Digital Reg of Texas, LLC v. Hustler.com et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Digital Reg of Texas, LLC alleged that defendants Hustler.com (a/k/a LFP Internet Group, LLC), LFP, Inc., Microsoft Corp., Apple Inc., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Audible, Inc., Sony Corp. of America, Sony Connect, Inc., Macrovision Corp. and Blockbuster Inc. infringed on U.S. Patent No. 6,389,541 entitled "Regulating Access to Digital Content."

Plaintiff: Digital Reg of Texas, LLC
Defendant: Hustler.com, Microsoft Corp., Apple, Inc., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Audible, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Macrovision Corp, Blockbuster, Inc, Sony Connect, Inc. and LEP, Inc
Case Number: 6:2007cv00467
Filed: October 5, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Presiding Judge: John D. Love
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER granting 367 Motion to Dismiss. Digital Reg's claims for relief against the Sony defendants and the Sony defendants' counterclaims for relief against Digital Reg are dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/18/09. cc:attys 11-18-09 (mll, )
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc., Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER granting 365 Motion to Dismiss. Digital Reg's claims for relief against Microsoft and Microsoft's counterclaims for relief against Digital Reg are dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/17/09. cc:attys 11-17-09 (mll, )
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 365 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER that all deadlines in this case with regard to Digital Reg's claims for relief against Sony and Sony's counterclaims for relief against Digital Reg are stayed pending finalization of a settlement between Digital Reg and Sony. The deadlines as to Digital Reg's claims for relief against the remaining defts remain in full force and effect. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/09/09. cc:attys 11-09-09(mll, )
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER that the parties substantively meet and confer on all limine issues before filing any motions in limine. Motions in limine shall be filed by 1-15-2010, and responses are due by 1-19-2010. The Court also withdraws its general request for any pending motion notebooks or courtesy copies. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/09/09. cc:attys 11-09-09(mll, )
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 362 Joint MOTION to Stay by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc., Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER granting 360 Motion to Dismiss. Digital Reg's claims for relief against Audible and Audible's counterclaims for relief against Digital Reg are dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/05/09. cc:attys 11-05-09 (mll, )
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, Audible, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 359 Revised Trial and Rebuttal Witness List by Audible, Inc.. (Low, John)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 358 Rebuttal Witness List by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Lejeune, Cody)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER granting 355 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 354 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Electronic Media and Request for Hearing; Responses due by 11/20/2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/02/09. cc:attys 11-02-09(mll, )
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER granting 353 Motion to Stay. All deadlines in this case with regard to Digital Reg's claims for relief against Microsoft and Microsoft's counterclaims for relief against Digital Reg are stayed pending finalization of a settlement between Digital Reg and Microsoft. The deadlines as to Digital Reg's claims for relief against the remaining defts remain in full force and effect. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/02/09. cc:attys 11-02-09(mll, )
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 355 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 354 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Electronic Media and Request for Hearing by Audible, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 354 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel Electronic Media and Request for Hearing by Audible, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Low Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 353 Joint MOTION to Stay by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER granting 350 Motion to Dismiss. Digital Reg's claims for relief against Playboy and Playboy's counterclaims for relief against Digital Reg are dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/29/09. cc:attys 10-29-09 (mll, )
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER granting 349 Motion to Dismiss. Digital Reg's claims for relief against Blockbuster and Blockbuster's counterclaims for relief against Digital Reg are dismissed with prejudice. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/29/09. cc:attys 10-29-09 (mll, )
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 350 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, Playboy Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 349 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Blockbuster, Inc, Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 348 NOTICE by Audible, Inc. of Service of Trial Witness List (Heartfield, J)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 347 Trial Witness List by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Dowd, Michael)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER granting 343 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Digital Reg's deadline to Respond to Audible's various discovery motions is extended to 11-13-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/26/09. cc:attys 10-26-09(mll, )
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER granting 340 Motion to Stay. All deadlines in this case with regard to Digital Reg's claims for relief against Playboy and Playboy's counterclaims for relief against Digital Reg are stayed pending finalization of a settlement between Digital Reg and Playboy. Deadlines as to Digital Reg's claims for relief against the remaining defts remain in full force and effect. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/26/09. cc:attys 10-26-09(mll, )
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 344 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Service of Trial Witness List (Findlay, Eric)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 343 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, MOTION to Extend Response Deadline by Audible, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 342 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Limited Extension of Fact Discovery, Motion to Compel Discovery from Digital Reg, and Motion for Leave to Depose Patrick E. Patterson by Audible, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Low Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER granting 337 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order, and extending time for discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/21/09. cc:attys 10-21-09(mll, )
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Joint MOTION to Stay by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, Playboy Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER granting 336 Motion to Stay. All deadlines in this case with regard to Digital Reg's claims for relief against Blockbuster and Blockbuster's counterclaims for relief against Digital Reg are stayed pending finalization of a settlement between Digital Reg and Blockbuster. Deadlines as to Digital Reg's claims for relief against the remaining defts remain in full force and effect. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/20/09. cc:attys 10-20-09(mll, )
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER granting 332 Motion to Dismiss. Digital Reg's claims for relief against LFP Internet Group LLC and LFP's counterclaims for relief against Digital Reg are dismissed with prejuice. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/20/09. cc:attys 10-20-09 (mll, )
