i4i Limited Partnership v. Microsoft Corporation Featured Case

Patent lawsuit against Microsoft over a Custom XML patent held by Toronto, Canada-based i4i affecting MS-Word.

Plaintiff: i4i Limited Partnership
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Counter Claimant: Microsoft Corporation
Counter Defendant: i4i Limited Partnership
Case Number: 6:2007cv00113
Filed: March 8, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2010 Filing 436 USCA for the Federal Circuit JUDGMENT as to 418 Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE filed by Microsoft Corporation. The district court's claim construction is AFFIRMED, as are the jury's findings of infringement and validity. The district court did not abuse its discretion in admitting i4i's evidence as to damages or in granting enhanced damages. Finally, this Court affirms the entry of the permanent injunction as modified in this Judgment. AFFIRMED. Circuit Judges Schall, Prost, and Moore. Issued as Mandate 4-13-2010. (Attachments: # 1 Judgment)(mll, )
March 12, 2010 Filing 435 USCA for the Federal Circuit ORDER as to 418 Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE filed by Microsoft Corporation. Microsoft's Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Combined Petition for Panel Rehearing and Rehearing En Banc is granted. Microsoft's Petition for Panel Rehearing is granted for the limited purpose of revising portions of the discussion of willfulness. The previous opinion in this appeal issued 12-22-2009 is withdrawn and replaced with the revised opinion accompanying this order. The Petition for Rehearing En Banc will be circulated to the full court along with a copy of this order. Before Circuit Judges Schall, Prost, and Moore. Signed by the Clerk for the Court on 3-10-2010. (Attachments: # 1 USCAFC Judgment)(mll, )
December 28, 2009 Filing 434 USCA for the Federal Circuit JUDGMENT as to 418 Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE filed by Microsoft Corporation. The District Court's claim construction is AFFIRMED, as are the jury's findings of infringement and validity. The District Court did not abuse its discretion in admitting i4i's evidence as to damages or in granting enhanced damages. The entry of the permanent injunction as modified in this Judgment is also AFFIRMED. Federal Circuit Judges Schall, Prost, and Moore. Opinion filed and Judgment entered 12-22-09. (mll, )
October 8, 2009 Filing 433 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by the Clerk, Federal Circuit, regarding receipt of Trial Exhibits. (mll, )
September 28, 2009 Filing 432 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 418 Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE. Trial Exhibits forwarded to the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals (2 envelopes containing CDs of Trial Exhibits) (mll, )
September 17, 2009 Filing 431 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul E Torchia for Microsoft Corporation. Fee pd., 6-1-19342. Approved 9/18/09. (mjc, )
September 17, 2009 Filing 430 Certified and Transmitted the Physical Record on Appeal to U S Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit: 2 CD's containing public appeal with transcripts; 6 vols of appeal records; 14 sealed envelope containing sealed documents, 14 transcripts. The trial exhibits will be sent via separate cover from the Tyler Clerk's Office.(djh, )
September 14, 2009 Filing 428 Received request from the Federal Circuit Court of Appeals for the entire record including sealed documents, on Appeal. (mll, )
September 10, 2009 Filing 429 Request for Certified Appeal Record to be sent to the US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit by Samuel Williams, Deputy Clerk for the US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit (djh, )
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER granting 422 Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record in Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Clarify the Agreed Protective Order in Light of the Court's Recent Relevant Ruling (Dkt. #421). Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/8/2009. (kls, )
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 426 ORDER granting 421 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Clarify the Agreed Protective Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/8/2009. (kls, )
September 8, 2009 Filing 424 REPLY to Response to Motion re 421 Emergency MOTION TO CLARIFY THE AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER (DKT. NO. 26) re 26 Protective OrderEmergency MOTION TO CLARIFY THE AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER (DKT. NO. 26) re 26 Protective Order filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
September 4, 2009 Filing 425 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal from USCA re 418 Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE filed by Microsoft Corporation. USCA Case Number 2009-1504 (mll, )
September 4, 2009 Filing 423 RESPONSE in Opposition re 421 Emergency MOTION TO CLARIFY THE AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER (DKT. NO. 26) re 26 Protective OrderEmergency MOTION TO CLARIFY THE AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER (DKT. NO. 26) re 26 Protective Order filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
September 4, 2009 Filing 422 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplement to the Record in Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion to Clarify the Agreed Protective Order (DKT. No. 42) in Light of the Court's Recent Relevant Ruling by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 3, 2009 Filing 421 Emergency MOTION TO CLARIFY THE AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER (DKT. NO. 26) re 26 Protective Order by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 24, 2009 Filing 420 Notice by the US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit that a Rule 8 Motion has been filed. This case is assigned docket no. 2009-1504. (mll, )
August 21, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit re 418 Notice of Appeal - PATENT CASE (mll, )
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 419 STIPULATED ORDER On Execution of Judgment Against Microsoft. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/20/09. cc:attys 8-20-09(mll, )
August 18, 2009 Filing 418 NOTICE OF APPEAL - PATENT CASE as to 414 Judgment,,,,, by Microsoft Corporation. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 05400000000002118345. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kudlac, Kevin)
August 18, 2009 Filing 417 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re 415 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Emergency Motion To Stay Execution of Judgment and Waive Bond Requirement Microsoft's Notice of Withdrawal Of Emergency Motion To Stay Execution Of Judgment And Waive Bond Requirement (Kudlac, Kevin)
August 18, 2009 Filing 416 Unopposed MOTION re 414 Judgment,,,,, Microsoft's Unopposed Motion To Enter Stipulation As Order by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulation)(Kudlac, Kevin)
August 14, 2009 Filing 415 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Emergency Motion To Stay Execution of Judgment and Waive Bond Requirement by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Damon Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
August 11, 2009 Filing 414 FINAL JUDGMENT. Deft Microsoft Corp is found to have unlawfully infringed US Patent 5,787,449, and to have infringed the '449 patent willfully. The '449 patent is valid and enforceable, and Michel Vulpe is found not to have engaged in inequitable conduct with respect to the '449 patent. i4i's damage award is found not barred by laches. The Court awards damages to i4i for Microsoft's infringement of the '449 patent in the amount of $200,000,000. i4i is further awarded enhanced damages of $40,000,000 for Microsoft's willful infringement. i4i is further awarded post-verdict damages of $144,060 per day from 5-21-2009 until the date of this Final Judgment. i4i is further awarded pre-judgment interest of $37,097,032 up to 5-20-2009 and $21,102 per day thereafter until the date of this Final Judgment. i4i is entitled to post-judgment interest for any time period between the entry of this Final Judgment and the date upon which i4i receives payment from Microsoft as ordered herein. Microsoft is enjoined from infringing the '449 Patent. The terms of that injunction are contained in the separate Order of this Court. Except for the Court's more detailed injunction terms as contained in a separate Order, all relief not specifically granted herein is DENIED. All pending motions not previously resolved are DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/11/09. cc:attys 8-11-09(mll, )
August 11, 2009 Filing 413 PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/11/09. cc:attys 8-11-09(mll, )
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 412 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part 346 Motion for enhanced damages and attorneys' fees; granting in part 364 Sealed Patent Motion for permanent injunction; granting in part 349 Sealed Patent Motion for permanent injunction; granting 350 Sealed Patent Motion for post verdict damages, pre-judgment interest, and post-judgment interest; all other motions are DENIED: denying 345 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 347 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 348 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 351 Motion for New Trial; denying 353 Motion for New Trial; denying 356 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 359 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 370 Sealed Motion to stay injunctive relief; denying 389 Sealed Motion to strike. The permanent injunction provided for herein will be memoralized in a seperate order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/11/09. cc:attys 8-11-09 (mll, )
August 4, 2009 Filing 411 Sealed Transcript. Partial Transcript of Post-Verdict Motion Hearing. 7/7/09. Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan. (sms, )
August 4, 2009 Filing 410 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Post-Verdict Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 7/7/09 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 84 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/25/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2009. (sms, )
July 22, 2009 Trial Exhibits stored in Vault in Clerk's Office. (rlf, )
July 21, 2009 Filing 409 Exhibit List: DEFENDANT MICROSOFT'S FINAL EXHIBIT LIST OF EXHIBITS ADMITTED DURING TRIAL (May 11 - 20, 2009) (SEE ATTACHMENT FOR ADDENDUM TO BENCH TRIAL EXHIBIT LIST) (Attachments: # 1 -- ADDENDUMto Microsoft's Bench Trial Exhibit List)(rlf, )
July 21, 2009 Filing 408 Exhibit List: PLAINTIFF i4i's FINAL EXHIBIT LIST OF EXHIBITS ADMITTED DURING TRIAL (May 11 - 20, 2009)(rlf)
July 9, 2009 Filing 407 Minute Entry -- 7.9.09 Post-Verdict Motion Hrg for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 7/9/2009 re 345 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law No Willful Infringement of the Patent-In-Suit and Alternative Motion for New Trial filed by Microsoft Corporation, 359 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law /Microsoft's Corrected Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Or in the Alternative, For New Trial, On Invalidity In Light Of the SEMI S4 System filed by Microsoft Corporation, 349 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A POST-JUDGMENT ROYALTY filed by Infrastructures for Information, Inc., i4i Limited Partnership, 364 SEALED PATENT MOTION CORRECTED MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A POST-JUDGMENT ROYALTY(ORIGINAL MOTION [DKT. 349]) SEALED PATENT MOTION CORRECTED MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A POST-JUDGMENT ROYALTY(ORIGINAL MOTION [DKT. 349]) filed by Infrastructures for Information, Inc., i4i Limited Partnership, 351 MOTION for New Trial and Alternative Motion for Remittitur, on Plaintiffs' Claim for Damages filed by Microsoft Corporation, 347 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Indirect Infringement of the Patent-in-Suit and Alternative Motion for New Trial filed by Microsoft Corporation, 356 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Obviousness or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial on Both Anticipation and Obviousness, in Light of Rita, DeRose filed by Microsoft Corporation, 348 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Noninfringement of Claims 14, 18 and 20 of the Patent-in-Suit and Alternative Motion for New Trial filed by Microsoft Corporation, 346 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON THE JURY VERDICT AND REQUEST FOR ENHANCED DAMAGES AND ATTORNEYS' FEES filed by Infrastructures for Information, Inc., i4i Limited Partnership, 353 MOTION for New Trial Due to the Verdict on the Validity of Claims 14, 18 and 20 of the Patent-in-Suit filed by Microsoft Corporation, 350 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR POST-VERDICT DAMAGES TO THE TIME OF JUDGMENT, PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, AND POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST filed by Infrastructures for Information, Inc., i4i Limited Partnership, 389 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Carl Tostevin (Dkt No. 370-005) filed by i4i Limited Partnership, 370 SEALED MOTION to Stay Injunctive Relief filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, )
July 7, 2009 Filing 406 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response Patent Motion re 351 MOTION for New Trial and Alternative Motion for Remittitur, on Plaintiffs' Claim for Damages filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Carter, Jeffrey)
July 7, 2009 Filing 405 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 345 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law No Willful Infringement of the Patent-In-Suit and Alternative Motion for New Trial filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
July 7, 2009 Filing 404 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 348 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Noninfringement of Claims 14, 18 and 20 of the Patent-in-Suit and Alternative Motion for New Trial filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
July 7, 2009 Filing 403 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 389 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Carl Tostevin (Dkt No. 370-005) filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Todd S. Patterson, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Exhibit A.4, # 6 Exhibit A.5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
July 7, 2009 Filing 402 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 353 MOTION for New Trial Due to the Verdict on the Validity of Claims 14, 18 and 20 of the Patent-in-Suit filed by Infrastructures for Information, Inc., i4i Limited Partnership. (Baxter, Samuel)
July 7, 2009 Filing 401 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 359 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law /Microsoft's Corrected Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Or in the Alternative, For New Trial, On Invalidity In Light Of the SEMI S4 System filed by Infrastructures for Information, Inc., i4i Limited Partnership. (Baxter, Samuel)
July 7, 2009 Filing 400 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 350 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR POST-VERDICT DAMAGES TO THE TIME OF JUDGMENT, PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, AND POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
July 7, 2009 Filing 399 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 356 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Obviousness or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial on Both Anticipation and Obviousness, in Light of Rita, DeRose filed by Infrastructures for Information, Inc., i4i Limited Partnership. (Baxter, Samuel)
July 7, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. Documents # 397 and 398, Sealed Sur-Replies. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (mjc, )
July 7, 2009 Filing 398 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 356 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Obviousness or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial on Both Anticipation and Obviousness, in Light of Rita, DeRose filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 7/7/2009 (mjc, ).
