DSS Technology Management, Inc. v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: DSS Technology Management, Inc.
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2013cv00919
Filed: November 26, 2013
Court: Texas Eastern District Court
Office: Tyler Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: John D. Love
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2014 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. CASE: 6:13-cv-00919DETAILS: Case transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:14-cv-05330, filed 12/04/2014. (mll, )
December 2, 2014 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California. (mll, )
November 17, 2014 This civil action will be transferred to the Northern District of California on or after 11-27-2014 per Local Rule CV-83(b). (mll, )
November 17, 2014 ***Memorandum Opinion and Order 85 UNSEALED per 86 Order. (mll, ) Modified on 11/17/2014 (mll, ).
November 17, 2014 86 Featured Case ORDER that 85 Venue Transfer Order be UNSEALED and made part of the public record. Plaintiff's response and associated exhibits shall remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/17/14. (mll, )
November 7, 2014 85 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 24 motion to transfer venue to the Northern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/07/14. (mll, ) (Main Document 85 replaced on 11/17/2014) (mll, ). (UNSEALED PER 86 ORDER) Modified on 11/17/2014 (mll, ).
October 31, 2014 84 Featured Case ORDER TO PAY TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/31/14. (mll, )
October 28, 2014 83 Featured Case ORDER STAYING CASE. The Court hereby STAYS all proceeding in the above-styled cause of action while it considers Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue 24 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/28/14. (mll, )
October 27, 2014 82 Plaintiff DSS Technology Management, Inc.'s REPLY to 72 Claim Construction Brief filed by DSS Technology Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - List of Code Sequence Patents, # 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 5,371,734, # 3 Exhibit C - DTSI 042 (July 1992))(Carpenter, Brian)
October 24, 2014 81 NOTICE by DSS Technology Management, Inc. Joint Notice re Estimated Time Requested for Markman Hearing (Perantie, Mark)
October 17, 2014 80 MOTION to Strike 74 Response to Non-Motion Plaintiff DSS Technology Management, Inc.'s Motion to Strike or, in the Alternative, to Compel Production of Documents, MOTION to Compel by DSS Technology Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
October 16, 2014 79 Featured Case ORDER granting 75 Motion to Supplement invalidity contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/16/2014. (gsg)
October 16, 2014 78 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Supplement its Invalidity Contentions by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of David Alberti, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3)(Smith, Melissa)
October 15, 2014 77 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Jeremiah A Armstrong on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4885198. (Armstrong, Jeremiah)
October 15, 2014 76 Featured Case ORDER granting 73 Motion to Amend/Correct Deadlines. The deadline for Plaintiff to file its reply brief in support of Plaintiff's Claim Construction Brief is extended to 10-27-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/15/14. (mll, )
October 15, 2014 75 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Supplement its Invalidity Contentions by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
October 14, 2014 74 RESPONSE to 72 Claim Construction Brief (Apple Inc.'s Responsive Claim Construction Brief) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Smith, Melissa)
October 14, 2014 73 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 33 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for P.R. 4-5(c) Claim Construction Briefs by DSS Technology Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perantie, Mark)
September 29, 2014 72 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF filed by DSS Technology Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Carpenter, Brian)
September 26, 2014 71 NOTICE by DSS Technology Management, Inc. Plaintiff DSS Technology Management, Inc.'s Notice of Compliance Regarding Technical Tutorial (Perantie, Mark)
September 26, 2014 70 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance Regarding Technical Tutorial (Smith, Melissa)
September 25, 2014 69 Featured Case ORDER granting 68 Motion to Amend/Correct Deadline. ORDERED that the deadline o mediate is extended to November 21, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 9/25/2014. (gsg)
September 24, 2014 68 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 33 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Mediate by DSS Technology Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perantie, Mark)
September 5, 2014 67 Featured Case ORDER appointing Richard Egan to the position of technical advisor in this case with his costs to be assessed equally between Plaintiff and Defendant and timely paid as billed. Any objections may be submitted for in camera review by 9-12-2014 at 5:00pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 09/05/14. (mll, )
September 3, 2014 66 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement by DSS Technology Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Constructions, # 2 Exhibit B - DSS Evidence, # 3 Exhibit C - Apple Evidence)(Perantie, Mark)
September 2, 2014 65 NOTICE by DSS Technology Management, Inc. re 33 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, Joint Notice Regarding Technical Advisor (Perantie, Mark)
August 29, 2014 64 Featured Case ORDER granting 63 Motion to Supplement Invalidty Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/29/2014. (gsg)
August 28, 2014 63 Unopposed MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT INVALIDITY CONTENTIONS by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 26, 2014 62 Featured Case ORDER granting 61 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff and Defendant's deadline to file the P.R. 4-3 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement is extended to 9-03-2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/26/14. (mll, )
