Smith v. Christus Health Ark-La-Tex d/b/a Christus St. Michael Health System et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Smith
Defendant: Christus Health Ark-La-Tex d/b/a Christus St. Michael Health System, CHRISTUS Trinity Clinic d/b/a CHRISTUS Trinity Clinic Surgery Associates - Texarkana and Greggory N. Angier
Case Number: 5:2019cv00084
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2020 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 9/17/2019. Jury Selection set for 6/22/2020 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Trial set for 6/22/2020 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Motions in Limine due by 5/19/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/19/2020. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/20/2019. (slo, )
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/20/2019. (slo, )
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/20/2019. (slo, )
August 20, 2019 Scheduling Conference held on 8/20/2019 before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court advised the parties of his wifes membership on the Christus St. Michael Foundation Board, pursuant to his normal practice, and stated he had no conflict and didnt intend to recuse but if the parties wanted to file a motion to recuse, the Court would consider it. Counsel in attendance were Jeff Meyerson, Michael Kelly, and Casey Cashion. (bas) Modified on 8/20/2019 (bas).
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Casey Lamar Cashion on behalf of Greggory N. Angier (Cashion, Casey)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Casey Lamar Cashion on behalf of Greggory N. Angier (Cashion, Casey)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Christus Health Ark-La-Tex d/b/a Christus St. Michael Health System . (King, Jennifer)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by Christus Health Ark-La-Tex d/b/a Christus St. Michael Health System . (King, Jennifer)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective order by Christus Health Ark-La-Tex d/b/a Christus St. Michael Health System . (King, Jennifer)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (Scheduling Conference set for 8/20/2019 11:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.) Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/25/2019. (slo, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Christus Health Ark-La-Tex d/b/a Christus St. Michael Health System.(King, Jennifer)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint byDefendants Greggory N. Angier, M.D., and Christus Trinity Clinic d/b/a Christus Trinity Clinic Surgery Associates - Texarkana (Dunnill, William) Modified on 8/15/2019 (lfs, ).
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Greggory N. Angier. (lfs, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Christus Health Ark-La-Tex d/b/a Christus St. Michael Health System. (lfs, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to CHRISTUS Trinity Clinic d/b/a CHRISTUS Trinity Clinic Surgery Associates - Texarkana. (lfs, )
June 26, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sharon Smith. (slo, )
June 26, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )
June 26, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7325852.), filed by Sharon Smith.(Meyerson, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (slo, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Christus Health Ark-La-Tex d/b/a Christus St. Michael Health System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christus Health Ark-La-Tex d/b/a Christus St. Michael Health System
Represented By: Jennifer Ann King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTUS Trinity Clinic d/b/a CHRISTUS Trinity Clinic Surgery Associates - Texarkana
Represented By: William Connor Dunnill
Represented By: Joel J Steed
Represented By: Casey Lamar Cashion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greggory N. Angier
Represented By: Casey Lamar Cashion
Represented By: William Connor Dunnill
Represented By: Joel J Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey M Meyerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?