July 7, 2009 Filing 397 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 359 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law /Microsoft's Corrected Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Or in the Alternative, For New Trial, On Invalidity In Light Of the SEMI S4 System filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 7/7/2009 (mjc, ).
July 7, 2009 Filing 396 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 346 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON THE JURY VERDICT AND REQUEST FOR ENHANCED DAMAGES AND ATTORNEYS' FEES filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
July 7, 2009 Filing 395 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 364 SEALED PATENT MOTION CORRECTED MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A POST-JUDGMENT ROYALTY(ORIGINAL MOTION [DKT. 349]) filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
July 7, 2009 Filing 394 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 347 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Indirect Infringement of the Patent-in-Suit and Alternative Motion for New Trial filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
July 6, 2009 Filing 393 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 370 SEALED MOTION to Stay Injunctive Relief filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2009 Filing 392 REPORT of Mediation by James W. Knowles. Mediation result: impasse(Knowles, James)
June 30, 2009 Filing 391 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Martin C. Robson, III on behalf of i4i Limited Partnership (Robson, Martin)
June 29, 2009 Filing 390 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 349 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A POST-JUDGMENT ROYALTY filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Robson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 29, 2009 Filing 389 SEALED MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Carl Tostevin (Dkt No. 370-005) by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Harting Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 29, 2009 Filing 388 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 346 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON THE JURY VERDICT AND REQUEST FOR ENHANCED DAMAGES AND ATTORNEYS' FEES filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Baxter, Samuel)
June 29, 2009 Filing 387 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 350 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR POST-VERDICT DAMAGES TO THE TIME OF JUDGMENT, PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, AND POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Baxter, Samuel)
June 29, 2009 Filing 386 REPLY to Response to Motion re 359 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law /Microsoft's Corrected Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Or in the Alternative, For New Trial, On Invalidity In Light Of the SEMI S4 System filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
June 29, 2009 Filing 385 REPLY to Response to Motion re 356 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Obviousness or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial on Both Anticipation and Obviousness, in Light of Rita, DeRose filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Steven Kalogeras, # 2 Exhibit 1)(Kudlac, Kevin)
June 29, 2009 Filing 384 REPLY to Response to Motion re 353 MOTION for New Trial Due to the Verdict on the Validity of Claims 14, 18 and 20 of the Patent-in-Suit filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
June 29, 2009 Filing 383 REPLY to Response to Motion re 348 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Noninfringement of Claims 14, 18 and 20 of the Patent-in-Suit and Alternative Motion for New Trial filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
June 29, 2009 Filing 382 REPLY to Response to Motion re 351 MOTION for New Trial and Alternative Motion for Remittitur, on Plaintiffs' Claim for Damages filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
June 29, 2009 Filing 381 REPLY to Response to Motion re 347 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Indirect Infringement of the Patent-in-Suit and Alternative Motion for New Trial filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
June 29, 2009 Filing 380 REPLY to Response to Motion re 345 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law No Willful Infringement of the Patent-In-Suit and Alternative Motion for New Trial filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER granting 376 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit in Response in Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for New Trial, and Alternative Motion or Remittitur. The page limit for Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Microsoft's Motion for New Trial, and Alternative Motion for Remittitur, on Plaintiffs' Claim for Damages is hereby extended to and including nineteen (19) pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/22/2009. (kls, )
June 19, 2009 Filing 378 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 351 MOTION for New Trial and Alternative Motion for Remittitur, on Plaintiffs' Claim for Damages filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 19, 2009 Filing 377 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 350 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR POST-VERDICT DAMAGES TO THE TIME OF JUDGMENT, PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, AND POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Poposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
June 19, 2009 Filing 376 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 19, 2009 Filing 375 RESPONSE in Opposition re 359 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law /Microsoft's Corrected Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Or in the Alternative, For New Trial, On Invalidity In Light Of the SEMI S4 System filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 19, 2009 Filing 374 RESPONSE to 355 Proposed Findings of Fact by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
June 19, 2009 Filing 373 RESPONSE to 354 Proposed Findings of Fact by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
June 19, 2009 Filing 372 RESPONSE in Opposition re 346 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON THE JURY VERDICT AND REQUEST FOR ENHANCED DAMAGES AND ATTORNEYS' FEES filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Amber Rovner, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
June 19, 2009 Filing 371 RESPONSE in Opposition re 345 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law No Willful Infringement of the Patent-In-Suit and Alternative Motion for New Trial filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 19, 2009 Filing 370 SEALED MOTION to Stay Injunctive Relief by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Amber Rovner, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
June 19, 2009 Filing 369 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 349 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A POST-JUDGMENT ROYALTY filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Amber Rovner, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
June 19, 2009 Filing 368 RESPONSE in Opposition re 356 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Obviousness or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial on Both Anticipation and Obviousness, in Light of Rita, DeRose filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 19, 2009 Filing 367 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 353 MOTION for New Trial Due to the Verdict on the Validity of Claims 14, 18 and 20 of the Patent-in-Suit filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 19, 2009 Filing 366 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 347 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Indirect Infringement of the Patent-in-Suit and Alternative Motion for New Trial filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 19, 2009 Filing 365 RESPONSE in Opposition re 348 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Noninfringement of Claims 14, 18 and 20 of the Patent-in-Suit and Alternative Motion for New Trial filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 19, 2009 Filing 364 SEALED PATENT MOTION CORRECTED MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A POST-JUDGMENT ROYALTY(ORIGINAL MOTION [DKT. 349]) by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 19, 2009 Filing 363 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. re 349 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A POST-JUDGMENT ROYALTY NOTICE OF FILING CORRECTED MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A POST-JUDGMENT ROYALTY (Baxter, Samuel)
June 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER granting 361 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/10/09. cc:attys 6-10-09 (mll, )
June 9, 2009 Filing 361 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion for New Trial/Remittitur on Damages by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER that the parties return to mediation before Jim Knowles by 7-03-2009, and strongly encourages the parties to find a business resolution to their disputes. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/08/09. cc:attys 6-08-09(mll, )
June 8, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 358, Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. PLEASE IGNORE. SEE CORRECTED DOUCMENT 359 .*** (mjc, )
June 5, 2009 Filing 359 ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES 358 .*** MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law /Microsoft's Corrected Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Or in the Alternative, For New Trial, On Invalidity In Light Of the SEMI S4 System by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin) Modified on 6/8/2009 (mjc, ).
June 4, 2009 Filing 358 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law , Or In the Alternative, For New Trial, On Invalidity In Light Of The SEMI S4 System by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin) Modified on 6/8/2009 (mjc, ).
June 4, 2009 Filing 357 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT.PLAINTIFFS' REVISED PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW REGARDING MICROSOFT CORPORATION'S EQUITABLE DEFENSE OF INEQUITABLE CONDUCT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 4, 2009 Filing 356 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of Obviousness or, in the Alternative, for a New Trial on Both Anticipation and Obviousness, in Light of Rita, DeRose by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
June 4, 2009 Filing 355 Proposed Findings of Fact by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ariane N. Newell, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2)(Kudlac, Kevin)
June 4, 2009 Filing 354 Proposed Findings of Fact by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
June 4, 2009 Filing 353 MOTION for New Trial Due to the Verdict on the Validity of Claims 14, 18 and 20 of the Patent-in-Suit by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
June 4, 2009 Filing 352 Proposed Findings of Fact by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Baxter, Samuel)
June 4, 2009 Filing 351 MOTION for New Trial and Alternative Motion for Remittitur, on Plaintiffs' Claim for Damages by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
June 4, 2009 Filing 350 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR POST-VERDICT DAMAGES TO THE TIME OF JUDGMENT, PREJUDGMENT INTEREST, AND POST-JUDGMENT INTEREST by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 4, 2009 Filing 349 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE A POST-JUDGMENT ROYALTY by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 4, 2009 Filing 348 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Noninfringement of Claims 14, 18 and 20 of the Patent-in-Suit and Alternative Motion for New Trial by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
June 4, 2009 Filing 347 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law of No Indirect Infringement of the Patent-in-Suit and Alternative Motion for New Trial by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
June 4, 2009 Filing 346 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON THE JURY VERDICT AND REQUEST FOR ENHANCED DAMAGES AND ATTORNEYS' FEES by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
June 4, 2009 Filing 345 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law No Willful Infringement of the Patent-In-Suit and Alternative Motion for New Trial by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
June 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER granting 343 Motion to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/01/09. cc:attys 6-01-09 (mll, )
May 28, 2009 Filing 343 Joint MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER REGARDING POST TRIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Both parties will file their respective findings of fact and conclusions of law on the equitable issues tried to the Court on 6-04-09. Each party will file all post verdict motions on which it has the burden on 6-04-09. Each party will file its response briefs to motions on 6-19-09. Each party will file its reply briefs to responses on 6-29-09. Each party will file any sur-replies to the reply briefs on 7-07-09. The Court will hear all post-trial motions on 7/9/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/26/09. cc:attys 5-26-09(mll, )
May 26, 2009 Filing 341 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/20/09 A.M. & P.M. Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2009. (lss, )
May 26, 2009 Filing 340 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/19/09 Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S.Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2009. (lss, )
May 26, 2009 Filing 339 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/19/09 Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2009. (lss, )
May 26, 2009 Filing 338 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/18/09 Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2009. (lss, )
May 26, 2009 Filing 337 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/18/09 Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2009. (lss, )
May 26, 2009 Filing 336 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/15/09 Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2009. (lss, )
May 26, 2009 Filing 335 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/15/09 Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2009. (lss, )
May 26, 2009 Filing 334 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/13/09 Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2009. (lss, )
May 26, 2009 Filing 333 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/13/09 Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2009. (lss, )
May 26, 2009 Filing 332 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/12/09 Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2009. (lss, )
May 26, 2009 Filing 331 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/12/09 Morning Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2009. (lss, )
May 26, 2009 Filing 330 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/11/09 Afternoon Session before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2009. (lss, )
May 26, 2009 Filing 329 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/11/09 Morning Session Voir Dire before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter/Transcriber: S. Simmons/J. Werlinger,Telephone number: 903/935-3868. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/16/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2009. (lss, )
May 22, 2009 Filing 328 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc., Microsoft Corporation NOTICE OF THE PARTIES' PROPOSED POST TRIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 20, 2009 Jury Trial completed on 5/20/2009. (rlf, )
May 20, 2009 Filing 327 Sealed Document. JURY VERDICT IN ITS ENTIRETY (rlf, )
May 20, 2009 Filing 326 JURY VERDICT. (rlf, )
May 20, 2009 Filing 325 SEALED Jury Notes. (rlf, )
May 20, 2009 Filing 324 Minute Entry -- 5.20.09 Jury Trial - Day 7 for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial completed on 5/20/2009. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 -- Plaintiffs' Exhibit List 5 (Plaintiffs' List of Jury Trial Exhibits Admitted as of End of Trial Day on May 20, 2009); # 2 -- Plaintiffs' Exhibit List 5-A (Plaintiffs' List of Bench Trial Exhibits Admitted as of End of Trial Day on May 20, 2009); # 3 -- Plaintiffs' Exhibit List 6 (Plaintiffs' List of Bench Trial Exhibits Admitted as of End of Trial Day on May 20, 2009); # 4 -- Defendant's Exhibit List 4 (Microsoft's Cumulative List of Defendant's Exhibits Admitted May 11 - 19, 2009) (rlf, )
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying [] Microsoft's Oral Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. FROM THE BENCH by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/19/2009. (rlf, )
May 19, 2009 ORAL MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Microsoft Corporation for (1) no direct infringement; (2) invalidity; (3) no willful infringement; and, (4) no infringement. Presented orally in open Court on 5.19.2009. (rlf, )
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER denying [] i4i's Oral Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. FROM THE BENCH by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/19/2009. (rlf, )
May 19, 2009 ORAL MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. on (1) direct infringement; (2) Defendant liable for inducing infringement; (3) Defendant liable for contributory infringement; (4) willful infringement; (5) Defendant's failure to produce evidence that patent invalid; (6) i4i entitled to no less than reasonalbe royalty; and (7) damages not limited by the marking provisions of 35 U.S.C. 287(a). Presented orally in open court on 5.19.2009. (rlf, )
May 19, 2009 Filing 323 Jury Instructions. (rlf, )
May 19, 2009 Filing 322 Minute Entry -- 5.19.09 Jury Trial - Day 6 for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 5/19/2009. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 -- Plaintiffs' Exhibit List 4 (Plaintiffs' List of Trial Exhibits Admitted as of End of Trial Day on May 18, 2009), # 2 -- Defendant's Exhibit List 3 (Microsoft's Cumulative List of Defendant's Exhibits Admitted May 11 - 18, 2009), # 3 -- Defendant's Exhibit List 3-A (Microsoft's List of Exhibits to be Admitted Tuesday, May 19, 2009.) (rlf, )
May 18, 2009 Filing 321 Minute Entry -- 5.18.09 Jury Trial - Day 5 for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 5/18/2009. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 -- Plaintiffs' Exhibit List 3 (Plaintiffs' List of Trial Exhibits Admitted as of End of Trial Day on May 15, 2009), # 2 -- Defendant's Exhibit List 2 (Microsoft's List of Exhibits to be Admitted Monday, May 18, 2009), # 3 -- Defendant's Exhibit List 2-A (Microsoft's Cumulative List of Defendant's Exhibits Admitted May 11 - 15, 2009) (rlf, )
May 17, 2009 Filing 320 Proposed Jury Instructions by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Joint Revised Proposed Final Jury Instructions, # 2 Exhibit B - i4i Proposed Verdict Form, # 3 Exhibit C - Microsoft's Second Revised Proposed Verdict Form)(Kudlac, Kevin)
May 15, 2009 Filing 319 Minute Entry - 5.15.09 Jury Trial - Day 4 for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 5/15/2009. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (Attachments: # 1 -- Plaintiff's Exhibit List No. 2, # 2 -- Defendant's Exhibit List No. 1) (rlf, )
May 13, 2009 Filing 318 Minute Entry 5.13.2009 Jury Trial - Day 3 for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 5/13/2009. Trial to resume on Friday, 5.15.09 at 9:00 am. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, )
May 12, 2009 Remark: Terminated deadline regarding continuation of trial. (rlf, )
May 12, 2009 Filing 317 Minute Entry -- 5.12.2009 Jury Trial - Day 2 for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Trial held on 5/12/2009. Trial to resume 5.13.2009 @ 9:00 am (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, )
May 12, 2009 Filing 316 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. That Dr. Thomas Rhyne and Michel Vulpe Will Testify Regarding Inequitable Conduct (Carter, Jeffrey)
May 11, 2009 Filing 315 Sealed Document: Jury Questionnaires 1 - 11. (Attachments: # 1 -- Jury Questionnaires 12 - 21)(rlf, )
May 11, 2009 Filing 314 Minute Entry - 5.11.09 Jury Trial - Day 1 for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Jury Selection held on 5/11/2009. A jury of 8 empaneled and sworn; Jury Trial - Day 1 held on 5/11/2009. Trial to resume on 5.12.09 at 9:00 am. (Court Reporter Judy Werlinger.) (rlf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2009: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, ).
