VirnetX Inc. et al v. Apple Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Leidos, Inc., VirnetX Inc. and Science Applications International Corporation
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Michael T McLemore, Robert W Faulkner and Francis McGovern, Professor
Case Number: 6:2012cv00855
Filed: November 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 UNSEALED AND CORRECTED ORDER re #1012 SEALED PATENT MOTION Omnibus Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and for a New Trial filed by Apple Inc. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/15/2021. (gsg)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1036 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #1034 Order (Schmidt, Leslie)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1035 FINAL JUDGMENT. A decision having been duly rendered as to all claims and consistent with the Court's order, the Court hereby enters FINAL JUDGMENT. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 01/06/21. (mll, )
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1034 ORDER RE REDACTIONS OF SEALED POST-TRIAL ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 01/06/2021. (mll, )
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1032 REDACTION to #1031 Sealed Document by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Schmidt, Leslie)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1031 Sealed Document. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of its December 17, 2020 Post-trial Motions Hearing Presentations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Schmidt, Leslie)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1030 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Apple Inc. for proceedings held on 12/17/20 post-trial motions before Judge Schroeder. (Jones, Michael)(Forwarded to Kate McAlpine) Modified on 12/17/2020 (ch, ).
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1029 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by VirnetX Inc. for proceedings held on 12/17/20 Post-trial motions before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (Caldwell, Bradley)(Forwarded to Kate McAlpine) Modified on 12/17/2020 (ch, ).
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1028 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Notice of Filing December 17, 2020 Hearing Presentation Slides (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1027 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Jeffrey Lease for proceedings held on Telephonic Post-Trial Hearing before Judge R.W.Schroeder III. (Forwarded to Kate McAlpine) (ch, ) Modified on 12/17/2020 (ch, ).
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1026 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2020 re #1012 SEALED PATENT MOTION Omnibus Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and for a New Trial filed by Apple Inc. and #1013 SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Motion for Entry of Judgment and Equitable and Statutory Relief filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Court Reporter Kate McAlpine) (bas)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE: The public may observe the Post Trial Hearing set for Thursday, December 17, 2020 at 10 a.m., by video at https://join.uc.uscourts.gov/invited.sf?secret=tYsmSB0ubk.l_kkpfIw5iA&id=478135508 or by phone at 571-353-2300 (access code: 478135508). (SMC)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1025 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #1013 SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Motion for Entry of Judgment and Equitable and Statutory Relief filed by Apple Inc.. (Schmidt, Leslie)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1024 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #1012 SEALED PATENT MOTION Omnibus Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and for a New Trial filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Caldwell, Bradley)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1023 ORDER that parties shall have 90 minutes of argument per side at the post-trial motions hearing on 12-17-2020. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/14/20. (mll, )
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 REDACTION to #1020 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Schmidt, Leslie)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1013 SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Motion for Entry of Judgment and Equitable and Statutory Relief filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Caldwell, Bradley)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1020 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #1012 SEALED PATENT MOTION Omnibus Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and for a New Trial filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Schmidt, Leslie)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1019 REDACTION to #1016 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stewart Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 REDACTION to #1017 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1017 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #1013 SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Motion for Entry of Judgment and Equitable and Statutory Relief filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1016 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #1012 SEALED PATENT MOTION Omnibus Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and for a New Trial filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stewart Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1015 REDACTION to #1012 SEALED PATENT MOTION Omnibus Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and for a New Trial by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1014 REDACTION to #1013 SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Motion for Entry of Judgment and Equitable and Statutory Relief by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roy Weinstein, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1013 SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Motion for Entry of Judgment and Equitable and Statutory Relief by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roy Weinstein, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1012 SEALED PATENT MOTION Omnibus Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and for a New Trial by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1011 ORDER re #1009 Notice Regarding Meet and Confer filed by Apple Inc. Videoconference Hearing on post trial matters set for 12/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/13/2020. (gsg)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1010 ORDER granting #1007 Unopposed Sealed Motion. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/13/2020. (gsg)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1009 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice Regarding Meet and Confer and Agreements Relating to Post-Trial Matters (Schmidt, Leslie)
November 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1008 REDACTION to #1007 Unopposed SEALED MOTION Requesting Portions of the Damages Trial Transcript Be Sealed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1007 Unopposed SEALED MOTION Requesting Portions of the Damages Trial Transcript Be Sealed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1006 REDACTION to #1001 Sealed Patent Document by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1005 ORDER granting #1000 Motion to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/3/2020. (ndc)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1004 ORDER granting #999 Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/3/2020. (ndc)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1003 REDACTION to #961 Sealed Document by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1002 REDACTION to #973 SEALED PATENT MOTION Rule 50(a) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Damages by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1001 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. VirnetX Inc.'s Notice Regarding Previous Objections (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1000 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 999 Unopposed MOTION to Seal VirnetX's Unopposed Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 998 REDACTION to #971 Sealed Document by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schmidt, Leslie)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 997 REDACTION to #965 Sealed Document by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Appleby, Robert)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 996 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/30/20 trial transcript afternoon session before Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kate McAlpine, kate_mcalpine@txed.uscourts.gov,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2021. (kem, )
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 995 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/30/30 trial transcript morning session before Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kate McAlpine, kate_mcalpine@txed.uscourts.gov,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2021. (kem, )
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 994 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/29/20 trial transcript pm session before Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kate McAlpine, kate_mcalpine@txed.uscourts.gov,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2021. (kem, )
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 993 Sealed Transcript portion of Day 4 am session. (kem, )
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 992 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/29/20 trial transcript morning session before Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kate McAlpine, kate_mcalpine@txed.uscourts.gov,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2021. (kem, )
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 991 Sealed Transcript portion of day 3 afternoon session. (kem, )
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 990 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/28/20 trial transcript afternoon session before Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kate McAlpine, kate_mcalpine@txed.uscourts.gov,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2021. (kem, )
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 989 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/28/20 trial transcript morning session before Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kate McAlpine, kate_mcalpine@txed.uscourts.gov,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2021. (kem, )
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 988 Sealed Transcript containing redacted information. (kem, )
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 986 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/27/20 trial transcript afternoon session before Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kate McAlpine, kate_mcalpine@txed.uscourts.gov,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2021. (kem, )
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 985 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/27/2020 trial transcript morning session before Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kate McAlpine kate_mcalpine@txed.uscourts.gov,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2021. (kem, )
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 984 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/26/20 trial transcript afternoon session before Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kate McAlpine kate_mcalpine@txed.uscourts.gov,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2021. (kem, )
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 983 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/26/2020 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III, trial transcript, morning session. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kate McAlpine kate_mcalpine@txed.uscourts.gov,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/31/2021. (kem, )
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 982 REDACTION to #966 Sealed Document, by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Caldwell, Bradley)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 981 SEALED Jury Notes. (bas)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 980 Defendant's Final Admitted Exhibits List. (bas)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 979 Plaintiff's Final Admitted Exhibits List. (bas)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 978 Redacted (foreperson's name) Jury Verdict. (bas)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 977 Sealed Verdict Form. (bas)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 976 Jury Instructions. (bas)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 975 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Fourth and Final Day of Jury Trial completed on 10/30/2020. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes) (bas)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 974 MOTION VirnetX Inc.'s Rule 50(a) Motion of at Least $1.20/Unit in Damages by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 973 SEALED PATENT MOTION Rule 50(a) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Damages by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 972 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Apple's Written Objections regarding the Verdict Form (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schmidt, Leslie)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 971 Sealed Document. Apple Inc.'s Notice Regarding Previous Objections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schmidt, Leslie)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 970 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Day Three of Jury Trial held on 10/29/2020. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes) (bas)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 969 REDACTION to #960 Sealed Response to Motion, by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Pearson Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 968 ORDER REGARDING TRANSCRIPT. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/28/2020. (gsg)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 967 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Day Two of Jury Trial held on 10/28/2020. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes) (bas)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 966 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Offer of Proof Regarding Prior Verdict or Judgment in the -417 Action and October Supplemental Expert Report of Roy Weinstein (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Caldwell, Bradley)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 965 Sealed Document. Apple Inc.'s Response to VirnetX's Objections to Dr. Blaze's Demonstratives (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Blaze Supplemental Report)(Appleby, Robert)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 964 TRIAL BRIEF Defendant Apple Inc.'s Offer of Proof by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Schmidt, Leslie)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 963 REDACTION to #956 SEALED MOTION to Strike Certain Supplemental Expert Damages Opinion of Roy Weinstein by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 962 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Day One of Jury Trial held on 10/27/2020. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes) (bas)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 961 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Written Response to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Demonstrative Objections (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Caldwell, Bradley)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 960 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #956 SEALED MOTION to Strike Certain Supplemental Expert Damages Opinion of Roy Weinstein filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Pearson Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 959 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Jury Selection held on 10/26/2020. (Court Reporter Shelly Holmes) (bas)
October 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 958 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #957 Notice (Other),. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N - Apple Inc.'s Objections to VirnetX's First Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Schmidt, Leslie)
October 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 957 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #882 Proposed Pretrial Order Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Objections to VirnetX's First Amended Trial Exhibit List (Exhibit N to Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N)(Schmidt, Leslie)
October 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 956 SEALED MOTION to Strike Certain Supplemental Expert Damages Opinion of Roy Weinstein by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
October 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 955 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Notice of Filing Sealed Exhibit M to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order (Dkt. No. 882) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M - VirnetX's Supplemental Objections to Apple's Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Caldwell, Bradley)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 954 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #953 Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Exhibit L)(Schmidt, Leslie)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 953 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #882 Proposed Pretrial Order Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Amended Trial Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Amended Exhibit L to Proposed Joint Pretrial Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 952 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Notice of Filing Sealed Exhibit K to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order (Dkt. No. 882) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K - VirnetX's First Amended Trial Exhibit List)(Caldwell, Bradley)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 951 ORDER to unseal re #942 Sealed Order Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/23/2020. (gsg)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 950 Proposed Jury Instructions by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Caldwell, Bradley)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 949 ORDER REGARDING TRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/21/20. (mll, )
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 948 Sealed Minute Entry for telephone conference held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III on 10/19/2020. Counsel in attendance were Brad Caldwell, Johnny Ward, Greg Arovas and Mike Jones. (bas)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 947 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re October 13, 2020 Order (DKT942) Regarding Redactions (Schmidt, Leslie)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 946 ORDERED that the October 20, 2020, final pretrial conference in this matter is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/15/2020. (gsg)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 945 ORDER granting #943 Sealed Motion. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/15/2020. (gsg)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 944 REDACTION to #943 Unopposed SEALED MOTION to Authorize Videoconference Testimony by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 943 Unopposed SEALED MOTION to Authorize Videoconference Testimony by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 942 SEALED ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/13/2020. (gsg)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 941 REDACTION to #940 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Relief from Standing Orders Relating to Court Operations During the National Pandemic by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 940 Unopposed SEALED MOTION for Relief from Standing Orders Relating to Court Operations During the National Pandemic by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 939 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. Joint Notice Regarding Meet and Confer and Agreement Relating to Certain Motions in Limine (Cassady, Jason)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 938 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #893 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/1/2020. (gsg)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 937 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #895 Sealed Patent Motion; granting in part and denying in part #896 Sealed Patent Motion. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/1/2020. (gsg)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 936 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for pretrial hearing proceedings held on August 3, 2020 before Judge Schroeder filed by Jeffrey Lease. (slo, ) (Main Document 936 replaced with flattened image on 8/20/2020) (ch, ). (forwarded to Kate McAlpine) Modified on 8/20/2020 (ch, ).
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 935 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on August 3, 2020 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kate McAlpine,Telephone number: 903-794-1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 9/2/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2020. (kem, )
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 934 ORDER granting #914 Sealed Motion to Continue. The above-captioned case is RESET for trial at 9 a.m. on October 26, 2020. A final pretrial conference is SET for 10 a.m. on October 20, 2020 in Texarkana, Texas. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/10/2020. (gsg)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 933 REDACTION to #928 Sealed Document, by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Schmidt, Leslie)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 932 REDACTION to #927 Sealed Document by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1 of 3, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2 of 3, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3 of 3)(Cassady, Jason)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 931 Amended Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Pretrial conference and Motions Hearing held on 8/3/2020 re #893 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Damages Opinions of Roy Weinstein filed by Apple Inc., #895 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Apple's Motions in Limine filed by Apple Inc., #896 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiff's Motions in Limine filed by VirnetX Inc., and #914 Opposed SEALED MOTION To Continue the Trial filed by Apple Inc.. (Court Reporter Kate McAlpine) (bas)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 930 REDACTION to #929 Sealed Document by VirnetX Inc.. (Cassady, Jason)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 929 Sealed Document. VirnetX Inc.'s Response to the Court's Question at the Pretrial Conference Regarding Having All Live Witnesses Testify by Video. (Cassady, Jason)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 928 Sealed Document. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of its August 3, 2020 Pretrial Conference Presentations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Schmidt, Leslie)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 927 Sealed Document. VirnetX Inc.'s Notice of Filing August 3, 2020 Hearing Presentation Slides (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1 of 3, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2 of 3, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3 of 3)(Cassady, Jason)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 926 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Pretrial conference and Motions Hearing held on 8/3/2020 re #893 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Damages Opinions of Roy Weinstein filed by Apple Inc., #895 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Apple's Motions in Limine filed by Apple Inc., #896 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiff's Motions in Limine filed by VirnetX Inc., and #914 Opposed SEALED MOTION To Continue the Trial filed by Apple Inc.. (Court Reporter Kate McAlpine) (bas)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 925 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Apple Inc.'s Response to the Court's Question at the Pretrial Conference Regarding Having All Live Witnesses Testify by Video (Schmidt, Leslie)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 924 REDACTION to #921 Sealed Response to Motion by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 923 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by VirnetX Inc. for proceedings held on 8/3/2020 Pretrial Conference before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (Cassady, Jason) ( forwarded to Kate McAlpine) Modified on 8/4/2020 (ch, ).
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 922 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Apple Inc. for proceedings held on 8/3/2020 Pretrial before Judge Schroeder. (Jones, Michael) (Main Document 922 replaced with flattened image on 8/4/2020) (ch, ). Modified on 8/4/2020 (ch, ) (forwarded to Kate McAlpine) . Modified on 8/4/2020 (ch, ).
