PersonalWeb Technologies LLC et al v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: PersonalWeb Technologies LLC and Level 3 Communications, LLC
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 6:2012cv00660
Filed: September 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2014 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. CASE: 6:12-cv-00660DETAILS: Case transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 4:14-cv-01683, filed 04/11/2014. (mll, )
March 10, 2014 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California. (mll, )
February 25, 2014 Filing 104 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Marc M Seltzer on behalf of PersonalWeb Technologies LLC (Seltzer, Marc)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 102 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Audrey M Calkins terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/24/14. (mll, )
February 21, 2014 Filing 102 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Audrey M. Calkins by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
February 12, 2014 This civil action will be transferred to the Northern District of California on or after 3-04-2014, per Local Rule CV-83(b). (mll, )
February 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 45 Sealed Patent Motion to Transfer Venue, and transferring this civil action to the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/12/14. (mll, )
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/17/14. (mll, )
January 15, 2014 Filing 99 Joint MOTION TO AMEND DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jay, Michael)
January 10, 2014 Filing 98 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re 91 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL APPLES REVENUE AND FINANCIAL INFORMATION filed by Apple Inc.. (Ringgenberg, Kieran)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting 96 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 91 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL APPLES REVENUE AND FINANCIAL INFORMATION; Sur-Reply due by 1/10/2014. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/06/14. (mll, )
January 3, 2014 Filing 96 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Opposition to PersonalWeb Technology, LLC's Motion to Compel by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ringgenberg, Kieran)
December 27, 2013 Filing 95 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re 91 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL APPLES REVENUE AND FINANCIAL INFORMATION filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Hockensmith, Adam)
December 20, 2013 Filing 94 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nandan R Padmanabhan on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4452230. (Padmanabhan, Nandan)
December 16, 2013 Filing 93 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 91 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL APPLES REVENUE AND FINANCIAL INFORMATION filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark Buckley, # 2 Declaration of Kieran Ringgenberg, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Ringgenberg, Kieran)
December 10, 2013 Filing 92 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kieran Paul Ringgenberg on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4437750. (Ringgenberg, Kieran)
November 27, 2013 Filing 91 SEALED MOTION TO COMPEL APPLES REVENUE AND FINANCIAL INFORMATION by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kalpana Srinivasan, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Kalpana)
November 12, 2013 Filing 90 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Adam Tyler Hockensmith on behalf of PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4399892. (Hockensmith, Adam)
November 1, 2013 Filing 89 REPORT of Mediation by David Folsom. Mediation result: impasse(Folsom, David)
October 30, 2013 Filing 88 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Compliance With P.R. 3-7 Regarding Willfulness Production (Smith, Melissa)
October 17, 2013 Filing 87 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Audrey M Calkins on behalf of PersonalWeb Technologies LLC (Calkins, Audrey)
October 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying 79 Notice of Request for Hearing filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 10/07/13. (mll, )
October 3, 2013 Filing 85 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Completion of Venue Discovery (Smith, Melissa)
September 27, 2013 Filing 84 REPLY to Response to Motion re 80 MOTION for Reconsideration For Partial Reconsideration Of Markman Order As To A Limited Aspect Of Two Claim Terms filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - March 20, 2013 Patent Owner Prelim Response Re Patent No. 8,001,096)(Tribble, Max)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 82 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Parties' deadline for completing mediation is extended to 11-01-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/17/13. (mll, )
September 16, 2013 Filing 82 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery To Complete Mediation by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
September 16, 2013 Filing 81 RESPONSE in Opposition re 80 MOTION for Reconsideration For Partial Reconsideration Of Markman Order As To A Limited Aspect Of Two Claim Terms filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 28, 2013 Filing 80 MOTION for Reconsideration For Partial Reconsideration Of Markman Order As To A Limited Aspect Of Two Claim Terms by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Tribble, Max)
August 12, 2013 Filing 79 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Request for Hearing (Smith, Melissa)
August 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/06/13. (mll, )
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. The Court interprets the claim language in this case in the manner set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/13. (mll, )
July 18, 2013 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman Hearing held on 7/18/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf)
July 12, 2013 Filing 75 NOTICE by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC of Compliance Regarding Technical Tutorial (Tribble, Max)
July 9, 2013 Filing 74 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Joseph E Lasher on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4214139. (Lasher, Joseph)
July 8, 2013 Filing 73 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE as to JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Joint Claim Construction Chart)(McMillian, Ashley)
July 8, 2013 Filing 72 NOTICE by Apple Inc., PersonalWeb Technologies LLC Joint Notice to Court on Estimated Amount of Time Requested for Claim Construction Hearing (McMillian, Ashley)