May 11, 2009 Filing 313 Letter from Matthew D. Powers, Lead Counsel for Microsoft Corporation, withdrawing its defense of indefiniteness as to the remaining asserted claims (claims 14-18 and 20 of US Patent No. 5,787,449). (mll, )
May 10, 2009 Filing 312 Proposed Pretrial Order Amendment To Drop Pursuit of Dependent Claims 15, 16 and 17 by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Carter, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2009 Filing 311 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. That Stephen Owens Will Testify Regarding Inequitable Conduct (Carter, Jeffrey)
May 8, 2009 Filing 309 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT MICROSOFT'S PRETRIAL PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW ON LACHES AND EQUITABLE ESTOPPEL. (Kudlac, Kevin)
May 8, 2009 Filing 308 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT MICROSOFT'S PRETRIAL PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW ON INEQUITABLE CONDUCT. (Kudlac, Kevin)
May 8, 2009 Filing 307 Filed in Error. Please Disregard.Proposed Findings of Fact by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin) Modified on 5/8/2009 (gsg).
May 8, 2009 Filing 306 FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.Proposed Findings of Fact by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin) Modified on 5/8/2009 (gsg).
May 8, 2009 Filing 305 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. Proposed Joint List of Bench Trial Issues (Carter, Jeffrey)
May 7, 2009 Filing 310 Minute Entry -- 5.7.09 Pretrial Hrg for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Final Pretrial Conference (Hearing on Supplemental Claim Construction and Plaintiff's Motion in Limine #5) held on 5/7/2009. (Court Reporter Kimberly Julian.) (Attachments: # 1 -- Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, )
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 304 SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPINION. The Court again rejects Microsoft's proposed construction. The ability to edit content and structure separately is not a claim limitation. As stated at the 5-7-09 hearing, the Court leaves its original construction unchanged. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/07/09. cc:attys 5-8-09(mll, )
May 7, 2009 Filing 303 Proposed Voir Dire by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
May 7, 2009 Filing 302 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Craft, Roger)
May 6, 2009 Filing 301 Proposed Jury Instructions by Infrastructures for Information, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Revised Proposed Joint Prelim Jury Instruction, # 2 Exhibit B - Revised Proposed Final Jury Instruction, # 3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs Proposed Verdict Form, # 4 Exhibit D - Microsoft's Revised Proposed Verdict Form)(Kudlac, Kevin)
May 5, 2009 NOTICE of Hearing: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/7/2009 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. The Court will hear argument on Supplemental Claim Construction and Plaintiff's Motion in Limine #5.(rlf, )
May 1, 2009 Filing 300 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MICROSOFT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION by i4i Limited Partnership to 297 Claim Construction Brief filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 1, 2009 Filing 299 RESPONSE in Opposition re 274 SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE Microsoft's Opposition to i4i's Supplemental Briefing on its Motion in Limine No. 5 to Preclude Evidence or Statements in Front of the Jury Related to Microsoft's Equitable Defenses filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Amber Rovner, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2)(Kudlac, Kevin)
April 30, 2009 Filing 298 RESPONSE in Support re 274 SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE No. 5 on Equitable Issues filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jonathan Yim, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Jeffrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/30/2009: # 4 Text of Proposed Order) (kls, ).
April 30, 2009 Filing 297 MICROSOFT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Amber H. Rovner, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Kudlac, Kevin)
April 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER denying 184 Sealed Motion to Strike Untimely Supplemental Reports of Rhyne Gilbane; denying 188 Sealed Patent Motion to Strike Portions of Expert Report of Microsoft's Noninfringement Expert, Stephen Gray, and Damages Expert, Keith Ugone, Regarding Alternative Non-Infringing Designs; denying 190 Sealed Patent Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Microsoft's Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Equitable Estoppel; denying 191 Sealed Patent Motion to Strike Portions of Expert Report of Microsoft's Invalidity Expert, Stephen Gray, That Are Based on Uncorroborated Testimony; denying 192 Sealed Motion Microsoft's Daubert Motion and Motion to Strike the 12-08-2008 Expert Report of Frank Gilbane; denying 193 Sealed Motion Microsoft's Daubert Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Reports of V Thomas Rhyne and Irving Rappaport as to Opinions on Microsoft's Alleged Intent Underlying Allegations of Inducement and Willfulness; denying 194 Sealed Motion Microsoft's Daubert Motion and Motion to Strike Survey Evidence and Report of William E Wecker and Corresponding Portions of Reports and Testimony by Michael Wagner; denying 195 Sealed Motion to Exclude Testimony of Michael J Wagner; denying 198 Sealed Patent Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that the 449 Patent is not Invalid Based on Purported Sale in US of a Software Product Named Waterloo Rita in 1989; denying 200 Motion for Leave to File Supplement Rebuttal Expert Report of George Gerstman on Willful Infringement in Light of Recent Grant of Reexamination; denying 266 Motion to Strike Improper Second Supplemental Report of Dr Rhyne and Supplement Report of Dr Martin; denying 269 Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Contributory Infringement; granting in part, denying in part and carrying in part 270 Sealed Motion in limine; granting in part, denying in part, and carrying part 274 Sealed Patent Motion in limine; granting 290 Sealed Motion for Application or Modification of the Protective Order to Allow Disclosure of Two Confidential i4i Documents to i4i Ex-Employee Scott Young. i4i may take a four-hour deposition of Mr Little by 5-05-09 and may supplement Dr. Rhyne's report within 48 hours of the deposition. Parties shall meet and confer on any motion in limine not ruled on at the 4-28-09 hearing and notify the Court of any issues that need to be resolved by 5-04-09. If the parties cannot resolve all the issues, the Court will hear them at 1:30 p.m. on 5-07-09. The Court orders parties to meet and confer regarding Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law, a list of Bench-trial issues to be decided, and the Court's Charge, to be submitted by noon on 5-06-09. The Court orders i4i to submit a brief distinguishing the cases Microsoft cited regarding i4i's motion in limine number 5 by noon on 4-30-09. Microsoft may file a reply brief no later than 5 p.m. on 5-01-09. Microsoft shall file a brief on the claim scope of metacode map distinct storage means by noon 4-30-09. i4i may file a reply brief no later than 5 p.m. on 5-01-09. If the Court requires oral arguments, the Court will hear them on 5-07-09 at 1:30 p.m. The Court will allow parties 30 minutes for voir dire, 45 minutes for opening statements, 15 hours for direct and cross examinations, and 60 minutes for closing arguments. The 15 hours includes issues that are tried to the Bench. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/29/09. cc:attys 4-30-09 (mll, )
April 28, 2009 Filing 295 Minute Entry -- 4.28.09 Pretrial & Motion Hrg for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Final Pretrial Conference and Motion Hearing held on 4/28/2009 re 193 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Daubert Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Reports of V. Thomas Rhyne and Irving Rappaport As To Opinions on Microsoft's Alleged "Intent" Underlying Allegations Of Inducement and Willfulness filed by Microsoft Corporation, 188 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF MICROSOFT'S NONINFRINGEMENT EXPERT, STEPHEN GRAY, AND DAMAGES EXPERT, KEITH UGONE, REGARDING ALTERNATIVE NON-INFRINGING DESIGNS filed by i4i Limited Partnership, 274 SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE filed by Infrastructures for Information, Inc., i4i Limited Partnership, 191 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORT OF MICROSOFT'S INVALIDITY EXPERT, STEPHEN GRAY, THAT ARE BASED ON UNCORROBORATED TESTIMONY filed by i4i Limited Partnership, 192 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Daubert Motion and Motion to Strike The December 8, 2008 Expert Report of Frank Gilbane filed by Microsoft Corporation, 190 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANT MICROSOFT CORPORATION'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF LACHES AND EQUITABLE ESTOPPEL filed by i4i Limited Partnership, 266 MOTION to Strike Improper "Second Supplemental Report" Of Dr. Rhyne and Supplemental Report of Dr. Martin And Unopposed Request For Expedited Consideration filed by Microsoft Corporation, 195 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Michael J. Wagner filed by Microsoft Corporation, 270 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Omnibus Motions In Limine and To Exclude filed by Microsoft Corporation, 184 SEALED MOTION to Strike Untimely "Supplemental" Reports of Rhyne and Gilbane filed by Microsoft Corporation, 200 MOTION for Leave to File Microsoft's Opposed Motion for Leave to Supplement the Rebuttal Expert Report of George H. Gerstman on Willful Infringement In Light Of The Recent Grant Of Reexamination Of the Patent-In_Suit filed by Microsoft Corporation, 269 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Contributory Infringement filed by Microsoft Corporation, 290 SEALED MOTION for Application or Modification of the Protective Order to Allow Disclosure of Two Confidential i4i Documents to i4i Ex-Employee Scott Young and Request for Expedited Consideration filed by Microsoft Corporation, 194 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Daubert Motion and Motion To Strike Survey Evidence And Report Of William E. Wecker And Corresponding Portions of Reports And Testimony By Michael Wagner filed by Microsoft Corporation, 198 Amended SEALED PATENT MOTION AMENDED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE '449 PATENT IS NOT INVALID BASED ON A PURPORTED SALE IN THE UNITED STATES OF A SOFTWARE PRODUCT NAMED WATERLOO RITA IN 1989 filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 -- Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf, )
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/27/09. cc:attys 4-27-09(mll, )
April 27, 2009 Filing 293 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 290 SEALED MOTION for Application or Modification of the Protective Order to Allow Disclosure of Two Confidential i4i Documents to i4i Ex-Employee Scott Young and Request for Expedited Consideration filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Michel Vulpe)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 27, 2009 Filing 292 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Randy Yim on behalf of i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. (Yim, Jonathan)
April 27, 2009 Filing 291 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 269 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Contributory Infringement filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of John B. Campbell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 24, 2009 Filing 290 SEALED MOTION for Application or Modification of the Protective Order to Allow Disclosure of Two Confidential i4i Documents to i4i Ex-Employee Scott Young and Request for Expedited Consideration by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Ariane N. Newell, # 2 Exhibit Exh 1, # 3 Exhibit Exh 2, # 4 Exhibit Exh 3, # 5 Exhibit Exh 4, # 6 Exhibit Exh 5, # 7 Exhibit Exh 6, # 8 Exhibit Exh 7, # 9 Exhibit Exh 8, # 10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
April 24, 2009 Filing 289 ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES 287 .***Sealed Document. Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Regarding Microsoft Corporation's Laches and Equitable Estoppel Affirmative Defenses (Carter, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/24/2009 (mjc, ).
