Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG v. Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, et al
Plaintiff: Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG
Defendant: Lenovo (United States) Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,, Motorola Mobility, LLC and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv00388
Filed: August 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Smith
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 157 Opposed MOTION in Limine regarding Samsung by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 28, 2018 Filing 156 Opposed MOTION in Limine by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 27, 2018 Filing 155 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, of Time Requested for Jury Selection and Trial (Kelleher, Patrick)
September 27, 2018 Filing 154 NOTICE by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG of Estimate of Time Requested for Jury Selection and Trial (Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 27, 2018 Filing 153 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #55 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 27, 2018 Filing 152 NOTICE by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC of Estimates of Time Requested for Jury Selection and Trial (Moore, Steven)
September 27, 2018 Filing 151 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #46 Scheduling Order,,,, Terminate Motions,,, by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
September 26, 2018 Filing 150 NOTICE by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC of Request for Daily Transcripts (Moore, Steven)
September 26, 2018 Filing 149 NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, Notice of Request for Daily Transcript and Real-Time Reporting of Trial Proceedings (Kelleher, Patrick)
September 26, 2018 Filing 148 NOTICE by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG re Request for Daily Transcript (Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 21, 2018 Filing 147 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #47 MOTION to Allow its Damages Expert, Dr. Stephen Becker, to Testify Out of Order filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Henry, Claire)
September 20, 2018 Filing 146 REPLY to Response to Motion re #55 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC. (Moore, Steven)
September 19, 2018 Filing 145 NOTICE by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG re #72 Sealed Response to Motion,, Notice of Correction (Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 19, 2018 Filing 144 NOTICE by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG re #60 Sealed Response to Motion,, Notice of Correction (Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 14, 2018 Filing 143 REPLY to Response to Motion re #47 MOTION to Allow its Damages Expert, Dr. Stephen Becker, to Testify Out of Order filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Kelleher, Patrick)
September 12, 2018 Filing 142 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENT to Main Document: #141 Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 12, 2018 Filing 141 RESPONSE to Motion re #55 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice and Cross Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Goodpastor, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2018: #4 Text of Proposed Order) (rlf, ).
September 11, 2018 Filing 140 REDACTION to #67 Sealed Response to Motion,, to Exclude The Testimony of Expert Dwayne Perry Ph.D. by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC. (Moore, Steven)
September 11, 2018 Filing 139 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kimberly Gustafson Bueno on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, (Bueno, Kimberly)
September 11, 2018 Filing 138 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Edward McConnico on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, (McConnico, Stephen)
September 10, 2018 Filing 137 REDACTION to #108 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, to Strike Publicly Available Source Code and Late-Identified Source Code from the Expert Report of Robert Zeidman by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 136 REDACTION to #58 Sealed Response to Motion, to Strike Publicly Available Source Code and Late-Identified Source Code from the Expert Report of Robert Zeidman by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 135 REDACTION to #102 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Benoit by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 134 REDACTION to #74 Sealed Response to Motion, to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Benoit by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 133 REDACTION to #100 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion to Strike Supplemental Reports of Benoit by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 132 REDACTION to #70 Sealed Response to Motion, to Strike Supplemental Reports of Benoit by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 131 REDACTION to #103 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment (Samsung) by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 130 REDACTION to #60 Sealed Response to Motion,, for Summary Judgment (Samsung) by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 129 REDACTION to #77 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 128 REDACTION to #79 Sealed Response to Motion, in Limine by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 127 REDACTION to #78 Sealed Response to Motion, in Limine by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 126 REDACTION to #88 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion to Strike References to Unelected and Excessive Prior Art by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 125 REDACTION to #27 Sealed Additional Attachments to Main Document, by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 124 REDACTION to #89 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion to Strike Portions of the Becker Report re Alternative Hypothetical Negotiation Date by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 123 REDACTION to #24 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Becker Report re Alternative Hypothetical Negotiation Date by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 122 REDACTION to #91 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion to Exclude Testimony of Expert Gabriel Robins by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 121 REDACTION to #22 