PersonalWeb Technologies LLC et al v. Facebook Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: PersonalWeb Technologies LLC and Level 3 Communications, LLC
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Case Number: 6:2012cv00662
Filed: September 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: Leonard Davis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 25 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by Facebook Inc. The Clerk is ORDERED to transfer these cases to the Northern District of California. The Court hereby WAIVES the 21-day waiting period pursuant to Local Rule CV-83(b), so the cases may be transferred immediately. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/13. (mll, )
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 66 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court interprets the claim language in this case in the manner set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/05/13. (mll, )
August 5, 2013 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California. (mll, )
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 97 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brian P Wikner terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/31/13. (mll, )
July 30, 2013 Filing 98 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dena Chen on behalf of Facebook Inc. (Chen, Dena)
July 30, 2013 Filing 97 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Brian Wikner as Counsel of Record by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi)
July 29, 2013 Filing 96 NOTICE by Facebook Inc. of Disassociation of Counsel Brian Wikner (Keefe, Heidi)
July 18, 2013 Filing 95 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Markman Hearing held on 7/18/2013. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf)
July 17, 2013 Filing 94 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Aaron Kerr on behalf of Facebook Inc. (Kerr, Peter)
July 15, 2013 Filing 93 REPLY to Response to Motion re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness of Claims 30, 31, 32 and 41 of U.S. Patent No. 5,978,791 Under 35 USC § 112 2 filed by Facebook Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi)
July 12, 2013 Filing 92 NOTICE by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC of Compliance Regarding Technical Tutorial (Tribble, Max)
July 12, 2013 Filing 91 NOTICE by Facebook Inc. of Compliance Regarding Technical Tutorial (Keefe, Heidi)
July 12, 2013 Filing 90 RESPONSE in Opposition re 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness of Claims 30, 31, 32 and 41 of U.S. Patent No. 5,978,791 Under 35 USC § 112 2 filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Tribble, Max) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
July 8, 2013 Filing 89 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE as to JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Joint Claim Construction Chart)(McMillian, Ashley)
July 8, 2013 Filing 88 NOTICE by Facebook Inc., PersonalWeb Technologies LLC Joint Notice to Court on Estimated Amount of Time Requested for Claim Construction Hearing (McMillian, Ashley)
July 8, 2013 Filing 87 REPLY 60 Claim Construction Brief,, filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Declaration of Jeffrey Huang, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Tribble, Max)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting 77 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties' deadline to file the Joint Statement on Time Requested for the Markman Hearing is extended to 7-08-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/08/13. (mll, )
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/08/13. (mll, )
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 07/08/13. (mll, )
July 3, 2013 Filing 83 Joint MOTION To Enter Discovery Order by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillian, Ashley)
July 3, 2013 Filing 82 Joint MOTION To Enter E-Discovery Order by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillian, Ashley)
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 78 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Facebook's Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness. Deadline extended to 7/12/2013 at noon. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/3/13. (mjc, )
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 75 Motion to Withdraw 75 MOTION to Withdraw 71 Opposed MOTION to Enter Discovery and E-Discovery Orders. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/3/13. (mjc, )
July 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 76 Motion for Extension of Time to File PersonalWeb's Reply to Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief. Reply due by 7/8/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 7/3/13. (mjc, )
June 28, 2013 Filing 78 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Facebooks Motion for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
June 28, 2013 Filing 77 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Statement on Time Requested for Markman Hearing by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillian, Ashley)
June 28, 2013 Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Its Reply to Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillian, Ashley)
June 28, 2013 Filing 75 MOTION to Withdraw 71 Opposed MOTION to Enter Discovery and E-Discovery Orders by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillian, Ashley)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER denying 68 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/28/13. (mll, )
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 50 Motion for Clarification. Facebook and PersonalWeb shall meet and confer and submit proposed Discovery and E-Discovery Orders within seven days. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/28/13. (mll, )
June 26, 2013 Filing 72 RESPONSE in Opposition re 68 MOTION to Strike 65 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness of Claims 30, 31, 32 and 41 of U.S. Patent No. 5,978,791 Under 35 USC § 112 2 MOTION to Strike 65 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness of Claims 30, 31, 32 and 41 of U.S. Patent No. 5,978,791 Under 35 USC § 112 2 filed by Facebook Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2013: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
June 26, 2013 Filing 71 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER 80 .***Opposed MOTION to Enter Discovery and E-Discovery Orders by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit of Ashley McMillian, # 3 Exhibit 1 Proposed Discovery Order, # 4 Exhibit 2 Proposed E-Discovery Order, # 5 Exhibit 3 February 20, 2013 email from counsel for PersonalWeb to counsel for Facebook, # 6 Exhibit 4 March 28, 2013 and April 22, 2013 emails from counsel for PersonalWeb to counsel for Facebook, # 7 Exhibit 5 April 30, 2013 email from counsel for Facebook to counsel for PersonalWeb)(McMillian, Ashley) Modified on 7/3/2013 (mjc, ).
