Brewer v. Stephens et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Eugene Brewer
Defendant: William Stephens, Todd A Foxworth, John Doe #1 and John Doe #2
Case Number: 6:2014cv00010
Filed: January 10, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: John D. Love
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION and ORDER. ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs Failure to Exhaust Administrative Remedies (docket entry #89) is hereby GRANTED. ORDERED that Plaintiffs complaint is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. ORDERED that the defendants Motion to Seal (docket entry # 86) is GRANTED. ORDERED that the defendants Motion to Substitute Attorney (docket entry # 108) is GRANTED. ORDERED that any motion not previously or otherwise ruled on herein is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 3/18/2016. (gsg)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 24 Report and Recommendations, and Order of Partial Dismissal dismissing with prejudice Defendant William Stephens. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 7/1/14. (mjc, )
May 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 13 Report and Recommendations, and denying 7 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 05/30/14. (mll, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Stephens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Eugene Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd A Foxworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?