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 337 MOTION to Amend/Correct 118 Scheduling Order, Set Hearings,,,, Joint Unopposed Motion for Limited Extension of Discovery Deadlines by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 336 Joint MOTION to Stay by Blockbuster, Inc, Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER GRANTING 333 Unopposed MOTION for Limited Extension of Discovery Deadline filed by Audible, Inc. (Discovery due by 10/19/2009.) Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/16/2009. (gsg)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 334 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Audible, Inc. (Montgomery, M.)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 333 Unopposed MOTION for Limited Extension of Discovery Deadline by Audible, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 332 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, LFP Internet Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER granting 329 Motion to Stay. All deadlines in this case with regard to Digital Reg's claims for relief against LFP and LFP's counterclaims for relief against Digital Reg are stayed pending finalization of a settlement between Digital Reg and LFP. The deadlines as to Digital Reg's claims for relief against the remaining defts remain in full force and effect. All attys' fees, costs of court and expenses shall be borne by each party incurring the same. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/13/09. cc:attys 10-14-09 (mll, )
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 330 NOTICE by Audible, Inc. Notice of Document Subpoena on Patrick E. Patterson (Low, John)
October 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 329 Joint MOTION to Stay by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, LFP Internet Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 327 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Deposition of Walter Bratic (Findlay, Eric)
October 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Layn R. Phillips on 9/30/2009 as to 315 Order Setting Hearing on Motion. (gsg)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting 325 Motion to Withdraw 297 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL, 228 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel and Request for Hearing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/30/09. cc:attys 10-01-09(mll, )
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 325 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw 297 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL, 228 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel and Request for Hearing by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 324 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. OF SERVICE OF THE REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORT OF BRIAN W. NAPPER IN COMPLIANCE WITH FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26(a)(2) AND THE COURTS DOCKET CONTROL ORDER OF MAY 12, 2008 (Findlay, Eric)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 323 NOTICE of Disclosure by Audible, Inc. Joint Notice of Disclosure by Audible, Inc. of the Rebuttal Expert Report of Daniel L. Jackson submitted on behalf of Audible, Inc., LFP Internet Group, LLC, Playboy Enterprises, Inc.,and Blockbuster, Inc. in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) and the Court's Docket Control Order (Low, John)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 322 NOTICE by L.F.P., Inc., LFP Internet Group, LLC of Service of Expert Report (Phillips, Jeffrey)
September 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 321 NOTICE by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC Notice of Service of Rebuttal Expert Report of Nancy Miracle and the Expert Report of Peter Garza Rebutting the Expert Report of Michael L. Younger (Lejeune, Cody)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 320 NOTICE by Blockbuster, Inc of Service of Expert Report William Rosenblatt (McLean, Gentry)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 319 NOTICE by Playboy Enterprises, Inc. of Service of Expert Report of William Rosenblatt (McLean, Gentry)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 318 NOTICE of Disclosure by Audible, Inc. Notice of Defendant Audible, Inc.'s Service of the Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Edward W. Felten in Compliance With Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2) and the Court's Docket Control Order of May 12, 2008 (Low, John)
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 317 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Service of the Rebuttal Expert Report of Dr. Stuart G. Stubblebine in Compliance With Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) and the Court's Docket Control Order of May 12, 2008 (Findlay, Eric)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 316 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael G Gabriel for Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (kls, )
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 228 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel and Request for Hearing, 297 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL: Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2009 10:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/24/2009. (gsg)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 314 NOTICE of Disclosure by L.F.P., Inc., LFP Internet Group, LLC of Expert William R. Rosenblatt (Phillips, Jeffrey)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 313 NOTICE of Disclosure by L.F.P., Inc., LFP Internet Group, LLC of Daniel Jackson as Rebuttal Expert (Phillips, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 312 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney G Paul Howes for Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (kls, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2009: # 1 Exhibit) (mll, ).
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 311 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James S Blackburn for Microsoft Corp. Receipt #6-1-19372. (gsg)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 310 NOTICE of Disclosure by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc. of Daniel L. Jackson As An Expert (Wilcox, Melvin)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ORDER granting re 308 MOTION to Amend/Correct 118 Scheduling Order, Set Hearings, Joint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadlines to Submit Rebuttal Expert Reports, to Complete Discovery, and Additional Deadlines MOTION to Amend/Correct 118 Scheduling Order, Set Hearings, Joint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadlines to Submit Rebuttal Expert Reports, to Complete Discovery, and Additional Deadlines filed by Microsoft Corp.The deadline for Parties to designate rebuttal expert witnesses on issues other than damages issues (non-construction issues) and exchange rebuttal expert witness reports on issues other than damages issues is September 25, 2009. The deadline for Parties to designate rebuttal expert witnesses on damages issues and exchange rebuttal expert witness reports on damages issues is September 28, 2009. The deadline for fact discovery shall be October 14, 2009. The deadline for expert discovery shall be October 30, 2009. The deadline for parties to identify trial witnesses shall be October 26, 2009. The deadline for parties to identify rebuttal trial witnesses shall be November 2, 2009. The deadline for filing of dispositive motions from all parties and any other motions that may require a hearing (including Daubert motions) is November 9, 2009. The deadline for filing the response to dispositive motions (including Daubert motions) is November 23, 2009. The deadline for submitting the Joint Pretrial Order, Joint Proposed JuryInstructions with citation to authority, Form of the Verdict for jury trials,Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law with citation to authority for issues tried to the bench, and Notice of Request for Daily Transcript or Real Time Reporting of Court Proceedings is December 2, 2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/18/2009. (kls, )
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 308 MOTION to Amend/Correct 118 Scheduling Order, Set Hearings,,,, Joint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadlines to Submit Rebuttal Expert Reports, to Complete Discovery, and Additional Deadlines by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 307 NOTICE of Disclosure by Playboy Enterprises, Inc. of Expert William Rosenblatt (McLean, Gentry)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 306 NOTICE of Disclosure by Playboy Enterprises, Inc. of Expert Daniel Jackson (McLean, Gentry)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 305 NOTICE of Disclosure by Blockbuster, Inc of Expert William Rosenblatt (McLean, Gentry)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 304 NOTICE of Disclosure by Blockbuster, Inc of Expert Daniel Jackson (McLean, Gentry)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 303 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 297 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Joseph A. Micallef, # 2 Exhibit O, # 3 Exhibit P, # 4 Exhibit Q, # 5 Exhibit R, # 6 Exhibit S)(Findlay, Eric)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ***ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT TO MAIN DOCUMENT 301 *** NOTICE by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC re 301 Sealed Response to Motion Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal (Mandlekar, Ray) Modified on 9/16/2009 (mjc, ).