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 921 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #914 Opposed SEALED MOTION To Continue the Trial filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE: The public may observe the Pretrial Conference set for Monday, August 3, by video at https://join.uc.uscourts.gov/invited.sf?secret=tYsmSB0ubk.l_kkpfIw5iA&id=478135508 or by phone at 571-353-2300 (access code: 478135508). (SMC)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 920 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. Notice of Filing Exhibit I to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order (Dkt. No. 882) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I - VirnetX's Objections and Cross Designations to Apple's Rebuttal Deposition Designations)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 919 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Objections to VirnetX's Rebuttal Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J to Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order - Apple Inc.'s Objections to VirnetX's Rebuttal Deposition Designations)(Schmidt, Leslie)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 918 REDACTION to #914 Opposed SEALED MOTION To Continue the Trial by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 917 REDACTION to #907 Sealed Document, Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Objections to VirnetX's Trial Exhibit List by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N to Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order - Apple Inc.'s Objections to VirnetX's Trial Exhibit List)(Schmidt, Leslie)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 916 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #914 Opposed SEALED MOTION To Continue the Trial : Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2020 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Motions GRANTED: #915 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Apple Inc.'s Motion to Continue the Trial filed by Apple Inc. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to Apple's motion to continue trial by 12 p.m. on 7-31-2020. No further briefing will be permitted. Apple's Motion to Continue the Trial will be heard during the pretrial conference previously scheduled for 10 a.m. on 8-03-2020. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/28/20. (mll, )
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 915 Unopposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Apple Inc.'s Motion to Continue the Trial by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 914 Opposed SEALED MOTION To Continue the Trial by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 913 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Notice of Filing Sealed Exhibit E and F to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order (Dkt. No. 882). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E and F - VirnetX's Objections & Rebuttals to Apple's Deposition Designations)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 912 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Counter-Designations and Objections to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Combined Exhibits G & H to Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order - Apple Inc.'s Counter-Designations and Objections to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations)(Schmidt, Leslie)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 911 REDACTION Apple's Opposition to VirnetX's Motions in Limine by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 910 REDACTION to #905 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cassady Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 909 REDACTION to #904 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cassady Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 908 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Notice of Filing Sealed Exhibit M to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order (Dkt. No. 882). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M - VirnetX's Objections to Apple's Trial Exhibit List)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 907 Sealed Document. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Objections to VirnetX's Trial Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N to Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order - Apple Inc.'s Objections to VirnetX's Trial Exhibit List(Schmidt, Leslie)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 906 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #896 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiff's Motions in Limine filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 905 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #895 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Apple's Motions in Limine filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cassady Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 904 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #893 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Damages Opinions of Roy Weinstein filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cassady Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 903 ORDER granting #886 Motion for pretrial conference. The pretrial conference will remain as scheduled on August 3, 2020. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/22/2020. (gsg)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 902 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re #901 Response in Opposition to Motion Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Additional Authority)(Cassady, Jason)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 901 RESPONSE in Opposition re #886 Opposed MOTION to Conduct the Pretrial Conference Remotely for All Parties filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 900 REDACTION Apple Inc.'s Motion to Exclude Certain Expert Damages Opinions of Roy Weinstein by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 899 REDACTION Apple's Motions in Limine by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 898 REDACTION to #896 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiff's Motions in Limine by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cassady Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 897 REDACTION to #890 Sealed Document Apple Inc.'s Notice of Exhibit List by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L to Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order - Apple's Trial Exhibit List)(Schmidt, Leslie)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 896 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiff's Motions in Limine by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cassady Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 895 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Apple's Motions in Limine by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 894 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Renewal of Motions in Limine (Schmidt, Leslie)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 893 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude Certain Expert Damages Opinions of Roy Weinstein by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 892 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Notice of Filing Sealed Exhibits C and K to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order (Dkt. No. 882). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - VirnetX's Initial Deposition Designations, #2 Exhibit K - VirnetX's Trial Exhibit List)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 891 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D to Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order - Apple Inc.'s Initial Deposition Designations)(Schmidt, Leslie)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 890 Sealed Document. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L to Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order - Apple's Trial Exhibit List)(Schmidt, Leslie)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 889 ORDER granting #887 Motion to Expedite Briefing. VirnetXs opposition is due on 7-21-2020. No further briefing will be permitted. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/15/20. (mll, )
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 888 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re #887 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Apple's Motion to Conduct the Pretrial Conference Remotely for All Parties - VirnetX's Notice of Non-Opposition to Apple's Motion to Expedite Briefing (Caldwell, Bradley)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 887 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Apple's Motion to Conduct the Pretrial Conference Remotely for All Parties by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 886 Opposed MOTION to Conduct the Pretrial Conference Remotely for All Parties by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 885 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. VirnetX's Requested Time for Jury Selection and Trial (Caldwell, Bradley)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 884 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Estimates of Time for Jury Selection and Trial (Schmidt, Leslie)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 883 Proposed Jury Instructions by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 882 Proposed Pretrial Order by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - VirnetX's Trial Witness List, #2 Exhibit B - Apple's Trial Witness List)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 881 ORDER granting as modified #878 Motion for Submission of Juror Questionnaire. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/9/2020. (gsg)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 880 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (Caldwell, Bradley)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 879 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Request for Daily Trial Transcripts and Real time Reporting (Jones, Michael)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 878 Joint MOTION for Submission of Juror Questionnaire by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 877 ORDER granting #874 Motion to Take Deposition of Apple's Expert Out of Time signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/02/2020. (ksd )
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 876 ORDER to unseal #871 Sealed Order signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/02/2020. (ksd )
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 875 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re #872 Order Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Notice Regarding Redactions (Cassady, Jason)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 874 Unopposed MOTION to take Apple's Expert's Deposition Out of Time by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 873 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Hyunjong Jin on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7862918. (Jin, Hyunjong)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 872 ORDER RE REDACTION for #871 Sealed Order. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/25/2020. (gsg)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 871 SEALED ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/24/2020. (gsg)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 870 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Jeffrey Lease for proceedings of Telephonic Motion to Compel Hearing held on 6/18/2020 before Judge Schroeder III. (ch, ) (forwarded to Cindy Donald) Modified on 6/24/2020 (ch, ).
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 869 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Hearing held on 6/18/2020 before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Donald Court Reporting and Transcription LLC,Telephone number: 888-438-7836. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Motion to Redact due 7/14/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2020. (ch, )
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 868 REDACTION to #863 Sealed Document by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schmidt, Leslie)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 867 REDACTION to #864 Sealed Document by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Presentation Slides)(Cassady, Jason)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 866 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Apple Inc. for proceedings held on 6/18/20 Motions Hearing before Judge Schroeder. (Jones, Michael) (forwarded to Cindy Donald) Modified on 6/19/2020 (ch, ).
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 865 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by VirnetX Inc. for proceedings held on 6/18/2020 Telephonic Motion to Compel Hearing before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (Cassady, Jason) (forwarded to Cindy Donald) Modified on 6/19/2020 (ch, ).
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 864 Sealed Document. VirnetX Inc.'s Notice of Filing June 18, 2020 Hearing Presentation Slides (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Presentation Slides)(Cassady, Jason)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 863 Sealed Document. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of June 18, 2020 Hearing Presentation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schmidt, Leslie)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 862 Minute Entry for proceeding held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 6/18/2020 re #852 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff VirnetX, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Document Production filed by VirnetX Inc. (Court Reporter Cindy Donald.) (SMC)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 861 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re #852 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff VirnetX, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Document Production - Joint Notice Regarding Meet and Confer (Cassady, Jason)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 860 REDACTION to #858 Sealed Response to Motion by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 859 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #852 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff VirnetX, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Document Production: Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2020 AT 02:00 PM VIA TELEPHONE before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 6/12/2020. (gsg)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 858 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #852 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff VirnetX, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Document Production filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 857 REDACTION to #852 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff VirnetX, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Document Production by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 856 ORDER granting #853 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/29/2020. (gsg)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 855 ORDER granting #854 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/29/2020. (gsg)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 854 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Respect to Avaya, Inc. by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Modi, Ameet)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 853 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery with Respect to NEC Corporation of America and Atos North America, Inc. by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 852 Opposed SEALED MOTION Plaintiff VirnetX, Inc.'s Motion to Compel Document Production by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 851 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nathan Mammen on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7795209. (Mammen, Nathan)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 850 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nathaniel L. DeLucia on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7787219. (DeLucia, Nathaniel)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 849 TWELFTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Jury Selection set for 8/17/2020 AT 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 AT 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2020 AT 10:00 AM in Texarkana Courthouse before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/6/2020. (gsg)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 848 ADDENDUM OT THE SECOND AMENDED DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/6/2020. (gsg)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 847 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order and Discovery Order by Apple Inc.. (Schmidt, Leslie)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 846 ORDER granting #845 Motion for Extension of Time. ORDERED that the parties must submit joint proposed discovery and docket control orders on or before May 5, 2020. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/1/2020. (gsg)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 845 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Discovery and Docket Control Orders by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 844 ORDER to UNSEAL re #840 Sealed Order signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/01/2020. (ksd )
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 843 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re #841 Order Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Notice Regarding Redactions (Cassady, Jason)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 842 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on 04/14/2020 before Judge Schroeder. (ksd ) (Main Document 842 replaced with flattened image on 4/27/2020) (FORWARDED TO CINDY DONALD)(ch, ). Modified on 4/27/2020 (ch, ).
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 841 ORDER regarding redaction. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/23/2020. (gsg)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 840 ***Unsealed Per Order #844 *** SEALED ORDER. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/23/2020. (gsg) Modified on 5/1/2020 (gsg).
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 839 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by VirnetX Inc. for proceedings held on April 14, 2020 Telephonic Motion Hearing before Judge Schroeder. (Caldwell, Bradley)( FORWARDED TO CINDY DONALD) Modified on 4/20/2020 (ch, ).
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 838 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Hearing held on 4/14/2020 before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Donald Court Reporting & Transcription LLC,Telephone number: 888-438-7836. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Motion to Redact due 5/7/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2020. (ch, )
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 837 REDACTION to #832 Sealed Document Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of April 14, 2020 Hearing Presentation by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schmidt, Leslie)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 836 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for proceedings held on Telephonic Hearing before Judge Schroeder. (for non-party Michael D. Cohen) (FORWARDED TO CINDY DONALD) (ch, )
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 835 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Apple Inc. for proceedings held on 4/14/2020 telephonic motions hrg before Judge Schroeder. (Jones, Michael) (Main Document 835 replaced with flattened image on 4/14/2020) (ch, ). (FORWARDED TO CINDY DONALD ) Modified on 4/14/2020 (ch, ).
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 834 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. Notice of Filing of April 14, 2020 Hearing Presentation Slides (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 833 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Motion Hearing held via telephone on 4/14/2020 re #824 SEALED MOTION For Entry of Judgment filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Court Reporter Cindy Donald) (bas)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 832 Sealed Document. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of April 14, 2020 Hearing Presentation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schmidt, Leslie)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 831 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING for 4/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/1/2020. (gsg)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 830 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #824 SEALED MOTION For Entry of Judgment filed by Apple Inc.. (Heffernan, Jeanne)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 829 REDACTION to #828 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cassady, Jason)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 828 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #824 SEALED MOTION For Entry of Judgment filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cassady, Jason)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 827 REDACTION to #824 SEALED MOTION For Entry of Judgment by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 826 REDACTION to #825 Sealed Response to Motion by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heffernan, Jeanne)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 825 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #824 SEALED MOTION For Entry of Judgment and Brief in Support of a New Trial on Damages filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heffernan, Jeanne)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 824 SEALED MOTION For Entry of Judgment by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 823 ORDER REGARDNG BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/26/2020. (gsg)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 822 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. Joint Notice Regarding New Trial and Proposed Briefing Schedule (Cassady, Jason)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 821 ORDER that parties are to meet and confer and file a joint notice within seven days of this Order, indicating whether parties agree on whether a new trial is necessary. If the parties do not agree, they are further ORDERED to meet and confer and file a proposed briefing schedule on the necessity of a new trial within seven days of this Order. Briefing, if necessary, shall be completed by 3-11-2020. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/18/20. (mll, )
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 820 MANDATE of USCA FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #812 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Apple Inc. (ksd )
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 819 ORDER of FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #812 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Apple Inc. Petitions for panel rehearing and rehearing en banc are denied. Mandate to be issued on 2/18/2020. (ksd )
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 818 ERRATA to the Nonprecedential Opinion Doc No.: #85 . Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. (ksd )
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 817 JUDGMENT issued by Federal Circuit as to #812 Notice of Appeal filed by Apple Inc. (ksd )
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 816 OPINION as to #812 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Apple Inc. (ksd )
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 815 ORDER granting #806 Motion for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/15/2018. (rlf)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 814 ORDER granting #810 Motion to Modify the Accounting Deadline. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/15/2018. (rlf)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 813 FEDERAL CIRCUIT NOTICE of Docketing Notice of Appeal from USCA - FEDERAL CIRCUIT re #812 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT filed by Apple Inc. USCA Case Number 19-1050 (rlf)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals, Federal Circuit by separate email, re #812 Notice of Appeal - FEDERAL CIRCUIT. (mjc, )
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 812 NOTICE OF APPEAL - FEDERAL CIRCUIT as to #801 Judgment, by Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0540-6961484. (Loy, Joseph)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 811 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Joint Stipulation Concerning Apple's iMessage Counterclaims (Loy, Joseph)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 810 Unopposed MOTION to Modify the Accounting Deadline by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heffernan, Jeanne)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 809 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. PLAINTIFF VIRNETX INC.'S NOTICE REGARDING AGREED BILL OF COSTS AND PREJUDGMENT INTEREST (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Caldwell, Bradley)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 808 STIPULATION ON EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT AGAINST APPLE INC. entered per #807 Order, by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Certification)(mjc, )
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 807 ORDER granting #805 Motion To Enter Stipulation As Order. The Clerk is directed to enter the Stipulated Order on Execution of Judgment Against Apple, Inc. (Docket No. 805-1) including its corresponding exhibits (Docket Nos. 805-2,805-3 and 805-4). Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/18/2018. (mjc, )
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 806 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File VIRNETX'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE BILL OF COSTS by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 805 Unopposed MOTION to Enter Stipulation as Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulated Order on Executed of Judgment against Apple, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael Boyd, #3 Exhibit B - Certification, #4 Exhibit C - Certification, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 804 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to unseal #798 Sealed Memorandum Opinion and Order pursuant to #803 Notice (Other) filed by Apple Inc. indicating neither party will seek to seal any portion of the Order. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/4/2018. (mjc, )
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 803 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #799 Order, Joint Notice Regarding Post-Trial Memorandum Opinion and Order (Loy, Joseph)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 802 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at case termination. AO 120 e-mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mjc, )
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 801 FINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED due to a decision having been duly rendered as to all claims and consistent with the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close both the lead and member case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/30/2018. (mjc, )
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 800 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD. SEALED BY COURT.***FINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED due to a decision having been duly rendered as to all claims and consistent with the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close both the lead and member case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/30/2018. (mjc, ) Modified on 8/31/2018 (mjc, ).
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 799 ORDER for the parties to file by 9/6/2018 a joint sealed motion to redact limited portions of the Sealed Order entered today regarding pending post-trial motions. The Court plans to file an unsealed version no later than 9/10/2018. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/30/2018. (mjc, )
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 798 UNSEALED PER ORDER #804 .***SEALED ORDER Denying #775 Apple's Omnibus Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law under Rule 50(b) and for a New Trial, denying-in-part and granting-in-part #774 VirnetX's Motion for Entry of Judgment and for Equitable and Statutory Relief, and denying as moot #713 , #714 , and #718 Apple's Motions for Judgment as a Matter of Law Pursuant to Rule 50(a). Final judgment will be entered in accordance with this order. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/30/2018. (mjc, ) Modified on 9/4/2018 (mjc, ).
