EMG Technology, LLC v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

EMG Technology lawsuit accuses Apple of infringing U.S. Patent No. 7,441,196 in the way the iPhone navigates the Internet.

Plaintiff: EMG Technology, LLC
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2008cv00447
Filed: November 24, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Patent Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Presiding Judge:
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:183 Patent Infringement
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2010 ALL DOCUMENTS RELATED TO THIS CASE MUST BE FILED IN CAUSE 6:09CV367 AS THE LEAD CASE IN THIS CONSOLIDATED ACTION. (mll, )
April 23, 2010 Filing 228 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File (Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Invalidity Contentions) by American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 22, 2010 Filing 227 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah Renee Holland on behalf of Dell Inc. (Holland, Sarah)
February 15, 2010 Filing 226 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Joint Status Conference Proceedings held on 2/1/10 before Judge Leonard Davis. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov. 20 pages. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/22/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2010. (sms, )
February 8, 2010 Filing 225 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 209 MOTION to Change Venue filed by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Shawn Hansen Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G)(Ainsworth, Charles)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting 199 Motion to Vacate the deadlines in the Docket Control and Discovery Orders and for Case Management Conference. This case is CONSOLIDATED with cause 6:09cv367 for pretrial purposes. Cause 6:09cv367 is designated as the LEAD CASE. The Court VACATES all previous scheduling dates in this cause, and appoints Robert Faulkner as Mediator. Parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 02-16-2010. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the Court deems 02-16-2010 as the effective Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference date, and thus pltf's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures will be due 02-19-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/05/10. cc:attys 2-05-10 (mll, )
February 1, 2010 Filing 223 2.1.10 Minute Entry (Status Conf & Motion Hrg): for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Motion Hearing held on 2/1/2010 re 199 MOTION to Vacate; Status Conference held on 2/1/2010. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (rlf, )
January 29, 2010 Filing 222 REPLY to Response to Motion re 209 MOTION to Change Venue filed by American Airlines, Inc., Apple, Inc., Dell Inc., Hyatt Corporation, Marriott International, Inc., Barnes & Noble, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Carraway, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Rambin, Daymon)
January 28, 2010 Filing 221 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ainsworth, Charles)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER granting 219 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline to file parties' Joint Status Report is 1-28-2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/28/10. cc:attys 1-28-10 (mll, )
January 27, 2010 Filing 219 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
January 25, 2010 Filing 218 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Hotline Telephonic Conference held on 12/16/2009 before Judge Bush. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Bryn & Associates,Telephone number: 903/712-2273. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/18/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/1/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2010. (pad, )
January 22, 2010 Filing 217 RESPONSE in Opposition re 209 MOTION to Change Venue filed by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Charles Ainsworth Declaration, # 3 Exhibit A to Ainsworth Declaration - Witness Mileage Chart)(Ainsworth, Charles)
January 15, 2010 Filing 216 REPLY to Response to Motion re 199 MOTION to Vacate 100 Order, 99 Order The Deadlines In The Docket Control And Discovery Orders And For A Case Management Conference MOTION to Vacate 100 Order, 99 Order The Deadlines In The Docket Control And Discovery Orders And For A Case Management Conference filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of John R. Lane ISO Apple Inc.'s Reply, # 2 Exhibit A to Lane Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Lane Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Lane Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Lane Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Lane Declaration, # 7 Exhibit F to Lane Declaration, # 8 Exhibit G to Lane Declaration, # 9 Exhibit H to Lane Declaration, # 10 Exhibit I to Lane Declaration, # 11 Exhibit J to Lane Declaration, # 12 Exhibit K to Lane Declaration, # 13 Exhibit L to Lane Declaration, # 14 Exhibit M to Lane Declaration, # 15 Exhibit N to Lane Declaration, # 16 Exhibit O to Lane Declaration, # 17 Exhibit P to Lane Declaration)(Healey, David)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting 213 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 199 MOTION to Vacate 100 Order, 99 Order The Deadlines In The Docket Control And Discovery Orders And For A Case Management Conference ; Replies due by 1/15/2010. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/15/10. cc:attys 1-15-10 (mll, )
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting 212 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Mike McKool, Jr terminated. Attorney S Calvin Capshaw is substituted as Lead Counsel for American Airlines. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/15/10. cc:attys 1-15-10(mll, )
January 14, 2010 Filing 213 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 206 Response in Opposition to Motion,, to Vacate the Deadlines in the Docket Control and Discovery Orders and For A Case Management Conference by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lane, John)
January 14, 2010 Filing 212 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney as Lead Counsel by American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
January 11, 2010 Filing 211 EMG Technology, LLC's ANSWER to 198 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Hyatt by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
January 8, 2010 Filing 210 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Dru Montgomery on behalf of Dell Inc. (Montgomery, M.)