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 301 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 297 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Michael G. Gabriel)(Mandlekar, Ray)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 300 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corp. of Service of Expert Disclosure of Mr. Bruce Burton (Findlay, Eric)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 299 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corp. of Service of Expert Disclosure of Ms. Kimberly A. Gray (Findlay, Eric)
September 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER re 297 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Microsoft Corp. Pltf shall file its response and supporting documents by 9-14-2009; deft Microsoft shall file its reply and supporting documents by 9-16-2009. If Microsoft wants a ruling on this Motion prior to its McGuireWoods deposition, Microsoft will need to postpone the deposition until after the Court's ruling on the Motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/08/09. cc:attys 9-08-09(mll, )
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 297 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO COMPEL by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Joseph Micallef, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N)(Micallef, Joseph A)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 296 Plaintiff's Answer to Audible Inc.'s Supplemental Amended Counterclaim ANSWER to 183 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Mandlekar, Ray)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 295 NOTICE by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC Notice of Service of Expert Reports (Lejeune, Cody)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 294 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. of Service of the Expert Report of Dr. Stuart G. Stubblebine in Compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) and the Court's Docket Control Order of May 12, 2008 (Findlay, Eric)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 293 NOTICE by Audible, Inc. of Service of Expert Reports (Heartfield, J)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 292 NOTICE of Disclosure by Blockbuster, Inc of expert Simson Garfinkel, Ph.D. (McLean, Gentry)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 291 NOTICE of Disclosure by Playboy Enterprises, Inc. of expert Simson Garfinkel, Ph.D. (McLean, Gentry)
August 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ***NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION. CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORIZATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL ATTACHED TO Document # 283, Sealed Patent Additional Attachments.*** (mjc, )
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 289 NOTICE of Disclosure by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC of Peter Garza Pursuant to Paragraph 12(b) of the Agreed Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Mandlekar, Ray)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 288 REPLY to Response to Motion re 282 Emergency MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiff Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, for Sanctions, and for Expedited Hearing DEFENDANTS' SONY CORP. OF AMERICA AND SONY CONNECT INC. REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS filed by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G)(Wilcox, Melvin)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER denying as moot 286 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel and for Sanctions filed by Sony Connect, Inc., Sony Corporation of America; denying 282 Emergency MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiff Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, for Sanctions, and for Expedited Hearing filed by Sony Connect, Inc., Sony Corporation of America. Pltf DRT and defts Sony shall meet and confer in an effort to craft a Revised Notice of Deposition. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/26/09. cc:attys 8-26-09(mll, )
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 286, Motion for Leave to File. PLEASE IGNORE. DOES NOT CONTAIN A CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE.*** (mjc, )
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Compel and for Sanctions by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G, # 2 Text of Proposed Order (granting motion for leave to file))(Wilcox, Melvin) Modified on 8/26/2009 (mjc, ).
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 285 RESPONSE in Opposition re 282 Emergency MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiff Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, for Sanctions, and for Expedited Hearing filed by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Mandlekar, Ray)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER granting in part 282 Motion to Compel. Pltf shall file and serve an opposition brief on or before 12 p.m. on Tuesday, 8-25-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/24/09. cc:attys 8-24-09 (mll, )
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 283 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 282 Emergency MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiff Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, for Sanctions, and for Expedited Hearing. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Churchill Decl., # 2 Exhibit A to Churchill Decl., # 3 Exhibit B to Churchill Decl., # 4 Exhibit C to Churchill Decl.)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2009: # 5 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal) (mjc, ).
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 282 Emergency MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiff Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, for Sanctions, and for Expedited Hearing by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (1), # 2 Text of Proposed Order (2))(Wilcox, Melvin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/27/2009: # 3 Corrected Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Corrected Text of Proposed Order 2) (mjc, ).
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 281 FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 282 FOR CORRECT PLEADING Opposed MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiff Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, for Sanctions, and for Expedited Hearing by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order (1), # 2 Text of Proposed Order (2))(Wilcox, Melvin) Modified on 8/24/2009 (mll, ).
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER granting 275 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for each party to serve expert reports on any issue which that party bears the burden of proof shall be 8-28-09. The deadline for each party to serve its rebuttal expert reports shall be 9-21-09; All discovery must be completed by 10-14-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/19/09. cc:attys 8-20-09(mll, )
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 279 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Cody Lejeune for Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (mll, )
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE of Disclosure by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC of Expert J. Michael Thesz (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Mandlekar, Ray)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting 271 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation. Pltf and the Sony defts have until 9-30-09 to complete their mediation. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/18/09. cc:attys 8-18-09 (mll, )
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting 273 Sealed Patent Motion to Supplement. The Supplemental Amended Answer, Affirmative defenses and Counterclaims of deft Audible Inc are hereby filed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/18/09. cc:attys 8-18-09(mll, )
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and For Exchange of Expert Reports by Sony Corporation of America, Blockbuster, Inc, Sony Connect, Inc., Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, LFP Internet Group, LLC, Microsoft Corp., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Audible, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 274 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Supplemental Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims of Defendant Audible, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Heartfield, J)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 273 Unopposed SEALED PATENT MOTION for Leave to Supplement First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims by Audible, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 272 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Service of Second Amended Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric)
August 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 271 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File To Extend Mediation Date by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc., Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mandlekar, Ray)
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 270 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. of Deposition of McGuireWoods LLP Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 30(b)(6) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena on McGuireWoods LLP)(Findlay, Eric)
August 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 269 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Markmand and Motion Hearing Proceedings held on 7/2/09 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 79 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/25/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2009. (sms, )
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 268 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corp. of Expert Allison Moulthrop (Findlay, Eric)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 267 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. of Compliance with P.R. 3-7 (Findlay, Eric)
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 266 NOTICE of Disclosure by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc. Disclosure of Kyle Garcia Pursuant to Paragraph 12(b) of the Agreed Protective Order (Corrected Corrupt Exhibits) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Wilcox, Melvin)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 265 NOTICE of Disclosure by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc. Disclosure of Keith S. Balla Pursuant to Paragraph 12(b) of the Agreed Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Wilcox, Melvin)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 264 FILED IN ERROR. SEE CORRECTED ENTRY 266 NOTICE of Disclosure by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc. Disclosure of Kyle Garcia Pursuant to Paragraph 12(b) of the Agreed Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Wilcox, Melvin) Modified on 7/21/2009 (gsg).
