Wolf v. Rudd et al
Plaintiff: David Paul Wolf
Defendant: Robecca Rudd, Lannette Linthicum, Owen Murray, Denise DeShields, Allen Sapp and Janie Allison
Case Number: 6:2010cv00381
Filed: August 9, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Presiding Judge: John D. Love
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER ADOPTING 86 Report and Recommendations, granting 77 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Janie Allison, and dismissing with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. All motions by either party not previously ruled on are hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/30/13. (mll, )
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 49 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by David Paul Wolf. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 9/10/2012. (gsg)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING 30 Report and Recommendations. Pltf may proceed with his claim for denial of access to medical care against deft Allison. Pltf's remaining claims against defts Rudd, Linthicum, Murray, Deshields and Sapp are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/06/11. cc:attys 9-06-11(mll, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolf v. Rudd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Paul Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robecca Rudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lannette Linthicum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Owen Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise DeShields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Sapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janie Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?