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Expert Gabriel Robins, PhD. by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 120 REDACTION to #90 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Dwayne Perry by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 119 REDACTION to #23 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Expert Dewayne Perry, PhD. by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 118 REDACTION to #109 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, to Strike Zeidman by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 117 REDACTION to #73 Sealed Response to Motion, to Strike Zeidman by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 116 REDACTION to #98 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, to Strike Thomas Gafford by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 115 REDACTION to #59 Sealed Response to Motion, to Strike Thomas Gafford by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 114 REDACTION to #97 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion, for Summary Judgment (Len-Moto) by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 27, #3 Exhibit 28, #4 Exhibit 29)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 113 REDACTION to #72 Sealed Response to Motion,, for Summary Judgment (Len-Moto) by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 112 REDACTION to #99 Sealed Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion to Substitute Expert by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 10, 2018 Filing 111 REDACTION to #57 Sealed Response to Motion,, by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 7, 2018 Filing 110 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #26 Opposed MOTION to Strike References to Unelected and Excessive Prior Art in Defendants' Expert Reports filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Moore, Steven)
September 7, 2018 Filing 109 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #40 MOTION to Strike Certain Portions of the Expert Reports of Robert Zeidman filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 7, 2018 Filing 108 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #32 SEALED MOTION to Strike Publicly Available Source Code and Late-Identified Source Code from the Expert Report of Robert Zeidman filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 7, 2018 Filing 107 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #23 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Expert Dewayne Perry, PhD. filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC. (Moore, Steven)
September 7, 2018 Filing 106 RESPONSE to Motion re #47 MOTION to Allow its Damages Expert, Dr. Stephen Becker, to Testify Out of Order filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Gilstrap's Trial Settings for November 5, 2018, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
September 7, 2018 Filing 105 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #22 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Expert Gabriel Robins, PhD. filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Kelleher, Patrick)
September 7, 2018 Filing 104 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #24 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Becker Report re Alternative Hypothetical Negotiation Date filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Kelleher, Patrick)
September 7, 2018 Filing 103 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #31 SEALED MOTION Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 7, 2018 Filing 102 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #39 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul C. Benoit filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 7, 2018 Filing 101 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #33 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Third-Party Discovery After Close of Fact Discovery filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 7, 2018 Filing 100 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #35 SEALED MOTION to Strike Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Paul C. Benoit filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 7, 2018 Filing 99 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Substitute Expert Witness filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 7, 2018 Filing 98 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report and Testimony of Thomas Gafford filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 7, 2018 Filing 97 SEALED SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Goodpastor Declaration, #2 Exhibit 27, #3 Exhibit 28, #4 Exhibit 29)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 5, 2018 Filing 96 STIPULATION Regarding Affirmative Defenses & Counterclaims (Joint Notice) by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC. (Moore, Steven)
September 4, 2018 Filing 95 REPLY to Response to Motion re #44 MOTION to Substitute Expert Witness filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC. (Moore, Steven)
September 4, 2018 Filing 94 REPLY to Response to Motion re #34 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC. (Moore, Steven)
September 4, 2018 Filing 93 REPLY to Response to Motion re #37 MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report and Testimony of Thomas Gafford filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC. (Moore, Steven)
September 4, 2018 Filing 92 REPLY to Response to Motion re #40 MOTION to Strike Certain Portions of the Expert Reports of Robert Zeidman filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC. (Moore, Steven)
September 4, 2018 Filing 91 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Expert Gabriel Robins, PhD. filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 4, 2018 Filing 90 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Expert Dewayne Perry, PhD. filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 4, 2018 Filing 89 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Becker Report re Alternative Hypothetical Negotiation Date filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 4, 2018 Filing 88 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 Opposed MOTION to Strike References to Unelected and Excessive Prior Art in Defendants' Expert Reports filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Goodpastor, Christopher)
September 4, 2018 Filing 87 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 SEALED MOTION to Strike Publicly Available Source Code and Late-Identified Source Code from the Expert Report of Robert Zeidman filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Kelleher, Patrick)