April 23, 2009 Filing 288 Sealed Document. PLAINTIFFS PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW REGARDING MICROSOFT CORPORATIONS INEQUITABLE CONDUCT AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Carter, Jeffrey)
April 23, 2009 Filing 287 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 289 .***Proposed Findings of Fact by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Carter, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/24/2009 (mjc, ).
April 23, 2009 Filing 286 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 274 SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Amber Rovner in Support of Microsoft's Response to Plaintiff's Motions in Limine, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 E Exhibit A.4, # 6 Exhibit A.5, # 7 Exhibit A.6, # 8 Exhibit A.7, # 9 Exhibit A.8, # 10 Exhibit A.9, # 11 Exhibit A.10, # 12 Exhibit A.11, # 13 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
April 23, 2009 Filing 285 Proposed Pretrial Order JOINT PROPOSED FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E.1, # 6 Exhibit E.2, # 7 Exhibit F.1, # 8 Exhibit F.2, # 9 Exhibit F.3, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 23, 2009 Filing 284 Proposed Jury Instructions by Infrastructures for Information, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Joint Prelim Jury Instructions, # 2 Exhibit B - Joint Closing Jury Instructions, # 3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff Proposed Verdict Form, # 4 Exhibit D - Defendant's Proposed Verdict Form)(Kudlac, Kevin)
April 23, 2009 Filing 283 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Andrew Culbert for Microsoft Corporation. Fee pd., 6-1-17725. Approved 4/23/2009. (mjc, )
April 23, 2009 Filing 282 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Baxter, Samuel)
April 23, 2009 Filing 281 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Notice of Request For Daily Transcript (Kudlac, Kevin)
April 23, 2009 Filing 280 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Defendant's Estimates of Time Requested For Jury Selection And Trial (Kudlac, Kevin)
April 23, 2009 Filing 279 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. PLAINTIFFS' ESTIMATES OF TIME REQUESTED FOR JURY SELECTION AND TRIAL (Baxter, Samuel)
April 23, 2009 Filing 278 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPT (Baxter, Samuel)
April 23, 2009 Filing 277 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 270 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Omnibus Motions In Limine and To Exclude filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Gretchen K. Harting, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 22, 2009 Filing 276 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Compliance (Kudlac, Kevin)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER granting 271 Joint Motion to Exceed Page Limits for Motions in Limine and Responses Thereto. IT IS ORDERED that the page limits for the parties' motions in limine and the parties' responses shall be extended to twenty pages for each party. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/22/2009. (kls, )
April 21, 2009 Filing 274 SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS IN LIMINE by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 21, 2009 Filing 273 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 266 MOTION to Strike Improper "Second Supplemental Report" Of Dr. Rhyne and Supplemental Report of Dr. Martin And Unopposed Request For Expedited Consideration filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Gretchen K. Harting, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E Part 1, # 7 Exhibit E Part 2, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 21, 2009 Filing 272 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc., Microsoft Corporation NOTICE OF JOINT STIPULATION RELATING TO CERTAIN MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Baxter, Samuel)
April 21, 2009 Filing 271 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages JOINT MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS FOR MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND RESPONSES THERETO by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 21, 2009 Filing 270 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Omnibus Motions In Limine and To Exclude by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Todd S. Patterson in Support of Microsoft's Omnibus Motions in Limine and to Exclude, # 2 Exhibit Exh A.1, # 3 Exhibit Exh A.2, # 4 Exhibit Exh A.3, # 5 Exhibit Exh A.4, # 6 Exhibit Exh A.5, # 7 Exhibit Exh A.6, # 8 Exhibit Exh A.7, # 9 Exhibit Exh A.8, # 10 Exhibit Exh A.9, # 11 Exhibit Exh A.10, # 12 Exhibit Exh A.11, # 13 Exhibit Exh A.12, # 14 Exhibit Exh A.13, # 15 Exhibit Exh A.14, # 16 Exhibit Exh A.15, # 17 Exhibit Exh A.16, # 18 Exhibit Exh A.17, # 19 Exhibit Exh A.18, # 20 Exhibit Exh B, # 21 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
April 21, 2009 CORRECTED NOTICE (LOCATION OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE): Parties are advised that the Pretrial Conference set on **TUESDAY**, April 28, 2009 at 1:30 will be held in Judge Davis's Courtroom, in TYLER, TEXAS (rlf, )
April 21, 2009 NOTICE (LOCATION OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE): Parties are advised that the Pretrial Conference set on Thursday, April 28, 2009 at 1:30 will be held in Judge Davis's Courtroom, in TYLER, TEXAS. (rlf, )
April 20, 2009 Filing 269 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Contributory Infringement by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Amber Rovner, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Exhibit A.4, # 6 Exhibit A.5, # 7 Exhibit A.6, # 8 Exhibit A.7, # 9 Exhibit A.8, # 10 Exhibit A.9, # 11 Exhibit A.10, # 12 Exhibit A.11, # 13 Exhibit A.12, # 14 Exhibit A.13, # 15 Exhibit A.14, # 16 Exhibit A.15, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
April 17, 2009 Filing 268 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Baxter, Samuel)
April 17, 2009 Filing 267 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. PLAINTIFFS' INITIAL CONTRIBUTORY INFRINGEMENT DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS (Baxter, Samuel)
April 13, 2009 Filing 266 SEALED MOTION to Strike Improper "Second Supplemental Report" Of Dr. Rhyne and Supplemental Report of Dr. Martin And Unopposed Request For Expedited Consideration by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Amber Rovner, # 2 Exhibit A1, # 3 Exhibit A2, # 4 Exhibit A3, # 5 Exhibit A4, # 6 Text of Proposed Order)(Powers, Matthew) Modified on 4/13/2009 (mjc, )(Document modified to sealed status).
April 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER that the parties meet and confer on all limine issues before filing any motions in limine. Motions in limine shall be filed on 4-21-09 and responses are due by 4-23-09. Responses to dispositive motions and Daubert motions on contributory infringement are due by noon, 4-27-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/09/09. cc:attys 4-09-09(mll, )
April 6, 2009 Filing 264 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Austin Curry on behalf of i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. (Curry, John)
March 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 263 FIFTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Jury instructions due by 4/23/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 4/20/2009; Response to Dispositive Motions due 4-27-09. Motions in limine due 4-17-09. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/23/2009. Jury Selection set for 5/11/2009 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2009 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Expected length of trial is 5 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/24/09. cc:attys 3-25-09(mll, )
March 23, 2009 Filing 262 ANSWER to 258 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by i4i Limited Partnership.(Baxter, Samuel)
March 23, 2009 Filing 261 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Fourth Amended Docket Control Order by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
March 20, 2009 Filing 259 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. Notice of Compliance of Pretrial Objections (Carter, Jeffrey)
March 20, 2009 Filing 258 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Second 181 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
March 20, 2009 Filing 257 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation's Notice of Compliance (Kudlac, Kevin)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 260 AGREED FOURTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/19/09. cc:attys 3-20-09(mll, )
March 19, 2009 Filing 256 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Third Amended Docket Control Order by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Jeffrey)
March 18, 2009 Reset Jury Selection for 5/11/2009 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial reset for 5/11/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference reset for 4/30/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (per 255 Order) (mll, )
March 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 180 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 105 Amended Complaint PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THEIR SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ADDING A CLAIM FOR CONTRIBUTORY INFRINGEMENT AND TO SERVE A SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT IN LIGHT OF THE FEDERAL CI filed by Infrastructures for Information, Inc., i4i Limited Partners. The Court DISMISSES with prejudice pltfs' claims against Excel 2003 and Excel 2007, without prejudice to any claims against any other Excel products. The Court DENIES as moot 189 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by Excel filed by Microsoft Corporation. The Court orders the parties to meet and confer on a schedule that will allow the parties to take limited discovery before the May 2009 trial. Accordingly, the Court CONTINUES the pretrial hearing until 4-30-09 at 9:00 a.m. and the jury selection with trial immediately to follow on 5-11-09 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/18/09. cc:attys 3-18-09(mll, ) Modified on 3/18/2009 (mll, ).