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 797 RESPONSE to #794 Notice (Other) PLAINTIFF VIRNETX INC.'S RESPONSE TO APPLE'S NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Caldwell, Bradley)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 796 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #778 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,, Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Correction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of W. Christopher Bakewell)(Heffernan, Jeanne)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 795 REDACTION to #791 Sealed Patent Document by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - Redacted, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E - Redacted)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 794 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #778 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,, Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Supplemental Authorities (Loy, Joseph)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 793 REDACTION to #790 Sealed Patent Document, by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Redacted, #3 Exhibit 3 - Redacted, #4 Exhibit 4 - Redacted, #5 Exhibit 5 - Redacted, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Loy, Joseph)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 792 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re #779 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, VirnetX's Notice of Citation Correction (Caldwell, Bradley)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 791 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Notice of Filing July 18, 2018 Hearing Presentation Slides (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Caldwell, Bradley)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 790 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT-Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Fiing of July 18, 2018 Hearing Presentation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Loy, Joseph)
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 789 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Motion Hearing held on 7/18/2018 re #774 Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Motion for Entry of Judgment and Equitable and Statutory Relief filed by VirnetX Inc.; and #775 Apple's Omnibus Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and for a New Trial filed by Apple Inc.. (Court Reporter Chris Bickham) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 788 REDACTION to #785 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion by Apple Inc.. (Loy, Joseph)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 787 REDACTION to #786 Sealed PATENT Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by VirnetX Inc.. (Caldwell, Bradley)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 786 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #775 SEALED PATENT MOTION Apple's Omnibus Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and for a New Trial filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Caldwell, Bradley)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 785 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to PATENT Motion re #774 SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFF VIRNETX INC.'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND EQUITABLE AND STATUTORY RELIEF filed by Apple Inc.. (Loy, Joseph)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 784 REDACTION to #782 Sealed PATENT Reply to Response to PATENT Motion, by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Warren J. McCarty, III, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Caldwell, Bradley)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 783 REPLY to Response to Motion re #775 SEALED PATENT MOTION Apple's Omnibus Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and for a New Trial filed by Apple Inc.. (Loy, Joseph)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 782 VIRNETX INC.'S SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #774 SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFF VIRNETX INC.'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND EQUITABLE AND STATUTORY RELIEF filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Warren J. McCarty, III, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Caldwell, Bradley)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 781 REDACTION to #778 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion,, by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted, #2 Exhibit 2 - Redacted, #3 Exhibit 3 - Redacted, #4 Exhibit 4 - Redacted, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 - Redacted, #7 Exhibit 7 - Redacted, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13 - Redacted, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17 - Redacted, #18 Exhibit 18 - Redacted, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24 - Redacted, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 780 REDACTION to #779 Sealed Patent Response to Sealed Patent Motion, VirnetX Inc.'s Response to Apple's Omnibus Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and for a New Trial by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 779 VIRNETX INC.'S SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #775 SEALED PATENT MOTION Apple's Omnibus Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and for a New Trial filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 778 APPLE'S SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #774 SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFF VIRNETX INC.'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND EQUITABLE AND STATUTORY RELIEF filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 777 REDACTION to #775 SEALED PATENT MOTION Apple's Omnibus Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and for a New Trial by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 776 REDACTION to #774 SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFF VIRNETX INC.'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND EQUITABLE AND STATUTORY RELIEF by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hamad M. Hamad, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Declaration of Roy Weinstein, #8 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Final Judgment), #9 Text of Proposed Order (Alternative Proposed Final Judgment))(Caldwell, Bradley)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 775 SEALED PATENT MOTION Apple's Omnibus Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and for a New Trial by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 774 SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFF VIRNETX INC.'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND EQUITABLE AND STATUTORY RELIEF by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hamad M. Hamad, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Declaration of Roy Weinstein, #8 Text of Proposed Order (Proposed Final Judgment), #9 Text of Proposed Order (Alternative Proposed Final Judgment))(Caldwell, Bradley)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 773 ORDER granting #772 Motion for Entry of Post-Trial Briefing Schedule and setting a hearing on post-trial motions for 7/18/2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Texarkana. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/9/2018. (mjc, )
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Post-Trial Motion Hearing set for 7/18/2018 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (mjc, )
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 772 Joint MOTION for Entry of Post-Trial Briefing Schedule by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 771 Sealed Transcript on proceedings held on 04/11/18 PM before U. S. District Judge Robert Schroeder, III. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 770 Sealed Transcript on proceedings held on 04/10/18 before U. S. District Judge Robert Schroeder, III. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 769 Sealed Transcript on proceedings held on 04/09/18 PM before U. S. District Judge Robert Schroeder, III. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 768 Sealed Transcript of proceedings held on 04/09/18 AM before U. S. District Judge Robert Schroeder, III. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 767 Sealed Transcript on proceedings held on 04/06/18 PM before U. S. District Judge Robert Schroeder, III. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 766 Sealed Transcript of proceedings held on 04/06/18 AM before U. S. District Judge Robert Schroeder, III. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 765 Sealed Transcript of proceedings held on 04/05/18 AM before U. S. District Judge Robert Schroeder, III. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 764 Sealed Transcript of proceedings on 04/04/18 PM held before U. S. District Judge Robert Schroeder, III. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 763 Sealed Transcript of proceedings held on 04/03/18 PM before U. S. District Judge Robert Schroeder, III. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 762 Sealed Transcript of proceedings held before U. S. District Judge Robert Schroeder, III on 04/03/18 AM. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 761 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04/11/18 PM before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Polvi,Telephone number: 503-779-7406. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 760 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04/11/18 AM before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Polvi,Telephone number: 503-779-7406. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 759 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04/10/18 before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Polvi,Telephone number: 503-779-7406. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 758 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04/09/18 PM before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Polvi,Telephone number: 503/779-7406. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 757 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04/09/18 AM before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Polvi,Telephone number: 503-779-7406. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 756 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04/06/18 PM before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Polvi,Telephone number: 503-779-7406. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 755 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04/06/18 AM before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Polvi,Telephone number: 503-779-7406. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 754 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04/05/18 PM before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Polvi,Telephone number: 503-779-7406. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 753 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04/05/18 AM before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Polvi,Telephone number: 503-779-7406. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 752 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04/04/18 PM before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Polvi,Telephone number: 503-779-7406. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 751 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04/04/18 AM before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Polvi,Telephone number: 503-779-7406. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 750 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04/03/18 PM before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Polvi,Telephone number: 503-779-7406. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 749 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04/03/18 AM before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Polvi,Telephone number: 503-779-7406. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 748 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04/02/18 PM before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Polvi,Telephone number: 503-779-7406. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (lfs, )
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 747 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 04/02/18 AM before Judge Schroeder. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Polvi,Telephone number: 503-779-7406. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/24/2018. (lfs, )
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 746 ORDER granting #744 Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits. The following exhibits will be sealed: PX 404-409, 418-420, 1084-1086, 1088.03, 1089.03, 1089.06, 1180. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 4/18/2018. (mjc, )
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 745 ORDER granting #742 Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/16/18. (mll, )
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 744 Unopposed MOTION to Seal VirnetX's Unopposed Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 743 REDACTION to #717 Sealed Patent Document,, Defendant Apple Inc.'s Offer of Proof by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W - REDACTED, #24 Exhibit X - REDACTED, #25 Exhibit Y - REDACTED, #26 Exhibit Z - REDACTED)(Modi, Ameet)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 742 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 741 REDACTION to #718 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Willful Infringement by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Modi, Ameet)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 740 REDACTION to #711 Response to Non-Motion, VirnetX's Response to Apple's Trial Brief Concerning the Admissibility of Apple's '311 Patent, DTX 201 by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A REDACTED, #2 Exhibit B REDACTED, #3 Exhibit C REDACTED, #4 Exhibit D PUBLIC VERSION)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 739 REDACTION to #710 Response to Non-Motion VirnetX's Response to Apple's Trial Brief Concerning Cross-Examination of Simon Patience for Willfulness Trial by VirnetX Inc.. (Caldwell, Bradley)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 738 REDACTION to #712 Response to Non-Motion Defendant Apple Inc.'s Response Regarding Simon Patience Designated Testimony by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Modi, Ameet)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 737 REDACTION to #705 Sealed Document Defendant Apple Inc.'s Trial Brief Concerning Cross-Examination of Simon Patience for Willfulness Trial by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Modi, Ameet)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 736 REDACTION to #698 Sealed Document, Defendant Apple Inc.'s Trial Brief Regarding Deposition Designations by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 - Redacted, #8 Exhibit 8 - Redacted, #9 Exhibit 9)(Mizzo, F)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 735 REDACTION to #714 SEALED PATENT MOTION Rule 50(a) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Damages by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 734 REDACTION to #713 SEALED PATENT MOTION Rule 50(a) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Jury Inst., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 733 REDACTION to #706 Sealed Patent Document, VirnetX's Trial Brief Regarding Precluding Apple from Relying on Undisclosed Opinion of Counsel in Willfulness Trial and Objections to Deposition Designations of Simon Patience and Further Objecting that the Testimony of Simon Patience is Hearsay, Lacks Foundation, and Lacks Personal Knowledge by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A REDACTED, #2 Exhibit B PUBLIC VERSION)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 732 SEALED Jury Notes - Phase II. (bas)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 731 Defendant's Final Exhibit List - Phase II. (bas)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 730 Plaintiffs' Final Exhibit List - Phase II. (bas)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 729 SEALED JURY VERDICT - Phase II. (bas)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 728 REDACTED (foreperson's name) JURY VERDICT - Phase II. (bas)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 727 Final Jury Instructions - Phase II. (bas)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 726 SEALED Jury Notes - Phase I. (bas)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 725 Defendant's Final Exhibit List - Phase I. (bas)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 724 Plaintiffs' Final Exhibit List - Phase I. (bas)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 723 SEALED JURY VERDICT - Phase I. (bas)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 722 REDACTED (foreperson's name) JURY VERDICT - Phase I. (bas)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 721 Final Jury Instructions - Phase I. (bas)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 720 REDACTION to #699 Sealed Patent Document VirnetX's Trial Brief Regarding Apple Employees' Review of Patents by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A REDACTED)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 719 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Eighth and final day of jury trial completed on 4/11/2018. (Court Reporter Kelly Polvi) (bas)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 718 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Willful Infringement by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 717 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Offer of Proof (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z)(Modi, Ameet)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 716 REDACTION to #697 Sealed Document Defendant Apple Inc.'s Trial Brief Concerning Dr. Mark Jones by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Modi, Ameet)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 715 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Seventh day of jury trial held on 4/10/2018. (Court Reporter Kelly Polvi) (bas)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 714 SEALED PATENT MOTION Rule 50(a) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Damages by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 713 SEALED PATENT MOTION Rule 50(a) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Jury Instructions, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 712 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple Inc. to #706 Sealed Patent Document, filed by Apple Inc.. Response Regarding Simon Patience Designated Testimony (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Modi, Ameet)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 711 SEALED RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to #707 Trial Brief Apple's Trial Brief Concerning the Admissibility of Apple's '311 Patent, DTX 201 filed by VirnetX Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 710 SEALED RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to #705 Sealed Document - Apple Inc.'s Trial Brief Concerning Cross-Examination of Simon Patience for Willfulness Trial filed by VirnetX Inc. (Caldwell, Bradley)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 709 RESPONSE to #704 Trial Brief VirnetX's Response to Apple's Trial Brief Regarding the Verdict Form filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Caldwell, Bradley)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 708 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Modi, Ameet)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 707 TRIAL BRIEF Defendant Apple Inc.'s Trial Brief Concerning the Admissibility of Apple's '311 Patent, DTX 201 by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Modi, Ameet) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2018: #6 Exhibit A Searchable) (mjc, ).
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 706 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. VirnetX's Trial Brief Regarding Precluding Apple from Relying on Undisclosed Opinion of Counsel in Willfulness Trial and Objections to Deposition Designations of Simon Patience and Further Objecting that the Testimony of Simon Patience is Hearsay, Lacks Foundation, and Lacks Personal Knowledge (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 705 Sealed Document. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Trial Brief Concerning Cross-Examination of Simon Patience for Willfulness Trial (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Modi, Ameet)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 704 TRIAL BRIEF Apple's Trial Brief Regarding the Verdict Form by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Heffernan, Jeanne)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 703 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Sixth day of jury trial held on 4/9/2018. (Court Reporter Kelly Polvi) (bas)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 702 RESPONSE to #699 Sealed Patent Document Apple's Response to VirnetX's Trial Brief Regarding Apple Employees' Review of Patents filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Draper, David)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 701 SEALED RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to #698 Sealed Document Apple Inc.'s Trial Brief Regarding Deposition Designations. filed by VirnetX Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 700 SEALED RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to #697 Sealed Document Apple Inc.'s Trial Brief Concerning Dr. Mark Jones. filed by VirnetX Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #689 Redaction to #677 Sealed Patent Document. PLEASE IGNORE. DOCUMENT SEALED BY COURT.*** (mjc, )
April 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 699 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. VirnetX's Trial Brief Regarding Apple Employees' Review of Patents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 698 Sealed Document. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Trial Brief Regarding Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Mizzo, F)
April 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 697 Sealed Document. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Trial Brief Concerning Dr. Mark Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Modi, Ameet)
April 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 696 REDACTION to #687 Response to Non-Motion Apple's Response to VirnetX's Trial Brief Regarding Apple's Exhibits by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B - Sealed)(Draper, David)
April 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 695 REDACTION to #690 Sealed Document VirnetX's Trial Brief Objecting to Apple's Exhibits by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 694 REDACTION to #682 Sealed Patent Document, VirnetX's Offer of Proof Regarding Previous Determinations, Including the Amount of Damages by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 693 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Fifth day of jury trial held on 4/6/2018. (Court Reporter Kelly Polvi) (bas)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 692 TRIAL BRIEF Offer of Proof by Apple Inc. by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - February 7, 2017 Notice of Appeal, #2 Exhibit B - February 7, 2017 Notice of Docketing, #3 Exhibit C- February 1, 2018 Decision on Rehearing, #4 Exhibit D - June 12, 2017 Final Written Decision, #5 Exhibit E - September 22, 2017 Notice of Appeal, #6 Exhibit F - September 25, 2017 Notice of Docketing, #7 Exhibit G - February 7, 2017 Notice of Appeal, #8 Exhibit H - February 7, 2017 Notice of Docketing, #9 Exhibit I - February 7, 2017 Notice of Appeal, #10 Exhibit J - February 7, 2017 Notice of Docketing, #11 Exhibit K - June 12, 2017 Final Written Decision, #12 Exhibit L - September 22, 2017 Notice of Appeal, #13 Exhibit M - September 25, 2017 Notice of Docketing, #14 Exhibit N - February 6, 2018 Decision on Appeal, #15 Exhibit O - September 9, 2016 Final Written Decision, #16 Exhibit P - December 16, 2016 Notice of Appeal, #17 Exhibit Q - December 16, 2016 Notice of Docketing, #18 Exhibit R - September 9, 2016 Final Written Decision, #19 Exhibit S - December 20, 2016 Notice of Appeal, #20 Exhibit T - December 20, 2016 Notice of Docketing, #21 Exhibit U - June 13, 2017 Inter Partes Reexamination Certificate, #22 Exhibit V - February 22, 2018 Inter Partes Reexamination Certificate)(Modi, Ameet)
April 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 691 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple Inc. to #690 Sealed Document-Apple's Response to VirnetX's Trial Brief Regarding Apple's Exhibits filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Appleby, Robert)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 690 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Trial Brief Objecting to Apple's Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 689 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***REDACTION to #677 Sealed Patent Document, Defendant Apple Inc.'s Offer of Proof Regarding Anonymity by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 - Redacted, #8 Exhibit 8)(Appleby, Robert) Modified on 4/9/2018 (mjc, ).