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 263 NOTICE of Disclosure by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc. Disclosure of Simson Garfinkel, Ph.D. Pursuant to Paragraph 12(b) of the Agreed Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Wilcox, Melvin)
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 262 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Cannon Low on behalf of Audible, Inc. (Low, John)
July 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 260 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 236 Motion for Summary Judgment for Invalidity of claim 2 for failure to comply with 35 USC 112; denying 237 Motion for Summary Judgment of invalidity based on indefiniteness and written description under 35 USC 112. The Court interprets the claim language in this case in the manner set forth in this order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/13/09. cc:attys 7-13-09 (mll, )
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER that pltf and defts pay $13,500 each to Michael T McLemore for services through 7-06-09 as the Court appointed technical consultant to the Court, for a total amount of $27,000. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/08/09. cc:attys 7-08-09(mll, )
July 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 261 Minute Entry - 7.2.09 Markman Hrg for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman Hearing held on 7/2/2009, Motion Hearing held on 7/2/2009 re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Based On Indefiniteness And Written Description Under 35 U.S.C. §112 filed by Sony Connect, Inc., Sony Corporation of America. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, )
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER granting 257 Motion for Extension of Time. Pltf and Sony defts shall have until 8-15-09 to complete their mediation in accordance with the Court's Mediation Plan. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/30/09. cc:attys 6-30-09(mll, )
June 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Extend Mediation Date by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc., Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 256 NOTICE OF FILING P.R. 4-5(d) CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART and P.R. 4-5(d) CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit P.R. 4-5(d) Claim Chart)(Hill, David)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 255 REPLY to Response to Motion re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Based On Indefiniteness And Written Description Under 35 U.S.C. §112 filed by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc.. (Wilcox, Melvin)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 254 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. of Disclosure of Expert Ada Liu (Findlay, Eric)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 253 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. of Disclosure of Expert Kevin Chung (Findlay, Eric)
June 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 252 REPLY to Response to Motion re 236 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Invalidity of Claim 2 of U.S. Patent No. 6,389,541 for Failure to Comply with 35 U.S.C. § 112, para. 2. filed by Audible, Inc.. (Heartfield, J)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 251 RESPONSE in Opposition re 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Based On Indefiniteness And Written Description Under 35 U.S.C. §112 filed by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Hill, David)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 250 RESPONSE in Opposition re 236 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Invalidity of Claim 2 of U.S. Patent No. 6,389,541 for Failure to Comply with 35 U.S.C. § 112, para. 2. filed by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Hill, David)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 249 REPLY to 238 Claim Construction Brief, filed by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Hill, David)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 248 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corp. of Brian W. Napper (Findlay, Eric)
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 247 NOTICE by Sony Corporation of America, Blockbuster, Inc, Sony Connect, Inc., Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, LFP Internet Group, LLC, Microsoft Corp., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Audible, Inc. of Requested Time for Markman Hearing (Ward, Thomas)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 246 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 229 MOTION to Compel No. 2 and Request for Hearing filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Scott Border, # 2 Exhibit A)(Micallef, Joseph A)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 245 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re 228 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel and Request for Hearing filed by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Scott M. Border, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Micallef, Joseph A)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 244 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. of Deposition Subpoena for Jingyu Zhou (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Deposition Subpoena for Jingyu Zhou)(Findlay, Eric)
June 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 243 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. of Deposition Subpoena for Thinkfire Services USA, Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Deposition Subpoena for Thinkfire Services)(Findlay, Eric)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 242 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Expert Disclosure (Findlay, Eric)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 241 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 229 MOTION to Compel No. 2 and Request for Hearing filed by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Cody R. LeJeune, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Text of Proposed Order)(Mandlekar, Ray)
June 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 240 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re 228 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel and Request for Hearing filed by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael C. Gabriel, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Cody R. LeJeune, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Mandlekar, Ray)
June 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER appointing Michael T. McLemore as technical advisor to the Court in this action, with his costs to be assessed equally between pltf and defts and timely paid as billed. Parties shall provide Mr McLemore with a copy of the claim construction and claim construction-related summary judgment briefs and exhibits. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/08/09. cc:attys 6-08-09(mll, )
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 238 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Border, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B Part 1, # 4 Exhibit B Part 2, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J)(Findlay, Eric)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 237 MOTION for Summary Judgment Of Invalidity Based On Indefiniteness And Written Description Under 35 U.S.C. §112 by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Gregory S. Gewirtz, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
June 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 236 MOTION for Summary Judgment for Invalidity of Claim 2 of U.S. Patent No. 6,389,541 for Failure to Comply with 35 U.S.C. § 112, para. 2. by Audible, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Nolan Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting 234 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 229 MOTION to Compel No. 2 and Request for Hearing, 228 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel and Request for Hearing; Responses due by 6/9/2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/27/09. cc:attys 5-27-09 (mll, )
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 230 Additional Attachments to Main Document, 229 MOTION to Compel No. 2 and Request for Hearing, 228 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel and Request for Hearing by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
May 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting 226 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John Cannon Low terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/26/09. cc:attys 5-26-09 (mll, )
May 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 232 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Fay E Morisseau on behalf of Audible, Inc. (Morisseau, Fay)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 231 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey J Phillips on behalf of LFP Internet Group, LLC (Phillips, Jeffrey)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 229 MOTION to Compel No. 2 and Request for Hearing.. (Findlay, Eric)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 229 SEALED MOTION to Compel No. 2 and Request for Hearing by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Michael, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Errata I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P)(Findlay, Eric)(Sealed at request of parties) Modified on 5/20/2009 (rml, ).