March 17, 2009 Filing 254 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ariane Nicole Newell for Microsoft Corporation. (mll, )
March 17, 2009 Filing 253 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Steven Kalogeras for Microsoft Corporation. (mll, )
March 13, 2009 Filing 252 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation's Objections to i4i's Amended/Corrected Counter Deposition Designations (Kudlac, Kevin)
March 13, 2009 Filing 251 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. PLAINITIFFS' NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Baxter, Samuel)
March 13, 2009 Filing 250 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc., Microsoft Corporation re 232 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, JOINT SUBMISSION IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE COURT'S MARCH 5, 2009 ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Baxter, Samuel)
March 13, 2009 Filing 249 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corporation Indentification of Prior Art Pursuant To 35 U.S.C. §282 (Kudlac, Kevin)
March 12, 2009 Filing 248 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 200 MOTION for Leave to File Microsoft's Opposed Motion for Leave to Supplement the Rebuttal Expert Report of George H. Gerstman on Willful Infringement In Light Of The Recent Grant Of Reexamination Of the Patent-In_Suit filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Baxter, Samuel)
March 9, 2009 Filing 247 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 193 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Daubert Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Reports of V. Thomas Rhyne and Irving Rappaport As To Opinions on Microsoft's Alleged "Intent" Underlying Allegations Of Inducement and Willfulness filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Baxter, Samuel)
March 9, 2009 Filing 246 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership re 233 Notice (Other) PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTIONS AND AMENDED/CORRECTED COUNTER DESIGNATIONS TO DEPOSITION TESTIMONY DESIGNATED BY MICROSOFT CORPORATION (Baxter, Samuel)
March 9, 2009 Filing 245 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 195 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Michael J. Wagner filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Alfredo Silva, # 2 Exhibit C.1, # 3 Exhibit C.1 Part 2, # 4 Exhibit C.1 Part 3, # 5 Exhibit C.1 Part 4)(Baxter, Samuel)
March 9, 2009 Filing 244 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 190 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANT MICROSOFT CORPORATION'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF LACHES AND EQUITABLE ESTOPPEL filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
March 9, 2009 Filing 243 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 192 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Daubert Motion and Motion to Strike The December 8, 2008 Expert Report of Frank Gilbane filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Baxter, Samuel)
March 9, 2009 Filing 242 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 194 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Daubert Motion and Motion To Strike Survey Evidence And Report Of William E. Wecker And Corresponding Portions of Reports And Testimony By Michael Wagner filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Baxter, Samuel)
March 9, 2009 Filing 241 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 191 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORT OF MICROSOFT'S INVALIDITY EXPERT, STEPHEN GRAY, THAT ARE BASED ON UNCORROBORATED TESTIMONY filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
March 9, 2009 Filing 240 SEALED SURREPLY to Reply to Motion re 186 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE '449 PATENT IS NOT INVALID BASED ON A PURPORTED SALE IN THE UNITED STATES OF A SOFTWARE PRODUCT NAMED WATERLOO RITA IN 1989 filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
March 9, 2009 Filing 239 SEALED SURREPLY to Reply to Motion re 188 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF MICROSOFT'S NONINFRINGEMENT EXPERT, STEPHEN GRAY, AND DAMAGES EXPERT, KEITH UGONE, REGARDING ALTERNATIVE NON-INFRINGING DESIGNS filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
March 9, 2009 Filing 238 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 184 SEALED MOTION to Strike Untimely "Supplemental" Reports of Rhyne and Gilbane filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Baxter, Samuel)
March 9, 2009 Filing 237 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Baxter, Samuel)
March 6, 2009 Filing 236 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation's of Compliance (Kudlac, Kevin)
March 6, 2009 Filing 235 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation's Objections To i4i's Initial Deposition Designations (Kudlac, Kevin)
March 6, 2009 Filing 234 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Microsoft Corporation's Counter Deposition Designations (Kudlac, Kevin)
March 6, 2009 Filing 233 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. of Objections and Counter Designations to Deposition Testimony Designated by Microsoft Corporation (Carter, Jeffrey)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER granting 180 Motion to Amend. The Court orders parties to meet and confer on amending the scheduling order to accommodate any further discovery on the contributory infringement claim. Parties shall submit a proposed amended scheduling order to the Court by 3-13-09. As pltfs have withdrawn their claims against Excel 2003 and Excel 2007, the Court Dismisses those claims with prejudice. The Court will issue a memorandum opinion on these rulings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/05/09. cc:attys 3-6-09 (mll, )
March 2, 2009 Filing 231 REPLY to Response to Motion re 200 MOTION for Leave to File Microsoft's Opposed Motion for Leave to Supplement the Rebuttal Expert Report of George H. Gerstman on Willful Infringement In Light Of The Recent Grant Of Reexamination Of the Patent-In_Suit filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Paul Torchia, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2)(Kudlac, Kevin)
February 26, 2009 Filing 230 REPLY to Response to Motion re 184 SEALED MOTION to Strike Untimely "Supplemental" Reports of Rhyne and Gilbane filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Todd S. Patterson, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit A.3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit A.4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit A.5)(Kudlac, Kevin)
February 26, 2009 Filing 229 REPLY to Response to Motion re 189 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by Excel filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
February 26, 2009 Filing 228 REPLY to Response to Motion re 193 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Daubert Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Reports of V. Thomas Rhyne and Irving Rappaport As To Opinions on Microsoft's Alleged "Intent" Underlying Allegations Of Inducement and Willfulness filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
February 26, 2009 Filing 227 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 195 in Support of SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Michael J. Wagner filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
February 26, 2009 Filing 226 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 192 In Support of SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Daubert Motion and Motion to Strike The December 8, 2008 Expert Report of Frank Gilbane filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
February 26, 2009 Filing 225 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 194 in Support of SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Daubert Motion and Motion To Strike Survey Evidence And Report Of William E. Wecker And Corresponding Portions of Reports And Testimony By Michael Wagner filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
February 26, 2009 Filing 224 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 190 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANT MICROSOFT CORPORATION'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF LACHES AND EQUITABLE ESTOPPEL filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jennifer L. Henry, # 2 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 26, 2009 Filing 223 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 198 Amended SEALED PATENT MOTION AMENDED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE '449 PATENT IS NOT INVALID BASED ON A PURPORTED SALE IN THE UNITED STATES OF A SOFTWARE PRODUCT NAMED WATERLOO RITA IN 1989 filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of John B. Campbell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 26, 2009 Filing 222 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 188 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF MICROSOFT'S NONINFRINGEMENT EXPERT, STEPHEN GRAY, AND DAMAGES EXPERT, KEITH UGONE, REGARDING ALTERNATIVE NON-INFRINGING DESIGNS filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas G. Fasone III, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit I)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 26, 2009 Filing 221 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 191 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORT OF MICROSOFT'S INVALIDITY EXPERT, STEPHEN GRAY, THAT ARE BASED ON UNCORROBORATED TESTIMONY filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 26, 2009 Filing 220 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 180 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 105 Amended Complaint PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THEIR SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ADDING A CLAIM FOR CONTRIBUTORY INFRINGEMENT AND TO SERVE A SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT IN LIGHT OF THE FEDERAL CIOpposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 105 Amended Complaint PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THEIR SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ADDING A CLAIM FOR CONTRIBUTORY INFRINGEMENT AND TO SERVE A SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT IN LIGHT OF THE FEDERAL CI filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 23, 2009 Filing 219 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Baxter, Samuel)
February 20, 2009 Filing 218 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. of First Deposition Designations (Carter, Jeffrey)
February 20, 2009 Filing 217 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Compliance for Disclosure of Witness and Trial Exhibit Lists (Kudlac, Kevin)
February 20, 2009 Filing 216 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Initial Deposition Designations (Kudlac, Kevin)
February 20, 2009 Filing 215 RESPONSE in Opposition re 200 MOTION for Leave to File Microsoft's Opposed Motion for Leave to Supplement the Rebuttal Expert Report of George H. Gerstman on Willful Infringement In Light Of The Recent Grant Of Reexamination Of the Patent-In_Suit filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas Fasone III, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 18, 2009 Filing 214 ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. ATTACHED CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE/AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL TO Document # 212, Sealed Response to Motion.*** (mjc, )
February 18, 2009 E-NOTICE: This notice serves to inform the parties of the Courts April Docket. Presently, the Court has three (3) cases set on its April Docket, two of which are patent cases, and one is a products liability case. The two patent cases are Tyler Division cases and the products liability case is a Marshall Division case. If both the Tyler and Marshall cases proceed to trial, the Court plans on selecting juries in the patent cases in Tyler on Monday, April 6, 2009 at 9:00 am and selecting a jury for the products liability case in Marshall on Tuesday, April 7, 2009 at 9:00 am. The Court will proceed with the trials of these cases on Monday, April 13, 2009 in the order of filing. (rlf, )
February 13, 2009 Filing 213 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 190 Microsoft's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Defendant Microsoft's Affirmative Defenses of Laches and Equitable Estoppel filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 31 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
February 13, 2009 Filing 212 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 188 Microsoft's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of Microsoft's Non-Infringement Expert, Stephen Gray, and Damages Expert, Keith Ugone, Regarding Alternative Non-Infringing Designs filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Paul E. Torchia in Support of Microsoft's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Reports of S. Gray and K. Ugone, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Errata A.3, # 5 Exhibit A.4, # 6 Exhibit A.5, # 7 Exhibit A.6, # 8 Exhibit A.7, # 9 Exhibit A.8, # 10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/18/2009: # 11 Corrected Certificate of Service) (mjc, ).
February 13, 2009 Filing 211 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 198 Microsoft's Opposition to i4i's Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that the 449 Patent is not Invalid Based on a Purported Sale in the United States of a Software Product Named Waterloo Rita filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Todd Patterson in Support of Microsoft's Opposition to i4i's Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Exhibit A.4.1, # 6 Exhibit A.4.2, # 7 Exhibit A.5, # 8 Exhibit A.6, # 9 Exhibit A.7, # 10 Exhibit A.8, # 11 Exhibit A.9, # 12 Exhibit B, # 13 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
February 13, 2009 Filing 210 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 194 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Daubert Motion and Motion To Strike Survey Evidence And Report Of William E. Wecker And Corresponding Portions of Reports And Testimony By Michael Wagner filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Exhibit A.4, # 6 Exhibit A.5, # 7 Exhibit A.6, # 8 Exhibit A.7, # 9 Exhibit A.8, # 10 Exhibit A.9, # 11 Exhibit A.10, # 12 Exhibit A.11, # 13 Exhibit B, # 14 Exhibit B.1, # 15 Exhibit B.2, # 16 Exhibit B.3, # 17 Exhibit B.4, # 18 Exhibit B.5, # 19 Exhibit B.6, # 20 Exhibit B.7, # 21 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 13, 2009 Filing 209 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 191 Microsoft's Opposition to i4i's Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Microsoft's Invalidity Expert, Stephen Gray, Allegedly Based on Uncorroborated Testimony filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Todd Patterson in Support of Microsoft's Opposition to i4i's Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of S. Gray, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Exhibit A.4, # 6 Exhibit A.5, # 7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
February 13, 2009 Filing 208 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 180 Defendant Microsoft's Opposition to i4i's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and to Serve Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Rhyne filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Amber Rovner in Support of Microsoft's Opposition to i4i's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
February 13, 2009 Filing 207 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 193 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Daubert Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Reports of V. Thomas Rhyne and Irving Rappaport As To Opinions on Microsoft's Alleged "Intent" Underlying Allegations Of Inducement and Willfulness filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Exhibit A.4)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 13, 2009 Filing 206 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 184 SEALED MOTION to Strike Untimely "Supplemental" Reports of Rhyne and Gilbane filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of John C. Campbell, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 13, 2009 Filing 205 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 195 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Michael J. Wagner filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Exhibit A.4, # 6 Exhibit A.5, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit B.1, # 9 Exhibit B.2, # 10 Exhibit B.3, # 11 Exhibit B.4, # 12 Exhibit B.5, # 13 Exhibit B.6, # 14 Exhibit B.7, # 15 Exhibit B.8, # 16 Exhibit B.9, # 17 Exhibit B.10, # 18 Exhibit B.11, # 19 Exhibit B.12, # 20 Exhibit B.13, # 21 Exhibit B.14, # 22 Exhibit B.15, # 23 Exhibit B.16, # 24 Exhibit B.17, # 25 Exhibit B.18)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 13, 2009 Filing 204 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 192 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Daubert Motion and Motion to Strike The December 8, 2008 Expert Report of Frank Gilbane filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 13, 2009 Filing 203 RESPONSE in Opposition re 189 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by Excel filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 5, 2009 Filing 202 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas A Cawley on behalf of i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. (Cawley, Douglas)
February 5, 2009 Filing 201 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mike McKool, Jr on behalf of i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. (McKool, Mike)
February 4, 2009 Filing 200 MOTION for Leave to File Microsoft's Opposed Motion for Leave to Supplement the Rebuttal Expert Report of George H. Gerstman on Willful Infringement In Light Of The Recent Grant Of Reexamination Of the Patent-In_Suit by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit B1, # 4 Exhibit B2, # 5 Exhibit B3, # 6 Exhibit B4, # 7 Exhibit B5, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting 197 Motion to Amend/Correct. Pltfs are granted leave to file their Amended Motion for Partial Summary Judgment that the '449 Patent Is Not Invalid Based on a Purported Sale in the United States of a Software Product Named Waterloo Rita in 1989. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/04/09. cc:attys 2-4-09 (mll, )
February 3, 2009 Filing 198 Amended SEALED PATENT MOTION AMENDED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE '449 PATENT IS NOT INVALID BASED ON A PURPORTED SALE IN THE UNITED STATES OF A SOFTWARE PRODUCT NAMED WATERLOO RITA IN 1989 by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 3, 2009 Filing 197 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 186 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE '449 PATENT IS NOT INVALID BASED ON A PURPORTED SALE IN THE UNITED STATES OF A SOFTWARE PRODUCT NAMED WATERLOO RITA IN 1989 by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 2, 2009 Filing 196 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amber Hatfield Rovner on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Rovner, Amber)
February 2, 2009 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding 185 Sealed Document submitted by Microsoft Corporation. Document is filed using the incorrect event code. Correction should be made by Feb. 3, 2009. (mjc )
February 2, 2009 Filing 195 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Michael J. Wagner by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Paul Torchia, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
February 2, 2009 Filing 194 ***CORRECTED ENTRY. REPLACES DOCUMENT 187 .*** SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Daubert Motion and Motion To Strike Survey Evidence And Report Of William E. Wecker And Corresponding Portions of Reports And Testimony By Michael Wagner by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A1, # 3 Errata A2, # 4 Exhibit A3, # 5 Exhibit A4, # 6 Exhibit A5, # 7 Exhibit A6, # 8 Exhibit A7, # 9 Exhibit A8, # 10 Exhibit A9, # 11 Exhibit A10, # 12 Exhibit B, # 13 Exhibit B1, # 14 Exhibit C, # 15 Exhibit C1, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin) Modified on 2/2/2009 (mjc ).
