White v. Director, TDCJ-ID
Petitioner: Richard Lynn White
Respondent: DIRECTOR, TDCJ-ID
Case Number: 6:2009cv00502
Filed: November 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Brazoria
Presiding Judge: Judith K. Guthrie
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Schneider
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING 33 Report and Recommendations of the US Magistrate Judge and Denying 32 Motion for Relief From Judgment. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 7/8/2012. (leh, )
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 23 Report and Recommendations, and DENYING 22 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Richard Lynn White. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/8/2010. (gsg)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT for 18 Report and Recommendations. ORDERED that the application for the writ of habeas corpus be and hereby is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/16/2010. (gsg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Director, TDCJ-ID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Lynn White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DIRECTOR, TDCJ-ID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?