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 228 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Compel and Request for Hearing by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Appendix A, # 3 Affidavit of Michael, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit P, # 20 Exhibit Q, # 21 Exhibit R, # 22 Exhibit S, # 23 Exhibit T, # 24 Exhibit U, # 25 Exhibit V)(Findlay, Eric)
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER that the parties file any objections they have to the appointment of Michael T McLemore as the court's technical consultant no later than 5-22-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/15/09. cc:attys 5-15-09(mll, )
May 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 226 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by LFP Internet Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Low, John) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/22/2009: # 2 Corrected Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 225 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hill, David)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting 223 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Pltf Digital Reg and Deft Microsoft Corp have to 5-08-09 to comply with Paragraph 2 of the Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/24/09. cc:attys 4-24-09(mll, )
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
April 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 222 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gentry C McLean on behalf of Blockbuster, Inc (McLean, Gentry)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 221 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David M Stein on behalf of Audible, Inc. (Stein, David)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting 218 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Pltf Digital Reg and Deft Microsoft Corp have to 4-17-09 to comply with Paragraph 2 of the Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/31/09. cc:attys 3-31-09(mll, )
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 219 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by Sony Corporation of America, Blockbuster, Inc, Sony Connect, Inc., Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, LFP Internet Group, LLC, Microsoft Corp., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Audible, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Findlay, Eric)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
March 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 217 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Document Subpoena on Kilpatrick Stockton, LLP (Findlay, Eric)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 216 NOTICE by Audible, Inc. of Compliance re: Privilege Log (Heartfield, J)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 215 NOTICE of Disclosure by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC of PR 4-2 (Ward, Thomas)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 214 NOTICE by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC NOTICE OF PLAINTIFF DIGITAL REG OF TEXAS, LLC'S SERVICE OF PRIVILEGE LOG PURSUANT TO THE COURT'S DOCKET CONTROL ORDER (Mandlekar, Ray)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 213 NOTICE of Disclosure by L.F.P., Inc., LFP Internet Group, LLC Notice Regarding Exchange of Privilege Logs Pursuant to the Court's Docekt Control Order of May 20, 2008, As Amended (Chassman, Peter)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 212 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Defendants LFP Internet Group, LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Audible, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect Inc., and Blockbuster Inc.'s Compliance with Patent Rule 4-2 (Findlay, Eric)
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 211 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Service of Privilege Logs Pursuant to the Court's Scheduling Order of May 20, 2008, As Amended (Findlay, Eric)
March 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER granting 209 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/05/09. cc:attys 3-5-09 (mll, )
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 209 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting 207 Motion to Amend Docket Control Order and extending time to comply with PR 4-2. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/02/09. cc:attys 3-2-09 (mll, )
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 207 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 118 Scheduling Order,,, Set Hearings,, by Sony Corporation of America, Blockbuster, Inc, Sony Connect, Inc., Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, LFP Internet Group, LLC, Microsoft Corp., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Audible, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 206 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 205 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Sony by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Mandlekar, Ray)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 205 Sony's First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM (by Sony Connect Inc.) against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc..(Wilcox, Melvin)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting 203 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Parties have to 3-2-09 to complete discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/05/09. cc:attys 2-5-09 (mll, )
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
February 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 202 NOTICE of Disclosure by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC (PR 4-1) (Ward, Thomas)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 201 NOTICE of Disclosure by Sony Corporation of America, Blockbuster, Inc, Sony Connect, Inc., LFP Internet Group, LLC, Microsoft Corp., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Audible, Inc. Notice of Compliance with P.R. 4-1 (Findlay, Eric)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. of Issuance of Deposition Subpoena of Daniel S. Coolidge (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Findlay, Eric)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 199 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 189 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Playboy Enterprises, Inc. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Mandlekar, Ray)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 188 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Blockbuster by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Mandlekar, Ray)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 184 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Mandlekar, Ray)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 196 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 187 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Mandlekar, Ray)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 183 Amended Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Mandlekar, Ray)
January 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Change of Contact Information (Findlay, Eric)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting 182 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings. Sony has to 2-06-09 to amend its pleadings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/15/09. cc:attys 1-15-09 (mll, )
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting 190 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, and extending time to 2-6-09 to comply with Paragraph 2 of the Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/12/09. cc:attys 1-12-09 (mll, )
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. of Document Subpoena (Findlay, Eric)
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 189 Second Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Playboy Enterprises, Inc..(McLean, Gentry)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 188 First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Blockbuster, Inc.(Jackson, Andrew)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 187 First Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by LFP Internet Group, LLC.(Chassman, Peter)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE by Sony Corporation of America, Blockbuster, Inc, Sony Connect, Inc., LFP Internet Group, LLC, Microsoft Corp., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Audible, Inc. Notice of Service of Defendants' First Supplemental Invalidity Contentions (Findlay, Eric)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 185 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Service of Amended Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 184 Amended ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Amended COUNTERCLAIM and Affirmative Defenses against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Microsoft Corp..(Findlay, Eric)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 183 AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Audible, Inc.. (Heartfield, J)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/15/2009: # 2 Corrected Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ).
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting 180 Motion to Amend. Defts may amend their Patent Rule 3-3 Invalidity Contentions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/05/09. cc:attys 1-5-09(mll, )
December 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 180 MOTION to Amend/Correct Agreed Motion for Leave to Amend Defendants' Patent Rule 3-3 Invalidity Contentions by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER re 178 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Apple, Inc., Digital Reg of Texas, LLC dismissing with prejudice all claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff Digital Reg of Texas, LLC and Defendant Apple Inc., except that Apple may raise any defense or counterclaim if sued in the future. Each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/23/08. (mjc )
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 178 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of all Claims and Counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant Apple Inc. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting 176 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties are given to and including 1-22-09 to respond to amended pleadings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/18/08. cc:attys 12-18-08 (mll, )
December 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Pleadings by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Document Subpoena onWachovia Bank, N.A. (Findlay, Eric)
December 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting 173 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. Pltf Digital Reg and all defts in this case have until 1-07-09 to amend pleadings pursuant to the Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/01/08. cc:attys 12-01-08(mll, )
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 173 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 171 Motion for Extension of Time to Produce Documents. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. Plaintiff Digital Reg. and Defendant Microsoft Corporation have until January 19, 2009 to comply with Paragraph 2 of the Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/24/2008. (kls, )
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting 168 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/18/08. cc:attys 11-18-08 (mll, )
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting 167 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/17/08. cc:attys 11-17-08 (mll, )
November 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion Extending Time to Provide Additional Disclosures by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
November 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 167 FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 168 FOR CORRECT PLEADING Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Motion Extending Time to Provide Additional Disclosures by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) Modified on 11/18/2008 (mll, ).
November 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting 165 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Plaintiff Digital Reg and Defendant Microsoft Corporation have until 12/8/2008 to comply with Paragraph 2 of the Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/7/08. (mjc )
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Document Subpoena on McGuireWoods LLP (Findlay, Eric)
October 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting 162 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deft Playboy has until 11-17-08 to comply with section 2.B of the Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/20/08. cc:attys 10-20-08 (mll, )
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re: section 2.B of Discovery Order by Playboy Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McLean, Gentry)
October 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc. NOTICE OF DOCUMENT SUBPOENA ON TROUTMAN SANDERS LLP (Wilcox, Melvin)
October 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting 159 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Pltf Digital Reg and deft Microsoft Corp have until 11-14-08, to comply with Paragraph 2 of the Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/01/08. cc:attys 10-01-08 (mll, )
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting 156 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/29/08. cc:attys 9-29-08 (mll, )
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 155 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Playboy has until 10-17-08, to comply with section 2.B of the Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/29/08. cc:attys 9-29-08 (mll, )
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery To Provide Additional Disclosures by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/29/2008: # 2 Certificate of Conference) (mll, ).
