Harmon v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Plaintiff: Lisa Harmon
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Case Number: 6:2019cv00285
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Joinder of Parties due by 9/10/2019.(ksd )(Typographical error)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 08/21/2019: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/14/2020 09:00 AM in Ctrm 353 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell; Discovery due by 6/19/2020.; Expert Witness List due by 12/10/2019; Identify trial witnesses by 6/19/2020; Joinder of Parties due by 9/10/2019; Jury instructions due by 6/30/2020; Jury Selection and trial are set for 7/30/2020 09:00 AM in Ctrm 353 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell; Designation of Mediator due by 8/26/2019; Motions due by 7/7/2020; Motion in limine and pretrial objections due 06/30/2020; Motion to seal trial exhibits is due is 3 days after the trial. (ksd )
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 8/21/2019. (gsg)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 8/21/2019. (gsg)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER assigning case to Judge Mitchell by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 8/14/2019. (mjc, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by Lisa Harmon, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Consent)(mjc, )
August 13, 2019 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING. The Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 10:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. Parties filed agreed foundational documents and consent to USMJ. (leh, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC . (LaRue, Jessica)
August 6, 2019 Filing 11 Submission of Proposed Agreed Protective order by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC . (LaRue, Jessica)
August 6, 2019 Filing 10 Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC . (LaRue, Jessica)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (LaRue, Jessica)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Lisa Harmon of Plaintiff's Certificate of Interested Parties (Palavan, Shea)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shea Neal Palavan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Palavan, Shea)
July 15, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing (RESET): The Scheduling Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 10:30 a.m. is RE-SET for 8/14/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (leh, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 8/13/2019 10:30 AM in Ctrm 353 (Tyler) before Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. Parties are to submit an up-to-date Docket Control Order, Discovery Order, an agreed order related to the discovery and production of electronically stored information, and a Protective Order no later than 9:00 a.m. ten days prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/9/2019. (mjc, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC.(LaRue, Jessica)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC from 2nd Judicial District Court of Cherokee County, Texas, case number 2019060342. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7330413), filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(LaRue, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harmon v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Represented By: Jessica Merritt LaRue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Harmon
Represented By: Eric David Nielsen
Represented By: Shea Neal Palavan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?