January 7, 2010 Filing 209 MOTION to Change Venue by Apple, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Dell Inc., Hyatt Corporation, Marriott International, Inc., Barnes & Noble, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K - Part 1, # 13 Exhibit K - Part 2, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Exhibit V, # 25 Exhibit W, # 26 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon)
January 7, 2010 Filing 208 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Thad Heartfield on behalf of Dell Inc. (Heartfield, J)
January 7, 2010 Filing 207 EMG Technology LLC's ANSWER to 194 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Marriott by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
January 4, 2010 Filing 206 RESPONSE in Opposition re 199 MOTION to Vacate 100 Order, 99 Order The Deadlines In The Docket Control And Discovery Orders And For A Case Management Conference MOTION to Vacate 100 Order, 99 Order The Deadlines In The Docket Control And Discovery Orders And For A Case Management Conference filed by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Hansen, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K)(Ainsworth, Charles)
January 4, 2010 Filing 205 EMG Technology, LLC's ANSWER to 185 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Barnes & Noble by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
December 29, 2009 Status Conference reset for 2/1/2010 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis (per 204 Order). (mll, )
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting 203 Motion to Continue Status Conference, and continuing to 2-01-2010, or the next date that is convenient for the Court. All existing deadlines in the Court's Docket Control and Discovery Orders between the date of this Order and the date of the rescheduled joint status conference are continued until the rescheduled joint status conference and hearing. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/29/09. cc:attys 12-29-09 (mll, )
December 24, 2009 Filing 203 Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference and Hearing by EMG Technology, LLC, Apple, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Dell Inc., Hyatt Corporation, Marriott International, Inc., Barnes & Noble, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER setting Status Conference for 1/4/2010 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. The Court will hear oral arguments on 199 Motion to Vacate the deadlines in the Docket Control Order and Discovery Order, and will decide whether to consolidate this cause with 6:09cv367. Parties shall meet and confer and file a joint status report by 12-31-2009, identifying any disputed issues that need to be discussed at the status conference and each party's position on consolidation. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/21/09. cc:attys 12-22-09(mll, )
December 21, 2009 Filing 201 NOTICE of Disclosure by American Airlines, Inc. re P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 19, 2009 Filing 200 NOTICE of Disclosure by Apple, Inc. re P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 (Lane, John)
December 18, 2009 Filing 199 MOTION to Vacate 100 Order, 99 Order The Deadlines In The Docket Control And Discovery Orders And For A Case Management Conference by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of John R. Lane, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2)(Lane, John)
December 18, 2009 Filing 198 ANSWER to 159 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against EMG Technology, LLC by Hyatt Corporation.(Capshaw, Sidney)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 197 HOTLINE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush on 12/17/2009. (baf, )
December 16, 2009 Filing 196 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Don D. Bush: Hotline Conference via Audio Conference held on 12/16/2009 in Plano Texas. (Court Reporter Digital Recording.) (ttm, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/16/2009: # 1 Correct PDF) (ttm, ).
December 11, 2009 Filing 195 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Marriott International, Inc. (Guaragna, John)
December 11, 2009 Filing 194 ANSWER to 159 Amended Complaint (Fifth), COUNTERCLAIM against EMG Technology, LLC by Marriott International, Inc..(Guaragna, John)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER granting 191 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Hyatt Corporation to answer the Fifth Amended Complaint is 12-18-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/10/09. cc:attys 12-10-09 (mll, )
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting 186 Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order. The date by which defts Apple Inc and American Airlines Inc must comply with PR 3-3 and PR 3-4 is extended to 12-18-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/09/09. cc:attys 12-09-09(mll, )
December 9, 2009 Filing 191 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 159 Amended Complaint by Hyatt Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Capshaw, Sidney)
December 9, 2009 Filing 190 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of Hyatt Corporation (Capshaw, Sidney)
December 9, 2009 Filing 189 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Lea Hannah on behalf of American Airlines, Inc., Hyatt Corporation (Hannah, Jessica)
December 9, 2009 Filing 188 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of Hyatt Corporation (Rambin, Daymon)
December 9, 2009 Filing 187 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Hyatt Corporation (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
December 8, 2009 Filing 186 Agreed MOTION to Modify the Docket Control Order re 100 Order by Apple, Inc., American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order granting Agreed Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order)(Lane, John)
December 8, 2009 Filing 185 BARNES & NOBLE, INC.'S ANSWER to 159 Amended Complaint (FIFTH) AND, COUNTERCLAIM against EMG Technology, LLC by Barnes & Noble, Inc..(McNabnay, Neil)
November 30, 2009 Filing 184 EMG Technology LLC's ANSWER to 173 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Dell, Inc. by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
November 27, 2009 Filing 183 EMG Technology, LLC's ANSWER to 171 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Apple, Inc. by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
November 25, 2009 Filing 182 PLAINTIFF EMG TECHNOLOGY LLC'S ANSWER to 174 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim OF AMERICAN AIRLINES by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