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 155 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery re: section 2.B of Discovery Order by Playboy Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McLean, Gentry)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE of Disclosure by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC (of Paragraph 2) (Ward, Thomas)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 153 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Document Subpoena on Metrix Services, Inc., also doing business as Patent Metrix (Findlay, Eric)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 152 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Document Subpoena on PatentCafe.com, Inc. (Findlay, Eric)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Document Subpoena on Patent Ratings (Findlay, Eric)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 150 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Document Subpoena on Patent Metrix (Findlay, Eric)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Document Subpoena on David R. Patterson (Findlay, Eric)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 148 NOTICE by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Document Subpoena on ThinkFire Services USA, Ltd. (Findlay, Eric)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Microsoft Corporation's Supplemental Production Pursuant to Patent Rule 3-4 on Behalf of the Defendants (Findlay, Eric)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 146 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Defendants LFP Internet Group, LLC, Microsoft Corporation, Apple Inc., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Audible, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc., and Blockbuster Inc.'s Compliance with Patent Rule 3-3 (Findlay, Eric)
July 21, 2008 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 144 & 145, Notices of Disclosure. PLEASE IGNORE ATTORNEY WILL REFILE.*** (rml, )
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 145 **PLEASE IGNORE *** NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Defendants LFP Internet Group, LLC, LFP, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, Apple Inc., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Audible, Inc., Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc., and Blockbuster Inc.'s Compliance with Patent Rule 3-3 (Findlay, Eric) Modified on 7/21/2008 (rml, ).
July 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 144 **PLEASE IGNORE ****NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Microsoft Corporation's Supplemental Production Pursuant to Patent Rule 3-4 (Findlay, Eric) Modified on 7/21/2008 (rml, ).
July 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 143 TRANSCRIPT of Status Conferences held on 4/7/08 before Judges Leonard Davis and John Love. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 8/7/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/18/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2008. 13 pages. See 105 (sms, )
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE of Disclosure by Blockbuster, Inc - Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-4 (Jackson, Andrew)
July 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE of Disclosure by Playboy Enterprises, Inc. - Notice of Compliance with P.R. 3-4 (McLean, Gentry)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc. Compliance with Patent Rule 3-4 (Wilcox, Melvin)
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting 134 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall have until and including 7-18-08, to comply with P.R. 3-3. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/15/08. cc:attys 7-15-08 (mll, )
July 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 138 NOTICE by Audible, Inc. of Compliance with Patent Rule 3-4 (Heartfield, J)
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 137 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Microsoft Corporation's Compliance With Patent Rule 3-4 (Findlay, Eric)
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 136 NOTICE by LFP Internet Group, LLC of Service of Patent Local Rule 3-4 Document Production Accompanying Invalidity Contentions (Low, John)
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE of Disclosure by Apple, Inc. (Albritton, Eric)
July 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with P.R. 3-3 by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2008: # 2 Unopposed Motion) (gsg, ).
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 133 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding the disclosure and use of discovery materials. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/26/08. cc:attys 6-27-08 (mll, )
June 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 132 NOTICE by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC of Submission of Agreed Protective Order Regarding the Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Protective Order)(Ward, Thomas)
June 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER granting 130 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order. Deadline is 6/25/08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/16/08. (mjc ) Modified on 6/19/2008 (mjc ).
June 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Extension of Time to Sumbit a Proposed Protective Order by Sony Corporation of America, L.F.P., Inc., Blockbuster, Inc, Sony Connect, Inc., Digital Reg of Texas, LLC, LFP Internet Group, LLC, Microsoft Corp., Apple, Inc., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Audible, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER that parties have an additional seven days from the date of this order to provide written objections to the appointment of Judge Phillips as mediator. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/12/08. cc:attys 6-12-08(mll, )
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE of Disclosure by LFP Internet Group, LLC Notice of LFP Internet Group, LLC's Service of Initial Disclosures (Low, John)
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE of Disclosure by Apple, Inc. (Albritton, Eric)
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE of Disclosure by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc. Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Wilcox, Melvin)
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE of Disclosure by Microsoft Corp. Notice of Microsoft Corporation's Service of Initial Disclosures (Findlay, Eric)
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE of Disclosure by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC (Initial Disclosures) (Ward, Thomas)
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE of Disclosure by Blockbuster, Inc -Notice of Initial Disclosures (Jackson, Andrew)
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 122 NOTICE of Disclosure by Audible, Inc. (Heartfield, J)
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 121 NOTICE of Disclosure by Playboy Enterprises, Inc. - Notice of Initial Disclosures (McLean, Gentry)
June 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 120 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew E Jackson on behalf of Blockbuster, Inc (Jackson, Andrew)
May 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Layn R. Phillips added as Mediator. Signed by Judge Judge Leonard Davis on 5/20/08. (mjc )
May 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/8/2008. Discovery due by 10/5/2009. Expert Witness List due by 8/19/2009. Identify trial witnesses by 10/19/2009, Jury instructions due by 11/23/2009, Mediation Completion due by 6/30/2009. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/23/2009. Jury Trial set for 2/8/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 7/2/2009 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Selection set for 2/1/2010 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Judge Leonard Davis on 5/20/08. (mjc )
May 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 117 NOTICE by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC of Agreement on Mediator (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
May 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 116 DISCOVERY ORDER entered in furtherance of the management of the Court's docket under FRCP 16. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/13/08. (mjc )
May 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 107 Order,, Set Hearings, (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Order# 2 Docket Control Order)(Albritton, Eric)
May 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting 113 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Docket Control Order and Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/9/08. (mjc )
May 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Agreed Motion Extending the Time for the Parties to Submit Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
April 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 110 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Docket Control Order and Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/22/08. (mjc )
April 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Robert Hail on behalf of Digital Reg of Texas, LLC (Hail, James)
April 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Agreed Motion Extending the Time for the Parties to Sumit Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
April 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 109 NOTICE of Disclosure by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC of PR 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures (Ward, Thomas)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 108 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danny Lloyd Williams on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Williams, Danny)
April 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 107 AMENDED ORDER re 105 Status Conference: Jury Selection set for 2/1/2010 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 2/8/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 7/2/2009 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. The parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 4-21-08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/10/08. cc:attys 4-10-08(mll, )
April 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER per 105 Status Conference - Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Selection set for 2/1/2010 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 2/8/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 7/2/2009 09:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 4/21/2008. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/8/08. (mjc )
