Tareco Properties, Inc. v. L&S Minerals, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Tareco Properties, Inc. |
Defendant: |
L&S Minerals, LLC, Steve Morriss and Karen Morriss |
Case Number: |
6:2016cv00482 |
Filed: |
June 1, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas |
Office: |
Tyler Office |
County: |
Smith |
Presiding Judge: |
K. Nicole Mitchell |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael H. Schneider |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Fraud |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 5 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 13, 2018 |
Filing
64
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 53 Motion for Attorney Fees; and terminating as moot 63 Motion Request for Ruling or Setting on Attorney's Fees. The motion is GRANTED as to Steve and Karen Morriss and DENIED as to L&S Minerals , LLC. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall recover $91,200.00 for reasonable attorneys fees and $710.00 for costs against Steve Morris and Karen Morriss, jointly and severally. It is finally ORDERED that the Clerk shall terminate L&S Minerals, LLC's Request for Ruling or Setting on Attorneys' Fees (ECF 63 ) as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 8/13/2018. (rlf)
|
August 9, 2017 |
Filing
48
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 36 Plaintiff Tareco Properties, Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment and 45 Plaintiff's Second Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendants' Newly Asserted Affirmative Defenses are GRANTED. [ 31] Defendant Steve Morriss and Karen Morriss' Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that the Pretrial Conference scheduled for August 28, 2017, Jury Selection scheduled for September 18, 2017 and Jury Trial sch eduled for September 25, 2017 are CANCELED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants Steve and Karen Morriss shall immediately turnover their claim to the property, described as 92.71 acres of land, more or less, situated in Section 23 of the D on Thomas Quevado Survey, A-18, Smith County, Texas being the same land described in that certain Warranty Deed dated October 20, 1917 from J.H. Herndon, Executor of the Estate of W.S. Herndon to Juddie Parks, recorded in Volume 133, Page 441 of the Deed Records of Smith County, Texas. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall turn over to Plaintiff all documents or records in their possession or control relevant to the claim. It is finally ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a motion seeking to recover attorneys fees and costs supported by appropriate documentation. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 8/9/2017. (rlf)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?