weldon Todd Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian I Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDW Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Marie Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pan American Express, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Marie Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Hunsicker
Represented By: Patrick R Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William N Hunsicker
Represented By: Patrick R Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?