Hewitt v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Lisa Ann Hewitt
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2019cv00029
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Ann Hewitt. Nancy A Berryhill served on 3/20/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Giles, Gregory)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy A Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons-Attorney General, #2 Summons-US Attorney)(slo, )
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 3/15/2019. (slo, )
February 27, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order STANDING ORDER REFERRING SOCIAL SECURITY CASES to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/27/2019. (slo, )
February 27, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lisa Ann Hewitt. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Giles, Gregory)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A Berryhill, filed by Lisa Ann Hewitt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giles, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hewitt v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Ann Hewitt
Represented By: Gregory Ross Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?