November 25, 2009 Filing 181 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert M Parker on behalf of EMG Technology, LLC (Parker, Robert)
November 23, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 180 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Marriott International, Inc. to 12/11/2009. 29 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 23, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 178 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Hyatt Corporation to 12/11/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 20, 2009 Filing 180 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Marriott International, Inc..(Guaragna, John)
November 20, 2009 Filing 179 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Guaragna on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. (Guaragna, John)
November 19, 2009 Filing 178 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hyatt Corporation.( Genet, Russell)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting 176 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control and Discovery Orders. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/12/09. cc:attys 11-12-09(mll, )
November 10, 2009 Filing 176 Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket and Discovery Orders by EMG Technology, LLC, Apple, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Dell Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
November 9, 2009 Filing 175 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Constance M Boland for American Airlines, Inc.. (mll, )
November 6, 2009 Filing 174 American Airline's ANSWER to 159 Amended Complaint Fifth of EMG, COUNTERCLAIM against EMG Technology, LLC by American Airlines, Inc..(Rambin, Daymon)
November 6, 2009 Filing 173 Dell's ANSWER to 159 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Dell Inc. by Dell Inc..(Genet, Russell)
November 6, 2009 Filing 172 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell J Genet on behalf of Dell Inc. (Genet, Russell)
November 6, 2009 Filing 171 Apple Inc.'s ANSWER to 159 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against EMG Technology, LLC by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Stephens, Garland)
November 3, 2009 Filing 170 Return of Service Executed as to Marriott International, Inc. on 10/22/2009, by personal service; answer due: 11/12/2009. (mll, )
November 3, 2009 Filing 169 Return of Service Executed as to Hyatt Corporation on 10/22/2009, by personal service; answer due: 11/12/2009. (mll, )
November 3, 2009 Filing 168 Return of Service Executed as to Barnes & Noble, Inc. on 10/22/2009, by personal service. (mll, )
November 3, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 167 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Barnes & Noble, Inc. to 12/11/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
November 3, 2009 Filing 167 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Barnes & Noble, Inc..( McNabnay, Neil)
November 2, 2009 Filing 166 PLAINTIFF AND COUNTER-DEFENDANT EMG TECHNOLOGY LLCS ANSWER to 152 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of DEFENDANT AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
November 2, 2009 Filing 165 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney David C McKone for American Airlines, Inc.. (mll, )
October 30, 2009 Filing 164 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Richard D Rochford for American Airlines, Inc.. (mll, )
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting 161 Motion to Modify the Docket Control and Discovery Orders. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/27/09. cc:attys 10-28-09 (mll, )
October 27, 2009 Filing 162 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell J Genet on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (Genet, Russell)
October 26, 2009 Filing 161 Agreed MOTION re 100 Order, 99 Order to Modify the Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Apple, Inc., American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lane, John)
October 22, 2009 Filing 160 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Hyatt Corporation, Marriott International, Inc., Barnes & Noble, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
October 20, 2009 Filing 159 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Fifth) against all defendants, filed by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Patent No. 7,441,196, # 2 Exhibit B - Patent No. 7,020,845)(Ainsworth, Charles)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER granting 154 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this case between pltf and deft Bloomberg LP are DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own fees and expenses. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/20/09. cc:attys 10-20-09 (mll, )
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 150 Motion to Dismiss. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this case between pltf and deft United Parcel Service Inc are DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own fees and expenses. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/20/09. cc:attys 10-20-09 (mll, )
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER re 142 Sealed Patent Document, and granting pltf's Motion for Leave to File its Fifth Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/20/09. cc:attys 10-20-09(mll, )
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting 151 Motion for Extension of Time to File Certain Deadlines. The deadline for American Airlines, Inc. to answer the Fourth AmendedComplaint is October 14, 2009. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for American Airlines, Inc. to submit its Initial Disclosures is October 14, 2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/16/2009. (gsg)
October 14, 2009 Filing 154 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by EMG Technology, LLC, Bloomberg, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
October 14, 2009 Filing 153 NOTICE of Disclosure by American Airlines, Inc. (Rambin, Daymon)
October 14, 2009 Filing 152 ANSWER to 116 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against EMG Technology, LLC by American Airlines, Inc..(Rambin, Daymon)
October 14, 2009 Filing 151 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon)
