Brown v. Director TDCJ-CID
Plaintiff: Sammie Okeith Brown
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Case Number: 5:2019cv00111
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Pro Se Guidelines which include instructions to notify Court of any change of address forwarded to Petitioner, along with copy of docket sheet and Consent to Proceed form. (slo, )
August 23, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order STANDING ORDER REFERRING HABEAS CASES to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/23/2019. (slo, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 2:19-cv-00168. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS, TEXARKANA DIVISION: Case transferred to Texarkana Division of Eastern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 8/21/2019) (nhp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/23/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Addendum re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sammie Okeith Brown. (awc) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/23/2019.]
August 16, 2019 ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. (Copy of 1st page of petition also mailed to Petitioner) Fri Aug 16 13:55:23 CDT 2019 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/23/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Trust Account by Sammie Okeith Brown TDCJ # 01546265. (nhp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/23/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Brief in Support filed by Sammie Okeith Brown re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (nhp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/23/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Sammie Okeith Brown. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (nhp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/23/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (nhp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/23/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Reno (see Special Order 3). Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Reno). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (nhp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Director TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director, TDCJ-CID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammie Okeith Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?