Kitchings v. Total Account Specialty Collections et al

Plaintiff: Stephen Kitchings
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Total Account Specialty Collections
Case Number: 6:2019cv00204
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Burgess, Mark)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS entered. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/5/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2019 10:00 AM in Ctrm 102 (Tyler) before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 6/6/2019. (mjc, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Total Account Specialty Collections.(Burgess, Mark)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Saldana, Melissa)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Saldana, Melissa)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Kitchings. Total Account Specialty Collections served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. (Klote, Gregory)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Kitchings. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Motil, Gregory)
May 9, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rlf)
May 8, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Stephen Kitchings. (rlf)
May 8, 2019 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (rlf)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Total Account Specialty Collections. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) -Total Account)(mjc, )
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Total Account Specialty Collections ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7260074.), filed by Stephen Kitchings. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dispute Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Updated Credit Report, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Motil, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kitchings v. Total Account Specialty Collections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Saldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Account Specialty Collections
Represented By: Mark C Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Kitchings
Represented By: Gregory Stephen Motil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?