Brister v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Plaintiff: Jo Brister
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons and FCI Texarkana
Case Number: 5:2019cv00088
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 29:754
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 29 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #23 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Parker, Andrea)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING #27 Unopposed MOTION to Continue. Hearing re: #23 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is reset for 09/10/19 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 08/29/19. (lfs, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION to Continue by Jo Brister. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Whitburn, Mark)
August 27, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jo Brister. (Whitburn, Mark)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #23 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 9/4/2019 10:00 AM in Ctrm 403 (Texarkana) before Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven. (hma)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Substitute Attorney. The new attorney to be substituted in this matter is Andrea L. Parker, Assistant U.S. Attorney, 350 Magnolia Avenue, Suite 150, Beaumont, Texas 77701, Telephone: (409) 839-2538, Facsimile: (409) 839-2643, Texas Bar No. 00790851. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 08/21/19. (lfs, )
August 20, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Parker, Andrea) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/21/2019: #2 Text of Proposed Order) (lfs, ).
August 6, 2019 Filing 23 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jo Brister. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Whitburn, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2019: #5 Text of Proposed Order) (lfs, ).
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Issued as to FCI Texarkana. (slo, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parker, Andrea)
July 8, 2019 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00967. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TRANSFER ORDER: Case transferred to Texarkana Division Division of United States District Court for the Eastern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/8/2019) (skg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/8/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jo Brister. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (skg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/8/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File. (Unless the document has already been filed, clerk to enter the document as of the date of this order.) (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/8/2019) (skg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/8/2019.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Jo Brister (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A) (Whitburn, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/8/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Court hereby DIRECTS Brister to refile her Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint with a copy of the proposed amended pleading attached as an exhibit by July 5, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 7/1/2019) (trt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/8/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 14 Appendix in Support filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons re #13 Reply (Parker-DOJ, Tami) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/8/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons re: #11 Response/Objection, #9 Notice (Other) (Parker-DOJ, Tami) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/8/2019.]
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: After considering Brister's response and motion for leave to amend, the court determines that a reply from Defendant is warranted. Accordingly, the Court directs Defendant to file a reply to Brister's Response to Suggestion of Mootness and Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (ECF No. #11 ). The deadline to file the reply is Friday, June 28, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/21/2019) (skg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/8/2019.]
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE filed by Jo Brister re: #9 Notice (Other) (Whitburn, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/8/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: In light of these developments, the Court directs Brister to notify the Court no later than Wednesday, June 19, 2019, whether she disputes Defendant's assertion that the relief requested in this lawsuitrelief sought specifically to allow a dog to accompany Brister inside FMC Fort Worthis now moot, and if so, the basis for her dispute. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/14/2019) (skg) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/8/2019.]
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Suggestion of Mootness filed by FMC Fort Worth, Federal Bureau of Prisons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Inmate Locator) (Parker-DOJ, Tami) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/8/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY filed by Jo Brister re: #4 MOTION for Injunction (Whitburn, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/8/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal Bureau of Prisons. (Parker-DOJ, Tami) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/8/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons re: #4 MOTION for Injunction (Parker-DOJ, Tami) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/8/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Federal Bureau of Prisons. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Tami C Parker-DOJ added to party Federal Bureau of Prisons(pty:dft) (Parker-DOJ, Tami) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/8/2019.]
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Injunction filed by Jo Brister with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C) (Whitburn, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/8/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Summons issued as to FMC Fort Worth, Federal Bureau of Prisons, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (wxc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/8/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (wxc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/8/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FMC Fort Worth, Federal Bureau of Prisons filed by Jo Brister. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9625222) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Whitburn, Mark) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 7/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brister v. Federal Bureau of Prisons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Tami C Parker-DOJ
Represented By: Andrea Hedrick Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCI Texarkana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Brister
Represented By: Mark S Whitburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?