Laymance et al v. Taylor et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Laymance and Morgan Laymance
Defendant: Sharon VanCompernolle, Matthew Hester, Felicia Hickerson, John VanCompernolle, Greg Taylor, Ronnie Foster and Jeffrey Coe
Case Number: 6:2019cv00045
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to #15 Answer to Amended Complaint by Jeremy Laymance, Morgan Laymance. (mjc, )
March 19, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Felicia Hickerson. (Graydon, Scot)
March 18, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jeremy Laymance, Morgan Laymance. (mjc, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jeremy Laymance, Morgan Laymance. (mjc, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 17 Sealed Document - Unredacted Motion to Dismiss #16 . (mjc, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss (Redacted for minor child's name) by John VanCompernolle, Sharon VanCompernolle. (mjc, )
March 13, 2019 Filing 15 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND JURY DEMAND by Ronnie Foster, Matthew Hester, Greg Taylor.(Iglesias, David)
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jeremy Laymance as to Matthew Hester. (mjc, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jeremy Laymance as to Ronnie Foster. (mjc, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Felicia Hickerson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graydon, Scot)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jeremy Laymance, Morgan Laymance. (mjc, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 Sealed Document - First Amended Complaint Unredacted. (mjc, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (REDACTED) against Jeffrey Coe, Ronnie Foster, Matthew Hester, Felicia Hickerson, Greg Taylor, John VanCompernolle, Sharon VanCompernolle, filed by Morgan Laymance, Jeremy Laymance.(mjc, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Jeremy Laymance, Morgan Laymance. (mjc, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Jeffrey Coe. Responses due by 3/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coe, Jeffrey)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 ***REDACTED*** COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Coe, Ronnie Foster, Matthew Hester, Felicia Hickerson, Greg Taylor, John VanCompernolle, Sharon VanCompernolle, filed by Morgan Laymance, Jeremy Laymance.(mjc, )
February 8, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. Consent form mailed to Plaintiffs. (mjc, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (mjc, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Jeffrey Coe, Ronnie Foster, Matthew Hester, Felicia Hickerson, Greg Taylor, John VanCompernolle, Sharon VanCompernolle. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) - Foster, #2 Summons(es) - Hester, #3 Summons(es) - Hickerson, #4 Summons(es) - Coe, #5 Summons(es) - S. VanCompernolle, #6 Summons(es) - J. VanCompernolle)(mjc, )
February 8, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 6-45821. (mjc, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 ***SEALED RE MINOR CHILD.***COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Coe, Ronnie Foster, Matthew Hester, Felicia Hickerson, Greg Taylor, John VanCompernolle, Sharon VanCompernolle, filed by Morgan Laymance, Jeremy Laymance. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mjc, ) Modified on 2/8/2019 (mjc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laymance et al v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon VanCompernolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Hester
Represented By: David R. Herring Iglesias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Hickerson
Represented By: Scot Macdonald Graydon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John VanCompernolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Taylor
Represented By: David R. Herring Iglesias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Foster
Represented By: David R. Herring Iglesias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Coe
Represented By: Jeffrey Lee Coe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Laymance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Laymance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?