EMG Technology, LLC v. Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: EMG Technology, LLC
Defendant: Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Consolidated Defendant: IKEA North America Services, LLC, Publix Super Markets, Inc., RE/MAX LLC, The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, The Western Union Company, Rite Aid Corporation, Sally Beauty Supply LLC, Safelite Group, Inc., Frost Bank, Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association - College Retirement Equities Fund, Capital One Financial Corporation, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., TOYS R US-DELAWARE, INC., Gilt Groupe Holdings, Inc., Branch Banking and Trust Company and Volvo Cars of North America, LLC
Case Number: 6:2014cv00094
Filed: February 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2015 Filing 205 FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 06/19/15. (mll, )
June 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting #111 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Volvo Cars of North America, LLC, EMG Technology, LLC. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff, and Defendant Volvo Cars of North America, LLC, are hereby dismissed without prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 06/19/15. (mll, )
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting #201 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by EMG Technology, LLC. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant Rite AidCorporation, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 06/04/15. (mll, )
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting #200 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by EMG Technology, LLC. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendant Gilt Groupe Holdings Inc are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 06/04/15. (mll, )
June 3, 2015 Filing 201 STIPULATION of Dismissal between EMG Technology LLC and Rite Aid Corporation by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 3, 2015 Filing 200 STIPULATION of Dismissal between EMG Technology LLC and Gilt Groupe Holdings, Inc. by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting #193 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by EMG Technology, LLC. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant Sally Beauty Supply LLC, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/29/15. (mll, )
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting #192 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by EMG Technology, LLC. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association College Retirement Equities Fund, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/29/15. (mll, )
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER granting #191 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by EMG Technology, LLC. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant Amica Mutual Insurance Company, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/29/15. (mll, )
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #190 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by EMG Technology, LLC. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant Safelite Group, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/29/15. (mll, )
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting #194 Motion for Stay. All deadlines are stayed to 6-12-2015 as to Plaintiff and Defendants Rite Aid Corporation and Gilt Groupe Holdings Inc. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/29/15. (mll, )
May 29, 2015 Filing 194 Agreed MOTION TO STAY DEADLINES AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
May 22, 2015 Filing 193 STIPULATION of Dismissal between EMG Technology LLC and Sally Beauty Supply LLC by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
May 18, 2015 Filing 192 STIPULATION of Dismissal between EMG Technology LLC and Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association College Retirement Equities Fund by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
May 15, 2015 Filing 191 STIPULATION of Dismissal between EMG Technology LLC and Amica Mutual Insurance Company by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
May 15, 2015 Filing 190 STIPULATION of Dismissal between EMG Technology LLC and Safelite Group Inc. by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 6/4/2015 01:30 PM before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/08/15. (mll, )
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting #187 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by TOYS R US-DELAWARE, INC., EMG Technology, LLC. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant, Toys "R" Us-Delaware, Inc., are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by theparty that incurred them. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 05/08/15. (mll, )
April 28, 2015 Filing 187 STIPULATION of Dismissal between EMG Technology, LLC and Toys R US-Delaware, Inc. by EMG Technology, LLC, TOYS R US-DELAWARE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting #182 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. James Youngkwang Wang is allowed to withdraw and is hereby withdrawn as attorney of record for Defendant. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/15/15. (mll, )
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER granting #181 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James Youngkwang Wang terminated. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 04/15/15. (mll, )
March 30, 2015 Filing 184 NOTICE by Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Gilt Groupe Holdings, Inc., Rite Aid Corporation, Safelite Group, Inc., Sally Beauty Supply LLC, TOYS R US-DELAWARE, INC., Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association - College Retirement Equities Fund Notice of Compliance re Invalidity Contentions (McNabnay, Neil)
March 12, 2015 Filing 183 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Frederick Bufe on behalf of Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Bufe, John)