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 69 Motion for Expedited Briefing. Facebook must file its response, if any, to PersonalWeb's Motion to Strike Facebook's Untimely Letter Brief and to Strike Facebook's Motion for Summary Judgment by no later than 5:00 p.m. 6-26-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/25/13. (mll, )
June 25, 2013 Filing 69 Emergency MOTION for Expedited Briefing re 68 MOTION to Strike 65 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness of Claims 30, 31, 32 and 41 of U.S. Patent No. 5,978,791 Under 35 USC § 112 2 MOTION to Strike 65 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness of Claims 30, 31, 32 and 41 of U.S. Patent No. 5,978,791 Under 35 USC § 112 2 by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillian, Ashley)
June 25, 2013 Filing 68 MOTION to Strike 65 Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness of Claims 30, 31, 32 and 41 of U.S. Patent No. 5,978,791 Under 35 USC § 112 2 by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillian, Ashley)
June 24, 2013 Filing 67 REPLY to 60 Claim Construction Brief,, filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Amber Hagy, # 2 Exhibit A - FH of Patent No. 5,978,791, # 3 Exhibit B - FH '791 Amendment dated 08/29/1997, # 4 Exhibit C - PO Prelim Response dated 03/20/2013, # 5 Exhibit D - Decision Inter partes review dated 05/17/2013, # 6 Exhibit E - FH of Patent 6,415,280, # 7 Exhibit F - PO Prelim Response dated 03/21/2013, # 8 Exhibit G - Decision Inter Partes '280 dated 05/17/2013, # 9 Exhibit H - FH Patent 6,928,442, # 10 Exhibit I - '442 Reexam dated 07/30/2009, # 11 Exhibit J - Decision Inter Partes '539 dated 05/17/2013, # 12 Exhibit K - FH Patent 7,949,662 Amendment dated 12/29/2008, # 13 Exhibit L - FH Patent NO. 8,001,096 Amendment dated 04/12/2010, # 14 Exhibit M - PO Prelim Response '096 dated 03/20/13, # 15 Exhibit N - PWebs Disclosure of Asserted Claims)(Keefe, Heidi)
June 24, 2013 Filing 66 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Indefiniteness of Claims 30, 31, 32 and 41 of U.S. Patent No. 5,978,791 Under 35 USC § 112 2 by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Brian Wikner, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Patent No. 5,978,791, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Report and Recommendation dated 05/17/2011, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi)
June 21, 2013 Filing 65 Letter Brief filed by Facebook Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Letter Brief re Motion for Summary Judgment)(Keefe, Heidi)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 63 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/21/13. (mll, )
June 20, 2013 Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Consolidated Claim Construction Brief in Excess of Pages Allowed for Single Brief by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi)
June 10, 2013 Filing 62 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 50 MOTION for Clarification of this Court's March 21, 2013 Memorandum and Order filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Ashley McMillian in Support of PersonalWeb's Sur Reply to Facebook's Motion for Clarification, # 2 Exhibit 1 February 22, 2013 email chain between counsel for Facebook and counsel for PersonalWeb, # 3 Exhibit 2 May 10, 2013 email chain between counsel for Facebook and counsel for PersonalWeb, # 4 Exhibit 3 May 31, 2013 email chain between counsel for Facebook and counsel for PersonalWeb, # 5 Exhibit 4 January 4, 2013 Letter from counsel for PersonalWeb to counsel for Facebook)(Tribble, Max)
June 10, 2013 Filing 61 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 50 MOTION for Clarification of this Court's March 21, 2013 Memorandum and Order filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Tribble, Max) Modified on 6/10/2013 (sm, ).