July 8, 2013 Filing 71 REPLY 62 Claim Construction Brief,, filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Declaration of Jeffrey Huang, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Tribble, Max)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 68 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties' deadline to file the Joint Statement on Time Requested for the Markman Hearing is extended to 7-08-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/08/13. (mll, )
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 67 Motion for Extension of Time to File PersonalWeb's Reply to Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief. Reply due by 7/8/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/3/13. (mjc, )
June 28, 2013 Filing 68 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Statement on Time Requested for Markman Hearing by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillian, Ashley)
June 28, 2013 Filing 67 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Its Reply to Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillian, Ashley)
June 24, 2013 Filing 66 RESPONSE to 62 Opening Claim Construction Brief,, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Hagy Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N)(Smith, Melissa)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 64 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/21/13. (mll, )
June 20, 2013 Filing 64 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CONSOLIDATED CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF IN EXCESS OF PAGES ALLOWED FOR SINGLE BRIEF by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
June 13, 2013 Filing 63 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael D Jay (Jay, Michael)
June 5, 2013 Filing 62 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ashley McMillian, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Agreed Constructions, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Constructions, # 4 Exhibit 3 - 5,978,791 Patent, # 5 Exhibit 4 - 6,415,280 Patent, # 6 Exhibit 5 - 6,928,442 Patent, # 7 Exhibit 6 - 7,802,310 Patent, # 8 Exhibit 7 - 7,945,539 Patent, # 9 Exhibit 8 - 7,945,544 Patent, # 10 Exhibit 9 - 7,949,662 Patent, # 11 Exhibit 10 - 8,001,096 Patent, # 12 Exhibit 11 - 8,099,420 Patent, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Akamai Markman Order)(Tribble, Max)
June 3, 2013 Filing 61 SEALED SUR- REPLY in Support of its Opposition re 45 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1404 filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Davida Brook in Support of PersonalWeb, LLCs Sur Reply in Support of its Opposition to Apple Inc.s Motion to Transfer Venue, # 2 Exhibit 13, # 3 Exhibit 14, # 4 Exhibit 15)(Tribble, Max)
May 23, 2013 Filing 60 SEALED PATENT REPLY (APPLE INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1404) to Response to PATENT Motion re 45 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1404 filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Buckley Declaration)(Smith, Melissa)
May 21, 2013 Filing 59 SEALED RESPONSE of PersonalWeb Technologies, LLCs Corrected Opposition to Defendant Apple, Inc.s Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404 to Motion re 45 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1404 filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Davida Brook in Support of PersonalWeb Technologies, LLCs Corrected Opposition to Defendant Apple, Inc.s Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
May 14, 2013 Filing 58 Amended PR 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement filed by Apple Inc., PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreed Constructions, # 2 Exhibit B - Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Tribble, Max)
May 13, 2013 Filing 57 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 45 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1404 filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Davida Brook, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12)(Tribble, Max) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2013: # 14 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER appointing Richard D. Egan to the position of technical advisor in this case, with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendants and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/9/13. (mjc, )
May 8, 2013 Filing 55 NOTICE by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC of Selection of Techinical Advisor (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tribble, Max)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that parties meet and confer to reduce the number of disputed terms to a reasonable number. Parties shall file an amended P.R. 4-3 Statement within seven days. The Court also reminds parties that the page limits governing dispositive motions pursuant to Local Rule CV-7(a) apply to claim construction briefing and will not be extended absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/07/13. (mll, )
May 7, 2013 Filing 53 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Level 3 Communications, LLC, PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Tribble, Max)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 50 Motion for Extension of Time. PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC's Time To File Opposition To Apple Inc.'s Motion To Transfer Venue is extended to 5-13-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/06/13. (mll, )
May 3, 2013 Filing 51 PR 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement filed by Apple Inc., PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreed Constructions, # 2 Exhibit B - Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Tribble, Max)
May 3, 2013 Filing 50 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition To Apple Inc.s Motion To Transfer Venue by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the Parties to file the Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement in this case is 5-03-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/25/13. (mll, )
April 24, 2013 Filing 48 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction Statement by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 46 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/22/13. (mll, )
April 22, 2013 ***FILED IN ERROR. Documents # 43 and 44 motions. PLEASE IGNORE. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENTS 45 AND 46 .*** (mjc, )
April 19, 2013 Filing 46 Unopposed MOTION to Seal [#45] Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404 by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 19, 2013 Filing 45 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1404 by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Buckley Declaration, # 2 Affidavit Jay Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
April 19, 2013 Filing 44 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE CORRECTED DOCUMENT 46 .***Unopposed MOTION to Seal [#43] Apple Inc.'s Motion to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404 by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 4/22/2013 (mjc, ).