October 13, 2009 Filing 150 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by EMG Technology, LLC, United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting 148 Defendants' Agreed Motion to Modify the Docket Control and Discovery Orders. It is therefore ORDERED that the Defendants AgreedMotion to Modify the Docket Control and Discovery Orders is hereby in all things GRANTED and that the deadline for the Defendants compliance with P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 is extended from October 14, 2009 to October 28, 2009 and that the deadlines for (1) Plaintiff to produce documents under paragraph 2.B. of the Discovery Order, (2) Defendants to begin rolling document production under paragraph 2.C.i. of the Discovery Order, and (3) the parties to produce a complete computation of any category of damages under paragraph 2.D. of theDiscovery Order is extended from October 19, 2009 to November 2, 2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/13/2009. (kls, )
October 12, 2009 Filing 148 Agreed MOTION To Modify The Docket Control and Discovery Orders by Apple, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Bloomberg, L.P., Dell Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lane, John)
October 5, 2009 Filing 147 Plaintiff and CounterDefendant EMG's ANSWER to 130 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Apple, Inc. by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER granting 144 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for American Airlines Inc to answer the Fourth Amended Complaint is 10-12-2009. The deadline for American Airlines Inc to submit its Initial Disclosures is 10-12-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/29/09. cc:attys 9-30-09(mll, )
September 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting 143 Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order. The deadline for defts' compliance with PR 3-3 and PR 3-4 is extended to 10-14-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/29/09. cc:attys 9-30-09 (mll, )
September 28, 2009 Filing 144 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
September 28, 2009 Filing 143 Unopposed MOTION re 100 Order To Modify The Docket Control Order With Respect To P.R. 3-3 And 3-4 by Apple, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Bloomberg, L.P., Dell Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lane, John)
September 25, 2009 Filing 142 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Fifth Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
September 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting 139 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Continental Airlines, Inc. EMG Technology, LLC,. ORDERS that all claims and counterclaims asserted in this case between Plaintiff EMG Technology, LLC and Defendant Continental Airlines, Inc are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/24/2009. (gsg)
September 23, 2009 Filing 140 Return of Service Executed as to Dell Inc. on 9/3/2009, by personal service. (mll, )
September 23, 2009 Filing 139 Joint MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by EMG Technology, LLC, Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
September 23, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 132 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Dell Inc. to 10/23/2009. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
September 22, 2009 Filing 138 NOTICE of Disclosure by EMG Technology, LLC NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SECOND AMENDED P.R. 3-1 DISCLOSURES (Ainsworth, Charles)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting 136 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for United Parcel Service Inc to answer the Fourth Amended Complaint is 10-21-2009, and the deadline for United Parcel Service Inc to submit its Initial Disclosures is 10-21-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/22/09. cc:attys 9-22-09 (mll, )
September 21, 2009 Filing 136 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Abhyankar, Siraj)
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting 122 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that Plaintiff EMG Technology, LLC is granted leave pursuant to Patent Rule 3-6(b) to amend its Patent Rule 3-1 Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions as set forth in Exhibit A to the Motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/21/2009. (kls, )
September 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 133 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Bloomberg LP to answer the Fourth Amended Complaint is 10-02-2009. The deadline for Bloomberg LP to submit its Initial Disclosures is 10-02-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/21/09. cc:attys 9-21-09 (mll, )
September 18, 2009 Filing 133 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Bloomberg, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rambin, Daymon)
September 18, 2009 Filing 132 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Fourth Amended Complaint re Dell Inc..( Barrett, Michael)
September 18, 2009 Filing 131 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael C Barrett on behalf of Dell Inc. (Barrett, Michael)
September 18, 2009 Filing 130 Defendant Apple Inc.'s ANSWER to 116 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against EMG Technology, LLC by Apple, Inc..(Healey, David)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting 128 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for American Airlines Inc to answer the Fourth Amended Complaint is 9-28-2009. The deadline for American Airlines Inc to submit its Initial Disclosures is 9-28-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/17/09. cc:attys 9-17-09 (mll, )
September 16, 2009 Filing 128 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
September 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting 126 Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order with Respect to PR 3-3 and PR 3-4. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/16/09. cc:attys 9-16-09(mll, )
September 15, 2009 Filing 126 Unopposed MOTION re 100 Order To Modify The Docket Control Order With Respect To P.R. 3-3 And 3-4 by Apple, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Bloomberg, L.P., Continental Airlines, Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lane, John)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting 124 Motion to Amend/Correct Discovery Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/11/09. cc:attys 9-11-09 (mll, )
September 10, 2009 Filing 124 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 99 Order by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boyd, Steven)
September 9, 2009 Filing 123 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 122 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Infringement Contentions.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix B.1 to P.R. 3.1 Disclosures, # 2 Appendix B.2, # 3 Appendix B.3, # 4 Appendix B.4, # 5 Appendix K.1, # 6 Appendix K.2, # 7 Exhibit K.3, # 8 Appendix K.4, # 9 Appendix L.1, # 10 Appendix L.2, # 11 Appendix L.3, # 12 Appendix L.4)(Ainsworth, Charles)