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 688 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Fourth day of jury trial held on 4/5/2018. (Court Reporter Kelly Polvi) (bas)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 687 SEALED RESPONSE by Apple Inc. to #684 Sealed Patent Document-Apple's Response to VirnetX's Trial Brief Regarding Apple's Exhibits filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Draper, David)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 686 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #685 Notice (Other), Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Objections to VirnetX's Second Amended Trial Exhibit List (Amended Exhibit N to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order). (Attachments: #1 Amended Exhibit N)(Appleby, Robert)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 685 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #622 Proposed Pretrial Order, Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Objections to VirnetX's Second Amended Trial Exhibit List (Amended Exhibit N to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order) (Attachments: #1 Amended Exhibit N - Redacted)(Appleby, Robert)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 684 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. VirnetX's Trial Brief Objecting to Apple's Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Caldwell, Bradley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/5/2018: #7 Exhibit A Searchable) (mjc, ).
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 683 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Third day of jury trial held on 4/4/2018. (Court Reporter Kelly Polvi) (bas)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 682 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. VirnetX's Offer of Proof Regarding Previous Determinations, Including the Amount of Damages. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 681 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Second day of jury trial held on 4/3/2018. (Court Reporter Kelly Polvi) (bas)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 680 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Jury Selection and first day of jury trial held on 4/2/2018. (Court Reporter Kelly Polvi) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 679 RESPONSE to #676 Sealed Document, VirnetX's Response to Apple's Trial Brief Regarding VirnetX's Licenses filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 678 REDACTION to #676 Sealed Document, Apple's Trial Brief Regarding VirnetX's Licenses by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -Redacted, #2 Exhibit 2 -Redacted, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11 -Redacted, #12 Exhibit 12)(Heffernan, Jeanne)
April 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 677 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT-Defendant Apple Inc.'s Offer of Proof Regarding Anonymity. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Appleby, Robert)
April 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 676 Sealed Document. Apple's Trial Brief Regarding VirnetX's Licenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Heffernan, Jeanne)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 675 Sealed Transcript. (klp, )
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 674 NOTICE OF FILING OF (UNSEALED PORTION) OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3/26/2018, before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter: Kelly Polvi. Telephone number: 903.794.1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/3/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2018. (klp, )
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 673 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #672 Notice (Other) VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Second Amended Trial Exhibit List (Second Amended Exhibit K to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order) (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Exhibit K)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 672 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re #622 Proposed Pretrial Order, VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Second Amended Trial Exhibit List (Second Amended Exhibit K to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K FILED UNDER SEAL)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 671 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #670 Notice (Other), Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing Second Amended Trial Exhibit List (Second Amended Exhibit L to Proposed Joint Pretrial Order). (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Exhibit L)(Loy, Joseph)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 670 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #622 Proposed Pretrial Order, Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing Second Amended Trial Exhibit List (Second Amended Exhibit L to Proposed Joint Pretrial Order) (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Exhibit L)(Loy, Joseph)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 669 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #668 Notice (Other) VirnetX's Notice of Filing of First Amended Trial Exhibit List (First Amended Exhibit K to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order). (Attachments: #1 First Amended Exhibit K)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 668 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re #622 Proposed Pretrial Order, VirnetX's Notice of Filing of First Amended Trial Exhibit List (Amended Exhibit K to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K FILED UNDER SEAL)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 667 REDACTION to #663 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Apple Inc.'s Motion to Preclude VirnetX from Arguing that Apple Copied a VirnetX Product or Patent by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - Redacted, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 666 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #665 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 VirnetX's Fifth Supplemental Responses to Apple's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-13))(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 665 RESPONSE in Opposition re #663 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Apple Inc.'s Motion to Preclude VirnetX from Arguing that Apple Copied a VirnetX Product or Patent filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 664 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #622 Proposed Pretrial Order, Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Fifth Amended Trial Witness List (Amended Exhibit B to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order) (Attachments: #1 Fifth Amended Exhibit B - Defendant Apple Inc.'s Fifth Amended Trial Witness List)(Loy, Joseph)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 663 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Apple Inc.'s Motion to Preclude VirnetX from Arguing that Apple Copied a VirnetX Product or Patent by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 662 REDACTION to #659 Sealed Document,,, Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Disputed Exhibits by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted, #2 PX030, #3 PX062, #4 PX064, #5 PX158, #6 PX172, #7 PX184, #8 PX187 - Redacted, #9 PX203 - Redacted, #10 PX265 - Redacted, #11 PX295 - Redacted, #12 PX308, #13 PX474 - Redacted, #14 PX1007, #15 PX1010, #16 PX1012.01 - Redacted, #17 PX1012.02 - Redacted, #18 PX1012.03 - Redacted, #19 PX1025 - Redacted, #20 PX1026 - Redacted, #21 PX1029.01 - Redacted, #22 PX1031 - Redacted, #23 PX1032 - Redacted, #24 PX1038 - Redacted, #25 PX1039, #26 PX1074, #27 PX1089.03 - Redacted, #28 PX1089.05 - Redacted, #29 PX1089.06 - Redacted, #30 PX1106 - Redacted, #31 PX1107 - Redacted, #32 PX1108 - Redacted, #33 PX1109 - Redacted, #34 PX1117 - Redacted, #35 PX1121, #36 PX1126, #37 PX1127 - Redacted, #38 PX1154, #39 PX1155)(Loy, Joseph)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 661 REDACTION to #652 Sealed Patent Document Plaintiff's Notice Regarding Prior Determination by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A PUBLIC VERSION)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 660 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Final Pretrial Conference held on 3/26/2018. (Court Reporter Kelly Polvi) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 659 Sealed Document-Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Disputed Exhibits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit PX030, #3 Exhibit PX062, #4 Exhibit PX064, #5 Exhibit PX158, #6 Exhibit PX172, #7 Exhibit PX184, #8 Exhibit PX187, #9 Exhibit PX203, #10 Exhibit PX265, #11 Exhibit PX295, #12 Exhibit PX308, #13 Exhibit PX474, #14 Exhibit PX1007, #15 Exhibit PX1010, #16 Exhibit PX1012.01, #17 Exhibit PX1012.02, #18 Exhibit PX1012.03, #19 Exhibit PX1025, #20 Exhibit PX1026, #21 Exhibit PX1029.01, #22 Exhibit PX1031, #23 Exhibit PX1032, #24 Exhibit PX1038, #25 Exhibit PX1039, #26 Exhibit PX1074, #27 Exhibit PX1089.03, #28 Exhibit PX1089.05, #29 Exhibit PX1089.06, #30 Exhibit PX1106, #31 Exhibit PX1107, #32 Exhibit PX1108, #33 Exhibit PX1109, #34 Exhibit PX1117, #35 Exhibit PX1121, #36 Exhibit PX1126, #37 Exhibit PX1127, #38 Exhibit PX1154, #39 Exhibit PX1155)(Loy, Joseph)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 658 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. Plaintiff's Notice Regarding Exhibit Objections (Caldwell, Bradley)
March 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 657 RESPONSE to #652 Sealed Patent Document Apple's Response to Plaintiff's Notice Regarding Prior Determination filed by Apple Inc.. (Loy, Joseph)
March 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 656 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #655 Notice (Other)Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Amended Exhibit Pursuant to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order. (Attachments: #1 Amended Exhibits G and H)(Loy, Joseph)
March 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 655 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #622 Proposed Pretrial Order, Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Amended Exhibit Pursuant to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order (Attachments: #1 Amended Exhibits G and H)(Loy, Joseph)
March 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 654 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #622 Proposed Pretrial Order, Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Fourth Amended Trial Witness List (Amended Exhibit B to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order) (Attachments: #1 Fourth Amended Exhibit B - Defendant Apple Inc.'s Fourth Amended Trial Witness List)(Loy, Joseph)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 653 RESPONSE to #651 Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Response to Apple's Notice of Proposed Inadmissibility of Prior Adjudications filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Caldwell, Bradley)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 652 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. Plaintiff's Notice Regarding Prior Determination (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 651 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Apple's Notice of Proposed Inadmissibility of Prior Adjudications (Loy, Joseph)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 650 ORDER overruling VirnetX's objection and permitting Apple to reserve its opening statement until VirnetX rests its case-in-chief. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/23/2018. (mjc, )
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 649 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #648 Notice (Other), Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of First Amended Trial Exhibit List (Amended Exhibit L to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order). (Attachments: #1 Amended Exhibit L)(Loy, Joseph)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 648 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #622 Proposed Pretrial Order, Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of First Amended Trial Exhibit List (Amended Exhibit L to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L - Sealed)(Loy, Joseph)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 647 Sealed Transcript. (klp, )
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 646 NOTICE OF FILING OF (UNSEALED PORTION) OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 03/20/2018, before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter, Kelly Polvi; email: Kelly_Polvi@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/16/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2018. (klp, )
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 645 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Apple's Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Opening Statements (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Loy, Joseph)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 644 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #608 Sealed Patent Motion in limine; granting in part and denying in part #609 Sealed Patent Motion in limine, and carrying portions of both motions to the next pretrial conference. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/21/2018. (mjc, )
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 643 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. VirnetX's Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Opening Statements (Caldwell, Bradley)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 642 ORDER REGARDING EXHIBITS, EXHIBIT LISTS AND WITNESS LISTS entered. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/21/2018. (mjc, )
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 641 ORDER ON TRIAL PROCEDURES entered. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/21/2018. (mjc, )
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER setting a Final Pretrial Conference for 3/26/2018 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/21/2018. (mjc, )
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 639 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/20/2018. (Court Reporter Kelly Polvi) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 638 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #637 Notice (Other) (Apple's Notice of Filing of Final Deposition Transcript). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Loy, Joseph)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 637 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #618 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Notice of Filing of Final Deposition Transcript (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sealed)(Loy, Joseph)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 636 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL JOINT STIPULATION RELATING TO CERTAIN MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Caldwell, Bradley)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 635 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEYS TO REFILE PLEADING.*** NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. Notice of Supplemental Joint Stipulation Relating to Certain Motions in Limine (Caldwell, Bradley) Modified on 3/19/2018 (mll, ).
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 634 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #633 Notice (Other) (Apple's Notice of Filing of Rough Deposition Transcript). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Loy, Joseph)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 633 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #618 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Filing of Rough Deposition Transcript (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sealed)(Loy, Joseph)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 632 REDACTION to #628 Sealed Response to Motion, by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6 - Redacted, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 631 REDACTION to #627 Sealed Response to Motion, by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A REDACTED, #2 Exhibit B REDACTED, #3 Exhibit C PUBLIC VERSION, #4 Exhibit D PUBLIC VERSION, #5 Text of Proposed Order PUBLIC VERSION)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 630 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 03/06/2018, before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter, Kelly Polvi: Kelly_Polvi@txed.uscourts.gov. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 4/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/18/2018. (klp, )
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 629 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Notice Regarding Sealed Attachments to Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order (Dkt. No. 622) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M VirnetX's Objections to Apple's Trial Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit N Apple's Objections to VirnetX's Trial Exhibit List)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #626 Sealed Additional Attachments. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (mjc, )
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 628 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #608 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiff's Motions in Limine filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 627 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #609 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Apple's Motions in Limine filed by VirnetX Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #622 Proposed Pretrial Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M, #2 Exhibit N)(Caldwell, Bradley) Modified on 3/14/2018 (mjc, ).
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 625 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #622 Proposed Pretrial Order, Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Third Amended Trial Witness List (Amended Exhibit B to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order (Attachments: #1 Amended Exhibit B - Defendant Apple Inc.'s Third Amended Trial Witness List)(Loy, Joseph)
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORDER denying #542 Sealed Patent Document (Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of a $1.20 Per Unit in Damages if Infringement is Found), denying #541 Sealed Patent Document (Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement by FaceTime based on Preclusive Effect of Prior Judgment). Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/9/2018. (mjc, )
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 623 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #622 Proposed Pretrial Order,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit E & F, #3 Exhibit G & H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J, #6 Exhibit K, #7 Exhibit L)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 622 Proposed Pretrial Order by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C FILED UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E & F FILED UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit G & H FILED UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit I FILED UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit J FILED UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit K FILED UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit L FILED UNDER SEAL)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 621 Proposed Jury Instructions by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 620 Proposed Findings of Fact by VirnetX Inc.. (Caldwell, Bradley)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 619 Second Amended Trial Witness List by Apple Inc.. (Loy, Joseph)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #543 Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order to Supplement its Initial Disclosures; denying #545 Motion for Sequencing of Issues in the Already Bifurcated Trial. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/07/18. (mll, )
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 617 REDACTION to #608 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiff's Motions in Limine by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A REDACTED, #2 Exhibit B PUBLIC VERSION, #3 Text of Proposed Order PUBLIC VERSION)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 616 REDACTION to #609 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Apple's Motions in Limine by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - Redacted, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7 - Redacted, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 615 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Wesley White on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6688500. (White, Wesley) (Main Document 615 replaced on 3/8/2018) (jmv, ).
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 614 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jennifer Przybylski on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6688491. (Przybylski, Jennifer) (Main Document 614 replaced on 3/8/2018) (jmv, ).
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 613 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Edward B. Geist on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6688482. (Geist, Edward) (Main Document 613 replaced on 3/8/2018) (jmv, ).
