JEFFERSON v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: SERTANDAR E. JEFFERSON
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2019cv00020
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
0 Judge: Caroline Craven
1 Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SERTANDAR E. JEFFERSON. Nancy A Berryhill served on 2/19/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (Giles, Gregory)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy A Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons-Atty General, #2 Summons-US Atty)(slo, )
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. It is furtherORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue and Plaintiffs attorney shall serve process without prepayment of costs or fees. Signed by Judge Craven on 02/11/19. (lfs, )
February 8, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order STANDING ORDER REFERRING SOCIAL SECURITY CASES to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pre-trial matters. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/8/2019. (slo, )
February 8, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by SERTANDAR E. JEFFERSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Giles, Gregory)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A Berryhill, filed by SERTANDAR E. JEFFERSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giles, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JEFFERSON v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERTANDAR E. JEFFERSON
Represented By: Gregory Ross Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?