0728862 B.C. Ltd. v. Zachary Dozier d/b/a Doziers Excavating and Hauling
Plaintiff: 0728862 B.C. Ltd.
Defendant: Zachary Dozier d/b/a Doziers Excavating and Hauling
Case Number: 5:2019cv00124
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Zachary Dozier d/b/a Doziers Excavating and Hauling to 12/1/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( lfs, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Zachary Dozier d/b/a Doziers Excavating and Hauling.( Roth, Carl)
October 18, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Zachary Dozier d/b/a Doziers Excavating and Hauling to 11/1/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( lfs, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Zachary Dozier d/b/a Doziers Excavating and Hauling.( Roth, Carl)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by 0728862 B.C. Ltd.. Zachary Dozier d/b/a Doziers Excavating and Hauling served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Zachary Dozier d/b/a Doziers Excavating and Hauling. (slo, )
September 25, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )
September 25, 2019 Case Assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of 0728862 B.C. Ltd. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to John T Polasek on behalf of 0728862 B.C. Ltd. (Polasek, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Polasek, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by 0728862 B.C. Ltd.. (Polasek, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 0728862 B.C. Ltd. (Polasek, John)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Zachary Dozier d/b/a Doziers Excavating and Hauling ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7451399.), filed by 0728862 B.C. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '553 Patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Polasek, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 0728862 B.C. Ltd. v. Zachary Dozier d/b/a Doziers Excavating and Hauling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary Dozier d/b/a Doziers Excavating and Hauling
Represented By: Carl R Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 0728862 B.C. Ltd.
Represented By: John T Polasek
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?