February 27, 2015 Filing 182 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Defendant Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association College Retirement Equities Fund's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw James Youngkwang Wang as Attorney of Record by Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association - College Retirement Equities Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Chad)
February 27, 2015 Filing 181 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Defendant Safelite Group, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Withdraw James Youngkwang Wang as Attorney of Record by Safelite Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Chad)
February 20, 2015 Filing 180 NOTICE by Amica Mutual Insurance Company of Withdrawal of Appearance of Byron L. McMasters (McMasters, Byron)
January 30, 2015 Filing 179 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Auchter Allgood on behalf of Rite Aid Corporation (Allgood, Adam)
January 30, 2015 Filing 178 Case Reassigned to Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III. Judge Michael H. Schneider no longer assigned to the case. (gsg)
January 14, 2015 Filing 177 NOTICE by EMG Technology, LLC COMPLIANCE OF P.R. 3-1 AND 3-2 (Ainsworth, Charles)
December 23, 2014 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING: Scheduling Conference set for THURSDAY, JANUARY 8, 2015 at 10:30 AM in Ctrm 102 (Tyler) before Judge Michael H. Schneider is hereby CANCELLED pending further notification from the Court. (lgp, )
December 23, 2014 Filing 176 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Ainsworth, Charles)
December 22, 2014 Filing 175 NOTICE by Rite Aid Corporation Disclosure of Defendant Rite Aid Corporation's Certificate of Interested Persons (Hawes, Clay)
December 22, 2014 Filing 174 NOTICE by TOYS R US-DELAWARE, INC. Disclosure of Defendant Toys "R" Us-Delaware, Inc.'s Certificate of Interested Persons (Hawes, Clay)
December 19, 2014 Filing 173 NOTICE by Volvo Cars of North America, LLC of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Pollock, David)
December 19, 2014 Filing 172 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Derek Scott Neilson on behalf of Sally Beauty Supply LLC (Neilson, Derek)
December 19, 2014 Filing 171 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lindsey Michelle Yeargin on behalf of Sally Beauty Supply LLC (Yeargin, Lindsey)
December 15, 2014 Filing 170 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #147 MOTION to Dismiss #116 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #148 MOTION to Dismiss (DEFENDANTS SAFELITE GROUP, INC. AND TEACHERS INSURANCE AND ANNUITY ASSOCIATION-COLLEGE RETIREMENT EQUITIES FUND'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ainsworth, Charles)
December 12, 2014 Filing 169 NOTICE by Amica Mutual Insurance Company Disclosure of Interested Parties (Gardner, Allen)
December 11, 2014 Filing 168 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #141 MOTION to Dismiss filed by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ainsworth, Charles)
December 10, 2014 Filing 167 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theresa Marie Dawson on behalf of Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association - College Retirement Equities Fund (Dawson, Theresa)
December 10, 2014 Filing 166 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Theresa Marie Dawson on behalf of Safelite Group, Inc. (Dawson, Theresa)
December 10, 2014 Filing 165 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Youngkwang Wang on behalf of Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association - College Retirement Equities Fund (Wang, James)
December 10, 2014 Filing 164 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Youngkwang Wang on behalf of Safelite Group, Inc. (Wang, James)
December 10, 2014 Filing 163 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ricardo Joel Bonilla on behalf of Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association - College Retirement Equities Fund (Bonilla, Ricardo)
December 10, 2014 Filing 162 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ricardo Joel Bonilla on behalf of Safelite Group, Inc. (Bonilla, Ricardo)
December 9, 2014 Filing 161 NOTICE by EMG Technology, LLC re #151 Order, Set Hearings Certificate of Financially Interested Parties (Ainsworth, Charles)
December 9, 2014 Filing 160 NOTICE by Sally Beauty Supply LLC Certificate of Interested Persons (Saporito, Holly)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 AMENDED ORDER TO MEET, REPORT, AND APPEAR AT SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2015 10:30 AM before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 12/08/14. (mll, )
December 8, 2014 Filing 158 NOTICE by Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association - College Retirement Equities Fund Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association - College Retirement Equities Fund's Disclosure of Interested Persons (Walker, Chad)
December 8, 2014 Filing 157 NOTICE by Safelite Group, Inc. Safelite Group, Inc.'s Disclosure of Interested Persons (Walker, Chad)
December 5, 2014 Filing 156 REPLY to Response to Motion re #147 MOTION to Dismiss #116 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #148 MOTION to Dismiss (DEFENDANTS SAFELITE GROUP, INC. AND TEACHERS INSURANCE AND ANNUITY ASSOCIATION-COLLEGE RETIREMENT EQUITIES FUND'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Safelite Group, Inc., Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association - College Retirement Equities Fund. (McMasters, Byron)
December 4, 2014 Filing 155 NOTICE by Gilt Groupe Holdings, Inc. of Disclosure of Interested Parties (Dacus, Shannon)
December 1, 2014 Filing 154 REPLY to Response to Motion re #141 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Gilt Groupe Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Swetnam-Burland, David)