September 9, 2009 Filing 122 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Infringement Contentions by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A - Second Amended 3-1 Disclosures, # 3 Appendix A to P.R. 3-1 Disclosures)(Ainsworth, Charles)
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting 118 Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order. Continental Airlines Inc's deadline to comply with Section 1 of the Discovery Order is extended by seven days from entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/04/09. cc:attys 9-08-09 (mll, )
September 3, 2009 Filing 120 NOTICE of Disclosure by EMG Technology, LLC Service of Initial Disclosures (Ainsworth, Charles)
September 3, 2009 Filing 119 NOTICE of Disclosure by Apple, Inc. re: Initial Disclosures (Lane, John)
September 3, 2009 Filing 118 MOTION to Amend/Correct 99 Order by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boyd, Steven)
September 3, 2009 Filing 117 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Dell Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
September 2, 2009 Filing 116 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Fourth Amended Complaint) against Dell Inc., Apple, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Bloomberg, L.P., Continental Airlines, Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc., filed by Dell Inc., EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Patent No. 7441196, # 2 Exhibit B - Patent No. 7020845)(Ainsworth, Charles)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER granting 113 Sealed Patent Motion for leave to file Fourth Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/31/09. cc:attys 9-01-09(mll, )
August 27, 2009 Filing 114 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. PLAINTIFF EMG TECHNOLOGY, LLC. FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Patent No. 7,441,196, # 2 Exhibit B - Patent No. 7,020,845)(Ainsworth, Charles)
August 27, 2009 Filing 113 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Fourth Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 110 Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order with Respect to P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4, and that the deadline for defts' compliance is extended to 9-16-2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/24/09. cc:attys 8-25-09(mll, )
August 21, 2009 Filing 111 PLAINTIFF AND COUNTERDEFENDANT'S ANSWER to 92 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Continental Airlines by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
August 21, 2009 Filing 110 Joint MOTION Modify Docket Control Order re P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 by EMG Technology, LLC, Apple, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Bloomberg, L.P., Continental Airlines, Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lane, John)
August 18, 2009 Filing 109 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of HOTLINE CALL held on 8/5/09 before Judge John Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, Ind.,Telephone number: (361) 949-2988. (17 pgs) NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2009. (tja, )
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 HOTLINE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/10/09. cc:attys 8-10-09(mll, )
August 5, 2009 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Hotline Conference held on 8/5/2009. (Court Reporter M. Morris.) (mjm, )
August 5, 2009 Filing 107 REPLY to Response to Motion re 91 MOTION to Dismiss EMG Technology, LLCs Claims of Alleged Contributory and Induced Infringement of the 196 Patent filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Boyd, Steven)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 105 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Nancy Claire Abernathy terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/29/09. cc:attys 7-29-09 (mll, )
July 28, 2009 Filing 105 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney N. Claire Abernathy by American Airlines, Inc., Bloomberg, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2009 Filing 104 RESPONSE in Opposition re 91 MOTION to Dismiss EMG Technology, LLCs Claims of Alleged Contributory and Induced Infringement of the 196 Patent of Continental Airlines, Inc. filed by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Shawn G. Hansen, # 2 Exhibit A - FRCP Form 18, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
July 23, 2009 Filing 103 Plaintiff and CounterDefendant's ANSWER to 93 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of Apple, Inc. by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
July 23, 2009 Filing 102 Plaintiff and CounterDefendant's ANSWER to 90 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of American Airlines, Inc. by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
July 23, 2009 Filing 101 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 89 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of UPS by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
July 20, 2009 Set Deadlines per 100 Docket Control Order: Amended Pleadings due by 3/18/2010; Respond to Amended Pleadings by 4-01-2010. Discovery due by 9/3/2010. Expert Witness List due by 7/23/2010; Rebuttal Expert Witnesses designated by 8-04-2010. Identify trial witnesses by 9/17/2010; Reubttal Trial Witnesses identified by 9-28-2010. Joinder of Parties due by 6/6/2009, for pltf; 8-21-2009 for defts. Mediation Completion due by 5/19/2010. Judge Robert Faulkner is appointed as Mediator in this case. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2010; Response to Dispositive Motions due 10-20-2010. Jury Selection set for 1/3/2011 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2011 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 6/3/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2010 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Expected Length of Trial is five days. (mll, )
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/20/09. cc:attys 7-20-09(mll, )
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/20/09. cc:attys 7-20-09(mll, )
July 17, 2009 Filing 98 NOTICE of Disclosure by EMG Technology, LLC of Service of Plaintiff's First Amended Patent Rule 3-1 Disclosures (Ainsworth, Charles)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 95 Motion for Leave to File. Pltf EMG Technology LLC is granted leave to amend its Patent Rule 3-1 Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions as set forth in Exhibit A to the Motion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/14/09. cc:attys 7-14-09 (mll, )