June 10, 2013 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #61 SurReply submitted by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. Exhibits not properly identified per local rules. Correction should be made by 1 business day (sm, )
June 5, 2013 Filing 60 OPENING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ashley McMillian, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Agreed Constructions, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Constructions, # 4 Exhibit 3 - 5,978,791 Patent, # 5 Exhibit 4 - 6,415,280 Patent, # 6 Exhibit 5 - 6,928,442 Patent, # 7 Exhibit 6 - 7,802,310 Patent, # 8 Exhibit 7 - 7,945,539 Patent, # 9 Exhibit 8 - 7,945,544 Patent, # 10 Exhibit 9 - 7,949,662 Patent, # 11 Exhibit 10 - 8,001,096 Patent, # 12 Exhibit 11 - 8,099,420 Patent, # 13 Exhibit 12 - Akamai Markman Order)(Tribble, Max)
May 31, 2013 Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion re 50 MOTION for Clarification of this Court's March 21, 2013 Memorandum and Order filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Brian Wikner, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Wikner email dated 04/30/2013)(Keefe, Heidi)
May 20, 2013 Filing 58 RESPONSE in Opposition re 50 MOTION for Clarification of this Court's March 21, 2013 Memorandum and Order filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Davida Brook in Support of PersonalWebs Opposition to Facebooks Motion for Clarification, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Tribble, Max)
May 14, 2013 Filing 57 Amended PR 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement filed by Facebook Inc., PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreed Constructions, # 2 Exhibit B - Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Tribble, Max)
May 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER appointing Richard D. Egan to the position of technical advisor in this case, with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendants and timely paid as billed. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 5/9/13. (mjc, )
May 8, 2013 Filing 55 NOTICE by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC of Selection of Techinical Advisor (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Tribble, Max)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that parties meet and confer to reduce the number of disputed terms to a reasonable number. Parties shall file an amended P.R. 4-3 Statement within seven days. The Court also reminds parties that the page limits governing dispositive motions pursuant to Local Rule CV-7(a) apply to claim construction briefing and will not be extended absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/07/13. (mll, )
May 7, 2013 Filing 53 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Level 3 Communications, LLC, PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Tribble, Max)
May 3, 2013 Filing 52 PR 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement filed by Facebook Inc., PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Agreed Constructions, # 2 Exhibit B - Joint Claim Construction Chart)(Tribble, Max)
May 3, 2013 Filing 51 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Baxter, Samuel)
May 3, 2013 Filing 50 MOTION for Clarification of this Court's March 21, 2013 Memorandum and Order by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the Parties to file the Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement in this case is 5-03-2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/25/13. (mll, )
April 24, 2013 Filing 48 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi)
April 19, 2013 Filing 47 NOTICE by Facebook Inc. Notice of Compliance with Local Rule 4-2 (Keefe, Heidi)
April 12, 2013 Filing 46 NOTICE by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC Notice of Compliance with Local Patent Rule 4-2 (Srinivasan, Kalpana)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER conditionally granting 25 Motion to Change Venue; denying as moot 26 Motion to Stay. The Court will retain jurisdiction over all Defendants through the claim construction process. All conditional transfers will become effective the day the Court issues its claim constuction opinion. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/21/13. cc:attys 3-21-13 (mll, )
March 21, 2013 Filing 44 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) PersonalWeb Technologies, LLCs Sur-Reply in Support of its Opposition to Facebook Inc.s Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kalpana Srinivasan in Support of PersonalWeb Technologies, LLCs Sur-Reply in Support of its Opposition to Facebook Inc.s Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a), # 2 Exhibit 39 Declaration of K. Bermeister, # 3 Exhibit 40 Declaration of A. Neumann, # 4 Exhibit 41 Declaration of B. Siritzky, # 5 Exhibit 42 Declaration of M. Dyne, # 6 Exhibit 43 Declaration of M. Markiles)(Tribble, Max)
March 20, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE by Facebook Inc. Notice of Compliance (Keefe, Heidi)