November 24, 2014 Filing 153 RESPONSE in Opposition re #148 MOTION to Dismiss (DEFENDANTS SAFELITE GROUP, INC. AND TEACHERS INSURANCE AND ANNUITY ASSOCIATION-COLLEGE RETIREMENT EQUITIES FUND'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) filed by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Gregory Cordrey, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Ainsworth, Charles)
November 24, 2014 Filing 152 RESPONSE in Opposition re #147 MOTION to Dismiss #116 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Gregory Cordrey, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Ainsworth, Charles)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 1/8/2015 10:30 AM before Judge Michael H. Schneider. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/24/14. (mll, )
November 20, 2014 Filing 150 RESPONSE in Opposition re #141 MOTION to Dismiss by Gilt Groupe Holdings filed by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
November 13, 2014 Filing 149 EMG TECHNOLOGY, LLC'S ANSWER to #137 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim asserted by Sally Beauty by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
November 6, 2014 Filing 148 MOTION to Dismiss (DEFENDANTS SAFELITE GROUP, INC. AND TEACHERS INSURANCE AND ANNUITY ASSOCIATION-COLLEGE RETIREMENT EQUITIES FUND'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) by Safelite Group, Inc., Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association - College Retirement Equities Fund. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion To Dismiss)(McNabnay, Neil)
November 6, 2014 Filing 147 MOTION to Dismiss #116 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER denying as moot #131 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 11/04/14. (mll, )
November 4, 2014 Filing 145 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter J Brann on behalf of Gilt Groupe Holdings, Inc. (Brann, Peter)
November 4, 2014 Filing 144 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stacy O Stitham on behalf of Gilt Groupe Holdings, Inc. (Stitham, Stacy)
November 3, 2014 Filing 143 NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by EMG Technology, LLC (Ainsworth, Charles)
November 3, 2014 Filing 142 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Gilt Groupe Holdings, Inc. (Swetnam-Burland, David)
November 3, 2014 Filing 141 MOTION to Dismiss by Gilt Groupe Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swetnam-Burland, David)
October 23, 2014 Filing 140 EMG TECHNOLOGY, LLC'S ANSWER to #129 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim asserted by Toys R Us by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
October 23, 2014 Filing 139 EMG TECHNOLOGY, LLC'S ANSWER to #127 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim asserted by Rite Aid by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
October 20, 2014 Filing 138 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sally Beauty Supply LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sally Beauty Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Sally Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent Sally Investment Holdings LLC for Sally Beauty Supply LLC. (Saporito, Holly)
October 20, 2014 Filing 137 Defendant Sally Beauty Supply LLC's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM s against EMG Technology, LLC by Sally Beauty Supply LLC.(Saporito, Holly)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #115 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/19/14. (mll, )
October 17, 2014 Filing 135 EMG TECHNOLOGY, LLC'S ANSWER to #123 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim,, of Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America College Retirement Equities Fund by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting #133 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Publix Super Markets, Inc., EMG Technology, LLC. All claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant Publix Super Markets, Inc., are hereby dismissed without prejudice. All attorneys' fees, costs and expenses are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 10/14/14. (mll, )
October 13, 2014 Filing 133 STIPULATION of Dismissal between EMG Technology LLC and Publix Super Markets, Inc. by EMG Technology, LLC, Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
October 7, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert L Lee on behalf of Publix Super Markets, Inc., Sally Beauty Supply LLC (Lee, Robert)
October 7, 2014 Filing 131 MOTION to Dismiss by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Booher, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Saporito, Holly)
September 26, 2014 Filing 130 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by TOYS R US-DELAWARE, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Toys "R" Us, Inc. for TOYS R US-DELAWARE, INC.. (Hawes, Clay)
September 26, 2014 Filing 129 Toys "R" Us-Delaware, Inc.'s ANSWER to #116 Amended Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against EMG Technology, LLC by TOYS R US-DELAWARE, INC..(Hawes, Clay)
September 26, 2014 Filing 128 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Rite Aid Corporation (Hawes, Clay)
September 26, 2014 Filing 127 Rite Aid Corporation's ANSWER to #116 Amended Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against EMG Technology, LLC by Rite Aid Corporation.(Hawes, Clay)
September 25, 2014 Filing 126 REPLY to Response to Motion re #115 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by EMG Technology, LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER denying as moot #49 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 9/25/2014. (gsg)
September 22, 2014 Filing 124 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association - College Retirement Equities Fund (Walker, Chad)
September 22, 2014 Filing 123 Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America - College Retirement Equities Fund's ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Patent Infringement of EMG Technology, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association of America - College Retirement Equities Fund's against EMG Technology, LLC by Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association - College Retirement Equities Fund.(Walker, Chad)
