Tyson and Billy Architects, PC v. Kingdom Perspectives G.P., Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Tyson and Billy Architects, PC
Defendant: Jonathan Pino, Kingdom Perspectives G.P., Ltd. and Jim LaPorte
Undetermined: Donivan Flowers
Case Number: 6:2019cv00053
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 26 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tyson and Billy Architects, PC. (Gardner, Allen)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER APPOINTING MEDIATOR. The Court appoints Donivan W. Flowers. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/11/2019. (rlf)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/11/2019. (rlf)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (ESI) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/11/2019. (rlf)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/11/2019. (rlf)
April 11, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Scheduling Conference held on 4/11/2019. (srb)
April 9, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed by Tyson and Billy Architects, PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Dkt. 11-1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Canton Herald Article, #3 Exhibit 3 - Country Inn Newspaper Article, #4 Exhibit 4 - Meier Email/Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - Blevins Email, #6 Exhibit 6 - Ground Breaking Ceremony Email, #7 Exhibit 7 - LOI, Draft Agreement, etc., #8 Exhibit 8 - Forfeiture of the LLC, #9 Exhibit 9 - Kingdom Perspectives Certificate of Formation, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
April 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Tyson and Billy Architects, PC Joint Notice of Agreed Mediator (Gardner, Allen)
April 8, 2019 Filing 17 Submission of by Tyson and Billy Architects, PC Agreed Motion for Entry of Scheduling Orders. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Docket Control Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Discovery Order, #3 Text of Proposed Order Agreed Protective Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order Agreed ESI Order)(Gardner, Allen)
April 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Tyson and Billy Architects, PC (James, Clinton)
April 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Jonathan Pino (Kolder, Eric)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting in part #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #11 MOTION to Dismiss. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's response deadline is extended until and through April 9, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 4/2/2019. (rlf)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Regarding Defendant Kingdom Perspectives, G.P., Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss by Tyson and Billy Architects, PC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gardner, Allen)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Tyson and Billy Architects, PC (Gardner, Allen)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Kingdom Perspectives G.P., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hommel, William)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 4/11/2019 02:00 PM in Ctrm 207 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Parties are to submit an agreed Docket Control Order, Discovery Order, Protective Order, and an ESI Order taken from the Judge Love's website no later than 9:00 a.m. two days prior to the date of the Scheduling Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 3/14/2019. (mjc, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Monique Aleth Hammond on behalf of Tyson and Billy Architects, PC (Hammond, Monique)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Miles Spitzer on behalf of Jonathan Pino (Spitzer, Stephen)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jonathan Pino.(Kolder, Eric)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyson and Billy Architects, PC. Jonathan Pino served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (rlf)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyson and Billy Architects, PC. Jim LaPorte served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (rlf)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyson and Billy Architects, PC. Kingdom Perspectives G.P., Ltd. served on 2/16/2019, answer due 3/11/2019. (mjc, )
February 14, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rlf)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Kingdom Perspectives G.P., Ltd., Jim LaPorte, Jonathan Pino and emailed to Plaintiff for service. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS - LaPorte, #2 SUMMONS -Pino)(rlf)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D Love. (rlf)
February 14, 2019 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle and Magistrate Judge John D. Love added. (rlf)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7140383.), filed by Tyson and Billy Architects, PC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contract, #2 Exhibit Invoices, #3 Exhibit Demand and Fund Trapping Letter, #4 Exhibit Affidavit Claiming Mechanic's and Materialman's Lien, #5 Exhibit Notice of Affidavit Claiming Mechanic's and Materialman's Lien, #6 Exhibit Final Demand, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(James, Clinton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tyson and Billy Architects, PC v. Kingdom Perspectives G.P., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Pino
Represented By: Stephen Miles Spitzer
Represented By: Eric J Kolder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingdom Perspectives G.P., Ltd.
Represented By: William S Hommel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim LaPorte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyson and Billy Architects, PC
Represented By: Clinton Duane James
Represented By: Monique Aleth Hammond
Represented By: Allen Franklin Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Donivan Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?