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 612 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Notice of Filing March 6, 2018 Hearing Presentation Slides (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Slide presentation re Dkt. 543)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 611 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of March 6, 2018 Hearing Presentation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Slide Presentation re: DKT. 543, #2 Exhibit 2 - Slide Presentation re: DKT. 545)(Loy, Joseph)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 610 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Motion Hearing held on 3/6/2018 re #543 MOTION to Amend/Correct Apple's Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order to Supplement Its Initial Disclosures filed by Apple Inc., and #545 MOTION for the Sequencing of Issues in the Already Bifurcated Trial filed by Apple Inc. (Court Reporter Kelly Polvi) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 609 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Apple's Motions in Limine by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 608 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Plaintiff's Motions in Limine by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 607 ORDER granting-as-modified #605 Joint Motion for Submission of Juror Questionnaire. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/5/2018. (mjc, )
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 606 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. RENEWAL OF MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Cassady, Jason)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 605 Joint MOTION JOINT MOTION FOR SUBMISSION OF JUROR QUESTIONNAIRE by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ELEVENTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER entered, granting #601 Motion to Amend/Correct the DCO. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/2/2018. (mjc, )
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 603 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. VirnetX's Requested Time for Jury Selection and Trial (Caldwell, Bradley)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 602 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Estimates of Time for Jury Selection and Trial (Loy, Joseph)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 601 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct the Docket Control Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 600 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #599 Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Objections to VirnetX's Rebuttal Deposition Designations. (Attachments: #1 Apple Inc.'s Objections to VirnetX's Rebuttal Deposition Designations)(Appleby, Robert)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 599 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Objections to VirnetX's Rebuttal Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Apple Inc.'s Objections to VirnetX's Rebuttal Deposition Designations)(Appleby, Robert)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 598 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #597 VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Pretrial Objections.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A VirnetX's Cross-Designations and Objections to Apple's Rebuttal Deposition Designations)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 597 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Pretrial Objections (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A VirnetX's Cross-Designations and Objections to Apple's Rebuttal Deposition Designations (Filed Under Seal))(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 596 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #543 MOTION to Amend/Correct Apple's Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order to Supplement Its Initial Disclosures, #545 MOTION for the Sequencing of Issues in the Already Bifurcated Trial : Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2018 01:00 PM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 2/28/18. (mjc, )
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER from the USCA - FEDERAL CIRCUIT the Petition for Writ of Mandamus in case nos. 6:11cv563 and 6:12cv855 is denied. Signed for the Court by Clerk Peter R. Marksteiner on 2/22/2018. (mjc, )
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 594 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #593 Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Objections to VirnetX's Trial Exhibit List. (Attachments: #1 Apple Inc.'s Objections to VirnetX's Trial Exhibit List)(Appleby, Robert)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 593 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Objections to VirnetX's Trial Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Defendant Apple Inc.'s Objections to VirnetX's Inc.'s Trial Exhibit List (Filed Under Seal))(Appleby, Robert)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 592 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #591 Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Counter-Designations and Objections to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations. (Attachments: #1 Apple Inc.'s Counter-Designations and Objections to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations)(Appleby, Robert)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 591 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Counter-Designations and Objections to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Apple Inc.'s Counter-Designations and Objections to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations(Filed Under Seal))(Appleby, Robert)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 590 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #589 VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Objections to Pretrial Disclosures. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A VirnetX's Objections to Apple's Trial Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit B VirnetX's Objections & Counter Deposition Designations to Apple's Initial Deposition Designations)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 589 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Pretrial Objections (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A VirnetX's Objections to Apple's Trial Exhibit List (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B VirnetX's Objections & Counter Deposition Designations to Apple's Initial Deposition Designations (Filed Under Seal))(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 588 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (Jones, Michael)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 587 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. VIRNETX'S NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPTS AND REAL TIME REPORTING OF COURT PROCEEDINGS (Caldwell, Bradley)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 586 Amended Trial Witness List by Apple Inc.. (Loy, Joseph)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 585 REDACTION to #581 Sealed Patent Document, by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Slide Presentation re Dkt. 541, #2 Exhibit 2 REDACTED, #3 Exhibit 3 Slide Presentation re Dkt. 542)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 584 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Compliance regarding service of trial exhibits (Appleby, Robert)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 583 REDACTION to #580 Sealed Patent Document Notice of Filing February 9, 2018 Hearing Presentation by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Redacted, #2 Exhibit 2: Slide presentation re Dkt. 542)(Jones, Michael)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 582 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 02/09/2018 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Polvi,Telephone number: 903.794.1018. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/8/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/19/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/17/2018. (klp, )
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 581 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Notice of Filing February 9, 2018 Hearing Presentation Slides & Demonstratives (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Slide presentation re Dkt. 541, #2 Exhibit 2 Demonstratives re Dkt. 541, #3 Exhibit 3 Slide presentation re Dkt. 542)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 580 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of February 9, 2018 Hearing Presentation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Slide presentation re Dkt. 541, #2 Exhibit 2: Slide presentation re Dkt. 542)(Jones, Michael)
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 579 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Motions hearing on #541 VirnetX's Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement of FaceTime based on Preclusive Effect and #542 VirnetX's Motion for Summary Judgment of $1.20 per unit in Damages if Infringement is Found held on 2/9/2018. (Court Reporter Kelly Polvi) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 578 REDACTION to #577 Sealed Document Apple Inc.'s Notice of Exhibit List by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Apple Inc.'s Exhibit List)(Appleby, Robert)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 577 Sealed Document. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Exhibit List (Attachments: #1 Apple Inc.'s Exhibit List)(Appleby, Robert)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 576 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Apple Inc.'s Initial Deposition Designations)(Appleby, Robert)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 574 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #573 VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Pretrial Disclosures. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Trial Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit B Initial Deposition Designations)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 573 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Pretrial Disclosures (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Trial Exhibit List (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B Initial Deposition Designations (Filed Under Seal))(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 572 REDACTION to #568 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion (Apple's Sur-Reply in Opposition to VirnetX's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement) by Apple Inc.. (Appleby, Robert)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 571 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #545 MOTION for the Sequencing of Issues in the Already Bifurcated Trial filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Caldwell, Bradley)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 570 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #543 MOTION to Amend/Correct Apple's Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order to Supplement Its Initial Disclosures filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Caldwell, Bradley)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 569 RESPONSE to #542 Sealed Patent Document, (Apple's Sur-Reply in Support of its Opposition to VirnetX's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of a $1.20 Per Unit in Damages if Infringement is Found) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leslie M. Schmidt, #2 Exhibit 9 - Deposition Transcript of W. Christopher Bakewell)(Appleby, Robert)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 568 SEALED PATENT SUR-REPLY by Apple Inc. to #541 Sealed Patent Document, (Apple's Sur-Reply in Opposition to VirnetX's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement) filed by Apple Inc.. (Appleby, Robert)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 567 REDACTION to #565 Sealed Patent Document, Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of a $1.20 Per Unit in Damages if Infringement is Found by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Summers PUBLIC VERSION, #2 Exhibit 1 REDACTED, #3 Exhibit 2 PUBLIC VERSION)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 566 REDACTION to #564 Sealed Patent Document, Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement by FaceTime Based on Preclusive Effect of Prior Judgment by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Summers PUBLIC VERSION, #2 Exhibit 1 REDACTED)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 565 SEALED PATENT REPLY TO RESPONSE TO #542 Sealed Patent Document, Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of a $1.20 Per Unit in Damages if Infringement is Found. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Summers, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 564 SEALED PATENT REPLY TO RESPONSE TO #541 Sealed Patent Document, Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement by FaceTime Based on Preclusive Effect of Prior Judgment (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Summers, #2 Exhibit 1)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 563 REPLY to Response to Motion re #545 MOTION for the Sequencing of Issues in the Already Bifurcated Trial filed by Apple Inc.. (Appleby, Robert)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 562 REPLY to Response to Motion re #543 MOTION to Amend/Correct Apple's Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order to Supplement Its Initial Disclosures filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5-2016.01.07 Hearing Transcript, #2 Exhibit 6-2016.01.07 Hearing Transcript - No. 2, #3 Exhibit 7-2016.01.28 Trial Transcript, #4 Exhibit 8-2016.09.29 Trial Transcript)(Appleby, Robert)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 561 Trial Witness List by VirnetX Inc.. (Cassady, Jason)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 560 Trial Witness List by Apple Inc.. (Loy, Joseph)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 559 REDACTION to #554 Sealed Patent Response to Non-Motion, Apple's Opposition to VirnetX's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Matthew Blaze - REDACTED, #2 Declaration of Akshay S. Deoras - REDACTED, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 558 RESPONSE in Opposition re #545 MOTION for the Sequencing of Issues in the Already Bifurcated Trial filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 557 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #555 (Apple's Opposition to VirnetX Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of a $1.20 Per Unit in Damages if Infringement is Found filed by Apple Inc). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of W. Christopher Bakewell, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 8)(Appleby, Robert)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 556 RESPONSE in Opposition re #543 MOTION to Amend/Correct Apple's Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order to Supplement Its Initial Disclosures filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 555 RESPONSE to #542 Sealed Patent Document, Apple's Opposition to VirnetX Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of a $1.20 Per Unit in Damages if Infringement is Found filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of W. Christopher Bakewell, #2 Declaration of Leslie M. Schmidt, #3 Exhibit 1-Deposition Transcript of Bakewell, #4 Exhibit 2-Rebuttal Expert Report of Bakewell (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 3-Supplemental Rebuttal Expert Report of Bakewell (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 4-Trial Transcript 2016.09.29 PM, #7 Exhibit 5-Trial Transcript 2016.09.29 AM, #8 Exhibit 6-Trial Transcript 2016.09.28 PM, #9 Exhibit 7-Trial Transcript 2016.02.01, #10 Exhibit 8-Trial Sealed Transcript 2016.09.28 PM (Filed Under Seal), #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 554 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE (Apple's Opposition to VirnetX's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Infringement) by Apple Inc. to #541 Sealed Patent Document, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Matthew Blaze, #2 Declaration of Akshay S. Deoras, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 553 MEMORANDUM OPINION detailing the reasons for denying Apple Inc.'s Motion to Stay #518 . Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/12/18. (mjc, )
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 552 ORDER granting #549 Motion to Change Case Style. The style of this action shall be changed by substituting Movant's correct corporate name of Leidos, Inc. in place of its former corporate name of Science Applications International Corporation. The Clerk of the Court is directed to modify the style of the caption to read VirnetX Inc. and Leidos, Inc. v. Apple, Inc. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 1/11/18. (mjc, )
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 551 REDACTION to #542 Sealed Patent Document, Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of a $1.20 Per Unit in Damages if Infringement is Found by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Summers PUBLIC VERSION, #2 Exhibit A REDACTED, #3 Exhibit B REDACTED, #4 Exhibit C REDACTED, #5 Exhibit D REDACTED, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 550 REDACTION to #541 Sealed Patent Document, Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement by FaceTime Based on Preclusive Effect of Prior Judgment by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Summers PUBLIC VERSION, #2 Exhibit A REDACTED, #3 Exhibit B REDACTED, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 549 Unopposed MOTION to Change Case Style by Science Applications International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 548 ORDER from USCA - FEDERAL CIRCUIT that VirnetX Inc. and Science Applications International Corporation are to respond to the petition for writ of mandamus within seven days of the date of filing of this order. Any reply must be filed no later than three days from the date of the response. Signed for the Court by Clerk Peter R. Marksteiner on 1/8/18. (mjc, )
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 547 NOTICE OF DOCKETING by USCA - FEDERAL CIRCUIT. A petition for writ of mandamus has been filed by Apple Inc. Case no. 18-123. (mjc, )
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 546 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Renewal of Apple's Daubert Motions (Appleby, Robert)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 545 MOTION for the Sequencing of Issues in the Already Bifurcated Trial by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 544 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #543 MOTION to Amend/Correct Apple's Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order to Supplement Its Initial Disclosures. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4- Excerpts from Expert Report of Roy Weinstein)(Appleby, Robert)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 543 MOTION to Amend/Correct Apple's Motion to Modify the Docket Control Order to Supplement Its Initial Disclosures by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 9/28/2016 AM Trial Transcript, #2 Exhibit 2 1/27/2016 Trial Transcript, #3 Exhibit 3 9/28/2016 PM Trial Transcript, #4 Exhibit 4 Excerpts from Expert Report of Roy Weinstein (filed under seal), #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 542 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of a $1.20 Per Unit in Damages if Infringement is Found (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Summers, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 541 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Infringement by FaceTime Based on Preclusive Effect of Prior Judgment (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Summers, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 540 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. JOINT NOTICE REGARDING MEDIATOR (Cassady, Jason)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 539 TENTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 3/20/2018 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Selection and Trial set for 4/2/2018 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Dispositive Motionn Hearing set for 2/9/2018 10:00 AM in Ctrm 319 (Texarkana) before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Order grants #538 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order filed by VirnetX Inc. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/30/17. (mjc, )
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 538 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER granting #536 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jason Scott McManis terminated as counsel for VirnetX Inc. Clerk shall terminate CM/ECF notices. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/15/17. (mjc, )
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 536 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 535 ORDER setting Jury Selection and Trial for 4/2/2018 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Parties are ORDERED to meet and confer and propose a joint amended docket control order to the Court by 11/17/2017. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/9/17. (mjc, )
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER granting #530 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Thomas Vincent Matthew and Steve Papazian terminated as counsel of record for Apple. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/9/17. (mjc, )
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER granting #531 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Arturo Padilla terminated as counsel for Leidos, Inc., formerly known as Science Applications International Corporation. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/7/17. (mjc, )
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 532 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re #529 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Cassady, Jason)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 531 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Arturo Padilla by Science Applications International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 530 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Steven Papazian and Thomas Matthew by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER denying #528 Motion Regarding Proposed Trial Date. Parties are ordered to meet, confer and select one of the dates specified for jury selection with trial to immediately follow. They shall notify the Court of their joint selection by 11/3/2017. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/24/17. (mjc, )
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 528 Joint MOTION Regarding Proposed Trial Date re #527 Order on Motion to Stay by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER denying #518 Motion to Stay. A memorandum opinion will follow. Parties are to meet and confer and file a joint motion with a proposed trial date by 10/13/2017. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/29/17. (mjc, )
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 526 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. (Notice of Supplemental Authority) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bunt, Robert)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 525 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #518 Opposed MOTION to Stay filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Caldwell, Bradley)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER denying as moot #306 Sealed Patent Motion; denying as moot #308 Sealed Patent Motion; denying as moot #369 Sealed Patent Motion; denying as moot #400 Sealed Patent Motion; denying as moot #495 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 3/23/2017. (gsg)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 523 REPLY to Response to Motion re #518 Opposed MOTION to Stay filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16-Federal Circuit PTAB Appeal Statistics)(Appleby, Robert)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 522 RESPONSE in Opposition re #518 Opposed MOTION to Stay filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 521 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on 3/3/2017 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/27/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/5/2017. (sms, )
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Conference call held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Telephone Conference held on 3/3/2017. Attorneys in attendance were Chris Bunt, Jason Cassady, Austin Curry and Johnny Ward for Plaintiff; and Mike Jones, Greg Arovas, Robert Appleby, Joseph Loy, Ameet Modi and John Desmarais for Defendant. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan) (bas)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 520 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. NOTICE OF VIRNETX'S PROPOSED TRIAL SCHEDULE (Cassady, Jason)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 519 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Apple's Pretrial Plan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Apple's Proposed Docket Control Order)(Appleby, Robert)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 518 Opposed MOTION to Stay by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 517 ORDER denying #499 Motion to Stay; denying #504 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 09/15/16. (mll, )
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 516 ORDER denying as moot #419 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Damages; denying as moot #420 Sealed Patent Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Willfulness; denying as moot #421 Sealed Patent Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement; denying as moot #424 Motion for Mistrial; denying as moot #462 Sealed Motion for Entry of Judgment and Equitable and Statutory Relief; denying as moot #463 Sealed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and for a New Trial (portions not addressed in #500 Order). In addition, the order granting-in-part and denying-in-part Apple's motion for permission to contact the former jurors #476 is hereby VACATED and DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 09/12/16. (mll, )
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 515 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #504 MOTION for Reconsideration re #500 Order on Sealed Motion,, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - 012216 email from Summers)(Jones, Michael)
September 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 514 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Apple's Notice of Recent Developments Regarding Invalidity (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Loy, Joseph)
September 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 513 REPLY to Response to Motion re #504 MOTION for Reconsideration re #500 Order on Sealed Motion,, VIRNETX INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Caldwell, Bradley)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 512 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #499 Opposed MOTION to Stay filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Caldwell, Bradley)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 511 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ameet A Modi on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5916706. (Modi, Ameet)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 510 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael P Stadnick on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5916700. (Stadnick, Michael)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 509 RESPONSE in Opposition re #504 MOTION for Reconsideration re #500 Order on Sealed Motion,, filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 508 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re #504 MOTION for Reconsideration re #500 Order on Sealed Motion,, VIRNETX'S NOTICE OF FILING OF SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (Attachments: #1 Summers Declaration, #2 Exhibit G-1, #3 Exhibit G-2, #4 Exhibit G-3, #5 Exhibit G-4, #6 Exhibit G-5, #7 Exhibit G-6, #8 Exhibit G-7, #9 Exhibit G-8, #10 Exhibit G-9, #11 Exhibit G-10)(Caldwell, Bradley)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 507 REPLY to Response to Motion re #499 Opposed MOTION to Stay filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21)(Appleby, Robert)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER granting #503 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/12/16. (mll, )