September 18, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Sally Beauty Supply LLC to 10/20/2014. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
September 17, 2014 Filing 122 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Louis Raspino on behalf of Rite Aid Corporation (Raspino, Michael)
September 17, 2014 Filing 121 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sally Beauty Supply LLC.( Saporito, Holly)
September 16, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE by EMG Technology, LLC re #117 Order,,, Notice Regarding Filing Additional Related Cases (Ainsworth, Charles)
September 15, 2014 Filing 119 RESPONSE in Opposition re #115 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company, Safelite Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
September 12, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Publix Super Markets, Inc. to 10/7/2014. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
September 11, 2014 Filing 118 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Publix Super Markets, Inc..( Abhyankar, Siraj)
September 11, 2014 Consolidated Defendants added: Gilt Groupe Holdings Inc (6:14cv720); Sally Beauty Supply LLC (6:14cv721). (mll, )
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above listed cases are hereby consolidated for all pretrial purposes, including discovery and claim construction. Cause number 6:14cv94 is designated as the Lead Case. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants and lead counsel to the lead case 6:14cv94. Plaintiff shall renew its notice of readiness for scheduling conference in the lead case when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice must be filed within five days of the last remaining Defendants answer or motion. Within five days of this order, the Plaintiff also must file a notice indicating whether Plaintiff anticipates filing any additional related cases in this district. If the cases are not ready for scheduling conference within 90 days of this order, Plaintiff must file a detailed status report explaining the reason for the delay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 09/11/14. (mll, )
August 29, 2014 Filing 116 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '497 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '698 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '196 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - '196 ReExam)(Ainsworth, Charles)
August 29, 2014 Filing 115 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
August 27, 2014 Filing 114 NOTICE by EMG Technology, LLC re #112 Order,,, Notice Regarding Additional Related Cases (Ainsworth, Charles)
August 25, 2014 Filing 113 NOTICE by The Western Union Company of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
August 22, 2014 Consolidated Defendants added: Publix Super Markets Inc (6:14cv644); Rite Aid Corporation (6:14cv646); Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association - College Retirement Equities Fund (6:14cv647); Toys R US - Delaware Inc (6:14cv648). (mll, )
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above listed cases are hereby consolidated for all pretrial purposes, including discovery and claim construction. Cause number 6:14cv94 is designated as the Lead Case. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants and lead counsel to the lead case 6:14cv94. Plaintiff shall renew its notice of readiness for scheduling conference in the lead case when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. The notice must be filed within five days of the last remaining Defendant's answer or motion. Within five days of this order, the Plaintiff also must file a notice indicating whether Plaintiff anticipates filing any additional related cases in this district. If the cases are not ready for scheduling conference within 90 days of this order, Plaintiff must file a detailed status report explaining the reason for the delay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 08/22/14. (mll, )
August 21, 2014 Filing 111 STIPULATION of Dismissal between EMG Technology LLC and Volvo Cars of North America by EMG Technology, LLC, Volvo Cars of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
August 20, 2014 Filing 110 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Jones, Michael)
August 18, 2014 Filing 109 EMG TECHNOLOGY, LLC'S ANSWER to #103 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim asserted by Safelite by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting #107 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by EMG Technology, LLC, The Western Union Company. All claims asserted in this suit byPlaintiff against Defendant, The Western Union Company, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, and all counterclaims asserted in this suit by Western Union against EMG are hereby dismissed without prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 08/15/14. (mll, )
August 15, 2014 Filing 107 STIPULATION of Dismissal BETWEEN EMG TECHNOLOGY LLC AND THE WESTERN UNION COMPANY by EMG Technology, LLC, The Western Union Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
July 28, 2014 Filing 106 NOTICE by Branch Banking and Trust Company Notice of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Tadlock, Robert)
July 24, 2014 Filing 105 NOTICE by EMG Technology, LLC re #99 Order,, Second Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference (Ainsworth, Charles)
July 24, 2014 Filing 104 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Safelite Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Belron S.A. for Safelite Group, Inc.. (Walker, Chad)
July 24, 2014 Filing 103 SAFELITE GROUP, INC.'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint And COUNTERCLAIMS TO EMG'S Complaint against EMG Technology, LLC by Safelite Group, Inc..(Walker, Chad)
July 21, 2014 Filing 102 NOTICE by EMG Technology, LLC re #99 Order,, OF ADDITIONAL CASES IN THE DISTRICT (Ainsworth, Charles)