July 13, 2009 Filing 96 NOTICE by EMG Technology, LLC, Apple, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Bloomberg, L.P., Continental Airlines, Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc. Parties' Agreed Submission of Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Discovery Order, # 2 Exhibit B- Proposed Docket Control Order)(Healey, David)
July 13, 2009 Filing 95 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File (to Amend Infringement Contentions) by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed First Amended Infringement Contentions and Appendix, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
July 10, 2009 Filing 94 ANSWER to 78 Amended Complaint by Bloomberg, L.P..(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 10, 2009 Filing 93 Defendant Apple Inc's ANSWER to 78 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against EMG Technology, LLC by Apple, Inc..(Healey, David)
July 10, 2009 Filing 92 Defendant Continental Airlines, Inc.'s ANSWER to 78 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM to Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against EMG Technology, LLC by Continental Airlines, Inc..(Boyd, Steven)
July 10, 2009 Filing 91 MOTION to Dismiss EMG Technology, LLCs Claims of Alleged Contributory and Induced Infringement of the 196 Patent by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boyd, Steven)
July 10, 2009 Filing 90 ANSWER to 78 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against EMG Technology, LLC by American Airlines, Inc..(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
July 10, 2009 Filing 89 Defendant United Parcel Service, Inc.'s ANSWER to 78 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against EMG Technology, LLC by United Parcel Service, Inc..(Abhyankar, Siraj)
July 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 87 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for parties to file proposed docket control and discovery orders is extended to 7-13-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/07/09. cc:attys 7-07-09 (mll, )
July 6, 2009 Filing 87 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL AND DISCOVERY ORDER ON BEHALF OF ALL PARTIES by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 85 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for parties to file proposed docket control and discovery orders is extended to 7-06-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/30/09. cc:attys 6-30-09 (mll, )
June 29, 2009 Filing 85 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL AND DISCOVERY ORDER ON BEHALF OF ALL PARTIES by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 24, 2009 Filing 84 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kelsey I Nix for Bloomberg, L.P. (kls, )
June 24, 2009 Filing 83 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John M DiMatteo for Bloomberg, L.P. (kls, )
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 81 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control and Discovery Orders. Deadline is extended to June 29, 2009. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/23/2009. (gsg)
June 22, 2009 Filing 81 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL AND DISCOVERY ORDER ON BEHALF OF ALL PARTIES by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 77 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 6/22/09. (mjc, )
June 19, 2009 Filing 79 Additional Attachments to Main Document: 78 Amended Complaint.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Patent No. 7,441,196, # 2 Exhibit B - Patent No. 7,020,845)(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 18, 2009 Filing 78 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Apple, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Bloomberg, L.P., Continental Airlines, Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc., filed by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 18, 2009 Filing 77 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Third Party Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 75 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for parties to file proposed docket control and discovery orders is extended to 6-22-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/16/09. cc:attys 6-16-09 (mll, )
June 15, 2009 Filing 75 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File PROPOSED DOCKET CONTROL AND DISCOVERY ORDER ON BEHALF OF ALL PARTIES by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 5, 2009 Filing 74 NOTICE of Disclosure by EMG Technology, LLC OF SERVICE OF P.R. 3-1 AND 3-2 DISCLOSURES (Ainsworth, Charles)
June 5, 2009 Filing 73 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Apple, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Bloomberg, L.P., Continental Airlines, Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc., filed by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - '196 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B - '845 Patent)(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER that parties submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 6-15-09. The Court deems 6-15-09 as the effective Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference date, and thus pltf's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures will be due 6-05-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/02/09. cc:attys 6-02-09(mll, )
June 1, 2009 ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love and Judge Davis: Status Conference held on 6/1/2009. (refer to document #71) (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (mjm, )
June 1, 2009 Filing 71 Minute Entry -- 6.1.2009 Status Conference for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love: Status Conference held on 6/1/2009. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 -- Attorney Sign-In Sheet) (rlf, )
April 22, 2009 Filing 70 Plaintiff EMG's ANSWER to 59 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, of Apple, Inc. by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER setting Status Conference for 6/1/2009 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis and Judge John Love. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/21/09. cc:attys 4-21-09(mll, )
April 17, 2009 Filing 68 Plaintiff EMG's ANSWER to 56 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by UPS by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
April 17, 2009 Filing 67 Plaintiff EMG's ANSWER to 58 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Continental by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