August 25, 2014 61 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to P.R. 4-3 by DSS Technology Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perantie, Mark)
August 7, 2014 60 NOTICE by DSS Technology Management, Inc. re 33 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, Plaintiff DSS Technology Management, Inc.'s Notice of Compliance Regarding P.R. 4-2 Disclosures (Joe, Christopher)
August 7, 2014 59 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Compliance Re P.R. 4-2 Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
August 1, 2014 58 Featured Case ORDER granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 08/01/14. (mll, )
July 28, 2014 57 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Exchange P.R. 4-2 Constructions and Exchange Privilege Logs by DSS Technology Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perantie, Mark)
July 21, 2014 56 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 33 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Mediate by DSS Technology Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perantie, Mark)
June 5, 2014 55 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Compliance Regarding P.R. 4-1 Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
June 5, 2014 54 NOTICE by DSS Technology Management, Inc. re 33 Order, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines, Set Hearings,,, Plaintiff DSS Technology Management, Inc.'s Notice of Compliance Regarding P.R. 4-1 Disclosures (Perantie, Mark)
May 29, 2014 53 Featured Case AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 05/29/14. (mll, )
May 28, 2014 52 Agreed MOTION for Protective Order Regarding The Disclosure and Use of Discovery Materials by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Agreed Protective Order)(Alberti, David)
May 19, 2014 51 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Scheduling Conference held on 3/26/2014 before Judge John D. Love. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Tonya Jackson, Telephone number: 409.654.2833. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 6/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2014. (tj, )
May 13, 2014 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Vinay K Malik on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4656641. (Malik, Vinay)
May 13, 2014 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Nickolas Bohl on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4656580. (Bohl, Nickolas)
May 13, 2014 48 PAPER TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Apple, Inc. for proceedings held on 3/26/2014 Scheduling Conference before Judge John D. Love. (Smith, Melissa)
May 2, 2014 47 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 24 MOTION to Change Venue Plaintiff DSS Technology Management, Inc.'s Surreply in Opposition to Defendant Apple, Inc.s Motion to Transfer Venue to the Northern District of California filed by DSS Technology Management, Inc.. (Buether, Eric)
April 21, 2014 46 REPLY to Response to Motion re 24 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Ian Feinberg)(Smith, Melissa)
April 10, 2014 45 Featured Case ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 24 MOTION to Change Venue; Responses due by 4/9/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 04/10/14. (mll, )
April 10, 2014 44 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re 24 MOTION to Change Venue filed by DSS Technology Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Buether, Eric)
April 9, 2014 43 ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY. WILL REFILE UNDER SEAL.*** RESPONSE in Opposition re 24 MOTION to Change Venue filed by DSS Technology Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Buether, Eric) Modified on 4/10/2014 (gsg).
April 7, 2014 42 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 24 MOTION to Change Venue by DSS Technology Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joe, Christopher)
March 31, 2014 41 Featured Case ORDER granting 39 Motion to Amend and Entry of Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/31/14. (mjc, )
March 28, 2014 40 Digital Audio File regarding Scheduling Conference 34 held on 03/26/14 before Love. AUDIO FILE size(9.7 MB) (mjm, )
March 28, 2014 39 Unopposed MOTION for Entry of Order Focusing Patent Claims and Prior Art to Reduce Costs (As Amended) by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 26, 2014 38 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 30 Motion for Extension of Time to Select an Agreed Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/26/14. (mll, )
March 26, 2014 37 Featured Case ORDER denying 26 Motion to Extend Deadline to Submit Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/26/14. (mll, )
March 26, 2014 36 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. David Folsom added as Mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/26/14. (mll, )
March 26, 2014 35 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/26/14. (mll, )
March 26, 2014 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love: Scheduling Conference held on 3/26/2014. (Court Reporter Mechele Morris.) (mjm, )
March 25, 2014 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice of Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, )
March 25, 2014 33 Featured Case DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. First Mediation to be completed by 7-24-2014; Second Mediation Completion due by 6/16/2015. Jury Selection set for 9/8/2015 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Jury Trial set for 9/8/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Markman Hearing set for 11/6/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/25/14. (mll, )
March 25, 2014 32 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/25/14. (mll, )
March 25, 2014 31 Featured Case DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 03/25/14. (mll, )
March 24, 2014 30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Select an Agreed Mediator by DSS Technology Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perantie, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2014: # 2 SUBSTITUTED PROPOSED ORDER) (sm, ).