March 18, 2013 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re 26 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Facebook's Motion to Transfer filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Dena Chen, # 2 Exhibit A - One Stockdug Holdings v. Becton Dickinson, # 3 Exhibit B - B.E. Tech v. Sony Computer, # 4 Exhibit C - B.E. Tech v. Facebook)(Wikner, Brian)
March 15, 2013 Filing 41 NOTICE by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC Notice of Compliance (Srinivasan, Kalpana)
March 11, 2013 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/11/13. cc:attys 3-11-13(mll, )
March 8, 2013 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Facebook's Motion to Transfer filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillian, Ashley)
March 8, 2013 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McMillian, Ashley)
March 5, 2013 Filing 36 NOTICE by Facebook Inc. of P.R. 3-3 and P.R. 3-4 Dislcosures (Keefe, Heidi)
March 4, 2013 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daymon Jeffrey Rambin on behalf of PersonalWeb Technologies LLC (Rambin, Daymon)
March 4, 2013 Filing 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of PersonalWeb Technologies LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
March 4, 2013 Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sidney Calvin Capshaw, III on behalf of PersonalWeb Technologies LLC (Capshaw, Sidney)
March 1, 2013 Filing 32 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 25 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) PersonalWeb Technologies, LLCs Opposition to Defendant Facebook Inc.s Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Davida Brook in Support of PersonalWeb Technologies, LLCs Opposition to Defendant Facebook Inc.s Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a), # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, # 27 Exhibit 26, # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28, # 30 Exhibit 29, # 31 Exhibit 30, # 32 Exhibit 31, # 33 Exhibit 32, # 34 Exhibit 33, # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35, # 37 Exhibit 36, # 38 Exhibit 37, # 39 Exhibit 38, # 40 Text of Proposed Order Denying Defendant Facebook Inc.s Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a))(Tribble, Max)
March 1, 2013 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lam Khanh Nguyen on behalf of Facebook Inc. (Nguyen, Lam)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting in part 29 Motion for Extension of Time. PersonalWeb shall have until 3-08-2013 to respond to the Motion to Stay, but it shall respond to the Motion to Transfer by 3-01-2013. Facebooks request to extend the deadline to serve its 3-3 and 3-4 disclosures to 3-01-2013 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/21/13. cc:attys 2-21-13 (mll, )
February 15, 2013 Filing 29 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File PersonalWebs Responses to Motions to (1) Transfer Venue and (2) Stay and for (3) Facebook to Serve Invalidity Contentions by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Srinivasan, Kalpana)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 9/30/2013. David Folsom is appointed as Mediator in this cause. Jury Selection set for 11/3/2014 09:00AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Jury Trial set for 11/10/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Markman Hearing set for 7/18/2013 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2014 09:00 AM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/15/13. cc:attys 2-15-13(mll, )
February 15, 2013 CASE REFERRED to Mediator. David Folsom is appointed as Mediator in this cause. (mll, )
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael H. Schneider recused. Case reassigned to Judge Leonard Davis for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 02/05/13. cc:attys 2-06-13(mll, )
February 5, 2013 Filing 26 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Facebook's Motion to Transfer by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Dena Chen, # 2 Exhibit A - In re Fusion-IO, # 3 Exhibit B - In re EMC, # 4 Exhibit C - Solid State v. STEC, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi)
February 5, 2013 Filing 25 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Jeremy Jordan, # 2 Affidavit Dena Chen, # 3 Exhibit 1 - PNO 5978791, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Kinetech Acquired by Brilliant Digital, # 5 Exhibit 3 - Kinetech Granted 3 Additional Patents, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Brilliant Digital (CA), # 7 Exhibit 5 - Altnet, # 8 Exhibit 6 - Kinetech Inc. (CA), # 9 Exhibit 7 - Digital Island, # 10 Exhibit 8 - PNO 6415280, # 11 Exhibit 9 - PNO 7802310, # 12 Exhibit 10 - Wasef Kassis, # 13 Exhibit 11 - Kevin Bermeister, # 14 Exhibit 12 - Jack Fobel, # 15 Exhibit 13 - Decl of Kevin Bermeister, # 16 Exhibit 14 - David Farber, # 17 Exhibit 15 - PNO 7802310, # 18 Exhibit 16 - PNO 5978791, # 19 Exhibit 17 - PNO 6415280, # 20 Exhibit 18 - Ronald Lachman, # 21 Exhibit 19 - Catbird Company, # 22 Exhibit 20 - Map San Franciso to Ojai, # 23 Exhibit 21 - Pillsbury Winthrop, # 24 Exhibit 22 - Map Pillsbury to courthouse, # 25 Exhibit 23 - Map Menlo Park to court, # 26 Exhibit 24 - Map San Francisco to Google, # 27 Exhibit 25 - Map San Francisco to YouTube, # 28 Exhibit 26 - Map from San Francisco to DropBox, # 29 Exhibit 27 - Map San Francisco to NetApp, # 30 Exhibit 28 - Mapl from San Francisco to Autonomy, # 31 Exhibit 29 - Map from San Francisco to Autonomy, # 32 Exhibit 30 - Map from San Francisco to Yahoo, # 33 Exhibit 31 - Mapl from San Franciso to Apple, # 34 Exhibit 32 - USDC Federal Judicial Council, # 35 Exhibit 33 - Brilliant Digital, # 36 Exhibit 34 - Cable & Wireless article, # 37 Text of Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi)
