CROMPTON et al v. Graphic Packaging International, LLC
Plaintiff: HEATHER CROMPTON and MONTGOMERY CROMPTON
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv00095
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/21/2020. (slo, )
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER; re #9 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order filed by MONTGOMERY CROMPTON, HEATHER CROMPTON. (Amended Pleadings due by 2/23/2021. Discovery due by 2/16/2021. Joinder of Parties (Defendant) due by 12/22/2020. Motions in Limine due by 4/20/2021. Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/20/2021. Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 5/24/2021 09:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Pretrial Conference set for 5/4/2021 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.) Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/21/2020. (slo, )
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Canceling Scheduling Conference. Scheduling conference set for 8/12/2020 is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/21/2020. (slo, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Discovery Order by HEATHER CROMPTON, MONTGOMERY CROMPTON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Order)(Smith, Jon)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order by HEATHER CROMPTON, MONTGOMERY CROMPTON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Docket Control Order)(Smith, Jon)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2020 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.) Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/13/2020. (slo, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Graphic Packaging International, LLC.(Zimmer, Scott)
June 25, 2020 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Graphic Packaging International, LLC to 7/10/2020. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( slo, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Graphic Packaging International, LLC.( Zimmer, Scott)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons with Plaintiffs' Original Complaint served on Graphic Packaging International, LLC by serving its Registered Agent, Corporation Service Company (accepted by authorized agent, Vanessa Hernandez) on 06/05/20, filed by HEATHER CROMPTON, MONTGOMERY CROMPTON. (Smith, Jon)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Graphic Packaging International, LLC. (slo, )
June 3, 2020 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )
June 3, 2020 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by HEATHER CROMPTON, MONTGOMERY CROMPTON. (slo, )
June 3, 2020 Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles David Glass on behalf of HEATHER CROMPTON, MONTGOMERY CROMPTON (Glass, Charles)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert William Weber on behalf of HEATHER CROMPTON, MONTGOMERY CROMPTON (Weber, Robert)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Graphic Packaging International, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7819750.), filed by MONTGOMERY CROMPTON, HEATHER CROMPTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CROMPTON et al v. Graphic Packaging International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graphic Packaging International, LLC
Represented By: Scott Louis Zimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER CROMPTON
Represented By: Robert William Weber
Represented By: Charles David Glass
Represented By: Jon Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTGOMERY CROMPTON
Represented By: Robert William Weber
Represented By: Charles David Glass
Represented By: Jon Michael Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?