July 18, 2014 Filing 101 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John William McCauley, IV on behalf of Volvo Cars of North America, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4752370. (McCauley, John)
July 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #98 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by EMG Technology, LLC, Branch Banking and Trust Company. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 07/17/14. (mll, )
July 16, 2014 Consolidated Defendant added: Safelite Group Inc (6:14cv491). (mll, )
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above cases are hereby consolidated for all pretrial purposes, including discovery and claim construction, with Civil Action 6:14cv94 designated as the Lead Case. The Clerk of Court shall add the consolidated defendant and lead counsel to the Lead Case. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to renew its notice of readiness for scheduling conference in the lead case when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 07/16/14. (mll, )
July 15, 2014 Filing 98 STIPULATION of Dismissal between EMG Technology, LLC and Branch Banking and Trust Company by Branch Banking and Trust Company, EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #96 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by EMG Technology, LLC. All claims and counterclaims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff, and Defendant, The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 06/27/14. (mll, )
June 27, 2014 Filing 96 STIPULATION of Dismissal between EMG Technology LLC and The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company (Replaces Dkt. 95) by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 26, 2014 Filing 95 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY*** STIPULATION of Dismissal between EMG Technology LLC and The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles) Modified on 6/27/2014 (mll, ).
June 24, 2014 Filing 94 NOTICE by The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Schwartz, Charles)
June 24, 2014 Filing 93 NOTICE by RE/MAX LLC for Termination of Electronic Notices (Parker, Henrik)
June 24, 2014 Filing 92 NOTICE by RE/MAX LLC for Termination of Electronic Notices (Rocci, Steven)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #90 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by EMG Technology, LLC, Capital One Financial Corporation. All claims in this action between Plaintiff and Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 06/19/14. (mll, )
June 18, 2014 Filing 90 STIPULATION of Dismissal between EMG Technology LLC and Capital One Financial Corporation by Capital One Financial Corporation, EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #73 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by RE/MAX LLC, EMG Technology, LLC. All claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff and Defendant, Re/Max, LLC, are hereby dismissed with prejudice, subject to the terms of the Settlement Agreement entered into by the parties. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 06/11/14. (mll, )
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER denying as moot #86 Motion to Continue Stay. ORDERS that the Settling Parties or their counsel submit to the Court all papers necessary for the closing of the claims between the settling parties on or before June 20, 2014 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 6/6/2014. (gsg)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re #85 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., EMG Technology, LLC. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all claims asserted in this suit between Plaintiff, EMG Technology, LLC, and Defendant The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., are hereby dismissed WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 6/6/2014. (gsg)
June 6, 2014 Filing 86 Agreed MOTION to Stay Continue Stay (Dkt. 63) between EMG Technology LLC and Capital One by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 5, 2014 Filing 85 STIPULATION of Dismissal between EMG Technology LLC and the Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. by EMG Technology, LLC, The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
June 3, 2014 Filing 84 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Craig M Scott on behalf of Amica Mutual Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4687578. (Scott, Craig)
June 3, 2014 Filing 83 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Byron L McMasters on behalf of Amica Mutual Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4686270. (McMasters, Byron)
May 29, 2014 Filing 82 RESPONSE to #61 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Northwestern Mutual Insurance Company by EMG Technology, LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles)
May 28, 2014 Filing 81 NOTICE by Frost Bank Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Daffer, Kevin)
May 27, 2014 Filing 80 EMG TECHNOLOGY, LLC'S ANSWER to #58 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Western Union Company by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
May 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER EXTENDING ABATEMENT OF DEADLINES. The Settling Parties shall submit to the Court all papers necessary for the closing of the claims between the settling parties by 6-05-2014 at 5:00 p.m. All deadlines and appearances ordered by this Court are hereby ABATED between the Settling Parties. The Settling Parties' Motion to Continue Stay #78 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 05/22/14. (mll, )
May 21, 2014 Filing 78 Agreed MOTION to Continue Stay by The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Charles)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER FOR CLOSING DOCUMENTS. Plaintiff and Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation shall submit to the Court all papers necessary for the closing of the claims between the settling parties on or before 6-06-2014 at 5:00 p.m. All deadlines and appearances ordered by this Court are hereby ABATED between the Settling Parties; denying as moot #63 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 05/14/14. (mll, )