September 4, 2018 Filing 86 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul C. Benoit filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Kelleher, Patrick)
September 4, 2018 Filing 85 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #31 SEALED MOTION Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 24, #2 Exhibit 25, #3 Exhibit 26, #4 Exhibit 27, #5 Exhibit 28, #6 Exhibit 29, #7 Exhibit 30)(Kelleher, Patrick)
September 4, 2018 Filing 84 SEALED REPLY to Response to Motion re #35 SEALED MOTION to Strike Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Paul C. Benoit filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
September 4, 2018 Filing 83 REPLY to Response to Motion re #33 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Third-Party Discovery After Close of Fact Discovery filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (DiGiovanni, Francis)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #80 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #25 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct Response due by 9/5/2018. Reply due by 9/7/2018.. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/4/2018. (saenz, )
August 31, 2018 Filing 81 STIPULATION Joint Notice of Stipulation Regarding Affirmative Defense and Counterclaim of Unenforceability of the '449 Patent by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Kelleher, Patrick)
August 31, 2018 Filing 80 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Steven)
August 30, 2018 Filing 79 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #45 Opposed SEALED MOTION in Limine filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 30, 2018 Filing 78 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #43 MOTION in Limine filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 30, 2018 Filing 77 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #76 Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4 (SEALED))(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 30, 2018 Filing 76 RESPONSE to Motion re #33 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Third-Party Discovery After Close of Fact Discovery filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 30, 2018 Filing 75 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #24 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Becker Report re Alternative Hypothetical Negotiation Date filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Patrick J. Kelleher, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Kelleher, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: # (10) Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg).
August 30, 2018 Filing 74 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #39 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul C. Benoit filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 30, 2018 Filing 73 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #40 MOTION to Strike Certain Portions of the Expert Reports of Robert Zeidman filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 30, 2018 Filing 72 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #34 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Goodpastor Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 30, 2018 Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC, Motorola Mobility, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelleher, Patrick)
August 30, 2018 Filing 70 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #35 SEALED MOTION to Strike Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Paul C. Benoit filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 30, 2018 Filing 69 RESPONSE to Motion re #30 Opposed MOTION in Limine with respect to Papst & Lenovo filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William E. Mosley, #2 Exhibit 1 - Mosley Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 - Mosley Declaration, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Steven)
August 30, 2018 Filing 68 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #67 Sealed Response to Motion,,.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan Hardt, #2 Declaration of William E. Mosley, #3 Exhibit 1 - Hardt Declaration, #4 Exhibit 7 - Hardt Declaration, #5 Exhibit 9 - Hardt Declaration)(Moore, Steven)
August 30, 2018 Filing 67 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #23 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Expert Dewayne Perry, PhD. filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Hardt Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 3 - Hardt Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 4 - Hardt Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 5 - Hardt Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 6 - Hardt Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 8 - Hardt Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 10 - Hardt Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Steven)
August 30, 2018 Filing 66 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #65 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9 - Mosley Declaration - Filed Under Seal)(Moore, Steven)
August 30, 2018 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 Opposed MOTION to Strike References to Unelected and Excessive Prior Art in Defendants' Expert Reports filed by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William E. Mosley, #2 Exhibit 1 - Mosley Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 - Mosley Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 - Mosley Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 - Mosley Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 - Mosley Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 - Mosley Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 - Mosley Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 - Mosley Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 - Mosley Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Steven)
August 30, 2018 Filing 64 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #63 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Gabriel Robins PhD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G)(Kelleher, Patrick)
August 30, 2018 Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Expert Gabriel Robins, PhD. filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Patrick J. Kelleher, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Kelleher, Patrick) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: # (10) Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg).