April 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love : Status Conference held on 4/7/2008. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, )
April 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting 94 Motion to Amend/Correct Caption of case. Ordered that the caption be corrected by replacing "Hustler.com (A/K/A LFP Internet Group, LLC)" with "LFP Internet Group, LLC" and changing "LFP, Inc." to "L.F.P., Inc." Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 4/3/08. (mjc )
March 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 103 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gregory S Gewirtz for Sony Corporation of America and Sony Connect, Inc. Fee pd., 6-1-13206. Approved 3/27/08. (mjc )
March 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 102 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Raymond Churchill for Sony Corporation of America and Sony Connect, Inc. Fee pd., 6-1-13206. Approved 3/27/08. (mjc )
March 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 101 NOTICE by Audible, Inc. - Supplemental Rule 7.1 Disclosure (Heartfield, J)
March 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant Playboy Enterprises, Inc. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Olivo, John)
March 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 97 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice claims and counterclaims between Digital Reg of Texas, LLC and Macrovision Corporation. Each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/10/08. (mjc )
March 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER - Status Conference set for 4/7/2008 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Magistrate Judge John D. Love in Judge Davis's Courtroom in Tyler. Purpose of the conference is to assign a claim construction hearing date and trial setting, and to determine whether parties will consent to trial before Judge Love. Proposed Discovery Order is Appendix A; proposed Docket Control Order is Appendix B. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 3/7/08. (mjc)
February 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Macrovision Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Macrovision Corporation's and Digital Reg of Texas, LLC's Stipulated Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice)(Kohm, Bryan)
February 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 96 First Amended ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Playboy Enterprises, Inc..(Ross, Avelyn)
February 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Patrick Coughlin on behalf of Digital Reg of Texas, LLC (Coughlin, Patrick)
February 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption by LFP, Inc., Hustler.com. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chassman, Peter)
February 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant Macrovision Corporation by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Ward, Thomas)
January 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 92 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Matthew D Michael for Microsoft Corp. Fee pd., 6-1-12567. Approved 1/29/08. (mjc )
January 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael E Ginsberg for Microsoft Corp. Fee pd., 6-1-12567. Approved 1/29/08. (mjc )
January 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 90 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Scott M Border for Microsoft Corp. Fee pd., 6-1-12567. Approved 1/29/08. (mjc )
January 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 89 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joseph A Micallef for Microsoft Corp. Fee pd., 6-1-12567. Approved 1/28/08. (mjc )
January 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 88 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Macrovision Corp (Smith, Melissa)
January 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC re 84 Order, and Request for Scheduling Conference (Ward, Thomas)
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Macrovision Corp (Kohm, Bryan)
January 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Macrovision Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Macrovision Corp.(Kohm, Bryan)
January 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER for Plaintiff to file a notice, within five days of receipt of the last Defendant's answer, that the case is ready for scheduling conference. The notice shall include a list of any pending motions to dismiss or transfer. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 1/10/08. (mjc )
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant Blockbuster, Inc. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Ward, Thomas)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant Apple, Inc. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Ward, Thomas)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant Microsoft Corporation by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Ward, Thomas)
January 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Defendant Audible, Inc. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Ward, Thomas)
January 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Richard S. Hung; Fee: $25, receipt number: 213361 (fnt, )
January 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ANSWER to Counterclaim of Sony Connect Inc. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Ward, Thomas)
January 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ANSWER to Counterclaim of LFP Internet Group, LLC by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC.(Ward, Thomas)
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 79 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard S J Hung for Apple, Inc.. Approved 1/3/08(fnt, )
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice Filing fee paid by Michael A. Jacobs; Fee: $25, receipt number: 213361 (fnt, )
January 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 78 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael A Jacobs for Apple, Inc.. Approved 1/2/08(fnt, )
December 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gentry C McLean on behalf of Playboy Enterprises, Inc. (McLean, Gentry)
December 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David B Weaver on behalf of Playboy Enterprises, Inc. (Weaver, David)
December 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 73 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kristen Paris Foster on behalf of Playboy Enterprises, Inc. (Foster, Kristen)
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 72 NOTICE of Disclosure by Blockbuster, Inc Pursuant to Rule 7.1(a) (Breedlove, Scott)
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Blockbuster, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Blockbuster, Inc.(Breedlove, Scott)
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 70 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Albritton, Eric)
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Apple, Inc..(Albritton, Eric)
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 68 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Playboy Enterprises, Inc. (Ross, Avelyn)
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Microsoft Corp. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Findlay, Eric)
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Playboy Enterprises, Inc..(Ross, Avelyn)
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Microsoft Corp..(Findlay, Eric)
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc. identifying Sony Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Wilcox, Melvin)
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Macrovision Corp answer due 1/18/2007. (mjc )
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 60 Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer. Macrovision Corporation shall file a response to the Complaint by 1/18/08. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/17/07. (mjc )
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Audible, Inc. identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Heartfield, J)
December 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Audible, Inc..(Heartfield, J)
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Macrovision Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kohm, Bryan)
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc..(Wilcox, Melvin)
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Hustler.com identifying L.F.P., Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Chassman, Peter)
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 57 LFP Internet Group, LLC's (incorrectly named as Hustler.com) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Hustler.com.(Chassman, Peter)
December 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 54 Vountary Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice Defendant LFP, Inc. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant LFP, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice. Each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/13/07. (mjc )
December 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 53 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 53 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Move or Otherwise Respond on behalf of Defendant Playboy Enterprises, Inc. MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Move or Otherwise Respond on behalf of Defendant Playboy Enterprises, Inc.. Deadline for Defendant Playboy Enterprises, Inc. to answer the complaint is 12/17/07. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/13/07. (mjc )
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT LFP, INC. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas)
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Move or Otherwise Respond on behalf of Defendant Playboy Enterprises, Inc. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) Modified on 12/13/2007 (djh, ). Modified on 12/13/2007 (djh, ). Additional attachment(s) added on 12/13/2007 (djh, ).
December 12, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ***Filed in error, signature omitted, refer to corrected document # 53 , which replaces this document*** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint or Move or Otherwise Respond for Defendant Playboy Enterprises, Inc. by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ward, Thomas) Modified on 12/12/2007 (fnt, ).