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #60 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Steven G. Schortgen terminated. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 05/14/14. (mll, )
May 14, 2014 Filing 75 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Tracy Zurzolo Quinn on behalf of Volvo Cars of North America, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4658881. (Quinn, Tracy)
May 12, 2014 Filing 74 EMG TECHNOLOGY, LLC'S ANSWER to #42 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
May 9, 2014 Filing 73 STIPULATION of Dismissal BETWEEN EMG TECHNOLOGY, LLC AND RE/MAX LLC by EMG Technology, LLC, RE/MAX LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
May 9, 2014 Filing 72 NOTICE by Branch Banking and Trust Company Notice of Concurrent Proceeding (Tadlock, Robert)
May 8, 2014 Filing 71 EMG Technology LLC's ANSWER to #35 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Volvo by EMG Technology, LLC.(Ainsworth, Charles)
May 8, 2014 Filing 70 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael Halley Bernick on behalf of Volvo Cars of North America, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4650064. (Bernick, Michael)
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #67 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice filed by Frost Bank, EMG Technology, LLC. All claims asserted between Plaintiff, EMG Technology, LLC, and Defendant Frost Bank in this case, are dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) and (c), and subject to the terms of the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 5/7/14. (mjc, )
May 6, 2014 Filing 68 NOTICE by EMG Technology, LLC re #8 Order,,,, OF READINESS FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Ainsworth, Charles)
May 6, 2014 Filing 67 STIPULATION of Dismissal between EMG Technology LLC and Frost Bank by EMG Technology, LLC, Frost Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
May 6, 2014 Filing 66 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mark T Vogelbacker on behalf of Volvo Cars of North America, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4646163. (Vogelbacker, Mark)
May 5, 2014 Filing 65 NOTICE by IKEA North America Services, LLC Notice of Request for Termination of Electronic Notices (Donoghue, R)
May 5, 2014 Filing 64 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David T Pollock on behalf of Volvo Cars of North America, LLC. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4645896. (Pollock, David)
May 5, 2014 Filing 63 Agreed MOTION to Stay Deadlines between EMG Technology and Capital One by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
May 5, 2014 Filing 62 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company (Bornstein, Scott)
May 5, 2014 Filing 61 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company by The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company.(Bornstein, Scott)
May 2, 2014 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Steven G. Schortgen by The Western Union Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 2, 2014 Filing 59 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Western Union Company (DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 2, 2014 Filing 58 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against EMG Technology, LLC by The Western Union Company.(DeRieux, Elizabeth)
May 2, 2014 Filing 57 NOTICE of Designation of Attorney in Charge to David E Sipiora on behalf of The Western Union Company (Sipiora, David)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Motion to Stay and extending the closing deadline to 5-09-2014; denying as moot #27 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 05/02/14. (mll, )
April 30, 2014 Filing 55 Agreed MOTION to Stay Continue Stay between EMG Technology and Re/Max by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that parties submit to the Court all papers necessary for dismissal of all claims on or before 5-26-2014. All deadlines as to the settling parties are hereby ABATED. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 04/28/14. (mll, )
April 28, 2014 Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Stephen Ravel on behalf of Frost Bank (Ravel, J)
April 28, 2014 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Frost Bank identifying Corporate Parent Cullen/Frost Bankers, Inc. for Frost Bank, Frost Bank. (Daffer, Kevin)
April 28, 2014 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint (filed in 14-cv-00097), Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against EMG Technology, LLC by Frost Bank.(Daffer, Kevin)
April 25, 2014 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J Steven Gardner on behalf of Branch Banking and Trust Company (Gardner, J)
April 25, 2014 Filing 49 Agreed MOTION to Stay Deadlines between EMG Technology and Goldman Sachs by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
April 24, 2014 Filing 48 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Branch Banking and Trust Company. (Tadlock, Robert)
April 17, 2014 Filing 47 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John Cadkin on behalf of The Western Union Company. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4619092. (Cadkin, John)
April 17, 2014 Filing 46 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David E Sipiora on behalf of The Western Union Company. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-4619027. (Sipiora, David)
April 17, 2014 ***FILED IN ERROR, WRONG EVENT USED, ATTY MUST REFILE USING THE PHV NOTICE OF APPEARANCE EVENT. Document # 45, Notice of atty appearance. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (sm, )
April 17, 2014 Filing 45 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David E Sipiora on behalf of The Western Union Company (Sipiora, David) Modified on 4/17/2014 (sm, ).
