S3G Technology LLC v. PestRoutes LLC
Plaintiff: S3G Technology LLC
Defendant: PestRoutes LLC
Case Number: 6:2018cv00595
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: Robert W Schroeder
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for PestRoutes LLC to 1/21/2019. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mjc, )
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 Case Reassigned to District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III no longer assigned to the case. (rlf)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PestRoutes LLC.( Smith, Melissa)
December 3, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for PestRoutes LLC to 1/6/2019. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.(rlf)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re PestRoutes LLC.( Smith, Melissa)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by S3G Technology LLC. PestRoutes LLC served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Ainsworth, Charles)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to PestRoutes LLC. (mjc, )
November 14, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by S3G Technology LLC. (rlf)
November 14, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rlf)
November 14, 2018 District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III added. (rlf)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ainsworth, Charles)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PestRoutes LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7024074.), filed by S3G Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Ainsworth, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S3G Technology LLC v. PestRoutes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S3G Technology LLC
Represented By: Charles Ainsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PestRoutes LLC
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?