December 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John Cannon Low for LFP, Inc. (mll, )
December 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to Peter John Chassman on behalf of LFP, Inc., Hustler.com (Chassman, Peter)
December 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Apple, Inc. answer due 12/17/2007. (mjc )
December 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer. Apple's answer is due by 12/17/07. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/3/07. (mjc )
December 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Blockbuster, Inc answer due 12/17/2007. (mjc )
December 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 46 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 46 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint. Defendant Blockbuster Inc.'s answer is due by 12/17/2007. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/3/07. (mjc )
November 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond (Unopposed) by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
November 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Blockbuster, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Maloney, Collin)
November 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Collin Michael Maloney on behalf of Blockbuster, Inc (Maloney, Collin)
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Audible, Inc. answer due 12/17/2007. (mjc )
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 40 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint , or Otherwise Respond. Defendant Audible Inc.'s answer is due by 12/17/07. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/07. (mjc )
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Microsoft Corp. answer due 12/17/2007. (mjc )
November 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff. Microsoft's answer is due 12/17/2007. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/28/07. (mjc )
November 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint , or Otherwise Respond, by Audible, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
November 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 42 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paul J Cambria for LFP, Inc. and Hustler.com. Fee pd., 6-1-11852. Approved 11/27/07. (mjc )
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 41 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney William M Feigenbaum for LFP, Inc. and Hustler.com. Fee pd., 6-1-11852. Approved 11/27/07. (mjc )
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Macrovision Corp answer due 12/17/2007. (mjc )
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 37 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 37 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint of Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. Defendant Macrovision Corporation's deadline to answer the complaint is extended to 12/17/2007. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/26/07. (mjc )
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint of Digital Reg of Texas, LLC by Macrovision Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kohm, Bryan)
November 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: LFP, Inc. answer due 12/14/2007. (mjc )
November 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint to 12/14/2007. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/9/07. (mjc )
November 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff by LFP Internet Group, LLC, LFP, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tidwell, James)
November 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ray A Mandlekar for Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. Fee pd., 6-1-11670. Approved 11/7/07. (mjc )
November 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 33 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Brian W Nolan for Audible, Inc. Fee pd., 6-1-11641. Approved 11/6/07. (mjc )
November 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 32 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael E Shanahan for Audible, Inc. Fee pd., 6-1-11633. Approved 11/5/07. (mjc)
October 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 31 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to LEP, Inc. (fnt, )
October 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan Alexander Kohm on behalf of Macrovision Corp (Kohm, Bryan)
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Blockbuster, Inc answer due 12/3/2007. (mjc)
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Blockbuster Inc.'s answer is due by 12/3/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/29/07. (mjc )
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Playboy Enterprises, Inc. answer due 12/3/2007. (mjc )
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Playboy Enterprises until 12/3/07. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/29/07. (mjc )
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Sony Corporation of America answer due 12/17/2007; Sony Connect, Inc. answer due 12/17/2007. (mjc )
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint Defendants', Sony Corporation of America and Sony Connect, Inc., Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint. The Sony defendants have until 12/17/07 to answer the complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/29/07. (mjc )
October 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Blockbuster, Inc. (Attachments: # 1)(Breedlove, Scott)
October 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Playboy Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ross, Avelyn)
October 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint Defendants', Sony Corporation of America and Sony Connect, Inc., Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Sony Corporation of America, Sony Connect, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Melvin)
October 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Apple, Inc. answer due 12/3/2007. (mjc )
October 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint. Apple's answer is due by 12/3/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/25/07. (mjc )
October 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Macrovision Corp answer due 11/30/2007. (mjc )
October 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. Macrovision Corporation's answer is due by 11/30/07. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/25/07. (mjc )
October 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Microsoft Corp. answer due 12/3/2007. (mjc )
October 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff. Microsoft's answer is due by 12/3/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/25/07. (mjc )
October 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint.. (Morrow, Charlene)
October 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
October 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Macrovision Corp. (Morrow, Charlene)
October 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint of Plaintiff by Microsoft Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
October 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Return of Service Executed as to Sony Corporation of America on 10/15/2007, answer due: 11/5/2007. (mjc )
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Return of Service Executed as to Sony Connect, Inc. on 10/15/2007, answer due: 11/5/2007. (mjc )
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Return of Service Executed as to Playboy Enterprises, Inc. on 10/15/2007, answer due: 11/5/2007. (mjc )
October 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Return of Service Executed as to Macrovision Corp on 10/12/2007, answer due: 11/1/2007. (mjc )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael J Dowd for Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. Fee pd., 6-1-11417. Approved 10/19/07. (mjc )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 11 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patrick Coughlin for Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. Fee pd., 6-1-11416. Approved 10/19/07. (mjc)
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Audible, Inc. answer due 12/3/2007. (mjc )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint , or Otherwise Respond. Defendant Audible, Inc.'s answer is due by 12/3/07 . Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/17/07. (mjc )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Blockbuster, Inc on 10/12/2007, answer due: 11/1/2007. (mjc )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Microsoft Corp. on 10/12/2007, answer due: 11/1/2007. (mjc )
October 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Apple, Inc. on 10/11/2007, answer due: 10/31/2007. (mjc )
October 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint , or Otherwise Respond, by Audible, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Heartfield, J)
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John F Ward for Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. Fee pd., 6-1-11343. Approved 10/15/07. (mjc )
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 4 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John W Olivo, Jr for Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. Fee pd., 6-1-11343. Approved 10/15/07. (mjc )
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 3 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Sony Corporation of America, Macrovision Corp, Blockbuster, Inc, Hustler.com, Microsoft Corp., Apple, Inc., Playboy Enterprises, Inc., Audible, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Microsoft Corp summon# 2 Playboy Enterprises summon# 3 Hustler.Com summon# 4 Apple Inc summon# 5 Audible, Inc summon# 6 Blockbuster Inc summon# 7 Macrovision Corp summon# 8 LFP, Inc summon# 9 Sony Connect Inc summon# 10 Sony Corp of America summon)(fnt, ) Modified on 10/15/2007 (fnt, ).
October 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: # 1 Form AO 120)(Ward, Thomas)
October 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 1289037.), filed by Digital Reg of Texas, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Civil Cover Sheet # 3 List of Parties)(Ward, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Digital Reg of Texas, LLC v. Hustler.com et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Digital Reg of Texas, LLC
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hustler.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Playboy Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audible, Inc.
Represented By: J Thad Heartfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macrovision Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blockbuster, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sony Connect, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEP, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?