February 2, 2009 Filing 193 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Daubert Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Reports of V. Thomas Rhyne and Irving Rappaport As To Opinions on Microsoft's Alleged "Intent" Underlying Allegations Of Inducement and Willfulness by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A1, # 3 Exhibit A2, # 4 Exhibit A3, # 5 Exhibit A4, # 6 Exhibit A5, # 7 Exhibit A6, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
February 2, 2009 Filing 192 SEALED MOTION Microsoft's Daubert Motion and Motion to Strike The December 8, 2008 Expert Report of Frank Gilbane by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A1, # 3 Exhibit A2, # 4 Exhibit A3, # 5 Exhibit A4, # 6 Exhibit A5, # 7 Exhibit A6, # 8 Exhibit A7, # 9 Exhibit A8, # 10 Exhibit A9, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
February 2, 2009 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding 183 Sealed Document submitted by Microsoft Corporation. Document was filed using the incorrect event code. Correction should be made by Feb. 3, 2009. (mjc )
February 2, 2009 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding document 182 , Sealed Document, submitted by Microsoft Corporation. Document was filed using incorrect event code. Correction should be made by Feb. 3, 2009. (mjc )
January 30, 2009 Filing 191 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORT OF MICROSOFT'S INVALIDITY EXPERT, STEPHEN GRAY, THAT ARE BASED ON UNCORROBORATED TESTIMONY by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 30, 2009 Filing 190 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANT MICROSOFT CORPORATION'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF LACHES AND EQUITABLE ESTOPPEL by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jennifer L. Henry, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37, # 39 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 30, 2009 Filing 189 MOTION for Summary Judgment Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by Excel by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Amber H. Rovner in Support of MSJ, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Powers, Matthew)
January 30, 2009 Filing 188 SEALED PATENT MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORTS OF MICROSOFT'S NONINFRINGEMENT EXPERT, STEPHEN GRAY, AND DAMAGES EXPERT, KEITH UGONE, REGARDING ALTERNATIVE NON-INFRINGING DESIGNS by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 30, 2009 Filing 187 ***PLEASE IGNORE. TO BE REDOCKETED USING CORRECT EVENT CODE.***Sealed Document.Microsoft's Daubert Motion And Motion To Strike Survey Evidence And Report of William E. Wecker And Corresponding Portions Of Reports And Testimony By Michael Wagner (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A.1, # 3 Exhibit A.2, # 4 Exhibit A.3, # 5 Errata A.4, # 6 Exhibit A.5, # 7 Exhibit A.6, # 8 Exhibit A.7, # 9 Exhibit A.8, # 10 Exhibit A.9, # 11 Exhibit A.10, # 12 Exhibit B, # 13 Exhibit B.1, # 14 Exhibit C, # 15 Exhibit C.1, # 16 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin) Modified on 2/2/2009 (mjc ).
January 30, 2009 Filing 186 SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT THAT THE '449 PATENT IS NOT INVALID BASED ON A PURPORTED SALE IN THE UNITED STATES OF A SOFTWARE PRODUCT NAMED WATERLOO RITA IN 1989 by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 30, 2009 Filing 185 ***PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED USING CORRECT EVENT CODE.***Sealed Document.Microsoft's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Michael J. Wagner (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Paul Torchia, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin) Modified on 2/2/2009 (mjc ).
January 30, 2009 Filing 184 SEALED MOTION to Strike Untimely "Supplemental" Reports of Rhyne and Gilbane by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Amber H. Rovner in Support of Motion to Strike Untimely "Supplemental" Reports, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhbit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Powers, Matthew)
January 30, 2009 Filing 183 ***PLEASE IGNORE. TO BE REFILED USING CORRECT EVENT CODE.***Sealed Document.Microsoft's Daubert Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of Reports of V. Thomas Rhyne and Irving Rappaport As To Opinions on Microsoft's Alledged "Intent" Underlying Allegations Of Inducement and Willfulness (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A1, # 3 Exhibit A2, # 4 Exhibit A3, # 5 Exhibit A4, # 6 Exhibit A5, # 7 Exhibit A6, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin) Modified on 2/2/2009 (mjc ).
January 30, 2009 Filing 182 ***PLEASE IGNORE. TO BE REFILED USING CORRECT EVENT CODE.***Sealed Document.Microsoft's Daubert Motion and Motion to Strike The December 8, 2008 Expert Report of Frank Gilbane (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit A1, # 3 Exhibit A2, # 4 Exhibit A3, # 5 Exhibit A4, # 6 Exhibit A5, # 7 Exhibit A6, # 8 Exhibit A7, # 9 Exhibit A8, # 10 Exhibit A9, # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin) Modified on 2/2/2009 (mjc ).
January 29, 2009 Filing 181 AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFFS' SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Microsoft Corporation, filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 29, 2009 Filing 180 Opposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 105 Amended Complaint PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THEIR SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT ADDING A CLAIM FOR CONTRIBUTORY INFRINGEMENT AND TO SERVE A SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT IN LIGHT OF THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT'S HOLDING IN RICOH CO., LTD. V. QUANTA COMPUTER INC. by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting 178 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Parties shall be allowed to take the deposition of Microsoft's testifying expert George Gerstman at a mutually agreeable time and place no later than Friday, 2-06-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/27/09. cc:attys 1-27-09(mll, )
January 26, 2009 Filing 178 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery AGREED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE THE DEPOSITION OF EXPERT GEORGE GERSTMAN AFTER THE CLOSE OF EXPERT DISCOVERY by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 26, 2009 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 177, Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. PLEASE IGNORE. TO BE REFILED IN SEARCHABLE PDF FORMAT.*** (mjc )
January 23, 2009 Filing 177 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery AGREED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE THE DEPOSITION OF EXPERT GEORGE GERSTMAN AFTER THE CLOSE OF EXPERT DISCOVERY by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 1/26/2009 (mjc ).
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting 153 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Pltfs are granted leave to identify a third party for one deposition. Pltfs are to complete the one deposition at the earliest possible time. The Court hereby cancels the hearing in this case set for 1-21-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/21/09. cc:attys 1-21-09 (mll, )
January 20, 2009 Filing 175 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Notice of Change of Contact Information (Findlay, Eric)
January 20, 2009 Filing 174 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership re 139 SEALED PATENT MOTION COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND COMPLETE SOURCE CODE FOR THE ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION, 170 SEALED MOTION Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Compel for In Camera Review and Production To Microsoft Documents Withheld As Privileged, 128 SEALED MOTION Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Compel Production of Documents, 172 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,,, 153 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO COMPLETE THIRD PARTY DISCOVERY AFTER THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY JOINT NOTICE REGARDING PENDING MOTIONS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 20, 2009 Filing 173 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Lee Burgess on behalf of i4i Limited Partnership (Burgess, Kevin)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER Re-Setting Hearing on Motion and for counsel to meet and confer by 1/16/2009 in an effort to resolve the disputes without Court intervention. The Court reschedules the hearing on 153 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO COMPLETE THIRD PARTY DISCOVERY AFTER THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY, 139 SEALED PATENT MOTION COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND COMPLETE SOURCE CODE FOR THE ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION, 128 SEALED MOTION Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Compel Production of Documents, 170 SEALED MOTION Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Compel for In Camera Review and Production To Microsoft Documents Withheld As Privileged. Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/13/09. (mjc )
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER that pltf i4i respond re 170 SEALED MOTION Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Compel for In Camera Review and Production To Microsoft Documents Withheld As Privileged filed by Microsoft Corporation; that pltf respond by 9:00 a.m., 1-20-09. The Court will hear this motion at the 9:30 a.m. hearing on 1-21-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/12/09. cc:attys 1-12-09(mll, )
January 12, 2009 E-NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 153 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO COMPLETE THIRD PARTY DISCOVERY AFTER THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY, 139 SEALED PATENT MOTION COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND COMPLETE SOURCE CODE FOR THE ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION, 128 SEALED MOTION Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Compel Production of Documents : MOTION HEARING SET for 1/21/2009 at 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (rlf, )
January 8, 2009 Filing 170 SEALED MOTION Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Compel for In Camera Review and Production To Microsoft Documents Withheld As Privileged by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Steven Kalogeras, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13a, # 15 Exhibit 13b, # 16 Exhibit 13c, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting 168 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order as stated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/23/08. (mjc)
December 22, 2008 Filing 168 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 143 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting 166 Motion to Withdraw 155 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of SQM Reports and Designation of Rule 30(B)(6) WitnessesOpposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of SQM Reports and Designation of Rule 30(B)(6) WitnessesOpposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of SQM Reports and Designation of Rule 30(B)(6) WitnessesOpposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of SQM Reports and Designation of Rule 30(B)(6) Witnesses. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/22/2008. (kls, )
December 19, 2008 Filing 166 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 155 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of SQM Reports and Designation of Rule 30(B)(6) WitnessesOpposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of SQM Reports and Designation of Rule 30(B)(6) WitnessesOpposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of SQM Reports and Designation of Rule 30(B)(6) WitnessesOpposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of SQM Reports and Designation of Rule 30(B)(6) Witnesses by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Jeffrey)
December 19, 2008 Filing 165 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite CONSIDERATION OF THEIR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO COMPLETE THIRD PARTY DISCOVERY AFTER THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 19, 2008 Filing 164 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 153 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO COMPLETE THIRD PARTY DISCOVERY AFTER THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Gretchen K. Harting, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30)(Carter, Jeffrey)
December 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting 160 Sealed Motion for Leave to Supplement and Amend deft's P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions. Deft is hereby granted leave to amend its P.R. 3-3 invalidity contentions with the supplemental and amended invalidity contentions attached to the motion as Exhibits A - E. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/08/08. cc:attys 12-09-08 (mll, )
December 8, 2008 Filing 162 SEALED Microsoft Corporation's Opposition In Response to Plaintiff's Opposed Motion For Leave To Complete Third Party Discovery After The Close Of Fact Discovery re 153 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO COMPLETE THIRD PARTY DISCOVERY AFTER THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Steve Kalogeras, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19)(Kudlac, Kevin)
December 8, 2008 Filing 161 SEALED Microsoft Corporation's Opposition in Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Microsoft to Generate SQM Reports and To Produce a Rule 30(b)(6) Witness re 155 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of SQM Reports and Designation of Rule 30(B)(6) WitnessesOpposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of SQM Reports and Designation of Rule 30(B)(6) WitnessesOpposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of SQM Reports and Designation of Rule 30(B)(6) WitnessesOpposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of SQM Reports and Designation of Rule 30(B)(6) Witnesses filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Paul Torchia, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Errata 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Kudlac, Kevin)
December 5, 2008 Filing 160 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Leave to Supplement and Amend Defendant's P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
December 3, 2008 Filing 159 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Lynn Henry on behalf of i4i Limited Partnership (Henry, Jennifer)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting 152 Agreed Motion for Leave to Take Depositions After the Close of Fact Discovery. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall be allowed to take the deposition of third party Liam Quin and the Rule 30(b)(6) depositions of Microsoft's corporate designees on Topics 5 and 19 of i4i's Third Notice of Deposition of Microsoft at a mutually agreeable time and place. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/24/2008. (kls, )
November 24, 2008 Filing 156 ***REPLACES #154***SEALED Notice of Erratum - Microsoft Corporation's Opposition in RESPONSE to Plaintiff's Motion to Comple re 139 SEALED PATENT MOTION COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND COMPLETE SOURCE CODE FOR THE ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kudlac, Kevin) Modified on 11/24/2008 (mpv, ).
November 24, 2008 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding 154 the SEALED Notice of Erratum - Microsoft Corporation's Opposition In Response To Plaintiff's Motion to Compel re 139 SEALED PATENT MOTION COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND COMPLETE SOURCE CODE FOR THE ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION filed by Microsoft Corporation submitted Document does not contain a Certificate of Service or a Certificate of Authorization to file under seal. Attorney to correct and refile. Correction should be made by one business day. (mpv, )
November 21, 2008 Filing 155 ***WITHDRAWN BY ORDER # 167 *** Opposed SEALED MOTION to Compel Production of SQM Reports and Designation of Rule 30(B)(6) Witnesses by Infrastructures for Information, Inc., i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Text of Proposed Order)(Carter, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/22/2008 (kls, ).
