Sevick v. Henderson County Constable Office et al
Plaintiff: Jr Erick Charles Sevick and Erick Charles Sevick
Defendant: Brad Meyers, Henderson County Constable Office, FNU Pinato, Josh Rickman, John Doe and Unknown Nurses
Case Number: 6:2018cv00518
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Thad Heartfield
Referring Judge: John D Love
2 Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Erick Charles Sevick as to #11 Order for Initial Partial Filing Fee - RECEIVED 11.17.2018. (rlf)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Initial Partial Filing Fee. The Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (docket no. #2 ) is GRANTED. An initial partial filing fee of $38.00 shall be paid to the Clerk within thirty (30) daysfrom the receipt of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 11/14/2018. (rlf)
November 7, 2018 Filing 10 Additional Attachments to Main Document: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Henderson Co Jail Resident Account Summary) (rlf)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Doe, Henderson County Constable Office, Brad Meyers, Unknown Nurses, FNU Pinato, Josh Rickman, filed by Erick Charles Sevick. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rlf)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Erick Charles Sevick on 10/29/2018 as to #6 Order, 1983 form, and #7 Order. (mjc, )
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER entered re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Erick Charles Sevick. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date of receipt of this order in which to either pay the statutory $400.00 filing fee, or furnish a properly certified in forma pauperis data sheet or inmate account summary sheet, from the institution where he is confined. If granted ifp status, the amount of the filing fee will be $350.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/25/2018. (mjc, )
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the Plaintiff has 30 days from the date of receipt of this order in which to file an amended complaint presenting a short and plain statement of his claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 10/25/2018. (mjc, )
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Thad Heartfield for all further proceedings. District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 10/15/2018. (gsg)
October 2, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. Consent form mailed to Plaintiff. (rlf)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (rlf)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Erick Charles Sevick. (rlf)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Henderson County Constable Office, Brad Meyers, filed by Erick Charles Sevick. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rlf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sevick v. Henderson County Constable Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jr Erick Charles Sevick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erick Charles Sevick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henderson County Constable Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Pinato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Rickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Nurses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?