Williams v. Catoe et al
Plaintiff: Elliott Williams
Defendant: Jeffrey Catoe, William Wheat, Pamela Pace, Jacinta Assava and Jane and John Doe
Case Number: 6:2017cv00627
Filed: November 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Ron Clark
Presiding Judge: K. Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 286 Report and Recommendations. It is ORDERED that 265 Sealed Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that 222 Motion for Summary Judgment filed is DENIED as to Defendant White only. Finally, it is ORDERED that Plaintiff'sclaims against Defendant Vicki White are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 6/4/2021. (efarris, )
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Court hereby ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge 261 as the findings of this Court. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order 200 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 11/24/20. (mll, )
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Court hereby ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge 260 as the findings of this Court. Plaintiff's motion for default judgment 257 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 11/03/20. (mll, )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The Report and Recommendation 232 is ADOPTED. Defendants Assava, Dr. Shrode, and White's Motion for Summary Judgment 193 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff's claims against Defend ants Assava and Dr. Shrode are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for Plaintiff's failure to exhaust his administrative remedies. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant White are (in part) DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to exhaust his administrative remedies. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 09/01/20. (mll, )
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 108 Report and Recommendations of the United Stated Magistrate Judge. ORDERED that the Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction and temporary restraining (Docket No. 91) be DENIED. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 2/26/2020. (gsg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Catoe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliott Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Catoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Wheat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Pace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacinta Assava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane and John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?