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 505 RESPONSE in Opposition re #499 Opposed MOTION to Stay VIRNETX INC.'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO APPLE'S MOTION TO STAY filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 504 MOTION for Reconsideration re #500 Order on Sealed Motion,, by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Summers, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 503 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 502 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Vincent Matthew on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5869916. (Matthew, Thomas)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 501 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Aaron D Resetarits on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5868772. (Resetarits, Aaron)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order ***Consolidated Defendant Apple Inc (6:10cv417) is SEVERED from this Consolidated Lead Action. All pleadings related to the former consolidated case should now be filed in Civil Action 6:10cv417. Attorneys who have not appeared in 6:10cv417 should also file notices of appearance in that case. (mll, )
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 500 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #463 Sealed Motion for New Trial. The orders consolidating the cases (Cause No. 6:10-cv-417, Docket No. 878; Cause No. 6:12-cv-855, Docket No. 220) are hereby VACATED. The issue of willfulness in both cases is BIFURCATED. Cause No. 6:10-cv-417 will be retried with jury selection to begin on 9-26-2016, unless the parties agree otherwise on an alternative date, and immediately followed by a second trial on the issue of willfulness. Cause No. 6:12-cv-855 will be retried after Cause No. 6:10-cv-417.The parties are ORDERED to meet and confer and file a joint pretrial plan for Cause No. 6:10-cv-417 within ten (10) days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/29/16. (mll, )
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 499 Opposed MOTION to Stay by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 498 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #495 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing Regarding VirnetX's Request for Enhanced Damages (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Loy, Joseph)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 497 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Notice of Subsequent Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Loy, Joseph)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 496 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. VirnetX's Notice Regarding Apple's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Submit Supplemental Briefing Regarding VirnetX's Request for Enhanced Damages #495 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Caldwell, Bradley)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 495 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing Regarding VirnetX's Request for Enhanced Damages by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 494 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. VirnetX's Notice of New Supreme Court Authority Regarding VirnetX's Request for Enhanced Damages Pursuant to 35 U.S.C. 284 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Caldwell, Bradley)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 493 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE by VirnetX Inc. to #492 Apple's Supplemental Post-Trial Submission in Support of its Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and New Trial. filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Caldwell, Bradley)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 492 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. APPLE'S SUPPLEMENTAL POST-TRIAL SUBMISSION IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW AND NEW TRIAL(Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Loy, Joseph)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 491 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Post Trial Motions Hearing held on 05/25/2016 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Smith, CSR, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number: 903-794-1018 (brenda_smith@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2016. (bhs, )
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 490 ORDER granting #489 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 5/31/16. (mjc, )
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 489 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Leslie)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 488 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. VirnetX's Notice of Filing of May 25, 2016 Hearing Presentation Slides. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Caldwell, Bradley)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 487 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of May 25, 2016 Hearing Presentation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Loy, Joseph)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 486 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Motion Hearing held on 5/25/2016 re #462 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFF VIRNETX INC.'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND EQUITABLE AND STATUTORY RELIEF filed by VirnetX Inc., #424 MOTION for Mistrial Written Objection to Closing Argument by VirnetX and Motion for Mistrial filed by Apple Inc., #463 SEALED MOTION APPLE'S OMNIBUS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50(b) AND FOR A NEW TRIAL filed by Apple Inc.. (Court Reporter Brenda Smith) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER SETTING POST-TRIAL HEARING TIMES. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/16/16. (mll, )
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 484 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #476 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Apple's Reply to VirnetX's Juror Questionnaire Objections (Loy, Joseph)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 483 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re #476 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, VirnetX's Response to Apple's Objections to VirnetX's Juror Questionnaire (Caldwell, Bradley)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 482 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #476 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Apple's Objections to VirnetX's Juror Questionnaire (Loy, Joseph)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 481 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re #476 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, VirnetX's Objections to Apple's Juror Questionnaire (Caldwell, Bradley)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 480 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re #463 SEALED MOTION APPLE'S OMNIBUS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50(b) AND FOR A NEW TRIAL filed by VirnetX Inc. (Caldwell, Bradley)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 479 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Response to Motion re #462 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFF VIRNETX INC.'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND EQUITABLE AND STATUTORY RELIEF filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21, #2 Exhibit 22, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24, #5 Exhibit 25, #6 Exhibit 26, #7 Exhibit 27, #8 Exhibit 28, #9 Exhibit 29, #10 Exhibit 30, #11 Exhibit 31, #12 Exhibit 32, #13 Exhibit 33, #14 Exhibit 34, #15 Exhibit 35, #16 Exhibit 36, #17 Exhibit 37, #18 Exhibit 38, #19 Exhibit 39, #20 Exhibit 40, #21 Exhibit 41, #22 Exhibit 42)(Appleby, Robert)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 478 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re #476 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, VirnetX's Former Juror Questionnaire (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Questionnaire)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 477 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #476 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Apple's Juror Questionnaire (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 476 ***VACATED AND DENIED AS MOOT PER #516 ORDER.*** ORDER granting in part and denying in part #467 Motion for Permission to Contact Former Jurors. Parties may contact the jurors through Court-approved questionnaires under the conditions detailed in this order. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/18/16. (mll, ) Modified on 9/12/2016 (mll, ).
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 475 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #463 SEALED MOTION APPLE'S OMNIBUS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50(b) AND FOR A NEW TRIAL filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9)(Appleby, Robert)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 474 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #462 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFF VIRNETX INC.'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND EQUITABLE AND STATUTORY RELIEF filed by VirnetX Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason S. McManis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 473 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #467 Opposed MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO CONTACT FORMER JURORS filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Caldwell, Bradley)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 472 REPLY to Response to Motion re #467 Opposed MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO CONTACT FORMER JURORS filed by Apple Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 471 APPLE'S SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #462 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFF VIRNETX INC.'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND EQUITABLE AND STATUTORY RELIEF filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 470 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #463 SEALED MOTION APPLE'S OMNIBUS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50(b) AND FOR A NEW TRIAL filed by VirnetX Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason S. McManis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 469 RESPONSE in Opposition re #467 Opposed MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO CONTACT FORMER JURORS filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher S. Stewart, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 468 MEMORANDUM OPINION RE #362 ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/22/16. (mll, )
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 467 Opposed MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO CONTACT FORMER JURORS by Apple Inc.. (Loy, Joseph) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/17/2016: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ).
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 466 Sealed Document.SEALED NOTICE OF FILING OF CORRECTED PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT RE: DKT 462 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 465 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re #464 Brief, NOTICE OF FILING OF CORRECTED PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 464 BRIEF (PUBLIC VERSION OF VIRNETX INC.'S #462 Sealed MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND EQUITABLE AND STATUTORY RELIEF by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Pearson Declaration, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 463 SEALED MOTION APPLE'S OMNIBUS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50(b) AND FOR A NEW TRIAL by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert) Modified on 7/29/2016 (mll, ).
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 462 SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFF VIRNETX INC.'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND EQUITABLE AND STATUTORY RELIEF by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Pearson Declaration, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE. Document # 461, Sealed Document. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENTS USED. Documents # 459 Sealed Document (Should be Sealed Motion) and #460, Response to Motion (Should be Sealed Response). PLEASE IGNORE THESE DOCUMENTS.*** (sm, )
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Sealed Document. APPLE'S OMNIBUS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW UNDER RULE 50(b)AND FOR A NEW TRIAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert) Modified on 3/8/2016 (sm, ).
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***RESPONSE to #455 Order,, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,, Set Hearings, PUBLIC VERSION OF VIRNETX INC.'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND EQUITABLE AND STATUTORY RELIEF [DKT. NO. 459] by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Pearson Declaration, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) Modified on 3/8/2016 (sm, ).
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Sealed Document. PLAINTIFF VIRNETX INC.'S MOTION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AND EQUITABLE AND STATUTORY RELIEF (Attachments: #1 Pearson Declaration, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Exhibit H, #8 Exhibit I, #9 Exhibit J, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley) Modified on 3/8/2016 (sm, ).
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER denying as moot #218 Motion to Take Depositions Out of Time. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/03/16. (mll, )
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER granting #456 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Allen Franklin Gardner terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 03/02/16. (mll, )
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 456 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER REGARDING POST-TRIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Professor Francis McGovern is appointed as Mediator in this case. Mediation Completion due by 5/18/2016. Post-Trial Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2016 10:00 AM in Texarkana Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/16/16. (mll, )
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 454 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #424 MOTION for Mistrial Written Objection to Closing Argument by VirnetX and Motion for Mistrial filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bradley W. Caldwell, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 453 ORDER granting #448 Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/10/16. (mll, )
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER granting #447 Sealed Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 02/10/16. (mll, )
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 451 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. VirnetX's Notice Regarding Demonstratives Used During Trial (Caldwell, Bradley)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 450 REPLY to Response to Motion re #424 MOTION for Mistrial Written Objection to Closing Argument by VirnetX and Motion for Mistrial filed by Apple Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ***DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.***REPLY to Response to Motion re #424 MOTION for Mistrial Written Objection to Closing Argument by VirnetX and Motion for Mistrial filed by Apple Inc.. (Jones, Michael) Modified on 2/8/2016 (mjc, ).
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 448 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Certain Trial Exhibits by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 447 Unopposed SEALED MOTION VirnetX's Unopposed Motion to Seal Trial Exhibits by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR. Document #449 Reply to Response to Motion. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (mjc, )
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 446 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Volume 8, held on 02/03/2016 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Smith, CSR, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number: 903-794-1018 (brenda_smith@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016. (bhs, )
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 445 Sealed Transcript of Jury Trial, Volume 7. (bhs, )
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 444 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Volume 7, held on 02/02/2016 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Smith, CSR, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number: 903-794-1018 (brenda_smith@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016. (bhs, )
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 443 Sealed Transcript of Jury Trial, Volume 6. (bhs, )
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 442 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Volume 6, held on 02/01/2016 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Smith, CSR, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number: 903-794-1018 (brenda_smith@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016. (bhs, )
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 441 Sealed Transcript of Jury Trial, Volume 5. (bhs, )
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 440 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Volume 5, held on 01/29/2016 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Smith, CSR, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number: 903-794-1018 (brenda_smith@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016. (bhs, )
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 439 Sealed Transcript of Jury Trial, Volume 4. (bhs, )
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 438 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Volume 4, held on 01/28/2016 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Smith, CSR, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number: 903-794-1018 (brenda_smith@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016. (bhs, )
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 437 Sealed Transcript of Jury Trial, Volume 3. (bhs, )
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 436 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Volume 3, held on 01/27/2016 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Smith, CSR, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number: 903-794-1018 (brenda_smith@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016. (bhs, )
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 435 Sealed Transcript of Jury Trial, Volume 2. (bhs, )
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 434 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Volume 2 held on 01/26/2016 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Smith, CSR, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number: 903-794-1018 (brenda_smith@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016. (bhs, )
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 433 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial, Volume 1, held on 01/25/2016 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Smith, CSR, RPR, FCRR,Telephone number: 903-794-1018 (brenda_smith@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016. (bhs, )
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 432 RESPONSE in Opposition re #424 MOTION for Mistrial Written Objection to Closing Argument by VirnetX and Motion for Mistrial filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 431 Defendant's Final Admitted Exhibits List. (bas)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 430 Plaintiff's Final Admitted Exhibits List. (bas)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 429 SEALED Jury Notes. (bas)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 428 Jury Instructions. (bas)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 427 Sealed Jury Verdict. (bas)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 426 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Day eight of jury trial completed on 2/3/2016. (Court Reporter Brenda Smith) (bas)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 425 JURY VERDICT. (bas)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 424 MOTION for Mistrial Written Objection to Closing Argument by VirnetX and Motion for Mistrial by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 423 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Concerning the Demonstratives Used by Apple on Direct and Cross Examinations (Jones, Michael)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 422 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Day seven of jury trial held on 2/2/2016. (Court Reporter Brenda Smith) (bas)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 421 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Non-Infringement by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - cv855 Jury Instructions, #2 Ex. 2 - cv417 Responsive CC Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 420 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Willfulness by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1 - cv417 Notice, #2 Ex. 2 - 012516 Apple VirnetX IPR '135, #3 Ex. 3 - 012516 Apple VirnetX IPR '151, #4 Ex. 4 - 052714 Right of Appeal Notice, #5 Ex. 5 - 022615 Right of Appeal Notice, #6 Ex. 6 - 052314 Right of Appeal Notice, #7 Ex. 7 - 010915 Right of Appeal Notice, #8 Ex. 8 - 091515 Right of Appeal Notice, #9 Ex. 9 - 091515 right of Appeal Notice, #10 Ex. 10 - 092215 Closing Prosecution, #11 Ex. 11 - 092215 Closing Prosecution, #12 Ex. 12 - cv 417 Stipulation, #13 Ex. 13 - cv855 Jury Instructions, #14 Ex. 14 - 082012 email from Cassady to Drew, #15 Ex. 15 - 090512 email from Drew to Cassady, #16 Ex. 16 - 090812 email from Cassady to Drew, #17 Ex. 17 - 092512 email from Drew to Cassady, #18 Ex. 18 - 101012 email from Drew to Cassady, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 419 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on Damages by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 418 TRIAL BRIEF Offer of Proof by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - 052714 Right of Appeal Notice, #2 Ex. B - 022615 Right of Appeal Notice, #3 Ex. C - 052314 Right of Appeal Notice, #4 Ex. D - 010915 Right of Appeal Notice, #5 Ex. E - 091515 Right of Appeal Notice, #6 Ex. F - 091515 Right of Appeal Notice, #7 Ex. G - Apple VirnetX IPR '135, #8 Ex. H - 092215 Closing Prosecution, #9 Ex. I - 092215 Closing Prosecution, #10 Ex. J - Apple VirnetX IPR '151)(Jones, Michael)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 417 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Day six of jury trial held on 2/1/2016. (Court Reporter Brenda Smith) (bas)
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 416 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Day five of jury trial held on 1/29/2016. (Court Reporter Brenda Smith) (bas)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 415 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Day four of jury trial held on 1/28/2016. (Court Reporter Brenda Smith) (bas)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 414 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Day three of jury trial held on 1/27/2016. (Court Reporter Brenda Smith) (bas)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 413 RESPONSE to #411 Notice (Other) Response to Apple's Notice Concerning Dr. Jones' Testimony Regarding Apple's Claim Construction Positions filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Caldwell, Bradley)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 412 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John C O'Quinn on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5582312. (O'Quinn, John)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 411 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Concerning Dr. Jones' Testimony Regarding Apple's Claim Construction Positions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Appleby, Robert)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 410 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Day two of jury trial held on 1/26/2016. (Court Reporter Brenda Smith) (bas)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 409 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #407 Opposed MOTION VirnetX's Motion for Curative Instruction Based on Apple's Improper Arguments Made to the Jury filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Pretrial and MIL Hearing [2016.01.19], #2 Ex. B - Jury Trial Volume 1, #3 Ex. C - DKT266 - Memorandum Opinion and Order [Markman], #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 408 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Certificate of Conference): #407 Opposed MOTION VirnetX's Motion for Curative Instruction Based on Apple's Improper Arguments Made to the Jury .. (Caldwell, Bradley)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 407 Opposed MOTION VirnetX's Motion for Curative Instruction Based on Apple's Improper Arguments Made to the Jury by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summers Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 406 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Jury Selection and first day of trial held on 1/25/2016. (Court Reporter Brenda Smith) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 405 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John M Desmarais on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5578169. (Desmarais, John)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER REGARDING TRIAL TIMES. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 01/25/16. (mll, )
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER granting #402 Motion for Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 01/25/16. (mll, )
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 402 Joint MOTION for Entry of Stipulation and Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and Order)(Jones, Michael)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 401 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #400 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Apple's Motion to Preclude VirnetX's Assertions of Willfullness against iMessage filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John F. Summers, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order ***FILED IN ERROR, PER COURT REPORTER, SEE #398 FOR CORRECTED FILING. Document # 397, Transcript. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
January 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 400 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Apple's Motion to Preclude VirnetX's Assertions of Willfullness against iMessage by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
January 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 399 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Second Amended Trial Exhibit List - Exhibit K to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [Dkt. No. 263]. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Exhibit K)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 398 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Final Pre-Trial Conference held on 01/22/2016 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Smith, CSR, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number: 903-794-1018 (brenda_smith@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/18/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/26/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2016. (bhs, )
January 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ***FILED IN ERROR PER COURT REPORTER, PLEASE IGNORE.***NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Final Pre-Trial Conference held on 01/22/2016 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Smith, CSR, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number: 903-794-1018 (brenda_smith@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/18/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/26/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2016. (bhs, ) Modified on 1/25/2016 (sm, ).