April 9, 2009 Filing 66 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert James McAughan, Jr on behalf of Continental Airlines, Inc. (McAughan, Robert)
April 9, 2009 Filing 65 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven S Boyd on behalf of Continental Airlines, Inc. (Boyd, Steven)
April 8, 2009 Filing 64 Plaintiff's ANSWER to 49 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim of American Airlines by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
April 3, 2009 Filing 63 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Shawn G Hansen for EMG Technology, LLC. (mll, )
April 2, 2009 Filing 62 NOTICE by EMG Technology, LLC THAT CASE IS READY FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Ainsworth, Charles)
April 1, 2009 Filing 61 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Continental Airlines, Inc. (Andrews, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2009 Filing 60 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc. (Healey, David)
March 31, 2009 Filing 59 ANSWER to 29 Amended Complaint, Apple Inc.'s Answers, Affirmative Defenses And Counterclaims To EMG Technology, LLC's Second Amended Complaint For Patent Infringement, COUNTERCLAIM against EMG Technology, LLC by Apple, Inc..(Healey, David)
March 31, 2009 Filing 58 ANSWER to 29 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against EMG Technology, LLC by Continental Airlines, Inc..(Andrews, Jeffrey)
March 31, 2009 Filing 57 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. (Abhyankar, Siraj)
March 31, 2009 Filing 56 United Parcel Service, Inc.'s ANSWER to 29 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against EMG Technology, LLC by United Parcel Service, Inc..(Abhyankar, Siraj)
March 19, 2009 Filing 55 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Airlines, Inc. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 16, 2009 Filing 54 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Patrick J Flinn for United Parcel Service, Inc.. (mll, )
March 16, 2009 Filing 53 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert L Lee for United Parcel Service, Inc.. (mll, )
March 16, 2009 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of American Airlines, Inc., Bloomberg, L.P. (Rambin, Daymon)
March 16, 2009 Filing 51 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nancy Claire Abernathy on behalf of American Airlines, Inc., Bloomberg, L.P. (Abernathy, Nancy)
March 16, 2009 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of American Airlines, Inc., Bloomberg, L.P. (Capshaw, Sidney)
March 16, 2009 Filing 49 ANSWER to 29 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against EMG Technology, LLC by American Airlines, Inc..(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 16, 2009 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bloomberg, L.P. (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 16, 2009 Filing 47 ANSWER to 29 Amended Complaint, by Bloomberg, L.P..(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 29 Second Amended Complaint. Apple Inc is given to 3-31-09 to move, answer or otherwise respond to EMG's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/16/09. cc:attys 3-16-09 (mll, )
March 16, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 45 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for United Parcel Service, Inc. to 3/31/2009. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
March 16, 2009 Filing 45 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re United Parcel Service, Inc..(Abhyankar, Siraj)
March 13, 2009 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 29 Amended Complaint, SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR APPLE INC. TO MOVE, ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Healey, David)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 29 Amended Complaint. Continental Airlines Inc shall be permitted to answer or otherwise respond to pltf's Second Amended Complaint up to and including 3-31-09. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/13/09. cc:attys 3-13-09 (mll, )
March 12, 2009 Filing 42 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 29 Amended Complaint, for CONTINENTAL AIRLINES, INC. by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
March 4, 2009 Filing 41 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Robert D Becker for EMG Technology, LLC. (mll, )
February 23, 2009 Filing 40 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Siraj Abhyankar for United Parcel Service, Inc.. (mll, )
February 23, 2009 Filing 39 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer R Liotta for United Parcel Service, Inc.. (mll, )
February 17, 2009 Filing 38 Return of Service Executed as to Continental Airlines, Inc. on 2/6/2009, by personal service. (mll, )
February 17, 2009 Filing 37 Return of Service Executed as to United Parcel Service, Inc. on 2/2/2009, by personal service. (mll, )
February 17, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 36 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for United Parcel Service, Inc. to 3/16/2009. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
February 13, 2009 Filing 36 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re United Parcel Service, Inc..( Cook, Jason)
February 10, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 35 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for American Airlines, Inc. to 3/16/2009. 27 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
February 6, 2009 Filing 35 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Airlines, Inc..( Baxter, Samuel)
February 5, 2009 Filing 34 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Continental Airlines, Inc.. (mll, )
February 5, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint 31 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple, Inc. to 3/16/2009. ( mll, )
February 4, 2009 Filing 33 Return of Service Executed as to Bloomberg, L.P. on 1/8/2009, by personal service. (mll, )
February 4, 2009 Filing 32 Return of Service Executed as to Apple, Inc. on 1/12/2009, by personal service. (mll, )
February 4, 2009 Filing 31 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple, Inc..( Healey, David)
January 30, 2009 Filing 30 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to United Parcel Service, Inc.. (mll, )
January 30, 2009 Filing 29 ***CORRECTED DOCUMENT. REPLACES 28 .***AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT) against Apple, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Bloomberg, L.P., Continental Airlines, Inc., United Parcel Service, Inc., filed by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ainsworth, Charles) Modified on 1/30/2009 (mjc ).
