EMG Technology, LLC v. Google Inc Featured Case
Plaintiff: EMG Technology, LLC
Defendant: Google Inc
Case Number: 6:2012cv00439
Filed: July 10, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2013 Filing 26 Order reassigning this case to United States District Judge Michael H. Schneider per General Order 13-3. Please see Appendix D: Addendum Regarding Cases Assigned to Judge Schneider. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (tlh, )
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Randy Wulff added as Mediator. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/02/13. cc:attys 1-04-13(mll, )
December 10, 2012 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Klein Ayers on behalf of Google Inc (Ayers, Jennifer)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. This civil action is CONSOLIDATED for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv259 shall serve as the Lead Case for consolidated issues. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the Lead Case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order, and each of the respective orders shall be filed in the lead case by 12-10-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/27/12. cc:attys 11-27-12(mll, )
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties shall submit the proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order no later than 12-03-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/27/12. cc:attys 11-27-12 (mll, )
November 27, 2012 This Civil Action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 6:12cv259, which is designated as the Lead Case. All future pleadings, except for venue motions, should be filed in the Lead Case. (mll, )
November 21, 2012 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by EMG Technology, LLC, Google Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schortgen, Steven)
November 20, 2012 Filing 20 NOTICE by EMG Technology, LLC OF SERVICE OF PR 3-1 AND 3-2 (Ainsworth, Charles)
November 14, 2012 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 11/14/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign In Sheets) (rlf)
November 1, 2012 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 11/14/2012 at 10:30 AM is moved to 1:00 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. (cwk)
October 19, 2012 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Bryan J Sinclair on behalf of Google Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-3837426. (Sinclair, Bryan)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER setting Status Conference for 11/14/2012 10:30 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/16/12. cc:attys 10-17-12(mll, )
October 15, 2012 Filing 16 EMG Technology LLC's ANSWER to 12 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Google, Inc. by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
September 24, 2012 Filing 15 NOTICE by EMG Technology, LLC that Case if Ready for Scheduling Conference (Ainsworth, Charles)
September 19, 2012 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Klein Ayers on behalf of Google Inc (Ayers, Jennifer)
September 19, 2012 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Google Inc (Ayers, Jennifer)
September 19, 2012 Filing 12 Original ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against EMG Technology, LLC by Google Inc.(Schortgen, Steven)
September 4, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 11 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google Inc to 9/19/2012. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
August 30, 2012 Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google Inc. (Schortgen, Steven)
July 27, 2012 Filing 10 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Gregory S Cordrey for EMG Technology, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID #6-9727) (bsw, ) (Main Document 10 replaced on 7/27/2012) (bsw, ).
July 27, 2012 Filing 9 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Stanley M Gibson for EMG Technology, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID #6-9727) (bsw, )
July 27, 2012 Filing 8 APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Ali Shalchi for EMG Technology, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID #6-9727) (bsw, )
July 23, 2012 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Google Inc on 7/12/2012, by personal service. (mll, )
July 19, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 6 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Google Inc to 9/4/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
July 17, 2012 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Google Inc.( Jones, Michael)
July 10, 2012 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Google Inc, and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
July 10, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of EMG Technology, LLC (Bunt, Robert)
July 10, 2012 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EMG Technology, LLC (Ainsworth, Charles)
July 10, 2012 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles)
July 10, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Google Inc ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3671241.), filed by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A '196 Patent, # 3 Exhibit B '196 Reexam)(Ainsworth, Charles)
July 10, 2012 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMG Technology, LLC v. Google Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMG Technology, LLC
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Gregory S Cordrey
Represented By: Stanley M Gibson
Represented By: Ali Shalchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?