April 19, 2013 Filing 43 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEE CORRECTED FILING 45 .***Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION TO TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1404 by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Buckley Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 4/22/2013 (mjc, ).
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. David Folsom added as Mediator. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/15/13. (mll, )
April 15, 2013 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael D Jay on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4092581. (Jay, Michael)
April 12, 2013 Filing 40 NOTICE by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC Notice of Compliance with Local Patent Rule 4-2 (Srinivasan, Kalpana)
April 9, 2013 Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Donald William Ward on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4084213. (Ward, Donald)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/05/13. cc:attys 4-05-13(mll, )
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 37 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/05/13. cc:attys 4-05-13(mll, )
April 4, 2013 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order and Discovery Order by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Protective Order Regarding the Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Discovery Order)(McMillian, Ashley)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting in part 25 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part 29 Motion for Discovery Order. Parties are ORDERED to file a Discovery Order and Protective Order incorporating the rulings contained in this order within seven days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/04/13. cc:attys 4-04-13 (mll, )
March 15, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC Notice of Compliance (Srinivasan, Kalpana)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/04/13. cc:attys 3-04-13(mll, )
March 4, 2013 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of PersonalWeb Technologies LLC (Rambin, Daymon)
March 4, 2013 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of PersonalWeb Technologies LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 4, 2013 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of PersonalWeb Technologies LLC (Capshaw, Sidney)
March 1, 2013 Filing 29 Joint MOTION to Enter Discovery Order by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, Proposed Discovery Order # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) Modified on 3/6/2013 (gsg).
March 1, 2013 Filing 28 Joint MOTION to Enter E-Discovery Order by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Kalpana)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for parties to submit their agreed Protective Order is extended to 2-08-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/11/13. cc:attys 2-12-13 (mll, )
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Defendant, APPLE INC., to comply with P.R. 3-3 is extended to 2-22-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/11/13. cc:attys 2-12-13 (mll, )
February 8, 2013 Filing 25 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Srinivasan, Kalpana)
February 6, 2013 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Kalpana)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael H. Schneider recused. Case reassigned to Judge Leonard Davis for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 02/05/13. cc:attys 2-06-13(mll, )
February 1, 2013 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Comply with P.R. 3-3 by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit an Agreed Protective Order. Deadline is extended to 2/6/2013. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 1/31/13. (mjc, )
January 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time. ORDERED that the deadline for the parties to submit their agreed Protective Order is extended up to and including February 6, 2013. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 1/30/2013. (gsg)
January 30, 2013 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Apple Inc., Level 3 Communications, LLC, PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 29, 2013 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Protective Order by Apple Inc., Level 3 Communications, LLC, PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
January 24, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC Notice of Readiness for Status Conference (Tribble, Max)
January 22, 2013 Filing 16 Plaintiff Personal Web Technologies, LLCs ANSWER to 13 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC.(Tribble, Max)
January 15, 2013 Filing 15 Order reassigning this case to United States District Judge Michael H. Schneider per General Order 13-3. Please see Appendix D: Addendum Regarding Cases Assigned to Judge Schneider. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (mjc, )
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 9/30/2013. Jury Selection set for 11/3/2014 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 11/10/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 7/18/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/10/13. cc:attys 1-14-13(mll, )
December 28, 2012 Filing 13 Apple Inc.'s ANSWER to 11 Amended Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Apple Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
December 28, 2012 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Entry of Docket Control Order by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Kalpana) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2013: # 2 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
December 17, 2012 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Apple Inc., filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Tribble, Max)
December 11, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Davida P Brook on behalf of PersonalWeb Technologies LLC (Brook, Davida)
November 26, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC of Compliance of Rule 3-1 and 3-2 Preliminary Disclosures (Srinivasan, Kalpana)
November 26, 2012 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Apple Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
November 26, 2012 Filing 7 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Apple Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
October 22, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 6 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 11/26/2012. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 18, 2012 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc.(Smith, Melissa)
September 18, 2012 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc.and emailed to pltf for service. (klb)
September 18, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashley Lauren McMillian on behalf of PersonalWeb Technologies LLC (McMillian, Ashley)
September 18, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Samuel Grinstein on behalf of PersonalWeb Technologies LLC (Grinstein, Joseph)
September 17, 2012 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
September 17, 2012 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kalpana Srinivasan on behalf of PersonalWeb Technologies LLC (Srinivasan, Kalpana)
September 17, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3785191.), filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tribble, Max)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PersonalWeb Technologies LLC et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PersonalWeb Technologies LLC
Represented By: Joseph Samuel Grinstein
Represented By: Ashley Lauren McMillian
Represented By: Kalpana Srinivasan
Represented By: Max Lalon Tribble, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Level 3 Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?