Kitchings v. United Revenue Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Stephen Kitchings
Defendant: United Revenue Corporation and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv00210
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint and Brief in Support signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/05/2019 Responses due by 7/29/2019. (ksd )
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint and Brief in Support by Stephen Kitchings. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Motil, Gregory)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District Judge J. Campbell Barker for all further proceedings. District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 6/28/19. (tkd, )
June 27, 2019 Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 02:30 PM in Tyler Courthouse before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. (gsg)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 02:30 PM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 6/25/2019. (gsg)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Saldana, Melissa)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint and Brief in Support by United Revenue Corporation. (Farrar, Zachary) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2019: #1 Corrected Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
June 3, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for United Revenue Corporation. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( gsg )
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re United Revenue Corporation.( Farrar, Zachary)
June 3, 2019 ***FILED IN ERROR. Document # 7, Motion for extension of time. PLEASE IGNORE. ATTORNEY WILL RE-FILE AS AN APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME.*** (gsg)
May 31, 2019 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to 6/25/2019. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( gsg )
May 31, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Saldana, Melissa)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Experian Information Solutions, Inc.( Saldana, Melissa)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR. DISREGARD.*** Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, United Revenue Corporation's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Original Complaint by United Revenue Corporation. (Farrar, Zachary) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2019: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (mjc, ). Modified on 6/3/2019 (gsg).
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Kitchings. United Revenue Corporation served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Motil, Gregory)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen Kitchings. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 5/14/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. (Motil, Gregory)
May 13, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rlf)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., United Revenue Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es) - Experian)(mjc, )
May 10, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Stephen Kitchings. (rlf)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D Love. (rlf)
May 10, 2019 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle and Magistrate Judge John D. Love added. (rlf)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., United Revenue Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7261998.), filed by Stephen Kitchings. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CCS, #2 Exhibit A- Dispute Letter, #3 Exhibit B- Updated Credit Report)(Motil, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kitchings v. United Revenue Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Revenue Corporation
Represented By: Zachary Curtis Farrar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Saldana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Kitchings
Represented By: Gregory Stephen Motil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?