April 17, 2014 Filing 44 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Amica Mutual Insurance Company. (Gardner, Allen)
April 17, 2014 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Gardner, Allen)
April 17, 2014 Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against EMG Technology, LLC by Amica Mutual Insurance Company.(Gardner, Allen)
April 17, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Western Union Company to 5/2/2014. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
April 17, 2014 Filing 41 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Western Union Company.( DeRieux, Elizabeth)
April 16, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company to 5/5/2014. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
April 16, 2014 Filing 40 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company.( Bornstein, Scott)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER FOR CLOSING DOCUMENTS. ORDERED that the Settling Parties or their counsel shall submit to the Court all papers necessary for the closing of the claims between the settling parties on or before May 2, 2014 at 5:00 p.m. All deadlines and appearances ordered by this Court are hereby ABATED between the Settling Parties. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 4/14/2014. (gsg)
April 14, 2014 Filing 38 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Branch Banking and Trust Company (Tadlock, Robert)
April 14, 2014 Filing 37 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Branch Banking and Trust Company.(Tadlock, Robert)
April 14, 2014 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Volvo Cars of North America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Volvo Personvagnar AB, Corporate Parent Zhejiang Geely Holding Group Co., Ltd. for Volvo Cars of North America, LLC. (Bernick, Michael)
April 14, 2014 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against EMG Technology, LLC by Volvo Cars of North America, LLC.(Bernick, Michael)
April 14, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Capital One Financial Corporation to 5/5/2014. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
April 14, 2014 Filing 34 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Capital One Financial Corporation.( Vivarelli, Daniel)
April 11, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Frost Bank to 4/28/2014. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
April 11, 2014 Filing 32 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Frost Bank. (Daffer, Kevin)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #28 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by EMG Technology, LLC. All claims by Plaintiff against Defendant IKEA North America Services LLC are DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 04/10/14. (mll, )
April 10, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. to 4/29/2014. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
April 10, 2014 Filing 31 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc..( Schwartz, Charles)
April 10, 2014 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMG Technology, LLC. Amica Mutual Insurance Company served on 4/8/2014, answer due 4/29/2014. (gsg)
April 8, 2014 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Amica Mutual Insurance Company (Gardner, Allen)
April 8, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by EMG Technology, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order AS TO DEFENDANT IKEA ONLY)(Ainsworth, Charles)
April 3, 2014 Filing 27 Agreed MOTION to Stay Deadlines between EMG Technology and Re/Max LLC by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Charles)
March 24, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Volvo Cars of North America, LLC to 4/14/2014. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 24, 2014 Filing 26 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Volvo Cars of North America, LLC.( Riddle, Robert)
March 20, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henrik Davidson Parker on behalf of RE/MAX LLC (Parker, Henrik)
March 19, 2014 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua L Raskin on behalf of The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company (Raskin, Joshua)
March 18, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company to 4/18/2014. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 17, 2014 Filing 23 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company.( Bornstein, Scott)
March 17, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Capital One Financial Corporation to 4/18/2014. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 17, 2014 Filing 22 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Capital One Financial Corporation.( Vivarelli, Daniel)
March 17, 2014 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel G Vivarelli, Jr on behalf of Capital One Financial Corporation (Vivarelli, Daniel)
March 17, 2014 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Maya Miriam Eckstein on behalf of Capital One Financial Corporation (Eckstein, Maya)
March 14, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for RE/MAX LLC to 4/18/2014. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 14, 2014 Filing 19 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re RE/MAX LLC.( Rocci, Steven)
March 13, 2014 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. (Schwartz, Charles)
March 11, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. to 4/14/2014. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 11, 2014 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles W Schwartz on behalf of The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. (Schwartz, Charles)
March 11, 2014 Filing 16 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc..( Schwartz, Charles)
March 11, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Frost Bank to 4/11/2014. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 11, 2014 Filing 15 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Frost Bank. (Daffer, Kevin)
March 10, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Branch Banking and Trust Company to 4/14/2014. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 7, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Davis Tadlock on behalf of Branch Banking and Trust Company (Tadlock, Robert)
March 7, 2014 Filing 13 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Branch Banking and Trust Company.( Tadlock, Robert)
March 5, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for The Western Union Company to 4/18/2014. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