November 21, 2008 Filing 154 ***FILED IN ERROR; PLEASE IGNORE***SEALED Notice of Erratum - Microsoft Corporation's Opposition In Response To Plaintiff's Motion to Compel re 139 SEALED PATENT MOTION COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND COMPLETE SOURCE CODE FOR THE ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kudlac, Kevin) Modified on 11/24/2008 (mpv, ).
November 21, 2008 Filing 153 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO COMPLETE THIRD PARTY DISCOVERY AFTER THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 21, 2008 Filing 152 Agreed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO TAKE DEPOSITIONS AFTER THE CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 20, 2008 Filing 151 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT AND AMEND THEIR P.R. 3-1 INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
November 10, 2008 Filing 150 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership re 149 Order,, PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH COURT ORDER DOCKET NO. 149 FOR IN CAMERA INSPECTION (Baxter, Samuel)
November 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER that pltf produce, for in camera inspection, all communications and documents shared among i4i Inc/i4i LP and McLean Watson Capital and Northwater Capital Management put at issue by Microsoft's motion to compel 128 . The Court also orders pltf to produce, for in camera inspection, the recalled reports dated 10-13-2004 and 10-25-2004, and the recalled email dated 9-12-2005 put at issue by Microsoft's motion to compel 128 . The materials must be submitted by Friday, 11-07-08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/03/08. cc:attys 11-03-08(mll, )
October 24, 2008 Filing 148 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 139 SEALED PATENT MOTION COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND COMPLETE SOURCE CODE FOR THE ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Baxter, Samuel)
October 22, 2008 Filing 147 ***CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL FOR Document 146 , Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion.*** (mjc )
October 20, 2008 Filing 146 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 139 SEALED PATENT MOTION COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND COMPLETE SOURCE CODE FOR THE ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Steven Kalogeras, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2008: # 14 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal) (mjc, ).
October 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting 144 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 139 SEALED PATENT MOTION COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND COMPLETE SOURCE CODE FOR THE ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION; Response due by 10/20/2008. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/16/08. cc:attys 10-16-08 (mll, )
October 15, 2008 Filing 144 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 139 SEALED PATENT MOTION COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND COMPLETE SOURCE CODE FOR THE ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
October 15, 2008 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines per 143 Order: Amended Pleadings due by 6/26/2008; Respond to Amended Pleadings by 7-10-08. Fact Discovery due by 11/21/2008; Expert Discovery deadline 1-21-09. Expert Witness List due by 12/8/2008; Rebuttal Expert Witnesses identified by 01-12-09. Identify trial witnesses by 2/20/2009; Identify Rebuttal Trial Witnesses by 3-6-09. Jury instructions due by 3/23/2009. Early Mediation Completion due by 4/18/2008. Dispositive Motions due by 1/28/2009; Responses to Dispositive Motions due 2-12-09. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/23/2009. Motions in Limine due 3-20-09. Pretrial disclosures due 2-20-09. Jury Selection set for 4/7/2009 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 4/13/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Expected Length of Trial is 5 days. (mll, )
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting 142 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/15/08. cc:attys 10-15-08 (mll, )
October 14, 2008 Filing 142 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 125 Scheduling Order,,, Set Hearings,, by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting 140 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/02/08. cc:attys 10-2-08 (mll, )
October 1, 2008 Filing 140 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS FOR THEIR MOTION TO COMPEL THE PRODUCTIONOF DOCUMENTS AND COMPLETE SOURCE CODE FOR THE ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 1, 2008 Filing 139 SEALED PATENT MOTION COMPEL THE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND COMPLETE SOURCE CODE FOR THE ACCUSED INSTRUMENTALITIES AND REQUEST FOR EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Jill Lynch, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y, # 27 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel, # 28 Text of Proposed Order Granting Request for Expedited Consideration)(Baxter, Samuel)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 136 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney David J Healey terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/26/08. cc:attys 9-26-08(mll, )
September 26, 2008 Filing 137 NOTICE re disputes as to claims of privileged documents by Microsoft Corporation (mll, )
September 25, 2008 Filing 136 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney David J. Healey by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
September 25, 2008 Filing 135 NOTICE of Disclosure by i4i Limited Partnership (Baxter, Samuel)
September 11, 2008 Filing 134 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re 128 SEALED MOTION Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit L, # 3 Exhibit M, # 4 Exhibit N, # 5 Exhibit O)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 29, 2008 Filing 133 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 128 SEALED MOTION Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Lucy Muzzy in Support of Microsoft's Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 23, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 24, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 25, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 26)(Kudlac, Kevin)
August 18, 2008 Filing 132 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 128 SEALED MOTION Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Compel Production of Documents filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 14, 2008 Filing 131 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd S Patterson on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Patterson, Todd)
August 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting 129 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 128 SEALED MOTION Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Compel Production of Documents; Responses due by 8/18/2008. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/13/08. cc:attys 8-13-08 (mll, )
August 12, 2008 Filing 129 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 128 SEALED MOTION Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 28, 2008 Filing 128 SEALED MOTION Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Lucy Muzzy, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
July 28, 2008 Filing 127 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jill Frances Lynch on behalf of i4i Limited Partnership (Lynch, Jill)
July 25, 2008 Filing 126 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas Guy Fasone, III on behalf of i4i Limited Partnership (Fasone, Thomas)
July 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 125 AGREED SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Identify trial witnesses by 2/20/2009, Jury instructions due by 3/23/2009, Mediation Completion due by 4/18/2008, Proposed Findings of Fact due by 3/23/2009, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/23/2009. Jury Trial set for 4/13/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Selection set for 4/7/2009 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/7/08. (mjc )
July 3, 2008 Filing 124 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership re 107 Scheduling Order,,, Set Hearings,, JOINT NOTICE REGARDING MARKMAN HEARING AND AGREED AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 2, 2008 Filing 123 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isabella Fu on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Fu, Isabella)
July 2, 2008 Filing 122 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Douglas Powers on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Powers, Matthew)
June 16, 2008 Filing 121 ANSWER to 119 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by i4i Limited Partnership.(Baxter, Samuel)
May 30, 2008 Filing 120 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation of Compliance (Kudlac, Kevin)
May 30, 2008 Filing 119 Microsoft Corporation's First Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. by Microsoft Corporation.(Healey, David)
May 2, 2008 TRANSCRIPT of Markman Hearing proceedings held on 2/28/08 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan. See 103 . 117 pages.shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov (sms, )
May 1, 2008 Filing 117 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Infrastructures for Information, Inc. NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL PATENT RULES 3-1 AND 3-2 (Baxter, Samuel)
April 28, 2008 Filing 116 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Infrastructures for Information, Inc., i4i Limited Partnership.(Baxter, Samuel)
April 22, 2008 Filing 115 REPORT of Mediation by James W. Knowles. Mediation result: SUSPENDED(Knowles, James)
April 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 114 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Discovery due by 10/24/2008. Jury Selection set for 4/7/2009 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Amended Pleadings due by 12/19/2008. Expert Witness List due by 11/7/2008. Jury instructions due by 3/23/2009. Mediation Completion due by 4/18/2008. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/23/2009. Jury Trial set for 4/13/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 8/28/2008 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/15/08. (mjc )
April 14, 2008 Filing 113 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 107 Scheduling Order,,, Set Hearings,, by i4i Limited Partnership, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
April 11, 2008 Filing 112 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Bruce Campbell, Jr on behalf of i4i Limited Partnership (Campbell, John)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 83 Motion for PARTIAL Summary Judgment of Invalidity of Claims 1-13 of the '449 patent for Indefiniteness Under 35 U.S.C. 112. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/10/2008. (rvw, )
April 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying as moot 108 Motion for Leave to Supplement the Record in Microsoft's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Invalidity. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/7/08. (mjc)
April 7, 2008 Filing 109 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against all plaintiffs by Microsoft Corporation.(Kudlac, Kevin)
April 4, 2008 Filing 108 MOTION for Leave to File MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD IN MICROSOFTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF INVALIDITY OF CLAIMS 1-13 OF U.S. PATENT 5,787,449 FOR INDEFINITENESS WITH A RECENT DECISION FROM THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
April 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Discovery due by 10/24/2008. Jury Selection set for 4/7/2009 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis.Amended Pleadings due by 12/19/2008. Expert Witness List due by 11/7/2008. Identify trial witnesses by 2/20/2009. Jury instructions due by 3/23/2009. Mediation Completion due by 4/18/2008. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/23/2009. Jury Trial set for 4/13/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 8/28/2008 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/2/08. (mjc )
March 20, 2008 Filing 106 NOTICE by Infrastructures for Information, Inc., i4i Limited Partnership, Microsoft Corporation NOTICE OF AGREED AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
March 12, 2008 Filing 105 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Microsoft Corporation, filed by Infrastructures for Information, Inc., i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Baxter, Samuel)
March 5, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 4/13/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (mjc )
March 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 99 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 21 Scheduling Order, JOINT MOTION TO AMEND THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND RELATED RELIEF re Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 21 Scheduling Order, JOINT MOTION TO AMEND THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND RELATED RELIEF filed by i4i Limited Partnership, Microsoft Corporation, granting 46 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD ADDITIONAL ACCUSED PRODUCTS re Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD ADDITIONAL ACCUSED PRODUCTS filed by i4i Limited Partnership. The Court resets Final Pretrial Conference for 3/26/2009 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis, Jury Selection set for 4/7/2009 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis and Jury Trial is set for 4/13/2009 before Judge Leonard Davis. Parties to submit amended docket control order within 15 days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/5/08. (mjc )
February 28, 2008 Filing 103 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis : Markman Hearing held on 2/28/2008; Motion Hearing held on 2/28/2008 re 46 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD ADDITIONAL ACCUSED PRODUCTSConsent MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD ADDITIONAL ACCUSED PRODUCTS filed by i4i Limited Partnership, 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment Microsoft Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Of Invalidity of Claims 1-13 of U.S. Patent 5,787,449 For Indefiniteness filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, )
February 26, 2008 Filing 102 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Microsoft Corporation SECOND AMENDED JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PRE-HEARING STATEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 99 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 21 Scheduling Order, Set Hearings, JOINT MOTION TO AMEND THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND RELATED RELIEF: Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2008 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/26/08. (mjc )
February 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting 97 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Joint Claim Construction and Pre-Hearing Statement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/26/08. (mjc )
February 26, 2008 Filing 99 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 21 Scheduling Order,, Set Hearings, JOINT MOTION TO AMEND THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND RELATED RELIEF by i4i Limited Partnership, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 26, 2008 Filing 98 REPLY to Response to Motion re 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment Microsoft Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Of Invalidity of Claims 1-13 of U.S. Patent 5,787,449 For Indefiniteness filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Kudlac, Kevin)
February 26, 2008 Filing 97 Consent MOTION for Leave to File UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PRE-HEARING STATEMENT by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 22, 2008 Filing 96 RESPONSE in Opposition re 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment Microsoft Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Of Invalidity of Claims 1-13 of U.S. Patent 5,787,449 For Indefiniteness filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 46 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD ADDITIONAL ACCUSED PRODUCTS: Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2008 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/22/08. cc:attys 2-22-08(mll, )
February 19, 2008 Filing 94 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership NOTICE OF FILING OF P.R. 4-5(d) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 14, 2008 Filing 93 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership i4i LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Baxter, Samuel)
February 14, 2008 Filing 92 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Microsoft Corporation JOINT NOTICE OF ESTIMATED TIME REQUESTED FOR THE MARKMAN HEARING (Baxter, Samuel)
February 14, 2008 Filing 91 REPLY CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 14, 2008 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment Microsoft Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Of Invalidity of Claims 1-13 of U.S. Patent 5,787,449 For Indefiniteness : Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2008 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (rlf, )
