Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG v. Lenovo (United States) Inc et al
Plaintiff: Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG
Defendant: Lenovo (United States) Inc and Motorola Mobility, LLC
Case Number: 6:2018cv00424
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Office: Tyler Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON TRIAL PROCEDURES entered. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/17/2018. (mjc, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 Minute Entry for Final Pretrial Conference and motion hearing held on 10/16/2018 before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (Court Reporter Rachelle Sloan) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Initial Pretrial Conference Proceedings held on 10/4/2018 before Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Court Reporter: Shea Sloan, shea_sloan@txed.uscourts.gov NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) business days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.txed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Motion to Redact due 10/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2019. (sms, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/4/2018. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Sign In Sheet) (bas)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #3 Scheduling Order,, by Lenovo (United States) Inc, Motorola Mobility, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Amended Docket Control Order)(Moore, Steven)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE by Lenovo (United States) Inc, Motorola Mobility, LLC of Request for Daily Transcripts (Moore, Steven)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Pretrial Conference set for 10/4/2018 10:00 AM in Texarkana Courthouse before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Selection set for 10/30/2018 01:00 PM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. Jury Trial set for 10/30/2018 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Robert W. Schroeder III. (Trial in Lead Case 6:18cv388 will begin once jury selection for both cases has concluded. Trial in the Consolidated Case 6:18cv424 will begin once the trial in the Lead case is concluded.) Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/23/18. (mll, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Lenovo (United States) Inc, Motorola Mobility, LLC, filed by Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG.(mll, )
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 ORDER that Defendants Lenovo (United States) Inc. and Motorola Mobility, LLC are SEVERED into a new cause of action. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint against Lenovo and Motorola (Docket No. 17, 6:15-cv-1111) in the newly-severed case and to waive payment of a filing fee for the severed case. The newly-severed action against Lenovo and Motorola are to be CONSOLIDATED with Civil Action No. 6:18-cv-00388 for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The newly-severed action will remain active for venue motions and trial. All future pretrial filings, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the lead case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 08/20/18. (mll, )
August 20, 2018 This civil action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 6:18cv388 designated as the Lead Case. All future pleadings -- except relating to venue -- are to be filed in the Lead Case. This case remains active for venue determination and trial. (mll, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG v. Lenovo (United States) Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenovo (United States) Inc
Represented By: Steven David Moore
Represented By: David Clay Holloway
Represented By: Taylor Higgins Ludlam
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: William Edward Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility, LLC
Represented By: Steven David Moore
Represented By: David Clay Holloway
Represented By: Taylor Higgins Ludlam
Represented By: Jennifer Parker Ainsworth
Represented By: William Edward Mosley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Papst Licensing GmbH & Co., KG
Represented By: Claire Abernathy Henry
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Fair
Represented By: Andrew Gerald DiNovo
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Christopher V Goodpastor
Represented By: Gabriel Ross Gervey
Represented By: Adam G Price
Represented By: Nicole E Glauser
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?