Cooper v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Jeremy Cooper
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 5:2021cv00132
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Caroline Craven
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Cooper. Social Security Administration served on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Giles, Gregory)
November 3, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons-US Attorney, #2 Summons-US Attorney General)(slo, )
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven on 11/2/2021. (slo, )
November 1, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeremy Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Giles, Gregory)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Jeremy Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giles, Gregory)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order STANDING ORDER REFERRING SOCIAL SECURITY CASES to Magistrate Judge Caroline Craven for all pretrial matters. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/1/2021. (slo, )
November 1, 2021 Case assigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. (slo, )
November 1, 2021 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (slo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Cooper
Represented By: Gregory Ross Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?