August 30, 2018 Filing 62 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #61 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit E)(DiGiovanni, Francis)
August 30, 2018 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 Opposed MOTION in Limine with respect to Papst & Samsung filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francis DiGiovanni, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(DiGiovanni, Francis)
August 30, 2018 Filing 60 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #31 SEALED MOTION Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Price Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13 - part 1, #16 Exhibit 13 - part 2, #17 Exhibit 13 - part 3, #18 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 30, 2018 Filing 59 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #37 MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report and Testimony of Thomas Gafford filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 30, 2018 Filing 58 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #32 SEALED MOTION to Strike Publicly Available Source Code and Late-Identified Source Code from the Expert Report of Robert Zeidman filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 30, 2018 Filing 57 SEALED RESPONSE to Motion re #44 MOTION to Substitute Expert Witness filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12 (part 1), #13 Exhibit 12 (part 2), #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 29, 2018 Filing 56 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #55 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Ludlam Declaration - Email Communication)(Moore, Steven)
August 29, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Taylor Higgins Ludlam, #2 Exhibit A - Ludlam Declaration - Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions, #3 Exhibit B - Ludlam Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit C - Ludlam Declaration - Email Communication, #5 Certificate of Authority to File Under Seal, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Steven)
August 29, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 53 AND 54, Opposed Motion to Dismiss. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (gsg)
August 28, 2018 Filing 54 ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #53 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Ludlam Declaration - Email Communication)(Moore, Steven) Modified on 8/29/2018 (gsg).
August 28, 2018 Filing 53 ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.***Opposed MOTION to Dismiss by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Taylor Higgins Ludlam, #2 Exhibit A - Ludlam Declaration, #3 Exhibit B - Ludlam Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit C - Ludlam Declaration, #5 Certificate of Authority to File Under Seal, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Steven) Modified on 8/29/2018 (gsg).
August 24, 2018 Filing 52 REDACTION to #32 SEALED MOTION to Strike Publicly Available Source Code and Late-Identified Source Code from the Expert Report of Robert Zeidman by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelleher, Patrick)
August 24, 2018 Filing 51 REDACTION to #31 SEALED MOTION Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Patrick J. Kelleher, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelleher, Patrick)
August 24, 2018 Filing 50 REDACTION to #45 Opposed SEALED MOTION in Limine by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(DiGiovanni, Francis)
August 24, 2018 Filing 49 REDACTION to #35 SEALED MOTION to Strike Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Paul C. Benoit by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francis DiGiovanni, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(DiGiovanni, Francis)
August 24, 2018 Filing 48 REDACTION to #33 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Third-Party Discovery After Close of Fact Discovery by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francis DiGiovanni, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(DiGiovanni, Francis)
August 24, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION to Allow its Damages Expert, Dr. Stephen Becker, to Testify Out of Order by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - 030818 email from Kelleher, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2018 10:00 AM in Texarkana Courthouse before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Selection set for 10/30/2018 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III, Re: Civil Action 6:18cv388 Papst Licensing v. Samsung Electronics. Jury Selection set for 10/30/2018 01:00 PM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III, Re: Civil Action 6:18cv424, Papst Licensing v. Lenovo (United States) Inc. Jury Trial set for 10/30/2018 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III, for Civil Action 6:18cv388. (Trial in Civil Action 6:18cv388 (Samsung) will begin once jury selection for both cases has concluded. Trial in Civil Action 6:18cv424 (Lenovo) will begin once the trial in the Samsung Case is concluded.) Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/23/18. (mll, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 45 Opposed SEALED MOTION in Limine by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(DiGiovanni, Francis)
August 20, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION to Substitute Expert Witness by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Steven)
August 20, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION in Limine by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Steven)
August 20, 2018 Filing 42 Joint MOTION in Limine (Agreed) by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Steven)
August 20, 2018 Filing 41 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #40 MOTION to Strike Certain Portions of the Expert Reports of Robert Zeidman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5 - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 6 - Filed Under Seal)(Moore, Steven)
August 20, 2018 Filing 40 MOTION to Strike Certain Portions of the Expert Reports of Robert Zeidman by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J Hardt, #2 Declaration of W Mosley, #3 Exhibit 1 - Hardt Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 2 - Hardt Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 3 - Hardt Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 4 - Hardt Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 5 - Mosley Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 6 - Mosley Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #9 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Steven)