January 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 396 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Cross-Deposition Designations and Objections to Apple's Rebuttal Deposition Designations - Amended Exhibit I to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [Dkt. No. 263]. (Attachments: #1 Amended Exhibit I)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 395 Sealed Document.VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Third Amended Initial Deposition Designations Exhibit C to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [DKT. NO. 263] (Attachments: #1 Third Amended Exhibit C)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Final Pretrial/Exhibit Conference held on 1/22/2016. (Court Reporter Brenda Smith) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 393 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #387 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File VIRNETX'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION IN LIMINE OUT OF TIME filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 392 Sealed Document. Notice of Amended Joint Stipulation Relating to Certain Motions in Limine. (Cassady, Jason)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 391 Sealed Exhibit List Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Fourth Amended Trial Exhibit List (Fourth Amended Exhibit L to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [DKT. No. 263] by Apple Inc... (Attachments: #1 Fourth Amended Exhibit L)(Loy, Joseph)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 390 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #263 Proposed Pretrial Order Apple Inc.'s Counter-Designations and Objections to Plaintiff's Second Amended Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Combined Second Amended Exhibit G and H)(Loy, Joseph)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 389 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Pre-Trial Conference held on 01/19/2016 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Smith, CSR, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number: 903-794-1018 (brenda_smith@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2016. (bhs, )
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 388 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #306 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE, #308 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Motions In Limine Joint Notice of Agreement (Jones, Michael)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 387 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File VIRNETX'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION IN LIMINE OUT OF TIME by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 386 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Notice Concerning Dr. Short's Deposition Testimony Applicable to Apple's Motion in Limine IV. (Attachments: #1 Short Depo Excerpt)(Jones, Michael)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 385 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Final Pretrial Conference held on 1/19/2016. (Court Reporter Brenda Smith) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 384 Sealed Document. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Objections to VirnetX's First Amended Trial Exhibit List (Amended Exhibit N to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [DKT. No. 263]) (Attachments: #1 Amended Exhibit N)(Loy, Joseph)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 383 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #263 Proposed Pretrial Order Apple's Amended Deposition Designations - Amended Exhibit D (Attachments: #1 Amended Exhibit D)(Loy, Joseph)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF HEARING to address objections to trial exhibits will be held on JANUARY 22, 2016, at 1:00 PM in Texarkana. (bas)
January 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 382 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. Joint Notice of Agreements Regarding Motions in Limine (Cassady, Jason)
January 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 381 Sealed Exhibit List Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Third Amended Trial Exhibit List (Third Amended Exhibit L to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [DKT. No. 263] by Apple Inc... (Attachments: #1 Third Amended Exhibit List)(Loy, Joseph)
January 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 380 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. Notice of Parties' Agreed Trial Procedures (Cassady, Jason)
January 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 379 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Amended Trial Exhibit List - Exhibit K to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [Dkt. No. 263]. (Attachments: #1 Amended Exhibit K)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 378 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #377 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion. Exhibit A - Apple's P.R. 4-1 Disclosure (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Apple's P.R. 4-2 Disclosure, #2 Exhibit C - VirnetX's P.R. 4-1 Disclosure, #3 Exhibit D - VirnetX's 4-2 Disclosure)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 377 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #369 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO CLARIFY UNDER 02 MICRO filed by VirnetX Inc. (Caldwell, Bradley)
January 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Second Amended Objections to Apple's Trial Exhibit List - Exhibit M to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [Dkt. No. 263]. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Exhibit M)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 375 Sealed Exhibit List Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Second Amended Trial Exhibit List (Second Amended Exhibit L to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [Dkt. No. 263] by Apple Inc... (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Exhibit List)(Loy, Joseph)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 374 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #362 Order on Sealed Patent Motion, Order on Sealed Motion,,,,,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, The Parties' Joint Filing Regarding Apple's Proposed Remedy for VirnetX's Violation of the Court's Order and Rules (Loy, Joseph)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 373 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #369 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO CLARIFY UNDER 02 MICRO (Apple's Response to VirnetX's Emergency Motion to Clarify) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Appleby, Robert)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 372 Sealed Document. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Amended Objections to VirnetX's Trial Exhibit List (Amended Exhibit N to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [DKT. No. 263] (Attachments: #1 Amended Exhibit N)(Loy, Joseph)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 371 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Amended Objections to Apple's Trial Exhibit List - Exhibit M to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [Dkt. No. 263]. (Attachments: #1 Amended Exhibit M)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 370 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Second Amended Initial Deposition Designations - Exhibit C to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [Dkt. No. 263]. (Attachments: #1 Second Amended Exhibit C)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 369 Emergency SEALED PATENT MOTION TO CLARIFY UNDER 02 MICRO by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hamad M. Hamad, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 368 Sealed Portion No. 3 - Motions Hearing - 01/07/16. (bhs, )
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Sealed Portion No. 2 - Motions Hearing - 01/07/16. (bhs, )
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 366 Sealed Portion No. 1 - Motions Hearing - 01/07/16. (bhs, )
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 365 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 01/07/2016 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Brenda Hightower Smith, CSR, RPR, FCRR, Telephone number: 903-794-1018 (brenda_smith@txed.uscourts.gov). NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/8/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2016. (bhs, )
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 364 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by F Christopher Mizzo on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5561771. (Mizzo, F)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 363 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Apple Inc. (Bufe, John)
January 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER ON MOTIONS: denying #315 Sealed Patent Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting #316 Sealed Motion to Strike; denying #317 Sealed Patent Motion to Exclude Expert Opinion; denying #318 Sealed Motion to Exclude; denying as moot #319 Sealed Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part #320 Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying #321 Sealed Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting #322 Sealed Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #323 Sealed Patent Motion to Exclude; denying #326 Motion to Strike; denying #184 Sealed Motion to Compel; denying #194 Sealed Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 01/11/16. (mll, )
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing: FINAL Pretrial Conference has been rescheduled for 1/19/2016, at 10:00 AM in Judge Davis' Courtroom, Room 361 (Tyler) before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (bas)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 361 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. Plaintiff VirnetX Inc.'s Notice of Filing January 7, 2016 Hearing Presentation Slides. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 360 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of January 7, 2015 Hearing Presentation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Loy, Joseph)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 359 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. Notice Regarding January 7, 2016 Motions Hearing (Nemunaitis, Justin)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 358 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Motions Hearing held on 1/7/2016. (Court Reporter Brenda Smith) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 357 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. Requested Time for Jury Selection and Trial (Caldwell, Bradley)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 356 NOTICE by Apple Inc. Defendant Apple Inc.'s Estimates of Time for Jury Selection and Trial (Loy, Joseph)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 355 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #318 Opposed SEALED MOTION VirnetX's Motion to Exclude Portions of Dr. Blaze's Invalidity Report filed by VirnetX Inc. (Caldwell, Bradley)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 354 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #323 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Damages Opinions of Roy Weinstein filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 19, #2 Exhibit 20, #3 Exhibit 21, #4 Exhibit 22, #5 Exhibit 23)(Heffernan, Jeanne)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 353 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #321 SEALED MOTION VirnetX's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity Based on Derivation and Non-Joinder Theories filed by VirnetX Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher S. Stewart, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Caldwell, Bradley)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 352 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #315 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by FaceTime filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13)(Appleby, Robert)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 351 SEALED PATENT REPLY to Response to PATENT Motion re #317 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr. Mark Jones filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11, #4 Exhibit 12)(Appleby, Robert)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 350 REPLY to Response to Motion re #326 Opposed MOTION to Strike VirnetX's Summary Judgment Briefing filed by Apple Inc.. (Appleby, Robert)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 349 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #319 Opposed SEALED MOTION VirnetX's Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Mr. James T. Carmichael filed by VirnetX Inc. (Caldwell, Bradley)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 348 REPLY to Response to Motion re #320 SEALED MOTION VirnetX's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity on Dependent Claims of Previously Tried Claims filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Caldwell, Bradley)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 347 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #322 SEALED MOTION VirnetX's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed by VirnetX Inc. (Caldwell, Bradley)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 346 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #316 Opposed SEALED MOTION VirnetX's Motion to Strike Portions of the Opinion and Testimony of Mr. Christopher Bakewell filed by VirnetX Inc. (Caldwell, Bradley)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 345 RESPONSE in Opposition re #326 Opposed MOTION to Strike VirnetX's Summary Judgment Briefing filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER granting #340 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/29/15. (mll, )
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER granting #341 Motion for Submission of Juror Questionnaire. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/29/15. (mll, )
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER granting #328 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Ryan Abbott Hargrave; Stacie Greskowiak McNulty; Mitchell Reed Sibley; Samuel Franklin Baxter and Douglas A Cawley terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/29/15. (mll, )
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 341 Joint MOTION for Submission of Juror Questionnaire by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Respond to VirnetX's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #322 SEALED MOTION VirnetX's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David N. Draper, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, #3 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Declaration of James T. Carmichael, #27 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of James T. Carmichael, #28 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 338 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #323 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Damages Opinions of Roy Weinstein filed by VirnetX Inc. (Attachments: #1 Pearson Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 337 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #317 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr. Mark Jones filed by VirnetX Inc. (Attachments: #1 McCarty Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 336 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #315 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by FaceTime filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summers Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B Jones Declaration with Exhibits B-1 - B-3, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 335 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #318 Opposed SEALED MOTION VirnetX's Motion to Exclude Portions of Dr. Blaze's Invalidity Report filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 334 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #319 Opposed SEALED MOTION VirnetX's Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Mr. James T. Carmichael filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 333 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #316 Opposed SEALED MOTION VirnetX's Motion to Strike Portions of the Opinion and Testimony of Mr. Christopher Bakewell filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Heffernan, Jeanne)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 332 RESPONSE in Opposition re #320 SEALED MOTION VirnetX's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity on Dependent Claims of Previously Tried Claims filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leslie M. Schmidt, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 331 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #321 SEALED MOTION VirnetX's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity Based on Derivation and Non-Joinder Theories filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Akshay S. Deoras, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Declaration of Dr. Matthew Blaze, #10 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Dr. Matthew Blaze, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 330 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of VirnetX Inc. (Henry, Claire)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 329 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of VirnetX Inc. (Ward, Thomas)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 328 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER granting #314 Sealed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/22/15. (mll, )
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Opposed MOTION to Strike VirnetX's Summary Judgment Briefing by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 325 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Apple Inc.'s Errata to its #323 Motion to Exclude the Expert Damages Opinions of Roy Weinstein (Heffernan, Jeanne)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 324 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #317 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr. Mark Jones (Certificate of Conference) (Appleby, Robert)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 323 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Damages Opinions of Roy Weinstein by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 322 SEALED MOTION VirnetX's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Warren J. McCarty, III, #2 Exhibit A Part 1 of 2, #3 Exhibit A Part 2 of 2, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Declaration of Gale R. Peterson, #20 Exhibit A, #21 Exhibit B, #22 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 321 SEALED MOTION VirnetX's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity Based on Derivation and Non-Joinder Theories by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hamad M. Hamad, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 320 SEALED MOTION VirnetX's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of No Invalidity on Dependent Claims of Previously Tried Claims by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 319 Opposed SEALED MOTION VirnetX's Motion to Strike Portions of the Expert Report of Mr. James T. Carmichael by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason S. McManis, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 318 Opposed SEALED MOTION VirnetX's Motion to Exclude Portions of Dr. Blaze's Invalidity Report by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hamad M. Hamad, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 317 SEALED PATENT MOTION to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Dr. Mark Jones by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 316 Opposed SEALED MOTION VirnetX's Motion to Strike Portions of the Opinion and Testimony of Mr. Christopher Bakewell by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel R. Pearson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 315 SEALED PATENT MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by FaceTime by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 314 Opposed SEALED MOTION PLAINTIFF VIRNETX INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION IN LIMINE RESPONSES IN EXCESS OF FIFTEEN PAGES by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 313 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #308 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Motions In Limine filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 312 SEALED PATENT RESPONSE to SEALED PATENT MOTION re #306 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Apple's Opposition to VirnetX's Motions in Limine) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 20A, #10 Exhibit 20B, #11 Exhibit 21, #12 Exhibit 22, #13 Exhibit 23, #14 Exhibit 24, #15 Exhibit 25, #16 Exhibit 26, #17 Exhibit 27, #18 Exhibit 28, #19 Exhibit 29, #20 Exhibit 30, #21 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 311 NINTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Dispositive Motion and Daubert Hearing set for 1/7/2016 10:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Selection set for 1/25/2016 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Trial set for 1/25/2016 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Pretrial Conference set for 1/18/2016 01:30 PM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/11/15. (mll, )
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #300 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Apple Inc.(Consolidated Defendant

December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 309 SEALED PATENT ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #308 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Certificate of Conference to Apple's Motions In Limine. (Loy, Joseph)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 308 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION Motions In Limine by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 307 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #263 Proposed Pretrial Order Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Objections to VirnetX's Rebuttal Deposition Designations - Exhibit J to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [DKT. No. 263] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J)(Loy, Joseph)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 306 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 305 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Cross-Deposition Designations and Objections to Apple's Rebuttal Deposition Designations - Exhibit I to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [Dkt. No. 263] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit I)(Caldwell, Bradley)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 304 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT. Notice of Joint Stipulation Relating to Certain Motions in Limine. (Cassady, Jason)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER REGARDING LETTER BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 12/03/15. (mll, )