March 24, 2014 29 Submission of Proposed Agreed E-Discovery order by DSS Technology Management, Inc.. (Perantie, Mark)
March 24, 2014 28 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by DSS Technology Management, Inc.. (Perantie, Mark)
March 24, 2014 27 Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by DSS Technology Management, Inc.. (Perantie, Mark)
March 23, 2014 26 Joint MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SUBMIT PROTECTIVE ORDER by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 21, 2014 25 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Certificate of Interested Parties (Smith, Melissa)
March 19, 2014 24 MOTION to Change Venue by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Buckley, # 2 Declaration of D. Alberti, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of D. Alberti, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of D. Alberti, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of D. Alberti, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration of D. Alberti, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
March 19, 2014 NOTICE of DEFICIENCY regarding the #23 Motion to change venue submitted by Apple, Inc.. No certificate of conference was included. Correction should be made by 1 business day and refiled. Motion now TERMINATED. (sm, )
March 19, 2014 23 ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***MOTION to Change Venue by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of M. Buckley, # 2 Declaration of D. Alberti, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of D. Alberti, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of D. Alberti, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of D. Alberti, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration of D. Alberti, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 3/19/2014 (sm, ).
March 11, 2014 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by DSS Technology Management, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Document Security Systems, Inc. for DSS Technology Management, Inc.. (Joe, Christopher)
March 3, 2014 21 ANSWER to 17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff DSS Technology Management, Inc.'s Answer to Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Counterclaims by DSS Technology Management, Inc..(Perantie, Mark)
February 25, 2014 20 Featured Case ORDER setting Scheduling/Status Conference for 3/26/2014 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 02/25/14. (mll, )
February 7, 2014 19 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
February 7, 2014 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
February 7, 2014 17 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against DSS Technology Management, Inc. by Apple, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
February 5, 2014 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Yakov Zolotorev on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4510274. (Zolotorev, Yakov)
February 5, 2014 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David L Alberti on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4510262. (Alberti, David)
February 5, 2014 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Ian N Feinberg on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4510204. (Feinberg, Ian)
February 5, 2014 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Marc Belloli on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4510128. (Belloli, Marc)
January 29, 2014 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
December 30, 2013 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 11 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple, Inc. to 2/7/2014. 45 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
December 23, 2013 11 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple, Inc..( Day, Margaret)
December 10, 2013 10 Return of Service Executed as to Apple, Inc. on 12/4/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 12/25/2013. (mll, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2013: # 1 Proof of Service) (mll, ).
November 27, 2013 9 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple, Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb)
November 26, 2013 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy J.H. Craddock on behalf of DSS Technology Management, Inc. (Craddock, Timothy)
November 26, 2013 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael David Ricketts on behalf of DSS Technology Management, Inc. (Ricketts, Michael)
November 26, 2013 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Davin Perantie on behalf of DSS Technology Management, Inc. (Perantie, Mark)
November 26, 2013 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Andrew Carpenter on behalf of DSS Technology Management, Inc. (Carpenter, Brian)
November 26, 2013 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric William Buether on behalf of DSS Technology Management, Inc. (Buether, Eric)
November 26, 2013 Magistrate Judge John D. Love added per General Order 13-15. (mll, )
November 26, 2013 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Joe, Christopher)
November 26, 2013 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by DSS Technology Management, Inc. (Joe, Christopher)
November 26, 2013 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Patent Infringement against Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4420499.), filed by DSS Technology Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joe, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DSS Technology Management, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DSS Technology Management, Inc.
Represented By: Eric William Buether
Represented By: Brian Andrew Carpenter
Represented By: Timothy J.H. Craddock
Represented By: Christopher Michael Joe
Represented By: Mark Davin Perantie
Represented By: Michael David Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?