Brown v. Walmart #6467
Plaintiff: Debbie Brown
Defendant: Walmart #6467
Case Number: 6:2019cv00296
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Jeremy D Kernodle
Referring Judge: K Nicole Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Debbie Brown (no date given) as to #9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #8 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel. (mjc, )
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 07/31/2019. (ksd )
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 07/31/2019. (ksd)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Debbie Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope(s))(ksd)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Debbie Brown. (ksd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Debbie Brown (no date given) as to #4 Order. (mjc, )
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DEFICIENCY re #1 Complaint filed by Debbie Brown. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall either submit a motion to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full filing fee of $400 within 20 days of receipt of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/8/2019. (gsg)
July 1, 2019 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. CONSENT FORM MAILED TO PLAINTIFF. (ksd)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (ksd)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attempt to Secure Counsel by Debbie Brown. (ksd )
July 1, 2019 District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle and Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell added. (ksd)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walmart #6467 filed by Debbie Brown. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(ksd )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Walmart #6467
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart #6467
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?