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Sealed Document. Apple's Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Objections to VirnetX's Trial Exhibit List - Exhibit N to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [DKT No. 263] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit N)(Loy, Joseph)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Objections to Apple's Trial Exhibit List - Exhibit M to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [Dkt. No. 263] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 300 EIGHTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/30/15. (mll, )
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 299 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #263 Proposed Pretrial Order Apple's Amended Counter-Designations and Objections to Plaintiff's Amended Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Combined Amended Exhibit G and H)(Loy, Joseph)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 298 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Amended Initial Deposition Designations - Exhibit C to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [Dkt. No. 263]. (Attachments: #1 Amended Exhibit C)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 297 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #286 Order Notice of Compliance Regarding Final Election of Prior Art (Loy, Joseph)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 296 Sealed Exhibit List Apple's Inc.'s Notice of Filing of First Amended Trial Exhibit List - First Amended Exhibit L to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [DKT. NO. 263] by Apple Inc... (Attachments: #1 First Amended Exhibit L)(Loy, Joseph)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 295 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket Control Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Eighth Amended Docket Control Order)(Loy, Joseph)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 294 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Objections): #293 Notice (Other).. (Loy, Joseph)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 293 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #263 Proposed Pretrial Order Apple's Counter-Designations and Objections to Plaintiff's Deposition Designations (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Combined Exhibit G and H)(Loy, Joseph)
November 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 292 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Rebuttal Deposition Designations and Objections to Apple's Initial Deposition Designations - Exhibits E and F to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [Dkt. No. 263]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E and F)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 291 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. re #286 Order NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE REGARDING FINAL ELECTION OF ASSERTED CLAIMS (Curry, John)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 290 Sealed Document. Apple Inc.'s Notice of Filing of Trial Exhibit List - Exhibit L to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [Dkt. No. 263] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit L)(Loy, Joseph)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 289 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #263 Proposed Pretrial Order Apple's Initial Deposition Designations - Exhibit D (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D - Apple's Deposition Designations)(Loy, Joseph)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Trial Exhibit List - Exhibit K to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [Dkt. No. 263] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 287 Sealed Document. VirnetX's Notice of Filing of Initial Deposition Designations - Exhibit C to the Proposed Joint Final Pretrial Order [Dkt. No. 263] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Caldwell, Bradley)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER FOCUSING PATENT CLAIMS AND PRIOR ART TO REDUCE COSTS. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/4/2015. (gsg)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Steve Papazian on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5465782. (Papazian, Steve)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 284 JOINT NOTICE of Filing a proposed order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to reduce costs per courts order by Apple Inc. re #283 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #267 Motion to Enter Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/29/15. (mll, )
October 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 282 SEVENTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/27/15. (mll, )
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 281 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #267 Emergency MOTION To Enter Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Curry, John)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 280 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #263 Proposed Pretrial Order Apple's Trial Witness List - Exhibit B (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Trial Witness List)(Loy, Joseph)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 279 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. VIRNETX'S NOTICE OF FILING OF TRIAL WITNESS LIST - EXHIBIT A TO THE PROPOSED JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER [DKT. NO. 263] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Trial Witness List)(Cassady, Jason)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 278 REPLY to Response to Motion re #267 Emergency MOTION To Enter Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art filed by Apple Inc.. (Loy, Joseph)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 277 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #261 Scheduling Order, Terminate Motions,,,, JOINT MOTION TO AMEND THE DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cassady, Jason)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting #275 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Clerk shall withdraw the counsel Ronald Wielkopolski of Urrabazo Law, P.C. as counsel of record for Plaintiff Leidos Inc in Civil Action Number 6:12-cv-855 and related Civil Action Number 6:10-cv-417. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/20/15. (mll, ) Modified on 10/20/2015 (mll, ).
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Ronald Wielkopolski by Science Applications International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tindel, Andy)
October 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 274 RESPONSE to Motion re #267 Emergency MOTION To Enter Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Curry, John)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting as MODIFIED #268 motion to Expedite briefing and ORDERING that response to #267 Emergency Motion is due 10/16/2015; Reply due 10/21/2015; Surreply is due 10/26/2015. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/15/2015. (sm, )
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER granting #270 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Brian K Buss; Christopher Needham Cravey; Kyung Kim; Dominic E Massa; Terry D Morgan; Elizabeth Reilly; Matthew Richard Rodgers; Danny Lloyd Williams; Rebecca A Bact and Ruben Singh Bains terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/15/15. (mll, )
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 271 RESPONSE in Opposition re #268 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Apple's Emergency Renewed Motion to Enter Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art PLAINTIFF VIRNETX'S RESPONSE TO APPLE'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING ON APPLE'S EMERGENCY MOTION [DKT. NO. 268] AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, ITS PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE AS REQUESTED BY COURT ORDER [DKT. NO. 269] filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Curry, John)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER re #268 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Apple's Emergency Renewed Motion to Enter Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art filed by Apple Inc. Plaintiff is ORDERED to respond with its proposed briefing schedule no later than 10-14-2015 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/13/15. (mll, )
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 Opposed MOTION to Expedite Briefing on Apple's Emergency Renewed Motion to Enter Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 267 Emergency Renewed MOTION To Enter Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 SEALED PATENT DOCUMENT - Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Concerning the Unenforceability of the Patents-in-Suit Due to Inequitable Conduct and Unclean Hands. (Appleby, Robert)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 265 Proposed Findings of Fact by VirnetX Inc.. (Caldwell, Bradley)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Proposed Jury Instructions by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Caldwell, Bradley)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 263 Proposed Pretrial Order PROPOSED JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER by VirnetX Inc.. (Caldwell, Bradley)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER granting #195 Motion for Revised Claim Construction. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/24/15. (mjc, )
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 261 SIXTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2016 10:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Dispositive Motion and Daubert Hearing set for 12/17/2015 10:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Selection set for 1/18/2016 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Trial set for 1/25/2016 09:00 AM in Ctrm 361 (Tyler) before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Order grants #260 Joint MOTION to Amend the Docket Control Order filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/21/15. (mjc, )
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 Joint MOTION to Amend the Docket Control Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sixth Amended Docket Control Order)(Loy, Joseph)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 NOTICE by Apple Inc. re #217 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: #1 DKT608 - 2015-09-02 Order)(Gardner, Allen)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 258 NOTICE by Apple Inc. of Request for Daily Transcripts and Real Time Reporting (Jones, Michael)
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 257 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. VIRNETX'S NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DAILY TRANSCRIPTS AND REAL TIME REPORTING OF COURT PROCEEDINGS (Caldwell, Bradley)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 256 VIRNETX'S SEALED REPLY LETTER BRIEF in support of request for permission to file a motion to strike portions of the August 7, 2015 Supplemental Expert Report of Apple Inc.'s expert Mr. W. Christopher Bakewell re #253 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by VirnetX Inc. Filed by VirnetX Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Reply Letter Brief)(Caldwell, Bradley)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #253 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by VirnetX Inc. Filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Responsive Letter Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 254 NOTICE by Apple Inc. JOINT NOTICE THAT LETTER BRIEFS FILED BEFORE CASE CONSOLIDATION APPLY TO THE CONSOLIDATED CASES (Loy, Joseph)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 SEALED Letter Brief filed by VirnetX Inc. requesting permission to file a motion to strike portions of the August 7, 2015 Supplemental Expert Report of Apple Inc.'s expert Mr. W. Christopher Bakewell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Letter Brief)(Caldwell, Bradley)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 252 FIFTH AMENDED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Dispositive Motion and Daubert/Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/17/2015 10:00 AM before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Selection set for 1/18/2016 09:00AM before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Trial set for 1/25/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2016 10:00 AM before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 06/17/15. (mll, )
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 251 SECOND AMENDED DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 06/17/15. (mll, )
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting #249 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mangesh A Kulkarni terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 06/17/15. (mll, )
June 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 249 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Mangesh A. Kulkarni by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 Joint MOTION for Entry of Fifth Amended Docket Control Order and Second Amended Discovery Order by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Fifth Amended Docket Control Order, #2 Second Amended Discovery Order)(Jones, Michael)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER re #233 Notice of Competing Docket Control Orders filed by VirnetX Inc. Parties shall submit a Docket Control Order based on Defendant's proposed Docket Control Order by 6-12-2015. The deadline to submit a proposed Amended Discovery Order shall be 6-12-2015. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 06/03/15. (mll, )
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 246 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Rebecca A Bact on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5205145. (Bact, Rebecca)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 245 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Dominic E Massa on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5203949. (Massa, Dominic)
May 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Elizabeth Reilly on behalf of Apple Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5203888. (Reilly, Elizabeth)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 243 SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #217 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief [SEALED Letter Brief requesting permission to file a Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinion of Roy Weinstein under Federal Rules of Evidence 403 and 702], filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Reply Letter Brief)(Appleby, Robert)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 242 SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #216 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief [SEALED Letter Brief requesting permission to file a Motion to Exclude the Expert Opinion and Survey of William E. Wecker under Federal Rules of Evidence 403 and 702], filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Reply Letter Brief)(Appleby, Robert)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 241 SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #215 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief [SEALED Letter Brief requesting permission to file a motion to exclude the testimony of Dr. Mark Jones that the redesigned version of FaceTime infringes U.S. Patent Nos. 7,418,504 and 7,921,211 and that the redesigned version of VPN On Demand infringe s U.S. Patent Nos. 6,502,135 and 7,490,151], filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Reply Letter Brief)(Appleby, Robert)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 240 SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #214 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief [SEALED Letter Brief requesting permission to file a motion for summary judgment that all versions of Apple's FaceTime feature do not infringe the asserted claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 7,418,504; 7,921,211; 8,051,181; and 8,504,697], filed by Apple Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Reply Letter Brief)(Appleby, Robert)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 239 VirnetX's SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #213 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by VirnetX Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Reply letter brief)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 238 VirnetX's SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #212 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by VirnetX Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Reply letter brief)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 237 VirnetX's SEALED REPLY to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #211 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by VirnetX Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Reply letter brief)(Curry, John)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER granting #230 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties have to 4-13-2015 to submit an agreed Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/15/15. (mll, )
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting #222 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Eric M. Albritton terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/15/15. (mll, )
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER granting #221 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Shawn A. Latchford terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/15/15. (mll, )
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 233 NOTICE by VirnetX Inc. NOTICE OF COMPETING DOCKET CONTROL ORDER PROPOSALS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cassady, Jason)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ANSWER to #219 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Science Applications International Corporation.(Tindel, Andy)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ANSWER to #219 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim PLAINTIFF VIRNETX INC.'S REPLY TO APPLE INC.'S ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO PLAINTIFF VIRNETX INC.'S AND PLAINTIFF SCIENCE APPLICATIONS INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION'S CONSOLIDATED AND FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT by VirnetX Inc..(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 230 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SUBMIT AGREED DOCKET CONTROL ORDER by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 Apple's SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #211 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief (requesting permission to file a motion to strike portions of Dr. Matthew Blaze's expert report, for summary judgment regarding certain of Apple's invalidity defenses and for summary judgment of Apple's derivation defense), filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opposition to Letter Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Apple's SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #213 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief (requesting permission to file a motion to strike Opinions of Counsel authored by Mr. Lee Van Pelt, as well as the opinions of Dr. Matthew Blaze that rely on those Opinions of Counsel), filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opposition to Letter Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Appleby, Robert)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Apple's SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #212 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief (requesting permission to file a motion for summary judgment regarding Apple's counterclaim of inequitable conduct and motion to strike portions of the expert report of Mr. James Carmichael) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Opposition to Letter Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Loy, Joseph)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 226 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #217 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief filed by Apple Inc. Filed by VirnetX Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Answering Letter Brief)(Cassady, Jason)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 225 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #216 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Apple Inc. Filed by VirnetX Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Answering Letter Brief)(Caldwell, Bradley)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 224 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #215 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Apple Inc. Filed by VirnetX Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Answering Letter Brief)(Curry, John)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 223 SEALED RESPONSE to Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief re #214 SEALED Notice of Compliance - Letter Brief, filed by Apple Inc. Filed by VirnetX Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Answering Letter Brief)(Curry, John)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 222 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Eric M. Albritton as Counsel of Record for Apple Inc. by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Albritton, Eric)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Shawn Latchford as Counsel of Record for Apple Inc. by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Latchford, Shawn)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial reset for 1/25/2016 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III per Order #220. (sm, )
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines, Per Order #220, as to ( Dispositive and Daubert Motions Hearing set for 12/17/2015 10:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III.); Final Pretrial Conference reset for 1/7/2016 10:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Jury Selection reset for 1/18/2016 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III., Dispositive and Daubert Motion Briefings to be completed no later than 11/24/2015.) (sm, )
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. This civil action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 6:10-cv-417 for trial. Cause No. 6:12-cv-855 shall serve as the Lead Case, and all filings will be docketed there. The current trial setting in Cause No. 6:12-cv-855 is RESET. The new dates are as follows, with all events taking place at the Tyler Courthouse: Briefing on Dispositive and Daubert Motions to be completed no later than 11-24-2015. Dispositive and Daubert Motion Hearing at 10:00 a.m. on 12-17-2015. Pretrial conference at 10:00 a.m.