August 20, 2018 Filing 39 SEALED MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Paul C. Benoit by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Francis DiGiovanni, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3A, #5 Exhibit 3B, #6 Exhibit 3C, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelleher, Patrick)
August 20, 2018 Filing 38 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #37 MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report and Testimony of Thomas Gafford . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - Filed Under Seal)(Moore, Steven)
August 20, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Portions of the Expert Report and Testimony of Thomas Gafford by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J Hardt, #2 Declaration of W Mosley, #3 Exhibit 1 - Hardt Declaration - Exhibit Intentionally Omitted, #4 Exhibit 2 - Hardt Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 - Hardt Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 - Hardt Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 - Mosley Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #8 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Steven)
August 20, 2018 Filing 36 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #34 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 3 - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 8 - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 9 - Filed Under Seal)(Moore, Steven)
August 20, 2018 Filing 35 SEALED MOTION to Strike Untimely Supplemental Expert Report of Paul C. Benoit by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francis DiGiovanni, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(DiGiovanni, Francis)
August 20, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J Hardt, #2 Exhibit 1 - Hardt Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 - Hardt Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 3 - Hardt Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 4 - Hardt Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 - Hardt Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 - Hardt Declaration - Placeholder - Exhibit Intentionally Omitted, #8 Exhibit 7 - Hardt Declaration - Placeholder - Exhibit Intentionally Omitted, #9 Exhibit 8 - Hardt Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 9 - Hardt Declaration - Filed Under Seal, #11 Certificate of Authorization to File Under Seal, #12 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Steven)
August 20, 2018 Filing 33 SEALED MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Third-Party Discovery After Close of Fact Discovery by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francis DiGiovanni, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(DiGiovanni, Francis)
August 20, 2018 Filing 32 SEALED MOTION to Strike Publicly Available Source Code and Late-Identified Source Code from the Expert Report of Robert Zeidman by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelleher, Patrick)
August 20, 2018 Filing 31 SEALED MOTION Motion for Summary Judgment of Noninfringement by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Patrick J. Kelleher, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelleher, Patrick)
August 20, 2018 Filing 30 Opposed MOTION in Limine with respect to Papst & Lenovo by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 20, 2018 Filing 29 Opposed MOTION in Limine with respect to Papst & Samsung by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 20, 2018 Filing 28 Joint MOTION in Limine with respect to Papst & Samsung by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 20, 2018 Filing 27 SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: #26 Opposed MOTION to Strike References to Unelected and Excessive Prior Art in Defendants' Expert Reports. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Part 1 of 3, #2 Exhibit B - Part 2 of 3, #3 Exhibit B - Part 3 of 3, #4 Exhibit C - Part 1 of 5, #5 Exhibit C - Part 2 of 5, #6 Exhibit C - Part 3 of 5, #7 Exhibit C - Part 4 of 5, #8 Exhibit C - Part 5 of 5)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 20, 2018 Filing 26 Opposed MOTION to Strike References to Unelected and Excessive Prior Art in Defendants' Expert Reports by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Exhibit B (slip sheet), #4 Exhibit C (slip sheet), #5 Exhibit D-1, #6 Exhibit D-2, #7 Exhibit E-1, #8 Exhibit E-2, #9 Exhibit F-1, #10 Exhibit F-2, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I-1, #14 Exhibit I-2, #15 Exhibit J-1, #16 Exhibit J-2, #17 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 20, 2018 Filing 25 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Inequitable Conduct by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 20, 2018 Filing 24 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Strike Portions of the Becker Report re Alternative Hypothetical Negotiation Date by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 20, 2018 Filing 23 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Expert Dewayne Perry, PhD. by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2 - Part 2, #4 Exhibit 2 - Part 3, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 20, 2018 Filing 22 Opposed SEALED MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Expert Gabriel Robins, PhD. by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, #2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, #3 Exhibit 1 - Part 3, #4 Exhibit 1 - Part 4, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 20, 2018 Filing 21 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. Parties have until 8-20-2018 to file a proposed docket control order for the remaining deadlines in this case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/20/18. (mll, )
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that Defendants Lenovo (United States) Inc. and Motorola Mobility, LLC are SEVERED into a new cause of action. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint against Lenovo and Motorola (Docket No. 17, 6:15-cv-1111) in the newly-severed case and to waive payment of a filing fee for the severed case. The newly-severed action against Lenovo and Motorola are to be CONSOLIDATED with this case (Civil Action No. 6:18-cv-00388) for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. This action shall serve as the Lead Case for the consolidated issues. The newly-severed action will remain active for venue motions and trial. All future pretrial filings, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the lead case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/20/18. (mll, )