March 5, 2014 Filing 12 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re The Western Union Company.( Schortgen, Steven)
February 27, 2014 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for IKEA North America Services, LLC to 4/10/2014. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, )
February 27, 2014 Filing 11 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re IKEA North America Services, LLC.( Donoghue, R)
February 27, 2014 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by R David Donoghue on behalf of IKEA North America Services, LLC (Donoghue, R)
February 26, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE by EMG Technology, LLC re #8 Order,,,, Notice of Additional Related Cases (Ainsworth, Charles)
February 21, 2014 Consolidated Defendants Added: Branch Banking and Trust Company (6:14cv95); Capital One Financial Corporation (6:14cv96); Frost Bank (6:14cv97); The Goldman Sachs Group Inc (6:14cv98); IKEA North America Services LLC (6:14cv99); The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company (6:14cv100); RE/MAX LLC (6:14cv101); The Western Union Company (6:14cv102); Volvo Cars of North America LLC (6:14cv132). (mll, )
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above listed cases are hereby consolidated into cause number 6:14cv94 for all pretrial purposes, including discovery and claim construction. The Clerk of the Court shall add the consolidated defendants to the Lead Case, as well as lead counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The Clerk shall close all cases listed above other than the lead case. Any motions including motions challenging venue or jurisdiction filed prior to consolidation in any of the consolidated cases must be refiled in Lead Case 6:14cv94 to be considered by the Court. Plaintiff shall file a notice of readiness for scheduling conference in the Lead Case when all Defendants have either answered or filed a motion to transfer or dismiss. Within five days of this order, the Plaintiff also must file a notice indicating whether Plaintiff anticipates filing any additional related cases in this district. If the cases are not ready for scheduling conference within 90 days of this order, Plaintiff must file a detailed status report explaining the reason for the delay. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 02/21/14. (mll, )
February 14, 2014 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Amica Mutual Insurance Company and emailed to pltf for service. (klb)
February 13, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory S Cordrey on behalf of EMG Technology, LLC (Cordrey, Gregory)
February 13, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Christopher Bunt on behalf of EMG Technology, LLC (Bunt, Robert)
February 13, 2014 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by EMG Technology, LLC. (Ainsworth, Charles)
February 13, 2014 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EMG Technology, LLC (Ainsworth, Charles)
February 13, 2014 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles)
February 12, 2014 Judge Michael H. Schneider added. (mll, )
February 12, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amica Mutual Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-4520831.), filed by EMG Technology, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ainsworth, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EMG Technology, LLC v. Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: IKEA North America Services, LLC
Represented By: R David Donoghue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Holly Hawkins Saporito
Represented By: Robert L Lee
Represented By: Siraj Abhyankar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: RE/MAX LLC
Represented By: Steven J Rocci
Represented By: Henrik Davidson Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: The Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Scott J Bornstein
Represented By: Joshua L Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: The Western Union Company
Represented By: Steven G. Schortgen
Represented By: John David Cadkin
Represented By: Elizabeth L DeRieux
Represented By: David Edmond Sipiora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Adam Auchter Allgood
Represented By: Michael Louis Raspino
Represented By: Clay Erik Hawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Sally Beauty Supply LLC
Represented By: Holly Hawkins Saporito
Represented By: Robert L Lee
Represented By: Lindsey Michelle Yeargin
Represented By: Derek Scott Neilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Safelite Group, Inc.
Represented By: Theresa Marie Dawson
Represented By: James Youngkwang Wang
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Chad Brian Walker
Represented By: Ricardo Joel Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Frost Bank
Represented By: J Stephen Ravel
Represented By: Kevin Lowell Daffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Teachers Insurance and Annuity Association - College Retirement Equities Fund
Represented By: Theresa Marie Dawson
Represented By: James Youngkwang Wang
Represented By: Neil J McNabnay
Represented By: Chad Brian Walker
Represented By: Ricardo Joel Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Maya Miriam Eckstein
Represented By: Daniel G Vivarelli, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc.
Represented By: Charles W Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: TOYS R US-DELAWARE, INC.
Represented By: Clay Erik Hawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Gilt Groupe Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: David Asher Swetnam-Burland
Represented By: Shannon Marie Dacus
Represented By: Peter J Brann
Represented By: Stacy O Stitham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Branch Banking and Trust Company
Represented By: J Steven Gardner
Represented By: Robert Davis Tadlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Volvo Cars of North America, LLC
Represented By: Tracy Zurzolo Quinn
Represented By: Mark T Vogelbacker
Represented By: Michael Halley Bernick
Represented By: John William McCauley, IV
Represented By: David T Pollock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMG Technology, LLC
Represented By: Robert Christopher Bunt
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Represented By: Gregory S Cordrey
Represented By: Stanley M Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amica Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Craig M Scott
Represented By: John Frederick Bufe
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Byron L McMasters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?