Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Outlaw Country Social Club, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Songs Of Universal, Inc., Kostas Sauvas Lazarides, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Don Kirshner Entertainment Company, EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Steve O'Brien, Cruven, Inc., Bocephus Music, Inc. and SHELBY SINGLETON MUSIC, INC.
Defendant: Tracey L. Huff, Randy L. Wilbanks, Outlaw Country Social Club, Inc. and Beverly M. Wilbanks
Case Number: 6:2018cv00591
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., SHELBY SINGLETON MUSIC, INC., Broadcast Music, Inc., Bocephus Music, Inc., Songs Of Universal, Inc., Steve O'Brien, Cruven, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Kostas Sauvas Lazarides, Don Kirshner Entertainment Company, Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. Tracey L. Huff served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Hawkins, Myall)
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., SHELBY SINGLETON MUSIC, INC., Broadcast Music, Inc., Bocephus Music, Inc., Songs Of Universal, Inc., Steve O'Brien, Cruven, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Kostas Sauvas Lazarides, Don Kirshner Entertainment Company, Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. Beverly M. Wilbanks served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Hawkins, Myall)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., SHELBY SINGLETON MUSIC, INC., Broadcast Music, Inc., Bocephus Music, Inc., Songs Of Universal, Inc., Steve O'Brien, Cruven, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Kostas Sauvas Lazarides, Don Kirshner Entertainment Company, Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. Randy L. Wilbanks served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Hawkins, Myall)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., SHELBY SINGLETON MUSIC, INC., Broadcast Music, Inc., Bocephus Music, Inc., Songs Of Universal, Inc., Steve O'Brien, Cruven, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Kostas Sauvas Lazarides, Don Kirshner Entertainment Company, Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. Outlaw Country Social Club, Inc. served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Hawkins, Myall)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III no longer assigned to the case. (rlf)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to Tracey L. Huff, Outlaw Country Social Club, Inc., Beverly M. Wilbanks, Randy L. Wilbanks and emailed to Plaintiff for Service. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Randy Wilbanks, #2 Summons - Beverly Wilbanks, #3 Summons - Tracey Huff)(rlf)
November 13, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rlf)
November 13, 2018 District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III added. (rlf)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (Hawkins, Myall)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bocephus Music, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Cruven, Inc., Don Kirshner Entertainment Company, EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., Kostas Sauvas Lazarides, Steve O'Brien, Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, SHELBY SINGLETON MUSIC, INC., Songs Of Universal, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Songs Of Universal, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc. ; Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for EMI Virgin Songs, Inc.; Corporate Parent CBS Broadcasting, Inc. for Don Kirshner Entertainment Company; Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.; Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Hawkins, Myall)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7022448.), filed by EMI Virgin Songs, Inc., SHELBY SINGLETON MUSIC, INC., Broadcast Music, Inc., Bocephus Music, Inc., Songs Of Universal, Inc., Steve O'Brien, Cruven, Inc., Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Universal Music MGB NA LLC, Kostas Sauvas Lazarides, Don Kirshner Entertainment Company, Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hawkins, Myall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Outlaw Country Social Club, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Myall S Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music MGB NA LLC
Represented By: Myall S Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondor Music International, Inc. d/b/a Irving Music
Represented By: Myall S Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Songs of Polygram International, Inc.
Represented By: Myall S Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs Of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Myall S Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kostas Sauvas Lazarides
Represented By: Myall S Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Represented By: Myall S Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Kirshner Entertainment Company
Represented By: Myall S Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EMI Virgin Songs, Inc.
Represented By: Myall S Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve O'Brien
Represented By: Myall S Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cruven, Inc.
Represented By: Myall S Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bocephus Music, Inc.
Represented By: Myall S Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHELBY SINGLETON MUSIC, INC.
Represented By: Myall S Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey L. Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy L. Wilbanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outlaw Country Social Club, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly M. Wilbanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?