Fall Line Patents, LLC v. Starbucks Corporation
Plaintiff: Fall Line Patents, LLC
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 6:2018cv00411
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fall Line Patents, LLC. Starbucks Corporation served on 8/23/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (Ellis, Michael)
September 10, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Starbucks Corporation to 10/15/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(rlf)
September 7, 2018 Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Starbucks Corporation.( Elliott, Tara)
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 ***FILED IN ERROR. ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE. PLEASE DISREGARD.***SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fall Line Patents, LLC. Fall Line Patents, LLC served on 8/23/2018, answer due 9/13/2018. (Ellis, Michael) Modified on 9/5/2018 (rlf).
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Dean Thompson, Jr on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Thompson, Larry)
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Zachariah Harrington on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Harrington, Zachariah)
September 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael David Ellis on behalf of Fall Line Patents, LLC (Ellis, Michael)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by Fall Line Patents, LLC of Related Cases (Antonelli, Matthew)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC (Antonelli, Matthew)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Starbucks Corporation, and emailed to Plaintiff for Service. (rlf)
August 15, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Fall Line Patents, LLC. (rlf)
August 15, 2018 District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III added. (rlf)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Antonelli, Matthew)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Starbucks Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6900096.), filed by Fall Line Patents, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Antonelli, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fall Line Patents, LLC v. Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fall Line Patents, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J Antonelli
Represented By: Zachariah Harrington
Represented By: Larry Dean Thompson, Jr
Represented By: Michael David Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Tara D Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?