January 24, 2013 Filing 24 NOTICE by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC Notice of Readiness for Status Conference (Tribble, Max)
January 23, 2013 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION For Entry of Docket Control Order by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Docket Control Order)(Tribble, Max)
January 22, 2013 Filing 22 Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s ANSWER to 17 Amended Complaint of Plaintiffs PersonalWeb Technologies, LLC and Level 3 Communications, LLC's by Facebook Inc..(Keefe, Heidi)
January 15, 2013 Filing 21 Order reassigning this case to United States District Judge Michael H. Schneider per General Order 13-3. Please see Appendix D: Addendum Regarding Cases Assigned to Judge Schneider. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (mjc, )
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/04/13. cc:attys 1-04-13 (mll, )
January 4, 2013 Filing 19 NOTICE by Facebook Inc. of Withdrawal of Its Motion to Dismiss (Keefe, Heidi)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), or Alternative Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(F); Responses due by 1/3/2013. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/03/13. cc:attys 1-04-13 (mll, )
January 3, 2013 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement against Facebook Inc., filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Tribble, Max)
December 28, 2012 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), or Alternative Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(F); Replies due by 12/28/2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 12/26/12. cc:attys 12-26-12 (mll, )
December 21, 2012 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Keefe, Heidi)
December 14, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian P Wikner on behalf of Facebook Inc. (Wikner, Brian)
December 13, 2012 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), or Alternative Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(F) filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Appendix Ashley McMillian Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9)(Tribble, Max)
December 11, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Davida P Brook on behalf of PersonalWeb Technologies LLC (Brook, Davida)
November 27, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Heidi Lyn Keefe on behalf of Facebook Inc. (Keefe, Heidi)
November 26, 2012 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Facebook Inc. (Keefe, Heidi)
November 26, 2012 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6), or Alternative Motion to Strike Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(F) by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dacus, Deron)
November 21, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC of Compliance of Rule 3-1 and 3-2 Preliminary Disclosures (Srinivasan, Kalpana)
October 12, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 6 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Facebook Inc. to 11/24/2012. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
October 11, 2012 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Facebook Inc..( Dacus, Deron)
September 18, 2012 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Facebook Inc.and emailed to pltf for service. (klb)
September 18, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashley Lauren McMillian on behalf of PersonalWeb Technologies LLC (McMillian, Ashley)
September 18, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Samuel Grinstein on behalf of PersonalWeb Technologies LLC (Grinstein, Joseph)
September 17, 2012 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
September 17, 2012 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kalpana Srinivasan on behalf of PersonalWeb Technologies LLC (Srinivasan, Kalpana)
September 17, 2012 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Facebook Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3785313.), filed by PersonalWeb Technologies LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tribble, Max)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PersonalWeb Technologies LLC et al v. Facebook Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PersonalWeb Technologies LLC
Represented By: Joseph Samuel Grinstein
Represented By: Ashley Lauren McMillian
Represented By: Kalpana Srinivasan
Represented By: Max Lalon Tribble, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Level 3 Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Deron R Dacus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?