Chance v. Texas Department of Criminal Justice et al
Plaintiff: William E. Chance, Jr.
Defendant: Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Brad Livingston, Cynthia Lowery, Bill Pierce and Edgar Baker
Case Number: 6:2011cv00435
Filed: August 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: John D. Love
Presiding Judge: Michael H. Schneider
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION and ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 1 Complaint. ORDERED that the cause of action is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to the Parties joint stipulation of settlement. All parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/14/2014. (gsg)
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Order adopting 71 Second Report and Recommendations of the US Magistrate Judge. It is ORDERED that the Defendants' 59 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and the complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. All motions by either party not previously ruled on are DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 8/8/2012. (leh, )
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER adopting 30 Report and Recommendations of the US Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's 8 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction and 24 Motion for Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction are DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/17/11. (leh, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chance v. Texas Department of Criminal Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E. Chance, Jr.
Represented By: Scott Medlock
Represented By: Brian Rolland McGiverin
Represented By: Wayne Krause
Represented By: James C. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Department of Criminal Justice
Represented By: Kimberly Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Livingston
Represented By: Kimberly Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Lowery
Represented By: Kimberly Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Pierce
Represented By: Kimberly Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgar Baker
Represented By: Kimberly Fuchs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?