February 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 88 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (up to 20 total) in i4i's Reply Brief on Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/13/08. (mjc )
February 12, 2008 Filing 89 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gretchen Kristen Harting on behalf of i4i Limited Partnership (Harting, Gretchen)
February 12, 2008 Filing 88 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED THE PAGE LIMIT IN i4i LIMITED PARTNERSHIP'S REPLY BRIEF ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
February 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 82 Motion for Extension of Time to Exchange Privilege Logs. Deadline is extended to 2/27/2008. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/8/08. (mjc )
February 8, 2008 Filing 86 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation Notice of Compliance (Kudlac, Kevin)
February 7, 2008 Filing 85 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Cabrach Connor# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H)(Kudlac, Kevin)
February 7, 2008 Filing 84 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE (Baxter, Samuel)
February 7, 2008 Filing 83 MOTION for Summary Judgment Microsoft Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Of Invalidity of Claims 1-13 of U.S. Patent 5,787,449 For Indefiniteness by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kudlac, Kevin)
February 7, 2008 Filing 82 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Extend the Deadline To Exchange Privilege Logs by i4i Limited Partnership, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Deadline)(Healey, David)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER appointing Gale R. Peterson as technical advisor in this case re 79 Notice of Agreed Upon Technical Advisor filed by i4i Limited Partnership, 80 Notice of Additional Information on Agreed Upon Technical Advisor filed by i4i Limited Partnership. Peterson's costs are to be assessed equally between parties and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 2/6/08. (mjc)
February 5, 2008 Filing 80 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership ADDITIONAL NOTIFICATION REGARDING THE AGREED UPON TECHNICAL ADVISOR (Baxter, Samuel)
January 30, 2008 Filing 79 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership NOTIFICATION OF AN AGREED UPON TECHNICAL ADVISOR (Baxter, Samuel)
January 24, 2008 Filing 78 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 76 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages on Claim Construction Opening and Responsive Briefing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/24/08. (mjc)
January 24, 2008 Filing 76 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION OPENING AND RESPONSIVE BRIEFING by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 23, 2008 Filing 75 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Microsoft Corporation re 60 Notice (Other) AMENDED JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PRE-HEARING STATEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 23, 2008 Filing 74 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership re 69 Order, OBJECTION OF i4i LIMITED PARTNERSHIP TO PROPOSED TECHNICAL ADVISOR (Baxter, Samuel)
January 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 71 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Joint Claim Construction and Pre-Hearing Statement. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/23/08. (mjc )
January 22, 2008 Filing 72 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 71 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 60 Notice (Other) UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PRE-HEARING STATEMENT.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 22, 2008 Filing 71 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 60 Notice (Other) UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PRE-HEARING STATEMENT by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 68 Amended Motion for Extension of Time to 1/22/08 for i4i and Microsoft to provide the court with their tutorials. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/16/08. (mjc )
January 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER for the parties to file by 1/23/08 any objections they have to Lou Brucculeri being appointed technical advisor. If either party objects, they are to submit the name of at least one agreed technical advisor by 1/30/08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/15/08. (mjc)
January 15, 2008 Filing 68 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 67 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR i4i TO PROVIDE THE COURT WITH ITS TUTORIAL UNOPPOSED AMENDED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR i4i AND MICROSOFT TO PROVIDE THE COURT WITH THEIR TUTORIALS by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 15, 2008 Filing 67 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR i4i TO PROVIDE THE COURT WITH ITS TUTORIAL by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
January 11, 2008 Filing 66 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership Response to the Objection of Microsoft to the Technical Advisor (Carter, Jeffrey)
January 11, 2008 Filing 65 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re 63 Order Microsoft Corporation's Objections to Technical Advisor (Kudlac, Kevin)
January 7, 2008 E-NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 10/13/2008 @ 9:00 HAS BEEN CONTINUED and JURY TRIAL RESET to 10/14/2008 @ 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (NOTE: JURY SELECTION OF 10/6/2008 WILL REMAIN THE SAME)(rlf, )
January 4, 2008 Filing 64 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Cabrach J Connor for Microsoft Corporation. Fee pd., 6-1-12314. Approved 1/7/08. (mjc )
January 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDERS the parties to file any objections they may have to Mr. McLemore in five business days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/4/08. (fnt, )
January 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 61 Motion for Extension of Time. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline set in the Court's Order of November 13, 2007 is extended as follows: 1. The deadline for claim construction discovery is extended from January 10, 2008 to January 16, 2007. 2. The deadline to exchange privilege logs (other than pertaining to willful infringement) is extended from January 15, 2008 to February 8, 2008. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/3/08. (fnt, )
January 2, 2008 Filing 61 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Motion to Extend the Deadline to Exchange Privilege Logs by i4i Limited Partnership, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Date to Exchange)(Kudlac, Kevin)
December 28, 2007 Filing 60 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership, Microsoft Corporation JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PRE-HEARING STATEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 56 Motion to Amend/Correct Meidation Date to 3/6/2008. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/21/07. (mjc )
December 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 55 Motion for Extension of Time to File PR 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement. Deadline is extended to 12/28/07. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/21/07. (mjc )
December 20, 2007 Filing 57 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership TECHNICAL ADVISOR NOTIFICATION (Baxter, Samuel)
December 20, 2007 Filing 56 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 42 Order Referring Case to Mediator by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 20, 2007 Filing 55 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE P.R. 4-3 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
December 13, 2007 Filing 54 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Lucy Muzzy for Microsoft Corporation. Fee pd., 6-1-12113. Approved 12/13/07. (mjc )
December 13, 2007 Filing 53 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David Jason Lender for Microsoft Corporation. Fee pd., 6-1-12113. Approved 12/13/2007. (mjc )
December 11, 2007 Filing 52 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corporation P.R. 4-2 Preliminary Claim Constructions (Kudlac, Kevin)
December 10, 2007 Filing 51 NOTICE of Disclosure by i4i Limited Partnership (Baxter, Samuel)
December 10, 2007 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re 46 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD ADDITIONAL ACCUSED PRODUCTSConsent MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD ADDITIONAL ACCUSED PRODUCTS filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Baxter, Samuel)
November 30, 2007 Filing 49 RESPONSE to Motion re 46 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD ADDITIONAL ACCUSED PRODUCTSConsent MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD ADDITIONAL ACCUSED PRODUCTS filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6)(Healey, David)
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with PR 4-2. The deadline is extended from 12/3/2007 to 12/10/2007. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/07. (mjc )
November 27, 2007 Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Related to P.R. 4-2 Deadlines by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
November 15, 2007 Filing 46 MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD ADDITIONAL ACCUSED PRODUCTS by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel) Modified on 11/15/2007 (sm, ).
November 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 44 Motion to Amend/Correct Deadlines to Comply with PR 4-2 and PR 4-3. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/13/07. (mjc )
November 9, 2007 Filing 44 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct 21 Scheduling Order,, Set Hearings, Agreed Motion to Extend The Deadlines To Comply With P.R. 4-2 and P.R. 4-3 by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
October 24, 2007 Filing 43 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul E Torchia for Microsoft Corporation. Fee pd., 6-1-11498. Approved 10/25/07. (mjc ) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/25/2007 (mjc, ).
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. James W. Knowles rep by James W Knowles added as Mediator. Mediation completion deadline is 2/14/08. Mediation packet is attached. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/18/07. (mjc )
October 12, 2007 Filing 41 ANSWER to Counterclaim by i4i Limited Partnership.(Baxter, Samuel)
September 28, 2007 Filing 40 NOTICE of Disclosure by i4i Limited Partnership (Baxter, Samuel)
September 28, 2007 Filing 39 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corporation of P.R. 4-1 (Kudlac, Kevin)
September 18, 2007 Filing 38 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corporation of P.R. 3-3 Invalidity Contentions and P.R. 3-4 document production (Kudlac, Kevin)
September 18, 2007 Filing 37 Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand for Patent Infringement, COUNTERCLAIM against i4i Limited Partnership by Microsoft Corporation.(Kudlac, Kevin)
September 18, 2007 Filing 36 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership Notice of Compliance with Paragraph 2(B) and (C) of the Discovery Order (Baxter, Samuel)
September 12, 2007 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Thompson Gorham on behalf of i4i Limited Partnership (Gorham, Andrew)
September 12, 2007 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M Parker on behalf of i4i Limited Partnership (Parker, Robert)
September 12, 2007 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Ainsworth on behalf of i4i Limited Partnership (Ainsworth, Charles)
September 12, 2007 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of i4i Limited Partnership (Bunt, Robert)
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 29 Motion to Amend/Correct Discovery Order. Order that the date for complying with paragraph 2 of the discovery order is moved to 9/18/2007. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/11/2007. (rvw, )
September 10, 2007 Filing 30 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PARAGRAPH 2(D) OF THE DISCOVERY ORDER (Baxter, Samuel)
September 10, 2007 Filing 29 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 22 Order by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxter, Samuel)
August 27, 2007 Filing 28 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PARAGRAPH 1 OF THE DISCOVERY ORDER (Baxter, Samuel)
August 24, 2007 Filing 27 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corporation of Initial Disclosures (Kudlac, Kevin)
August 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/7/07. (kjr, )
August 6, 2007 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by i4i Limited Partnership identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Baxter, Samuel)
August 6, 2007 Filing 24 NOTICE of Disclosure by i4i Limited Partnership (Baxter, Samuel)
August 3, 2007 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Agreed Protective Order)(Carter, Jeffrey)
July 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DISCOVERY ORDER entered in furtherance of the management of the Court's docket under FRCP 16. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/25/07. (mjc )
July 25, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 10/13/2008 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 2/28/2008 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (mjc )
July 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2008 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Amended Pleadings due by 6/13/2008. Identify trial witnesses by 8/1/2008. Jury instructions due by 8/8/2008. Jury Selection set for 10/6/2008 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Mediation Completion due by 2/14/2008. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/8/2008. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/25/07. (mjc )
July 23, 2007 Filing 20 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey A Carter on behalf of i4i Limited Partnership (Carter, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/23/2007 (fnt, ).
July 23, 2007 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Gordon White on behalf of i4i Limited Partnership (White, Travis)
July 23, 2007 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Gordon White on behalf of i4i Limited Partnership (White, Travis)
July 20, 2007 Filing 17 NOTICE by i4i Limited Partnership JOINT NOTICE OF CONFERENCE REGARDING PROPOSED DISCOVERY ORDER, DOCKET CONTROL ORDER AND PROTECTIVE ORDER (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B.1# 3 Exhibit B.2)(Baxter, Samuel)
July 20, 2007 E-NOTICE of Hearing: The Time for Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2007 at 2:30 PM HAS BEEN CHANGED TO 7/25/2007 at 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. (NOTE: ONLY TIME HAS CHANGED - HEARING IS SCHEDULED ON SAME DATE AS BEFORE) (rlf, )
July 20, 2007 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Findlay, Eric)
July 6, 2007 Filing 15 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 7/25/2007 02:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis in Tyler. Proposed Discovery Order is Appendix A; Proposed Docket Control Order is Appendix B (mjc )
June 14, 2007 Filing 14 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Counterclaim by i4i Limited Partnership.(Baxter, Samuel)
May 25, 2007 Filing 13 ANSWER to Counterclaim by i4i Limited Partnership.(Baxter, Samuel)
May 2, 2007 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against i4i Limited Partnership by Microsoft Corporation.(Healey, David)
April 10, 2007 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erick Scott Robinson on behalf of i4i Limited Partnership (Robinson, Erick)
April 4, 2007 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Norma N Bennett on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Bennett, Norma)
April 2, 2007 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of i4i Limited Partnership (Ward, Thomas)
March 26, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines: Microsoft Corporation answer due 5/2/2007. (mjc )
March 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint Move or Otherwise Respond. Microsoft's answer is due 5/2/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/26/07. (mjc )
March 23, 2007 Filing 7 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by i4i Limited Partnership. Microsoft Corporation served on 3/13/2007, answer due 4/2/2007. (ehs, )
March 23, 2007 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Microsoft Corporation (Healey, David)
March 23, 2007 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint Move or Otherwise Respond by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
March 8, 2007 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by i4i Limited Partnership (Baxter, Samuel)
March 8, 2007 Filing 3 Form mailed to Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks. (mjc)
March 8, 2007 Filing 2 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Microsoft Corporation. (mjc )
March 8, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Microsoft Corporation (Filing fee $ 350 pd., receipt 2-1-2339) , filed by i4i Limited Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Receipt)(mjc )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: i4i Limited Partnership v. Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: i4i Limited Partnership
Represented By: Travis Gordon White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: David J Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: i4i Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?