August 20, 2018 ***Defendants Lenovo (United States) Inc and Motorola Mobility LLC are SEVERED into Civil Action 6:18cv424.*** (mll, )
August 20, 2018 ***Consolidated Defendants added: Lenovo (United States) Inc, Motorola Mobility LLC (6:18cv424). (mll, )
August 19, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Edward Mosley on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC (Mosley, William)
August 17, 2018 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Docket Control Order by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Henry, Claire)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that parties meet and confer on a schedule and file a joint proposed docket control order incorporating these deadlines by 8-17-2018. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/09/18. (mll, )
August 8, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Francis DiGiovanni on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, (DiGiovanni, Francis)
August 8, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carrie Anne Beyer on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, (Beyer, Carrie)
August 7, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nick Colic on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, (Colic, Nick)
August 7, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thatcher Albert Rahmeier on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, (Rahmeier, Thatcher)
August 7, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Wayne B. Mason on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, (Mason, Wayne)
August 7, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Clay Holloway on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC (Holloway, David)
August 2, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taylor Higgins Ludlam on behalf of Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC (Ludlam, Taylor)
August 2, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gabriel Ross Gervey on behalf of Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG (Gervey, Gabriel)
August 2, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicole E Glauser on behalf of Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG (Glauser, Nicole)
August 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Gerald DiNovo on behalf of Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG (DiNovo, Andrew)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher V Goodpastor on behalf of Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG (Goodpastor, Christopher)
August 2, 2018 Lead and local counsel only added to the severed case per EDTX procedures. Papst did not have lead counsel designated, so the first listed attorney was added to the docket. All other counsel need to file a notice of appearance to be added to this case. (mjc, )
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PROTECTIVE ORDER entered. Originally filed at entry 107 in consolidated lead case 6:15cv1095. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 7/27/2016. (mjc, )
August 1, 2018 Filing 3 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lenovo (United States) Inc., Motorola Mobility, LLC, filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. Document originally filed at entry 17 on 1/20/2016 in case 6:15cv1111. (mjc, )
August 1, 2018 Filing 2 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,, filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG. Document originally filed at entry 21 on 4/4/2016 in case 6:15cv1102. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(mjc, )
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER severing Claims 1 and 17 of the '449 patent from 6:15cv1095 into a new separate cause of action against Samsung, Lenovo and Motorola. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint against Samsung (Docket No. 21, 6:15-cv-1102), Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint against Lenovo and Motorola (Docket No. 17, 6:15-cv-1111) and the Protective Order (Docket No. 107, 6:15-cv-1095) shall be filed in the newly-severed case. Payment of a filing fee for the severed case will be waived. The lead case (6:15-cv-1095) is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pending the Federal Circuit's final decision on appeal, or until subsequent order of this Court. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 8/1/2018. (mjc, )
August 1, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (mjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG v. Samsung Electronics Co., LTD, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Represented By: Andrew Gerald DiNovo
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Christopher V Goodpastor
Represented By: Gabriel Ross Gervey
Represented By: Adam G Price
Represented By: Nicole E Glauser
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo (United States) Inc.
Represented By: Steven David Moore
Represented By: Taylor Higgins Ludlam
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: William Edward Mosley
Represented By: David Clay Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., LTD,
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV
Represented By: Patrick J Kelleher
Represented By: John Frederick Bufe
Represented By: Carrie Anne Beyer
Represented By: Stephen Edward McConnico
Represented By: Kimberly Gustafson Bueno
Represented By: Francis DiGiovanni
Represented By: Thatcher Albert Rahmeier
Represented By: Nick Colic
Represented By: Wayne B. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility, LLC
Represented By: Steven David Moore
Represented By: Taylor Higgins Ludlam
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: William Edward Mosley
Represented By: David Clay Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Represented By: Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV
Represented By: Patrick J Kelleher
Represented By: John Frederick Bufe
Represented By: Carrie Anne Beyer
Represented By: Stephen Edward McConnico
Represented By: Kimberly Gustafson Bueno
Represented By: Francis DiGiovanni
Represented By: Thatcher Albert Rahmeier
Represented By: Nick Colic
Represented By: Wayne B. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?