Willis v. of Emory
Plaintiff: Glenn Willis
Defendant: The City of Emory
Case Number: 6:2019cv00280
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: J Campbell Barker
Referring Judge: John D Love
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Continue. The Rule 16 Management Conference is reset to September 9, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/16/2019. (gsg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION to Continue 8/29/19 RULE 16 MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by The City of Emory. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Vincent, Lance)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDLULING ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 8/29/2019 AT 10:30 AM in Tyler Courthouse before Magistrate Judge John D. Love. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 8/1/2019. (gsg)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by The City of Emory.(Vincent, Lance)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Glenn Willis. The City of Emory served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (O'Kelly, Nicholas)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to The City of Emory. (gsg)
June 28, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge John D. Love.(ksd )
June 28, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ksd)
June 28, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Glenn Willis. (ksd)
June 28, 2019 District Judge J. Campbell Barker and Magistrate Judge John D. Love added. (ksd)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The City of Emory ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7328445.), filed by Glenn Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EEOC Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit Determination Letter, #3 Exhibit Notice of Right To Sue Letter)(O'Kelly, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. of Emory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Emory
Represented By: Lance Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Willis
Represented By: Nicholas Alban O'Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?