January 30, 2009 Filing 28 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT) against United Parcel Service, Inc., Apple, Inc., American Airlines, Inc., Bloomberg, L.P., Continental Airlines, Inc., filed by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ainsworth, Charles) Modified on 1/30/2009 (mjc ).
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/30/09. cc:attys 1-30-09 (mll, )
January 29, 2009 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
January 29, 2009 NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the 25 Motion for Leave to File submitted by EMG Technology, LLC. The Certificate of Conference is deficient. Correction should be made and document refiled by 1/30/09. (mjc )
January 29, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 24 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for American Airlines, Inc. to 3/16/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
January 29, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 23 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Continental Airlines, Inc. to 3/16/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
January 28, 2009 Filing 25 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) Modified on 1/29/2009 (mjc ).
January 27, 2009 Filing 24 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re American Airlines, Inc..( McKool, Mike)
January 26, 2009 Filing 23 Defendant CONTINENTAL AIRLINES, INC. Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint filed by EMG Technology, LLC, Plaintiff.( Ainsworth, Charles)
January 16, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint 22 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple, Inc. to 3/16/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
January 16, 2009 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 21 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Bloomberg, L.P. to 3/16/2009. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
January 15, 2009 Filing 22 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple, Inc.( Healey, David)
January 15, 2009 Filing 21 Defendant Bloomberg, L.P.'s Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
January 14, 2009 Filing 20 Return of Service Executed as to Continental Airlines, Inc. on 1/8/2009, by personal service; answer due: 1/28/2009. (mll, )
January 14, 2009 Filing 19 Return of Service Executed as to American Airlines, Inc. on 1/8/2009, by personal service; answer due: 1/28/2009. (mll, )
January 12, 2009 Filing 18 NOTICE by EMG Technology, LLC OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, OF The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc. (Ainsworth, Charles)
January 12, 2009 Filing 17 FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of The Weather Channel without Prejudice by EMG Technology, LLC (Ainsworth, Charles) Modified on 1/12/2009 (gsg).
January 9, 2009 Filing 16 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (mll, )
January 7, 2009 Filing 15 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to American Airlines, Inc., Bloomberg, L.P., Continental Airlines, Inc.. (mll, )
January 5, 2009 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement) against American Airlines, Inc., Bloomberg, L.P., Continental Airlines, Inc., The Weather Channel Interactive, Inc., Apple, Inc., filed by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Ainsworth, Charles)
December 12, 2008 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 11 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple, Inc. to 1/14/2009. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
December 10, 2008 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John R Lane on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Lane, John)
December 10, 2008 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Garland T Stephens on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Stephens, Garland)
December 10, 2008 Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc.( Healey, David)
December 10, 2008 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David J Healey on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Healey, David)
December 9, 2008 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Apple, Inc. on 11/25/2008, by personal service; answer due: 12/15/2008. (mll, )
December 5, 2008 Filing 8 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Joshua S Hodas for EMG Technology, LLC. (mll, )
December 5, 2008 Filing 7 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stanley M Gibson for EMG Technology, LLC. (mll, )
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the pltf file a notice that the case is ready for scheduling conference when all of the defts have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/25/08. cc:pltf 11-25-08(mll, )
November 24, 2008 Filing 5 E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Apple, Inc.. (mll, )
November 24, 2008 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
November 24, 2008 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of EMG Technology, LLC (Bunt, Robert)
November 24, 2008 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EMG Technology, LLC (Ainsworth, Charles)
November 24, 2008 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles)
November 24, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000001777958.), filed by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ainsworth, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMG Technology, LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMG Technology, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?